Todd Ashker, et al v. Gavin Newsom, et al
Defendant / Appellant: GREG LEWIS, Warden, GAVIN NEWSOM, Governor of the State of California, ANTHONY CHAUS, Chief, Office of Correctional Safety, CDCR and MATTHEW CATE
Plaintiff / Appellee: PAUL A. REDD, Jr., GABRIEL RALPH REYES, GEORGE RUIZ, RICHARD K. JOHNSON, TODD LEWIS ASHKER, JEFFREY ANTHONY FRANKLIN, DANNY TROXELL, LUIS ESQUIVEL, GEORGE FRANCO and RONNIE N. DEWBERRY
Case Number: 21-15839
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Filing 12 Filed (ECF) Appellees Todd Lewis Ashker, Ronnie N. Dewberry, Luis Esquivel, George Franco, Jeffrey Anthony Franklin, Richard K. Johnson, Paul A. Redd, Jr., Gabriel Ralph Reyes, George Ruiz and Danny Troxell response to motion ([ # 10 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 10 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to stay lower court action). Date of service: 07/06/2021. [12163788] [21-15839] (Miller, Samuel) [Entered: 07/06/2021 02:45 PM]
June 30, 2021 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) Appellants Matthew Cate, Anthony Chaus, Greg Lewis and Gavin Newsom Unopposed Motion for miscellaneous relief [NUNC PRO TUNC MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION]. Date of service: 06/30/2021. [12158973] [21-15839] (Brattin, Sarah) [Entered: 06/30/2021 11:12 AM]
June 23, 2021 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Appellants Matthew Cate, Anthony Chaus, Greg Lewis and Gavin Newsom Motion to stay lower court action. Date of service: 06/23/2021. [12152525] [21-15839] (Brattin, Sarah) [Entered: 06/23/2021 03:20 PM]
June 9, 2021 Filing 9 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12138709] (VS) [Entered: 06/09/2021 10:58 AM]
June 9, 2021 Filing 8 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): The appellants motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 3 ]) to withdraw the motion to stay appellate proceedings is granted. The motion at Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ] is deemed withdrawn. The opening brief remains due August 16, 2021. The answering brief is due September 16, 2021. The optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12138519] (WL) [Entered: 06/09/2021 09:42 AM]
May 26, 2021 Filing 7 MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 06/09/2021, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 06/08/2021 ). [12124855] (VS) [Entered: 05/26/2021 08:58 AM]
May 25, 2021 Filing 6 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 06/08/2021, 10:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12124028] (VS) [Entered: 05/25/2021 01:44 PM]
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/17/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12115945]. [21-15839] (AD) [Entered: 05/17/2021 06:44 PM]
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellants Matthew Cate, Anthony Chaus, Greg Lewis and Gavin Newsom Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/17/2021. [12115331] [21-15839] (Brattin, Sarah) [Entered: 05/17/2021 01:43 PM]
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellants Matthew Cate, Anthony Chaus, Greg Lewis and Gavin Newsom Motion for miscellaneous relief [Defendants-Appellants' Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Hold Appeal in Abeyance]. Date of service: 05/14/2021. [12113004] [21-15839] (Brattin, Sarah) [Entered: 05/14/2021 09:38 AM]
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Matthew Cate, Anthony Chaus, Greg Lewis and Gavin Newsom Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion to Hold Appeal in Abeyance]. Date of service: 05/11/2021. [12109676] [21-15839] (Brattin, Sarah) [Entered: 05/11/2021 04:16 PM]
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Matthew Cate, Anthony Chaus, Greg Lewis, Warden and Gavin Newsom Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/17/2021. Transcript ordered by 06/07/2021. Transcript due 07/06/2021. Appellants Matthew Cate, Anthony Chaus, Greg Lewis, Warden and Gavin Newsom opening brief due 08/16/2021. Appellees Todd Lewis Ashker, Ronnie N. Dewberry, Luis Esquivel, George Franco, Jeffrey Anthony Franklin, Richard K. Johnson, Paul A. Redd Jr., Gabriel Ralph Reyes, George Ruiz and Danny Troxell answering brief due 09/16/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12108051] (RT) [Entered: 05/10/2021 03:11 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Todd Ashker, et al v. Gavin Newsom, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GREG LEWIS, Warden
Represented By: Sarah M. Brattin
Represented By: Neah Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GAVIN NEWSOM, Governor of the State of California
Represented By: Sarah M. Brattin
Represented By: Neah Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ANTHONY CHAUS, Chief, Office of Correctional Safety, CDCR
Represented By: Sarah M. Brattin
Represented By: Neah Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MATTHEW CATE
Represented By: Sarah M. Brattin
Represented By: Neah Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PAUL A. REDD, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Bremer
Represented By: Charles Carbone
Represented By: Samuel Miller
Represented By: Jules Lobel
Represented By: Anne M. Cappella
Represented By: Rachel Anne Meeropol Esquire
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GABRIEL RALPH REYES
Represented By: Carmen Bremer
Represented By: Charles Carbone
Represented By: Samuel Miller
Represented By: Jules Lobel
Represented By: Anne M. Cappella
Represented By: Rachel Anne Meeropol Esquire
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GEORGE RUIZ
Represented By: Carmen Bremer
Represented By: Charles Carbone
Represented By: Samuel Miller
Represented By: Jules Lobel
Represented By: Anne M. Cappella
Represented By: Rachel Anne Meeropol Esquire
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RICHARD K. JOHNSON
Represented By: Carmen Bremer
Represented By: Charles Carbone
Represented By: Samuel Miller
Represented By: Jules Lobel
Represented By: Anne M. Cappella
Represented By: Rachel Anne Meeropol Esquire
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TODD LEWIS ASHKER
Represented By: Charles Carbone
Represented By: Samuel Miller
Represented By: Jules Lobel
Represented By: Anne M. Cappella
Represented By: Rachel Anne Meeropol Esquire
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JEFFREY ANTHONY FRANKLIN
Represented By: Carmen Bremer
Represented By: Charles Carbone
Represented By: Samuel Miller
Represented By: Jules Lobel
Represented By: Anne M. Cappella
Represented By: Rachel Anne Meeropol Esquire
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DANNY TROXELL
Represented By: Carmen Bremer
Represented By: Charles Carbone
Represented By: Samuel Miller
Represented By: Jules Lobel
Represented By: Anne M. Cappella
Represented By: Rachel Anne Meeropol Esquire
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LUIS ESQUIVEL
Represented By: Carmen Bremer
Represented By: Charles Carbone
Represented By: Samuel Miller
Represented By: Jules Lobel
Represented By: Anne M. Cappella
Represented By: Rachel Anne Meeropol Esquire
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GEORGE FRANCO
Represented By: Carmen Bremer
Represented By: Charles Carbone
Represented By: Samuel Miller
Represented By: Jules Lobel
Represented By: Anne M. Cappella
Represented By: Rachel Anne Meeropol Esquire
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RONNIE N. DEWBERRY
Represented By: Carmen Bremer
Represented By: Charles Carbone
Represented By: Samuel Miller
Represented By: Jules Lobel
Represented By: Anne M. Cappella
Represented By: Rachel Anne Meeropol Esquire
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?