S. Mendel v. Liane Randolph, et al
Defendant: ELAINE L. CHAO, in her official capacity as U.S. Secretary of Transportation, ANNE KRAMER, Attorney of the law firm Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C., MICHAEL PICKER, in his individual and official capacity as President, Commissioner, California Public Utilities Commission, XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of California, RAYMOND MARTINEZ, in his official capacity as Adminisrator, Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration, JOSEPH J. SIMONS, in his official capacity as Chairman, Federal Trade Commission, LYFT, INC., PHYLLIS J. HAMILTON, Chief District Judge, in her individual and official Administrative Capacity ofthe United States District Court of the Northern District of California, GARRETT CAMP, Board Member and Founder, WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, RYAN GRAVES, Board Member, former CEO, LICHTEN & LISS-RIORDAN P.C., a law firm, SIDNEY R. THOMAS, Chief United States Circuit Judge of the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, in his individual and official Administrative capacity, LOGAN GREEN, CEO of Lyft and Board Member, LORETTA BITNER, in her official capacity as Chief, Office of Enforcement and Compliance, Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration, CARLA J. PETERMAN, in her individual and Official Capacity as Commissioner, California Public Utilities Commission, SHANNON LISS-RIORDAN, Attorney of the law firm Lichten & Liss-Riordan, PC, ADELAIDE PAGANO, Attorney of the law form Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C. and JOHN ZIMMER, President of Lyft and Board Member
Defendant / Appellee: CLIFFORD RECHTSCHFFEN, in his indiviual and official capacity as Commissioner, California Public Utilities Commission, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., MARITZA PEREZ, in her individual and official capacity as Section Supervisor Badge #11 Transportationb License Section California Public Utilities Commission, RAISER-CA LLC, CALIFORNIA PUBLIC UTILITIES COMMISSION, LIANE RANDOLPH, in her individual and official capacity as Commissioner, California Public Utilities Commission, MARTHA GUZMAN ACEVES, in her individual and official capacity as Commissioner, California Public Utilities Commission, CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, TRAVIS KALANICK, Board Member, former CEO and UBER USA, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: S. PATRICK MENDEL
Case Number: 21-15910
Filed: May 25, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 Filing 4 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: MF): The courts records reflect that the notice of appeal was filed during the pendency of a timely-filed motion listed in Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(4), and that motion is still pending in the district court. The May 20, 2021 notice of appeal is therefore ineffective until entry of the order disposing of the last such motion outstanding. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). Accordingly, proceedings in this court are held in abeyance pending the district courts resolution of the pending May 19, 2021 motion. See Leader Natl Ins. Co. v. Indus. Indem. Ins. Co., 19 F.3d 444, 445 (9th Cir. 1994). Within 14 days after the district courts ruling on the pending motion, appellant shall file a written notice in this court: (1) informing this court of the district courts ruling; and (2) stating whether appellant intends to prosecute this appeal. To appeal the district courts ruling on the post-judgment motion, appellant must file an amended notice of appeal within the time prescribed by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4. The Clerk shall serve this order on the district court. [12157817] (CKP) [Entered: 06/29/2021 01:56 PM]
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 Filed Appellant S. Patrick Mendel motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 06/21/2021. [12150191] (DJV) [Entered: 06/22/2021 07:05 AM]
June 2, 2021 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [12130502] (CKP) [Entered: 06/02/2021 01:01 AM]
May 25, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant S. Patrick Mendel opening brief due 07/28/2021. Appellees California Public Utilities Commission, City and County of San Francisco, Martha Guzman Aceves, Travis Kalanick, Maritza Perez, Raiser-CA LLC, Liane Randolph, Clifford Rechtschffen, Uber Technologies, Inc. and Uber USA, LLC answering brief due 08/30/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12124314] (RT) [Entered: 05/25/2021 03:22 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: S. Mendel v. Liane Randolph, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELAINE L. CHAO, in her official capacity as U.S. Secretary of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANNE KRAMER, Attorney of the law firm Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL PICKER, in his individual and official capacity as President, Commissioner, California Public Utilities Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAYMOND MARTINEZ, in his official capacity as Adminisrator, Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH J. SIMONS, in his official capacity as Chairman, Federal Trade Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYFT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHYLLIS J. HAMILTON, Chief District Judge, in her individual and official Administrative Capacity ofthe United States District Court of the Northern District of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARRETT CAMP, Board Member and Founder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN GRAVES, Board Member, former CEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LICHTEN & LISS-RIORDAN P.C., a law firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIDNEY R. THOMAS, Chief United States Circuit Judge of the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, in his individual and official Administrative capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOGAN GREEN, CEO of Lyft and Board Member
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORETTA BITNER, in her official capacity as Chief, Office of Enforcement and Compliance, Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLA J. PETERMAN, in her individual and Official Capacity as Commissioner, California Public Utilities Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANNON LISS-RIORDAN, Attorney of the law firm Lichten & Liss-Riordan, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADELAIDE PAGANO, Attorney of the law form Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN ZIMMER, President of Lyft and Board Member
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLIFFORD RECHTSCHFFEN, in his indiviual and official capacity as Commissioner, California Public Utilities Commission
Represented By: Edward Moldavsky
Represented By: Christofer Charles Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: Brian Christopher Rocca Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARITZA PEREZ, in her individual and official capacity as Section Supervisor Badge #11 Transportationb License Section California Public Utilities Commission
Represented By: Edward Moldavsky
Represented By: Christofer Charles Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RAISER-CA LLC
Represented By: Brian Christopher Rocca Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CALIFORNIA PUBLIC UTILITIES COMMISSION
Represented By: Edward Moldavsky
Represented By: Christofer Charles Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIANE RANDOLPH, in her individual and official capacity as Commissioner, California Public Utilities Commission
Represented By: Edward Moldavsky
Represented By: Christofer Charles Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARTHA GUZMAN ACEVES, in her individual and official capacity as Commissioner, California Public Utilities Commission
Represented By: Edward Moldavsky
Represented By: Christofer Charles Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Represented By: Raymond R. Rollan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRAVIS KALANICK, Board Member, former CEO
Represented By: Brian Christopher Rocca Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UBER USA, LLC
Represented By: Brian Christopher Rocca Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: S. PATRICK MENDEL
Represented By: S. Patrick Mendel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?