Ronald Adams v. CDCR, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: RONALD ADAMS
Defendant / Appellee: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION, KATHLEEN ALLISON, Warden, Secretary, STEVEN C. SUZUKAWA, Superior Court Judge, DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, Circuit Court Judge, EDWARD LEAVY, Circuit Court Judge, T. MONTGOMERY, Case records analyst, JOSE GASTELO, Warden, KAMALA D. HARRIS, Attorney General, CALIFORNIA DISTRICT COURT and KATHLEEN ALLISON, Secretary
Case Number: 21-16167
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 Filed Appellant Ronald Adams motion to extend time to comply with the order dated 08/12/2021. Deficiencies: None. [12212835] (QDL) [Entered: 08/26/2021 04:11 PM]
August 26, 2021 Filing 6 Streamlined request by Appellant Ronald Adams to extend time to file the brief is not approved because briefing is suspended pending further order of this court. [12212784] (JN) [Entered: 08/26/2021 03:58 PM]
August 12, 2021 Filing 5 Filed order (MARY M. SCHROEDER and ANDREW D. HURWITZ) Appellants motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket Entry No. [ # 4 ]) is denied because appellant has had three or more prior actions or appeals dismissed as frivolous, malicious, or for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, and appellant has not alleged imminent danger of serious physical injury. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(g); see also Adams v. Grannis, Appeal No. 09-cv-15715 (9th Cir. Dec. 10, 2009); Adams v. Rowland, et al., No. 91-cv-4090-RFP (N.D. Cal. Dec. 23, 1991); Adams v. Vazquez, et al., Civil Case No. 09-cv-15715-OWW (E.D. Cal. May 21, 2009). Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall pay $505.00 to the district court as the docketing and filing fees for this appeal and file proof of payment with this court. Failure to pay the fees will result in the automatic dismissal of the appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute, regardless of further filings. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. No motions for reconsideration, clarification, or modification of the denial of appellants in forma pauperis status shall be entertained. If the appeal is dismissed for failure to comply with this order, the court will not entertain any motion to reinstate the appeal that is not accompanied by proof of payment of the docketing and filing fees. Briefing is suspended pending further order of this court. [12199872] (OC) [Entered: 08/12/2021 01:51 PM]
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 Filed Appellant Ronald Adams motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. [12189562] (QDL) [Entered: 08/02/2021 02:25 PM]
July 15, 2021 Filing 3 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [12173957] (CKP) [Entered: 07/15/2021 04:23 PM]
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Ronald Adams opening brief due 09/07/2021. [12171068] (JPD) [Entered: 07/13/2021 01:15 PM]
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 Appellee Leavy in 21-16167 substituted by Appellee Edward LEAVY in 21-16167 [12170975] (SLM) [Entered: 07/13/2021 12:28 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ronald Adams v. CDCR, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RONALD ADAMS
Represented By: Ronald Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KATHLEEN ALLISON, Warden, Secretary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVEN C. SUZUKAWA, Superior Court Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, Circuit Court Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EDWARD LEAVY, Circuit Court Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: T. MONTGOMERY, Case records analyst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSE GASTELO, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAMALA D. HARRIS, Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CALIFORNIA DISTRICT COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KATHLEEN ALLISON, Secretary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?