Gary Dubin, et al v. Supreme Court State of Hawaii, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: GARY VICTOR DUBIN, individually and on behalf of all Hawaii attorneys similarly situated, DBA Dubin Law Offices, CHRISTIE ADAMS, TORU AKEHI, GWEN ALEJO-HERRING, GLORIA ALMENDARES, JERIS YUKIO AMAZAKI, DEBRA ANAGRAN, DIRK APAO, JERRY BADUA, JULIA BADUA, LIAO LUCY BAMBOO, MIA BAN, ROMAN BAPTISTE, CHARLES BASS, LAURIE BASS, AGRIPINO PASCUA BONILLA, RUTH ROJAS BONILLA, SHERILYN MAY ROJAS BONILLA, KANOA ROSS BRISTOL, DONNA BROOKS, DAVID R. BROWN, REYNALDO CABUDOL, CHRISTY CARRICO, PHINEAS CASADY, JOYCE CHANDLER, WILLIAM CHANDLER, JENNIFER CHAPMAN, LUIS C. CHAVEZ, STEPHEN CHEIKES, MERVIN HALFRED NAEA CHING, LUCIA CHING, SUTAH CHIRAYUNON, SEUNG CHOI, BRETT CHRISTIANSEN, AH MEI CHUN, HUGH JOHN COFLIN, JANET COFLIN, RUSSEL COLE, PAUL COLLINS, WATOSHNA LYNN COMPTON, GEORGE COSTA, GREGORY CLYDE SOUZA CRAVALHO, TONI NOELANI CRAVALHO, ROGER CUNDALL, ERIC LEE DAVIES, WILLIAM DAVIS, VANDETTA DAVIS, YUKIKO HAYASHI DAY, PAIGE DE PONTE, FATIMA DUNCAN, CAROLINA CABUDOL EALA, EDWIN PAET EALA, DAVID WENDELL ELLIS, LORI LYNN ELLIS, JANICE ELLISON, SCOTT ELLISON, NELIE BANIAGA ESCALANTE, NORBERTO RAMELB ESCALANTE, ELENA FEDOROVA, AKIKO FERGERSTROM, JUSTIN FERGERSTROM, JOHN J. FREEPARTNER III, LISA MARIE FREEPARTNER, MICHAEL J. FUCHS, IRENE SAJOR GANO, ROYD ALLEN GANO, EDNA GANTT, LEAH GILLESPIE, ELIZABETH GILLETTE, DAVID GOODWIN, MALIA GRACE, ANTONIO GRAFILO, NELIA GRAFILO, HOWARD GREENBERG, KENNETH HAGMANN, MICHAEL JON HAMMER, DARRYL HASHIDA, SEAN HAYWORTH, NICOLE FLORES HOSAKA, TOD HOSAKA, CHRISTIAN JENSEN, DAVID KAPLAN, DONALD KARLEEN, BEATA KARPUSIEWICZ, YVONNE M. KEAHI, JAROSLAW KARPUSIEWICZ, KEITH KIMI, OTELIAH KIND, KORY KLEIN, MARY KNUDSEN, ELEANA U. KOAKOU, LENORE LANNON, STEPHEN LAUDIG, Esquire, MALLORY ASPILI LONGBOY, SHARI ARAKAWA LONGBOY, FRANK JAMES LYON, ERIC MADER, AMY KATHLEEN MAHER, MICHAEL CHARLES MAHER, GWEN MARCANTONIO, ARMAND MARIBOHO, DARLA MARIBOHO, JENNIFER MARTIN, MARYELLEN MARKLEY, LAURA MARQUES, CHANELLE LEOLA MATTOS, JOSEPH KEAOULA MATTOS, WILLIAM MCTHEWSON, EMILOU N.A. MIKAMI, RICKEY R. MIKAMI, TROY MIZUKAMI, JONNAVEN JO MONALIM, MISTY MARIE MONALIM, ROBERT-GAVIN MOORE, TERESA MOORE, THOMAS MORTON, TERRY LYNNE OHARA MOSELEY, YVONNE NIELSEN, AILYN T. OUNYOUNG, SAMRIT OUNYOUNG, DAVID L. OWLES, RAQUEL PACHECO, JOHN PERREIRA, ROSE PERREIRA, MICHAEL PIERCE, MARIO PORTILLO, EBONI PRENTICE, ROSARIO RAMOS, LURLINE RAPOZA, MERRILLYN M. J. L. RAPOZA, JOHN RIDDEL, Jr., JEANETTE ROSEHILL, MARCUS ROSEHILL, RAY J. RUDDY, MICHELE COLLEEN RUNDGREN, TODD RUNDGREN, JO RUSSO, KELLY KALANIKAPULAHAO SAMPAIO, RICHARD MILIKONA SAMPAIO, Jr., JOHN SAVAGE, RONALD SCHRANZ, JOHN SHIGEMURA, JASON SIEGFRIED, MELEANA SMITH, JODY SOLBACH, ELIZABETH SPECTOR, DANIEL JOSEPH SPENCE, EILEEN EVELYN STEPHENSON, CONNIE SWIERSKI, BONNIE SWINK, JACK SWINK, EVELYN TAKENAKA, NADINE K. TAMAYOSE, REID L. TAMAYOSE, KARRI TESHIMA, CLOVER THEDE, DYLAN THEDE, LANA M. TOLEAFAO, SAUMANI LOPI TOLEAFOA, BRUCE ROBERT TRAVIS, ELISE TRAVIS, DARREN TSUCHIYA, LANCE TSUCHIYA, MALIA OLIVAS TSUCHIYA, ANTHONY TUCKER, GLADYS TUPULUA, HEDY UDARBE, RUSTICO UDARBE, VALERIE UYEDA, EDWARD VALLEJO, JON VAN CLEAVE, PATRICK VERHAGEN, STEPHEN WARD, DONAVAN WEBB, VALERIE WOODS, LERMA YAMASHITA, JACK YOUNG and NANCY PATSY YOUNG, individually and on behalf of all clients of Hawaii attorneys similarly situated
Defendant / Appellee: SUPREME COURT OF THE STATE OF HAWAII, in its legislative rule-making capacity and in its judicial capacity, THE HONORABLE MARK E. RECKENWALD, in his official capacity while serving as Chief Justice of the Supreme Court of the State of Hawaii, THE HONORABLE PAULA A. NAKAYAMA, in her official capacity while serving as Associate Justice of the Supreme Court of the State of Hawaii, THE HONORABLE SABRINA S. MCKENNA, in her official capacity while serving as Associate Justice of the Supreme Court of the State of Hawaii, THE HONORABLE MICHAEL D. WILSON, in his official capacity while serving as Associate Justice of the Supreme Court of the State of Hawaii, THE HONORABLE KATHERINE S. LEONARD, in her official capacity while serving as appointed substitute Associate Justice of the Supreme Court of the State of Hawaii, OFFICE OF DISCIPLINARY COUNSEL OF THE HAWAII SUPREME COURT, in its individual capacity as a non-agency Special Master, DISCIPLINARY BOARD OF THE HAWAII SUPREME COURT, in its individual capacity as a non-agency Special Master, LAWYERS' FUND FOR CLIENT PROTECTION OF THE HAWAII SUPREME COURT, in its individual capacity as a non-agency Special Master, BRADLEY R TAMM, in his individual capacity while serving under color of law as both the Chief Disciplinary Counsel of the Office of Disciplinary Counsel of the Hawaii Supreme Court and Fund Administrator of the Lawyers' Fund for Client Protection of, CLIFFORD L. NAKEA, in his individual capacity while serving under color of law as Chairperson of the Disciplinary Board of the Hawaii Supreme Court, ROY F. HUGHES, in his individual capacity while serving under color of law as a Hearing Officer of the Disciplinary Board of the Hawaii Supreme Court, CHARLENE M. NORRIS, in her individual capacity while serving under color of law as Senior Disciplinary Counsel of the Office of Disciplinary Counsel of the Hawaii Supreme Court and ANDREA R. SINK, in her individual capacity while serving under color of law as an Investigator of the the Office of Disciplinary Counsel of the Hawaii Supreme Court
Case Number: 21-16863
Filed: November 4, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel may contact Circuit Mediator to discuss services available through the Circuit Mediation Program or to request a settlement assessment conference. Info regarding the mediation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [12299586] (CL) [Entered: 11/29/2021 11:46 AM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/23/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12297298]. [21-16863] (AD) [Entered: 11/23/2021 06:44 PM]
November 23, 2021 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant Gary Victor Dubin Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/23/2021. [12296902] [21-16863] (Kiuchi, Keith) [Entered: 11/23/2021 02:20 PM]
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellantshave filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellants shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12292327] (LW) [Entered: 11/18/2021 03:33 PM]
November 4, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Christie Adams, et al. Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/12/2021. Transcript ordered by 11/29/2021. Transcript due 12/28/2021. Appellants Christie Adams, et al. opening brief due 02/07/2022. Appellees Disciplinary Board of the Hawaii Supreme Court, Roy F. Hughes, Lawyers' Fund for Client Protection of the Hawaii Supreme Court, Katherine S. Leonard, Sabrina S. McKenna, Paula A. Nakayama, Clifford L. Nakea, Charlene M. Norris, Office of Disciplinary Counsel of the Hawaii Supreme Court, Mark E. Reckenwald, Andrea R. Sink, Supreme Court of the State of Hawaii, Bradley R Tamm and Michael D. Wilson answering brief due 03/08/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12278289] (JBS) [Entered: 11/04/2021 11:53 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Gary Dubin, et al v. Supreme Court State of Hawaii, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GARY VICTOR DUBIN, individually and on behalf of all Hawaii attorneys similarly situated, DBA Dubin Law Offices
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTIE ADAMS
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TORU AKEHI
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GWEN ALEJO-HERRING
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GLORIA ALMENDARES
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JERIS YUKIO AMAZAKI
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DEBRA ANAGRAN
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DIRK APAO
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JERRY BADUA
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JULIA BADUA
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LIAO LUCY BAMBOO
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MIA BAN
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROMAN BAPTISTE
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHARLES BASS
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LAURIE BASS
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AGRIPINO PASCUA BONILLA
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RUTH ROJAS BONILLA
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHERILYN MAY ROJAS BONILLA
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KANOA ROSS BRISTOL
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DONNA BROOKS
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID R. BROWN
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: REYNALDO CABUDOL
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTY CARRICO
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PHINEAS CASADY
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOYCE CHANDLER
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM CHANDLER
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JENNIFER CHAPMAN
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LUIS C. CHAVEZ
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEPHEN CHEIKES
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MERVIN HALFRED NAEA CHING
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LUCIA CHING
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SUTAH CHIRAYUNON
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SEUNG CHOI
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRETT CHRISTIANSEN
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AH MEI CHUN
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HUGH JOHN COFLIN
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JANET COFLIN
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RUSSEL COLE
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PAUL COLLINS
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WATOSHNA LYNN COMPTON
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GEORGE COSTA
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GREGORY CLYDE SOUZA CRAVALHO
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TONI NOELANI CRAVALHO
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROGER CUNDALL
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ERIC LEE DAVIES
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM DAVIS
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VANDETTA DAVIS
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: YUKIKO HAYASHI DAY
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PAIGE DE PONTE
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FATIMA DUNCAN
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CAROLINA CABUDOL EALA
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDWIN PAET EALA
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID WENDELL ELLIS
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LORI LYNN ELLIS
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JANICE ELLISON
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SCOTT ELLISON
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NELIE BANIAGA ESCALANTE
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NORBERTO RAMELB ESCALANTE
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELENA FEDOROVA
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AKIKO FERGERSTROM
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JUSTIN FERGERSTROM
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN J. FREEPARTNER III
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LISA MARIE FREEPARTNER
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL J. FUCHS
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: IRENE SAJOR GANO
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROYD ALLEN GANO
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDNA GANTT
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LEAH GILLESPIE
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELIZABETH GILLETTE
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID GOODWIN
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MALIA GRACE
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTONIO GRAFILO
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NELIA GRAFILO
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HOWARD GREENBERG
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KENNETH HAGMANN
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL JON HAMMER
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DARRYL HASHIDA
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SEAN HAYWORTH
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NICOLE FLORES HOSAKA
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TOD HOSAKA
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTIAN JENSEN
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID KAPLAN
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DONALD KARLEEN
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BEATA KARPUSIEWICZ
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: YVONNE M. KEAHI
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAROSLAW KARPUSIEWICZ
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KEITH KIMI
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: OTELIAH KIND
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KORY KLEIN
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARY KNUDSEN
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELEANA U. KOAKOU
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LENORE LANNON
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEPHEN LAUDIG, Esquire
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MALLORY ASPILI LONGBOY
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHARI ARAKAWA LONGBOY
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRANK JAMES LYON
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ERIC MADER
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AMY KATHLEEN MAHER
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL CHARLES MAHER
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GWEN MARCANTONIO
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ARMAND MARIBOHO
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DARLA MARIBOHO
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JENNIFER MARTIN
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARYELLEN MARKLEY
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LAURA MARQUES
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHANELLE LEOLA MATTOS
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSEPH KEAOULA MATTOS
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM MCTHEWSON
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EMILOU N.A. MIKAMI
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICKEY R. MIKAMI
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TROY MIZUKAMI
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JONNAVEN JO MONALIM
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MISTY MARIE MONALIM
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT-GAVIN MOORE
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TERESA MOORE
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THOMAS MORTON
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TERRY LYNNE OHARA MOSELEY
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: YVONNE NIELSEN
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AILYN T. OUNYOUNG
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SAMRIT OUNYOUNG
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID L. OWLES
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RAQUEL PACHECO
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN PERREIRA
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROSE PERREIRA
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL PIERCE
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARIO PORTILLO
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EBONI PRENTICE
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROSARIO RAMOS
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LURLINE RAPOZA
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MERRILLYN M. J. L. RAPOZA
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN RIDDEL, Jr.
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEANETTE ROSEHILL
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARCUS ROSEHILL
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RAY J. RUDDY
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHELE COLLEEN RUNDGREN
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TODD RUNDGREN
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JO RUSSO
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KELLY KALANIKAPULAHAO SAMPAIO
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD MILIKONA SAMPAIO, Jr.
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN SAVAGE
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RONALD SCHRANZ
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN SHIGEMURA
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JASON SIEGFRIED
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MELEANA SMITH
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JODY SOLBACH
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELIZABETH SPECTOR
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DANIEL JOSEPH SPENCE
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EILEEN EVELYN STEPHENSON
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONNIE SWIERSKI
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BONNIE SWINK
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JACK SWINK
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EVELYN TAKENAKA
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NADINE K. TAMAYOSE
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: REID L. TAMAYOSE
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KARRI TESHIMA
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CLOVER THEDE
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DYLAN THEDE
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LANA M. TOLEAFAO
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SAUMANI LOPI TOLEAFOA
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRUCE ROBERT TRAVIS
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELISE TRAVIS
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DARREN TSUCHIYA
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LANCE TSUCHIYA
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MALIA OLIVAS TSUCHIYA
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTHONY TUCKER
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GLADYS TUPULUA
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HEDY UDARBE
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RUSTICO UDARBE
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VALERIE UYEDA
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDWARD VALLEJO
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JON VAN CLEAVE
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PATRICK VERHAGEN
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEPHEN WARD
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DONAVAN WEBB
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VALERIE WOODS
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LERMA YAMASHITA
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JACK YOUNG
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NANCY PATSY YOUNG, individually and on behalf of all clients of Hawaii attorneys similarly situated
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin Esquire
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUPREME COURT OF THE STATE OF HAWAII, in its legislative rule-making capacity and in its judicial capacity
Represented By: Robyn B. Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE HONORABLE MARK E. RECKENWALD, in his official capacity while serving as Chief Justice of the Supreme Court of the State of Hawaii
Represented By: Robyn B. Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE HONORABLE PAULA A. NAKAYAMA, in her official capacity while serving as Associate Justice of the Supreme Court of the State of Hawaii
Represented By: Robyn B. Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE HONORABLE SABRINA S. MCKENNA, in her official capacity while serving as Associate Justice of the Supreme Court of the State of Hawaii
Represented By: Robyn B. Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE HONORABLE MICHAEL D. WILSON, in his official capacity while serving as Associate Justice of the Supreme Court of the State of Hawaii
Represented By: Robyn B. Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE HONORABLE KATHERINE S. LEONARD, in her official capacity while serving as appointed substitute Associate Justice of the Supreme Court of the State of Hawaii
Represented By: Robyn B. Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICE OF DISCIPLINARY COUNSEL OF THE HAWAII SUPREME COURT, in its individual capacity as a non-agency Special Master
Represented By: Robyn B. Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DISCIPLINARY BOARD OF THE HAWAII SUPREME COURT, in its individual capacity as a non-agency Special Master
Represented By: Robyn B. Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAWYERS' FUND FOR CLIENT PROTECTION OF THE HAWAII SUPREME COURT, in its individual capacity as a non-agency Special Master
Represented By: Robyn B. Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRADLEY R TAMM, in his individual capacity while serving under color of law as both the Chief Disciplinary Counsel of the Office of Disciplinary Counsel of the Hawaii Supreme Court and Fund Administrator of the Lawyers' Fund for Client Protection of
Represented By: Robyn B. Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLIFFORD L. NAKEA, in his individual capacity while serving under color of law as Chairperson of the Disciplinary Board of the Hawaii Supreme Court
Represented By: Robyn B. Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROY F. HUGHES, in his individual capacity while serving under color of law as a Hearing Officer of the Disciplinary Board of the Hawaii Supreme Court
Represented By: Robyn B. Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLENE M. NORRIS, in her individual capacity while serving under color of law as Senior Disciplinary Counsel of the Office of Disciplinary Counsel of the Hawaii Supreme Court
Represented By: Robyn B. Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDREA R. SINK, in her individual capacity while serving under color of law as an Investigator of the the Office of Disciplinary Counsel of the Hawaii Supreme Court
Represented By: Robyn B. Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?