Alfred Green v. Corizon Health Services, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: ALFRED GREEN
Defendant / Appellee: CORIZON HEALTH SERVICES, CORIZON HEALTH, INC., DAVID SHINN, Director, in his official capacity, ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, named as Arizona Dept. of Corrections, SHERFIELD, Prison Health Unit Nurse, Corizon Health Services Inc., UNKNOWN PARTIES, named as John Doe #1 & # 2, Corrections Officers-II Transport Officers, HOLDEN, Nurse Practioner, DUNAGAN, Correctional Officer III, CARRILLO, Sergeant, ARCHIE, Correctional Officer II, STEMPLES, Sergeant, MORGAN, Correctional Officer III and CHARLES L. RYAN, Director of Operation, Arizona Department of Corrections
Case Number: 21-16571
Filed: September 24, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Filing 15 Sent Appellant a copy of the FRAP and Ninth Circuit rules in response to his letter of request filed on 11/22/2021. [12295988] (JR) [Entered: 11/22/2021 05:51 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 14 Filed Appellant Alfred Green letter re: Request for copy of rules. Paper filing deficiency: None. [12295476] (QDL) [Entered: 11/22/2021 02:41 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 13 Filed Appellant Alfred Green letter re: Request for transcripts. Paper filing deficiency: None. [12295471] (QDL) [Entered: 11/22/2021 02:39 PM]
November 15, 2021 Filing 12 Filed Appellant Alfred Green reply to response (motion for partial jurisdiction transfer). Served on 11/15/2021. [12286710] (QDL) [Entered: 11/15/2021 09:38 AM]
November 15, 2021 Filing 11 Filed Appellant Alfred Green reply to response (motion for appointment of counsel). Served on 11/15/2021. [12286708] (QDL) [Entered: 11/15/2021 09:37 AM]
October 27, 2021 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Appellee Corizon Health, Inc. response opposing motion ([ # 8 ] Party Motion). Date of service: 10/27/2021. [12270462] [21-16571] (Bustos, Rita) [Entered: 10/27/2021 12:58 PM]
October 27, 2021 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) Appellee Corizon Health, Inc. response opposing motion ([ # 7 ] Party Motion). Date of service: 10/27/2021. [12270452] [21-16571] (Bustos, Rita) [Entered: 10/27/2021 12:56 PM]
October 20, 2021 Filing 8 Filed Appellant Alfred Green motion for partial jurisdiction transfer. Deficiencies: None. Served on 10/20/2021. [12263274] (QDL) [Entered: 10/20/2021 02:09 PM]
October 20, 2021 Filing 7 Filed Appellant Alfred Green motion for appointment of counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 10/20/2021. [12263272] (QDL) [Entered: 10/20/2021 02:08 PM]
October 13, 2021 Filing 6 Filed Appellant Alfred Green motion for partial jurisdiction transfer. Deficiencies: None. Served on 10/13/2021. [12256054] (QDL) [Entered: 10/13/2021 03:26 PM]
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [12241169] (CKP) [Entered: 09/28/2021 09:51 AM]
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 Fee status changed ( [Case Number 21-16571: IFP] ). [12241163] (CKP) [Entered: 09/28/2021 09:50 AM]
September 24, 2021 Filing 3 Attorney Ellen Blevins Burno in 21-16571 substituted by Attorney Rita Bustos in 21-16571 [12238620] (QDL) [Entered: 09/24/2021 02:56 PM]
September 24, 2021 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Rita J. Bustos (Quintairos Prieto Wood and Boyer 8800 East Raintree Drive Suite 100 Scottsdale Arizona 85260) for Appellee Corizon Health, Inc.. Substitution for Attorney Ms. Ellen Blevins Burno for Appellees Corizon Health Services, Corizon Health, Inc. and David Shinn. Date of service: 09/24/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12238542] [21-16571] (Bustos, Rita) [Entered: 09/24/2021 02:31 PM]
September 24, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Alfred Green opening brief due 11/22/2021. Appellees answering brief due 12/20/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12238467] (JMR) [Entered: 09/24/2021 01:59 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Alfred Green v. Corizon Health Services, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALFRED GREEN
Represented By: Alfred Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORIZON HEALTH SERVICES
Represented By: Anthony J. Fernandez
Represented By: Ellen Blevins Burno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORIZON HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: Anthony J. Fernandez
Represented By: Rita Bustos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID SHINN, Director, in his official capacity
Represented By: Anthony J. Fernandez
Represented By: Ellen Blevins Burno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, named as Arizona Dept. of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHERFIELD, Prison Health Unit Nurse, Corizon Health Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN PARTIES, named as John Doe #1 & # 2, Corrections Officers-II Transport Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HOLDEN, Nurse Practioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DUNAGAN, Correctional Officer III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARRILLO, Sergeant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARCHIE, Correctional Officer II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEMPLES, Sergeant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MORGAN, Correctional Officer III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES L. RYAN, Director of Operation, Arizona Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?