Demetrius Wilson v. David Shinn, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: DEMETRIUS A. WILSON
Defendant / Appellee: DAVID SHINN, Director, CENTURION HEALTH OF ADOC, STATE OF ARIZONA, PACHECO, Tucson Complex Warden Pacheco, sued in both individual and official capacity, NEIL, ADW, Whetstone Unit, sued in both individual and official capacity, JOSEFOWICZ, DW/Whetstone Unit, sued in both individual and official capacity, MARTINEZ, named as DW Martinez/Whetstone Unit, sued in both individual and official capacity, SUSANNA C. PINEDA, Honorable, Superior Court of Maricopa County, sued in both individual and official capacity, BRASCHLER, named as Assistant Deputy Warden Braschler, sued in both individual and official capacity, PULICICCHIO, Captain, sued in both individual and official capacity, ROJAS, SSU, C.O. II #5695, sued in both individual and official capacity, GALAVIZ, Sgt. #9368, sued in both individual and official capacity, WINN NGUYEN, #9591, sued in both individual and official capacity, F. MAJALCA, #9626, sued in both individual and official capacity, M. JASSO, Lt., sued in both individual and official capacity and CHRISTINA L. AABERG, Disciplinary Hearing Officer at Arizona Department of Corrections, sued in both individual and official capacity
Case Number: 21-16180
Filed: July 14, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Filing 10 Filed original and 0 copies of Appellant Demetrius A. Wilson errata to opening brief [ # 7 ]. Served via ECF on 09/08/2021. [12223513]--[COURT UPDATE: received 2 additional paper copies of errata. 09/09/2021 by KT] (SML) [Entered: 09/08/2021 03:48 PM]
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 Filed Appellant Demetrius A. Wilson letter dated 08/27/2021 re: Request for copy of docket sheet and filed-stamped brief. Paper filing deficiency: None. (Sent appellant copy of docket sheet and filed-stamped brief.) [12216988] (QDL) [Entered: 08/31/2021 03:32 PM]
August 31, 2021 Filing 8 Filed Appellant Demetrius A. Wilson motion for appointment of counsel. Deficiencies: None. [12216979] (QDL) [Entered: 08/31/2021 03:30 PM]
August 31, 2021 Filing 7 Filed original and 8 copies of Appellant Demetrius A. Wilson opening brief of 16 pages (Informal: Yes). Served on 08/31/2021. Served by Court via CM/ECF. Filed with minor deficiencies: no certificate of service. [12216929] (SML) [Entered: 08/31/2021 03:17 PM]
August 31, 2021 Filing 6 Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 08/03/2021. [Case Number 21-16180: Partially Paid] [12216798] (RL) [Entered: 08/31/2021 02:37 PM]
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner completed authorization fee order. [12197457] (CKP) [Entered: 08/10/2021 02:51 PM]
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 08/03/2021. [Case Number 21-16180: Partially Paid] [12197340] (RL) [Entered: 08/10/2021 02:08 PM]
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [12185521] (CKP) [Entered: 07/28/2021 12:20 PM]
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 Fee status changed ( [Case Number 21-16180: IFP] ). [12185515] (CKP) [Entered: 07/28/2021 12:16 PM]
July 14, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT . SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Demetrius A. Wilson opening brief due 09/16/2021. Appellees Christina L. Aaberg, Braschler, Centurion Health of ADOC, Galaviz, M. Jasso, Josefowicz, F. Majalca, Martinez, Neil, Winn Nguyen, Pacheco, Susanna C. Pineda, Pulicicchio, Rojas, David Shinn, Director and State of Arizona answering brief due 10/18/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12172466] (RT) [Entered: 07/14/2021 01:24 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Demetrius Wilson v. David Shinn, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DEMETRIUS A. WILSON
Represented By: Demetrius A. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID SHINN, Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CENTURION HEALTH OF ADOC
Represented By: Sarah Lynn Barnes Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE OF ARIZONA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PACHECO, Tucson Complex Warden Pacheco, sued in both individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEIL, ADW, Whetstone Unit, sued in both individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSEFOWICZ, DW/Whetstone Unit, sued in both individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARTINEZ, named as DW Martinez/Whetstone Unit, sued in both individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUSANNA C. PINEDA, Honorable, Superior Court of Maricopa County, sued in both individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRASCHLER, named as Assistant Deputy Warden Braschler, sued in both individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PULICICCHIO, Captain, sued in both individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROJAS, SSU, C.O. II #5695, sued in both individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GALAVIZ, Sgt. #9368, sued in both individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WINN NGUYEN, #9591, sued in both individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: F. MAJALCA, #9626, sued in both individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. JASSO, Lt., sued in both individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTINA L. AABERG, Disciplinary Hearing Officer at Arizona Department of Corrections, sued in both individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?