Susan Baker, et al v. Dean Meiling, et al
Defendant: JAMES PROCTOR, an individual, TIFFANY SCHWARTZ, an individual, JANET CHUBB, an individual, MEILING FAMILY PARTNERS, LTD., ARMSTRONG TEASDALE LLP, a Missouri Limited Liability Partnership, DOES, 1-100, inclusive and MERIDIAN ADVANTAGE, an unknown entity
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOAN DOTSON, an individual, LEONARD A. SEMAS, an individual, LARRY SMITH, an individual, STEPHEN GRAN, an individual, NANCY J. WOLOCHUK, an individual, JOAN DIETRICH, an individual, MARTHA B. SISSON, an individual, JIM W. EDWARDS III, an individual, WILLIAM NOYES, an individual, GIOVANNA SCHENINI, an individual, KENNETH KUHN, an individual, ELEANOR WEISMANN, an individual, MARY FRANCE GOMEZ, an individual, JOSEPH SIMS, an individual, LEE SADEG, an individual, BRUCE BOSTON, an individual, ED QUINTAL, an individual, RICHARD L. SHELLEY, an individual, BONNIE BRADT, an individual, FUMIKO FOSDICK FISHER, an individual, JIM KLESS, an individual, STAN CANARIS, an individual, KAREN Y. MALLORY, an individual, DOROTHY D. SHELLEY, an individual, ALAN P. WOLOCHUK, an individual, LAWRENCE LEHNER, an individual, KATHRYN KUHN, an individual, CAROLYN NOYES, an individual, ANKE HAGEDORN, an individual, GEORGE BURKHARDT, an individual, DONNA HAGENS, an individual, BRENDA CANARIS, an individual, WARREN E. SISSON, Jr., an individual, CHRISTINE ECKHOUT, an individual, VICKI MILLS, an individual, BUEL BARNETT, an individual, DAVID KANE, an individual, CLINT HUBBARD, an individual, ROGER B. FOSDICK, an individual, RAY WEISMANN, an individual, LINDA KANE, an individual, DIANE SMITH, an individual, KATHLEEN DELLE DONNE, an individual, STANLEY GROEN, an individual, SUSAN BAKER, an individual, MARIA GROEN, an individual, JAMES L. MURPHY, an individual, SANDRA R. PRICE, an individual, CAROLL BURKHARDT, an individual, JIM BRADT, an individual and ELAINE GRAND, an individual
Defendant / Appellee: DSM PARTNERS, LP, a Nevada Limited Partnership, DSM P GP LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company, CHEMEON SURFACE TECHNOLOGY LLC, a Nevada limited Liability Company, MADYLON MEILING, an individual, SUITE B LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company and DEAN MEILING, an individual
Case Number: 21-15957
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Filing 9 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12164589] (VS) [Entered: 07/07/2021 08:57 AM]
July 2, 2021 Filing 8 Streamlined request [7] by Appellants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards, III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson, Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk and Nancy J. Wolochuk to extend time to file the brief is approved in part. Streamlined requests only allow for a 30 day extension of time to file the brief. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants' opening brief due 09/01/2021. Appellees Chemeon Surface Technology LLC, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Dean Meiling, Madylon Meiling and Suite B LLC answering brief due 10/01/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12161230] (JN) [Entered: 07/02/2021 09:18 AM]
July 1, 2021 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards, III, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Roger B. Fosdick, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson, Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk and Nancy J. Wolochuk. New requested due date is 09/02/2021. [12161031] [21-15957] (Lazo, Marc) [Entered: 07/01/2021 08:10 PM]
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 06/29/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12145243] (VS) [Entered: 06/15/2021 03:54 PM]
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/10/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12141298]. [21-15957] (AD) [Entered: 06/11/2021 06:44 AM]
June 10, 2021 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards, III, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Roger B. Fosdick, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson, Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk and Nancy J. Wolochuk Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/10/2021. [12141276] [21-15957] (Lazo, Marc) [Entered: 06/10/2021 08:37 PM]
June 8, 2021 Filing 3 Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 06/08/2021. [12137879] (HH) [Entered: 06/08/2021 03:09 PM]
June 3, 2021 Filing 2 Terminated participation of Court Reporter Kathryn Marie French in this case. Added in error. [12133079] (JPD) [Entered: 06/03/2021 03:28 PM]
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Susan Baker, et al. opening brief due 08/02/2021. Dean Meiling, et al. answering brief due 08/31/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12133074] (JPD) [Entered: 06/03/2021 03:26 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Susan Baker, et al v. Dean Meiling, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOAN DOTSON, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LEONARD A. SEMAS, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LARRY SMITH, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEPHEN GRAN, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NANCY J. WOLOCHUK, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOAN DIETRICH, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARTHA B. SISSON, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JIM W. EDWARDS III, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM NOYES, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GIOVANNA SCHENINI, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KENNETH KUHN, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELEANOR WEISMANN, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARY FRANCE GOMEZ, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSEPH SIMS, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LEE SADEG, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRUCE BOSTON, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ED QUINTAL, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD L. SHELLEY, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BONNIE BRADT, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FUMIKO FOSDICK FISHER, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JIM KLESS, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STAN CANARIS, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KAREN Y. MALLORY, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DOROTHY D. SHELLEY, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALAN P. WOLOCHUK, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LAWRENCE LEHNER, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KATHRYN KUHN, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CAROLYN NOYES, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANKE HAGEDORN, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GEORGE BURKHARDT, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DONNA HAGENS, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRENDA CANARIS, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WARREN E. SISSON, Jr., an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTINE ECKHOUT, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VICKI MILLS, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BUEL BARNETT, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID KANE, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CLINT HUBBARD, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROGER B. FOSDICK, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RAY WEISMANN, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LINDA KANE, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DIANE SMITH, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KATHLEEN DELLE DONNE, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STANLEY GROEN, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SUSAN BAKER, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARIA GROEN, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES L. MURPHY, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SANDRA R. PRICE, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CAROLL BURKHARDT, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JIM BRADT, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELAINE GRAND, an individual
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES PROCTOR, an individual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIFFANY SCHWARTZ, an individual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANET CHUBB, an individual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEILING FAMILY PARTNERS, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMSTRONG TEASDALE LLP, a Missouri Limited Liability Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES, 1-100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERIDIAN ADVANTAGE, an unknown entity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DSM PARTNERS, LP, a Nevada Limited Partnership
Represented By: Timothy A. Lukas Esquire
Represented By: Robert C. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DSM P GP LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Timothy A. Lukas Esquire
Represented By: Robert C. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHEMEON SURFACE TECHNOLOGY LLC, a Nevada limited Liability Company
Represented By: Timothy A. Lukas Esquire
Represented By: Robert C. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MADYLON MEILING, an individual
Represented By: Timothy A. Lukas Esquire
Represented By: Robert C. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUITE B LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Timothy A. Lukas Esquire
Represented By: Robert C. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEAN MEILING, an individual
Represented By: Timothy A. Lukas Esquire
Represented By: Robert C. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?