Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, et al v. Panasonic Corporation, et al
Defendant: LG CHEM, LTD., SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION, MAXWELL CORPORATION OF AMERICA, HITACHI, LTD., PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, SONY CORPORATION, TOSHIBA AMERICA ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS, INC., TOSHIBA CORPORATION, SONY ELECTRONICS, INC., NEC CORPORATION, PANASONIC CORPORATION, SAMSUNG SDI CO. LTD., SANYO ELECTRIC CO, LTD, SANYO NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION, LG CHEM AMERICA, INC., SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC., HITACHI MAXWELL, LTD. and NEC TOKIN CORPORATION
Plaintiff / Appellant: INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS
Appellee: CHRISTOPHER ANDREWS, STEVEN FRANKLYN HELFAND and MICHAEL FRANK BEDNARZ
Not Classified By Court: In re: LITHIUM ION BATTERIES ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Case Number: 21-15200
Filed: February 3, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Filing 13 Filed (ECF) Appellee Michael Frank Bednarz in 21-15200, Appellant Michael Frank Bednarz in 21-15120 Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion to Clarify April 2 Scheduling Order and Motion to Dismiss Appeal No. 21-15200 as Untimely], Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 04/02/2021. [12062749] [21-15200, 21-15120, 21-15138] (Frank, Theodore) [Entered: 04/02/2021 09:22 PM]
April 2, 2021 Filing 12 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Granting Motion [ # 11 ] (ECF Filing) filed by Appellant Mr. Christopher Andrews, Appellee Mr. Christopher Andrews; Granting Motion (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant Mr. Christopher Andrews, Appellee Mr. Christopher Andrews. First cross appeal brief due 06/07/2021 for Christopher Andrews. Second brief on cross appeal due 07/07/2021 for Michael Frank Bednarz, Hitachi Maxwell, Ltd., Hitachi, Ltd., Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, LG Chem America, Inc., LG Chem, Ltd., Lithium Ion Batteries Antitrust Litigation, Maxwell Corporation of America, NEC Corporation, NEC Tokin Corporation, Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., Sanyo Electric Co, Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation, Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Energy Devices Corporation, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba Corporation and Steven Franklyn Helfand. Third brief on cross appeal due 08/06/2021 for Christopher Andrews. The fourth cross appeal brief is due within 21days after service of the third cross appeal brief. [12061812] [21-15138, 21-15120, 21-15200]--[Edited: Updated docket tex to match PDF. 04/02/2021 by SLM] (GS) [Entered: 04/02/2021 10:46 AM]
April 2, 2021 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) Appellant Mr. Christopher Andrews in 21-15138, Appellee Mr. Christopher Andrews in 21-15200 Motion to extend time to file Opening brief. Date of service: 04/02/2021. [12061735] [21-15120, 21-15200, 21-15138] --[COURT ENTERED FILING. Originally filed in case 21-15138 only.] (TYL) [Entered: 04/02/2021 10:20 AM]
March 4, 2021 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Appellant Mr. Christopher Andrews in 21-15138 reply to response to Court order dated 02/24/2021. Date of service: 03/04/2021. [12023717] [21-15138, 21-15200] (Andrews, Christopher) [Entered: 03/04/2021 03:40 AM]
February 24, 2021 Filing 9 Filed order MEDIATION (JW): This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions. [12015649] [21-15138, 21-15120, 21-15200] (WL) [Entered: 02/24/2021 03:03 PM]
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): The district courts post-judgment order was entered on the docket on December 10, 2020. Appellants notice of appeal was filed in the district court on January 15, 2021. Accordingly, the record suggests that this court may lack jurisdiction over this appeal because the notice of appeal was not filed within 30 days after entry of the district courts post-judgment order. See 28 U.S.C. 2107(a); Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(1)(A), 4(c); United States v. Sadler, 480 F.3d 932, 937 (9th Cir. 2007) (requirement of timely notice of appeal is jurisdictional). Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal, or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellant elects to show cause, a response may be filed within 10 days after service of the memorandum. If appellant does not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [12015315] [21-15138, 21-15120, 21-15200] (CKP) [Entered: 02/24/2021 01:14 PM]
February 24, 2021 Filing 7 Fee status changed ( [Case Number 21-15138: IFP] ). [12015300] [21-15138, 21-15120, 21-15200] (CO) [Entered: 02/24/2021 01:08 PM]
February 18, 2021 Filing 6 Terminated James F. Lerner for Sanyo North America Corporation, Sanyo Electric Co, Ltd, Panasonic Corporation of North America and Panasonic Corporation in 21-15022, 21-15120, 21-15138 and 21-15200 (due to incorrect ECF contact information) [12007998] [21-15022, 21-15200, 21-15120, 21-15138] (RY) [Entered: 02/18/2021 10:24 AM]
February 16, 2021 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Correspondence: Letter to Court requesting permission to file Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal on behalf of Appellant Steven Franklyn Helfand, per his request.. Date of service: 02/16/2021 [12005502] [21-15022]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 21-15200. 02/17/2021 by SLM] (Zapala, Adam) [Entered: 02/16/2021 05:58 PM]
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/10/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12000091]. [21-15200] (AD) [Entered: 02/10/2021 06:44 PM]
February 10, 2021 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs in 21-15200 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/10/2021. [11999310] [21-15200, 21-15022, 21-15120, 21-15138] (Scarlett, Shana) [Entered: 02/10/2021 12:45 PM]
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 Terminated Nancy L. Fineman for Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs in 21-15022, 21-15120, 21-15138, and 21-15200 (for failure to register for Appellate ECF) [11995759] [21-15022, 21-15200, 21-15120, 21-15138] (JBS) [Entered: 02/08/2021 10:35 AM]
February 3, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Appellant Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/10/2021. First cross appeal brief due 05/04/2021 for Christopher Andrews, Michael Frank Bednarz and Steven Franklyn Helfand. Second brief on cross appeal due 06/04/2021 for Hitachi Maxwell, Ltd., Hitachi, Ltd., Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, LG Chem America, Inc., LG Chem, Ltd., Lithium Ion Batteries Antitrust Litigation, Maxwell Corporation of America, NEC Corporation, NEC Tokin Corporation, Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., Sanyo Electric Co, Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation, Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Energy Devices Corporation, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Michael Frank Bednarz and Christopher Andrews. Third brief on cross appeal due 07/06/2021 for Christopher Andrews, Michael Frank Bednarz and Steven Franklyn Helfand. Optional cross appeal Reply brief for Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs is due within 21 days of service of Third brief on cross appeal. [11991783] [21-15200, 21-15022, 21-15120, 21-15138] (RT) [Entered: 02/03/2021 03:32 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, et al v. Panasonic Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG CHEM, LTD.
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION
Represented By: Beatriz Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAXWELL CORPORATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: Craig Philip Seebald
Represented By: Lindsey R. Vaala
Represented By: Christopher Walter James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HITACHI, LTD.
Represented By: Craig Philip Seebald
Represented By: Lindsey R. Vaala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Amato
Represented By: James F. Lerner
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Eva W. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SONY CORPORATION
Represented By: Beatriz Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOSHIBA AMERICA ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS, INC.
Represented By: Jerry Frank Hogue
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOSHIBA CORPORATION
Represented By: Jerry Frank Hogue
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SONY ELECTRONICS, INC.
Represented By: Beatriz Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC CORPORATION
Represented By: Dana Lynn Cook-Milligan
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PANASONIC CORPORATION
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Amato
Represented By: James F. Lerner
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Eva W. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMSUNG SDI CO. LTD.
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Represented By: John Roberti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANYO ELECTRIC CO, LTD
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Amato
Represented By: James F. Lerner
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Eva W. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANYO NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Amato
Represented By: James F. Lerner
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Eva W. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG CHEM AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Represented By: John Roberti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HITACHI MAXWELL, LTD.
Represented By: Craig Philip Seebald
Represented By: Lindsey R. Vaala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC TOKIN CORPORATION
Represented By: Rachel Susan Brass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Jeff D. Friedman
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Represented By: Adam J. Zapala
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Richard M. Heimann
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: Brendan P. Glackin
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CHRISTOPHER ANDREWS
Represented By: Christopher Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: STEVEN FRANKLYN HELFAND
Represented By: Steven Franklyn Helfand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MICHAEL FRANK BEDNARZ
Represented By: Theodore H. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: In re: LITHIUM ION BATTERIES ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?