Richard Watkinson v. Alaska Department of Correctio, et al
Defendant: JOHN CONANT and KEITH ROGERS
Defendant / Appellee: EARL HAUSER, JAMES DUNCAN, ALASKA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS and SCOTT DIAL
Plaintiff / Appellant: RICHARD R. WATKINSON
Case Number: 21-35084
Filed: February 2, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12030117] (CL) [Entered: 03/09/2021 05:05 PM]
February 19, 2021 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 03/09/2021, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12009849] (CL) [Entered: 02/19/2021 01:30 PM]
February 10, 2021 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/10/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11999307]. [21-35084] (AD) [Entered: 02/10/2021 12:44 PM]
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Richard R. Watkinson Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/10/2021. [11999153] [21-35084] (Anderson, Howard) [Entered: 02/10/2021 11:37 AM]
February 2, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 03/03/2021. Transcript due 04/02/2021. Appellant Richard R. Watkinson opening brief due 05/12/2021. Appellees Alaska Department of Corrections, Scott Dial, James Duncan and Earl Hauser answering brief due 06/11/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11989720] (JPD) [Entered: 02/02/2021 11:39 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Richard Watkinson v. Alaska Department of Correctio, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CONANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEITH ROGERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EARL HAUSER
Represented By: Matthias R. Cicotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES DUNCAN
Represented By: Matthias R. Cicotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALASKA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: Matthias R. Cicotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT DIAL
Represented By: Matthias R. Cicotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD R. WATKINSON
Represented By: Howard Walton Anderson III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?