Nicholas DeFiore, et al v. SOC LLC, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: DANIEL MERCANTON, SHAWN WHITEHEAD, RICHARD LANDRY, CHRISTOPHER WILLIAMS, KEITH QUICK, JEROME MUNDY, EDUARDO ZUNIGA, CHRISTOPHER WARREN, ABDELRAHIM KHAMIS, ROBERT HERRING, JOSEPH SCOTT, DAVID WOLDERZAK, BABATUNDA DOUGLAS, CURTIS WATSON, WARREN WOODS, ARNOLD ALEXANDER, CHRISTOPHER FIELDS, BENTON WILLIAMS, Jr., JAQUELYN JOUBERT-YOUNG, TODD DUPONT, NICHOLAS DEFIORE, GEORGE MUNN, ALLEN CAIN, HOUSTON WILLAMS, ALFREDO LUIS CRUZ, RENE PEREZ, NEIL ROBINSON, PAUL MILLS, Jr. and DUSTIN BOYLE
Defendant / Appellant: SOC-SMG, INC., DAY & ZIMMERMANN, INC. and SOC LLC, DBA SOC Nevada LLC
Case Number: 21-15261
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 Filed order MEDIATION (SMC): A telephonic mediation will be held on April 21, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. Each participant will receive an email with dial-in information. Please notify the Mediation Office at mediation@ca9.uscourts.gov if counsel does not receive an email or if additional participants should be added. Unless excused by the Circuit Mediator prior to the scheduled mediation, each party shall be represented by counsel of record and a client representative having full authority to negotiate and settle the case on any terms at the mediation. Mediation statements no longer than 10 pages shall be submitted to the Circuit Mediator via e-mail (Sasha_M_Cummings@ca9.uscourts.gov) on or before April 14, 2021, by 12:00 p.m. (noon). Should a party require more than 10 pages for their mediation brief, counsel should contact the Circuit Mediator prior to the date for submission to discuss such. Mediation statements should contain brief statements of the following: (a) factual and procedural background; (b) legal issues and arguments related to this dispute; (c) past settlement discussions; (d) the names and representative capacities of those who will attend the mediation and a cell phone number for counsel; Sections (a), (b), (c) and (d) shall be served on counsel for the opposing party on the same date they are submitted to the undersigned. Mediation statements should not be filed with the court. Counsel may also identify any documents filed with the district court that they wish the Circuit Mediator to review prior to the mediation. All counsel and mediation participants should review, sign and return the executed Confidentiality Agreement (attached as Exhibit A below) directly to the Circuit Mediator in advance of the mediation. [12046595] (OC) [Entered: 03/18/2021 04:00 PM]
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 03/17/2021, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12018642] (BLS) [Entered: 02/26/2021 04:14 PM]
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/23/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12013692]. [21-15261] (AD) [Entered: 02/23/2021 12:44 PM]
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Day & Zimmermann, Inc., SOC LLC and SOC-SMG, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/23/2021. [12012838] [21-15261] (Lee, Tara) [Entered: 02/23/2021 06:58 AM]
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: SOC LLC, et al. Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/23/2021. Transcript ordered by 03/15/2021. Transcript due 04/13/2021. Appellants SOC LLC, et al.opening brief due 05/24/2021. Appellees Nicholas DeFiore, et al. answering brief due 06/22/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12003580] (JPD) [Entered: 02/16/2021 09:19 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Nicholas DeFiore, et al v. SOC LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DANIEL MERCANTON
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHAWN WHITEHEAD
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RICHARD LANDRY
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHRISTOPHER WILLIAMS
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KEITH QUICK
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JEROME MUNDY
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EDUARDO ZUNIGA
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHRISTOPHER WARREN
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ABDELRAHIM KHAMIS
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROBERT HERRING
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOSEPH SCOTT
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID WOLDERZAK
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BABATUNDA DOUGLAS
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CURTIS WATSON
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WARREN WOODS
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ARNOLD ALEXANDER
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHRISTOPHER FIELDS
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BENTON WILLIAMS, Jr.
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAQUELYN JOUBERT-YOUNG
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TODD DUPONT
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NICHOLAS DEFIORE
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GEORGE MUNN
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALLEN CAIN
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HOUSTON WILLAMS
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALFREDO LUIS CRUZ
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RENE PEREZ
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NEIL ROBINSON
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PAUL MILLS, Jr.
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DUSTIN BOYLE
Represented By: Scott E. Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SOC-SMG, INC.
Represented By: E. Leif Reid Esquire
Represented By: Tara Melissa Lee Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DAY & ZIMMERMANN, INC.
Represented By: E. Leif Reid Esquire
Represented By: Tara Melissa Lee Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SOC LLC, DBA SOC Nevada LLC
Represented By: E. Leif Reid Esquire
Represented By: Tara Melissa Lee Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?