Jamal Hendrix v. M. Sharp, et al
Defendant / Appellee: ELLIOT BURLEIGH, H. CHUNG, C. DAVIS, Sgt., DANIEL ESQUIVEL, D. TRISTAN, MICHAEL SHARP, C. HAYMAN, CHRISTOPHER DAVIS, JACOB PARR, GEORGE DAVIS, M. SHARP, E. BURLIEGH, LIM ROGER, FAC, COREY COOKE, SEAN DONOHUE, Sgt., DEBRA BOONE SHARP, P. HERNANDEZ, ARIAS, c/o, M. NORIEGA, DAVID TRISTAN, LESLIE HEALER, CHRISTOPHER ASHDOWN, ALEJANDRO ARIAS, TAYLOR INGLE, R. BOONE-SHARP, CARLOS GOMEZ, HAROLD M. BYRNE, G. T. DAVIS, TASHEENA SANDOVAL and S. OXBORROW, c/o
Plaintiff / Appellant: JAMAL DAMON HENDRIX, AKA Jamar Hendrix
Case Number: 21-15358
Filed: March 2, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner completed authorization fee order. [12074061] (CKP) [Entered: 04/14/2021 12:59 PM]
April 13, 2021 Filing 8 Streamlined request by Appellant Jamal Damon Hendrix to extend time to file the brief is approved. Streamlined requests allow for30 days. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Jamal Damon Hendrix opening brief due 06/01/2021. Appellees Arias, Alejandro Arias, Christopher Ashdown, R. Boone-Sharp, Elliot Burleigh, E. Burliegh, Harold M. Byrne, H. Chung, Corey Cooke, C. Davis, Christopher Davis, G. T. Davis, George Davis, Sean Donohue, Daniel Esquivel, Carlos Gomez, C. Hayman, Leslie Healer, P. Hernandez, Taylor Ingle, M. Noriega, S. Oxborrow, Jacob Parr, Lim Roger, Tasheena Sandoval, Debra Boone Sharp, M. Sharp, Michael Sharp, D. Tristan and David Tristan answering brief due 07/01/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12072330] (BG) [Entered: 04/13/2021 10:40 AM]
April 12, 2021 Filing 9 Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 03/06/2021. [12073909] (RR) [Entered: 04/14/2021 11:33 AM]
March 31, 2021 Filing 7 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): On March 4, 2021, this court ordered appellant to complete and file with this court the enclosed prisoner authorization form. On March 29, 2021, appellant returned a prisoner authorization form that was dated but was not signed. A signature is required on the prisoner authorization form. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant must sign and file with this court the enclosed prisoner authorization form. If appellant fails to comply with this order, the appeal will be dismissed by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. The briefing schedule established on March 2, 202 remains in effect. The Clerk shall send a copy of the March 4, 2021 order to appellant along with this order. [12059611] (CKP) [Entered: 03/31/2021 01:32 PM]
March 29, 2021 Filing 6 Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 03/23/2021. [Case Number 21-15358: Partially Paid] [12058222] (QDL) [Entered: 03/30/2021 12:27 PM]
March 5, 2021 Filing 5 Attorneys Douglas Reed Rands, Douglas Reed Rands, Douglas Reed Rands, Douglas Reed Rands, Douglas Reed Rands, Douglas Reed Rands, Douglas Reed Rands, Douglas Reed Rands, Douglas Reed Rands, Douglas Reed Rands, Douglas Reed Rands, Douglas Reed Rands, Douglas Reed Rands and Douglas Reed Rands in 21-15358 substituted by Attorneys Frank Anthony Toddre II, Frank Anthony Toddre II, Frank Anthony Toddre II, Frank Anthony Toddre II, Frank Anthony Toddre II, Frank Anthony Toddre II, Frank Anthony Toddre II, Frank Anthony Toddre II, Frank Anthony Toddre II, Frank Anthony Toddre II, Frank Anthony Toddre II, Frank Anthony Toddre II, Frank Anthony Toddre II and Frank Anthony Toddre II in 21-15358 [12025346] (DJV) [Entered: 03/05/2021 07:32 AM]
March 5, 2021 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Frank A. Toddre (The State of Nevada Attorney General's Office, 555 E. Washington Ave., Suite 3900 Las Vegas NV 89101) for Appellees Arias, Alejandro Arias, Christopher Ashdown, R. Boone-Sharp, Elliot Burleigh, E. Burliegh, Harold M. Byrne, H. Chung, Corey Cooke, C. Davis, Christopher Davis, G. T. Davis, George Davis, Sean Donohue, Daniel Esquivel, Carlos Gomez, C. Hayman, Leslie Healer, P. Hernandez, Taylor Ingle, M. Noriega, S. Oxborrow, Jacob Parr, Lim Roger, Tasheena Sandoval, Debra Boone Sharp, M. Sharp, Michael Sharp, D. Tristan, David Tristan and Appellant Jamal Damon Hendrix. Substitution for Attorney Mr. Douglas Reed Rands, Esquire for Appellees Alejandro Arias, Christopher Ashdown, Elliot Burleigh, Harold M. Byrne, H. Chung, Corey Cooke, Christopher Davis, George Davis, Daniel Esquivel, C. Hayman, P. Hernandez, Jacob Parr, Tasheena Sandoval and Michael Sharp. Date of service: 03/05/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12025297] [21-15358] (Toddre, Frank) [Entered: 03/05/2021 06:30 AM]
March 4, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [12023708] (CKP) [Entered: 03/04/2021 01:12 AM]
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Entered in error (wrong case). Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. [12021649] (JPD) [Entered: 03/02/2021 01:24 PM]
March 2, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Jamal Damon Hendrix opening brief due 04/30/2021. Appellees Michael Sharp, et al. answering brief due 06/01/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12021625] (JPD) [Entered: 03/02/2021 01:18 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jamal Hendrix v. M. Sharp, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELLIOT BURLEIGH
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Frank Anthony Toddre II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: H. CHUNG
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Frank Anthony Toddre II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. DAVIS, Sgt.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL ESQUIVEL
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Frank Anthony Toddre II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: D. TRISTAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL SHARP
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Frank Anthony Toddre II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. HAYMAN
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Frank Anthony Toddre II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTOPHER DAVIS
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Frank Anthony Toddre II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACOB PARR
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Frank Anthony Toddre II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GEORGE DAVIS
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Frank Anthony Toddre II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. SHARP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: E. BURLIEGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIM ROGER, FAC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COREY COOKE
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Frank Anthony Toddre II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SEAN DONOHUE, Sgt.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEBRA BOONE SHARP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: P. HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Frank Anthony Toddre II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARIAS, c/o
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. NORIEGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID TRISTAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LESLIE HEALER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTOPHER ASHDOWN
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Frank Anthony Toddre II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALEJANDRO ARIAS
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Frank Anthony Toddre II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TAYLOR INGLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: R. BOONE-SHARP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARLOS GOMEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HAROLD M. BYRNE
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Frank Anthony Toddre II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: G. T. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TASHEENA SANDOVAL
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Frank Anthony Toddre II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: S. OXBORROW, c/o
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMAL DAMON HENDRIX, AKA Jamar Hendrix
Represented By: Jamal Damon Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?