Joseph Antonetti v. E. McDaniels, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOSEPH ANTONETTI
Defendant / Appellee: E. K. MCDANIELS, R. BAKER, BYRNES, AKA Byrne, WILLIAM GITTERE, MICHAEL FLETCHER, SHERY L. FOSTER, DWAYNE DEAL, BRIAN WILLIAMS, Warden, SCOTT SISCO, DONALD SOUTHWORTH, WILLIAM MOORE, ROBERT DUGAN, TASHEENA SANDOVAL, caseworker, DWIGHT NEVEN, Warden, JENNIFER NASH, L. HICKS, BARACLOUGH, G. PRUYT, BRAIN SANDOVAL, Governor, LESTER, Sgt., CURTIS KERNER, Sgt., MARK BOYD, HAMPTON, REBECCA BOYD, Sgt. and CHARLES DUDLEY
Case Number: 21-16687
Filed: October 12, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner completed authorization fee order. [12307425] (CKP) [Entered: 12/06/2021 04:13 PM]
December 6, 2021 Filing 6 Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 11/27/2021. [12306538] (NAC) [Entered: 12/06/2021 11:32 AM]
November 26, 2021 Filing 5 Filed original and 0 copies of Appellant Joseph Antonetti opening brief of 13 pages (Informal: Yes). Served on 11/14/2021. [12298800] (LA) [Entered: 11/26/2021 04:11 PM]
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [12282936] (CKP) [Entered: 11/09/2021 01:41 PM]
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 Added Attorney(s) Gregory L. Zunino for party(s) Appellee Lester Appellee Scott Sisco Appellee William Moore Appellee R. Baker Appellee Curtis Kerner Appellee William Gittere Appellee Dwayne Deal Appellee E. K. McDaniels Appellee Dwight Neven Appellee Rebecca Boyd Appellee Brain Sandoval Appellee Charles Dudley Appellee Brian Williams Appellee Mark Boyd Appellee Byrnes Appellee Tasheena Sandoval Appellee Donald Southworth Appellee Shery L. Foster, in case 21-16687. [12271221] (NAC) [Entered: 10/28/2021 07:17 AM]
October 27, 2021 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Gregory L. Zunino (Nevada Office of the Attorney General, 100 N. Carson Street, Carson City, Nevada 89701) for Appellees R. Baker, Mark Boyd, Rebecca Boyd, Byrnes, Dwayne Deal, Charles Dudley, Shery L. Foster, William Gittere, Curtis Kerner, Lester, E. K. McDaniels, William Moore, Dwight Neven, Brain Sandoval, Tasheena Sandoval, Scott Sisco, Donald Southworth and Brian Williams. Date of service: 10/27/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12271141] [21-16687] (Zunino, Gregory) [Entered: 10/27/2021 06:19 PM]
October 12, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Joseph Antonetti opening brief due 12/13/2021. Appellees McDaniels, et al answering brief due 01/10/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12254674] (JPD) [Entered: 10/12/2021 04:32 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Joseph Antonetti v. E. McDaniels, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSEPH ANTONETTI
Represented By: Joseph Antonetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: E. K. MCDANIELS
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Gregory L. Zunino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: R. BAKER
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Gregory L. Zunino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BYRNES, AKA Byrne
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Gregory L. Zunino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM GITTERE
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Gregory L. Zunino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL FLETCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHERY L. FOSTER
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Gregory L. Zunino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DWAYNE DEAL
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Gregory L. Zunino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRIAN WILLIAMS, Warden
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Gregory L. Zunino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT SISCO
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Gregory L. Zunino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONALD SOUTHWORTH
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Gregory L. Zunino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM MOORE
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Gregory L. Zunino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT DUGAN
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TASHEENA SANDOVAL, caseworker
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Gregory L. Zunino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DWIGHT NEVEN, Warden
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Gregory L. Zunino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JENNIFER NASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: L. HICKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BARACLOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: G. PRUYT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRAIN SANDOVAL, Governor
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Gregory L. Zunino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LESTER, Sgt.
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Gregory L. Zunino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CURTIS KERNER, Sgt.
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Gregory L. Zunino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK BOYD
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Gregory L. Zunino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HAMPTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REBECCA BOYD, Sgt.
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Gregory L. Zunino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES DUDLEY
Represented By: Douglas Reed Rands Esquire
Represented By: Gregory L. Zunino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?