Steven Miller v. Albert Najera, et al
Defendant / Appellee: FRESNO COUNTY JAIL INTAKE OFFICERS, MARGARET MIMS, Sheriff of Fresno County, GUTIERREZ, Officer at Fresno County Jail, MEZA, Fresno County Classification Officer, FRESNO COUNTY JAIL, ALBERT NAJERA, RICK HILL, Warden, Fresno County Captain of Detention, Retired, FRESNO COUNTY and UNITED STATES MARSHAL
Plaintiff / Appellant: STEVEN R. MILLER
Case Number: 21-15202
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 8 Mail returned on 03/08/2021 addressed to Steven R. Miller, re: 02/24/2021 order [ # 6 ]. Returned envelope notes: return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. Resending to: 4224 W. Monte Vista Ave., Visalia, CA 93277. [12032933] (LA) [Entered: 03/11/2021 03:54 PM]
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 Received notice of change of address dated 02/25/2021 from Steven R. Miller in 20-17348, 21-15202. New address: 4224 W. Monte Vista Ave., Visalia, CA 93277. [12020328] [20-17348, 21-15202] --[Edited: Updated Address. 03/01/2021 by TYL] (NAC) [Entered: 03/01/2021 03:06 PM]
February 24, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner completed authorization fee order. [12015406] (CKP) [Entered: 02/24/2021 01:49 PM]
February 22, 2021 Filing 5 Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 02/16/2021. [Case Number 21-15202: Partially Paid] [12011834] (DJV) [Entered: 02/22/2021 01:43 PM]
February 11, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [12001024] (CKP) [Entered: 02/11/2021 02:41 PM]
February 10, 2021 Filing 3 Received copy of District Court order filed on 02/10/2021. in forma pauperis status should not be revoked, and should continue on appeal. [11999920] (RR) [Entered: 02/10/2021 04:28 PM]
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 Filed referral notice (Deputy Clerk:CKP): Referring to the district court for determination whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal. [11995904] (CKP) [Entered: 02/08/2021 11:28 AM]
February 4, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Steven R. Miller opening brief due 04/05/2021. [11992397] (JPD) [Entered: 02/04/2021 09:17 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Steven Miller v. Albert Najera, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRESNO COUNTY JAIL INTAKE OFFICERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARGARET MIMS, Sheriff of Fresno County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GUTIERREZ, Officer at Fresno County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MEZA, Fresno County Classification Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRESNO COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALBERT NAJERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICK HILL, Warden, Fresno County Captain of Detention, Retired
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRESNO COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES MARSHAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEVEN R. MILLER
Represented By: Steven R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?