State of California, et al v. Alex Azar, II, et al
Intervenor Plaintiff: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 503, CAMILLE CHRISTIAN, VIRGINIA GRANT, SHERLEEN BRIGHT, ELENI SYRPIS, ED SOLENG, UNITED DOMESTIC WORKERS OF AMERICA, AFSCME LOCAL 3930, DEBRA HOWZE, REBECCA SANDOVAL, KAY WRIGHT and LESLEY FORSYTHE
Plaintiff / Appellee: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF ILLINOIS, KATE BROWN, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, by and through Attorney General Xavier Becerra and STATE OF OREGON
Defendant / Appellant: ALEX M. AZAR II and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Case Number: 21-15091
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Filing 7 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/22/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11979013]. [21-15091] (AD) [Entered: 01/22/2021 06:44 PM]
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellants Alex M. Azar, II and U.S. Department of Health and Human Services Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/22/2021. [11978140] [21-15091] (Federighi, Carol) [Entered: 01/22/2021 01:27 PM]
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 Attorneys Nicole DeFever and Nicole DeFever in 21-15091 substituted by Attorneys Patricia Garcia Rincon and Patricia Garcia Rincon in 21-15091 [11968128] (NAC) [Entered: 01/19/2021 02:04 PM]
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Patty Rincon (Oregon Department of Justice Appellate Division 1162 Court Street NE Salem, OR 97301) for Appellees Kate Brown and State of Oregon. Substitution for Attorney Nicole DeFever for Appellees Kate Brown and State of Oregon. Date of service: 01/19/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11967896] [21-15091] (Rincon, Patricia) [Entered: 01/19/2021 12:49 PM]
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 Added Attorney P. Casey Pitts for Appellees Debra Howze, Service Employees International Union Local 503, Sherleen Bright, Lesley Forsythe, Eleni Syrpis, Kay Wright, Ed Soleng, United Domestic Workers of America, AFSCME Local 3930, Camille Christian, Virginia Grant and Rebecca Sandoval, in case 21-15091. [11966583] (HH) [Entered: 01/15/2021 04:44 PM]
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of P. Casey Pitts (Altshuler Berzon LLP, 177 Post Street, Suite 300, San Francisco, CA 94108) for Appellees Sherleen Bright, Camille Christian, Lesley Forsythe, Virginia Grant, Debra Howze, Rebecca Sandoval, Service Employees International Union Local 503, Ed Soleng, Eleni Syrpis, United Domestic Workers of America, AFSCME Local 3930 and Kay Wright. Date of service: 01/15/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11966547] [21-15091] (Pitts, P.) [Entered: 01/15/2021 04:32 PM]
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Alex M. Azar II and U.S. Department of Health and Human Services Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/22/2021. Appellants Alex M. Azar II and U.S. Department of Health and Human Services opening brief due 03/15/2021. Appellees Sherleen Bright, Kate Brown, Camille Christian, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Lesley Forsythe, Virginia Grant, Debra Howze, Rebecca Sandoval, Service Employees International Union Local 503, Ed Soleng, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Illinois, State of Oregon, State of Washington, Eleni Syrpis, United Domestic Workers of America, AFSCME Local 3930 and Kay Wright answering brief due 04/14/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11965364] (JBS) [Entered: 01/15/2021 10:39 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: State of California, et al v. Alex Azar, II, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 503
Represented By: Stefanie Wilson
Represented By: Stacey Leyton
Represented By: Teague Pryde Paterson
Represented By: P. Casey Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: CAMILLE CHRISTIAN
Represented By: Stefanie Wilson
Represented By: Stacey Leyton
Represented By: Teague Pryde Paterson
Represented By: P. Casey Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: VIRGINIA GRANT
Represented By: Stefanie Wilson
Represented By: Stacey Leyton
Represented By: Teague Pryde Paterson
Represented By: P. Casey Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: SHERLEEN BRIGHT
Represented By: Stefanie Wilson
Represented By: Stacey Leyton
Represented By: Teague Pryde Paterson
Represented By: P. Casey Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: ELENI SYRPIS
Represented By: Stefanie Wilson
Represented By: Stacey Leyton
Represented By: Teague Pryde Paterson
Represented By: P. Casey Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: ED SOLENG
Represented By: Stefanie Wilson
Represented By: Stacey Leyton
Represented By: Teague Pryde Paterson
Represented By: P. Casey Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: UNITED DOMESTIC WORKERS OF AMERICA, AFSCME LOCAL 3930
Represented By: Stefanie Wilson
Represented By: Stacey Leyton
Represented By: Teague Pryde Paterson
Represented By: P. Casey Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: DEBRA HOWZE
Represented By: Stefanie Wilson
Represented By: Stacey Leyton
Represented By: Teague Pryde Paterson
Represented By: P. Casey Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: REBECCA SANDOVAL
Represented By: Stefanie Wilson
Represented By: Stacey Leyton
Represented By: Teague Pryde Paterson
Represented By: P. Casey Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: KAY WRIGHT
Represented By: Stefanie Wilson
Represented By: Stacey Leyton
Represented By: Teague Pryde Paterson
Represented By: P. Casey Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: LESLEY FORSYTHE
Represented By: Stefanie Wilson
Represented By: Stacey Leyton
Represented By: Teague Pryde Paterson
Represented By: P. Casey Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Cynthia Mark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF CONNECTICUT
Represented By: Margaret Q. Chapple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: Elizabeth Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KATE BROWN
Represented By: Patricia Garcia Rincon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF WASHINGTON
Represented By: Alicia Orlena Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF CALIFORNIA, by and through Attorney General Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Anna Rich
Represented By: Kathleen Boergers
Represented By: Nimrod Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF OREGON
Represented By: Patricia Garcia Rincon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ALEX M. AZAR II
Represented By: Carol Federighi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Carol Federighi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?