Dasay Hollinquest v. Michael Payne, et al
Defendant / Appellee: I. SILVA, Correctional Officer, FRANK SERRANO, Hearing Officer, STEVE FRANKE, Eastside Institution Administrator, MARK NOOTH, Superintendent, MICHAEL PAYNE, S. GRAVES, IMU Counselor, T. JOST, Captain, M. GOWER, Acting Inspector General, LEONARD WILLIAMS, Inspector General, JUDY GILMORE, Asst. Superintendent Correctional Rehabilitation Services, D. SHEPPARD, Lieutenant, J. TAYLOR, Grievance Superintendent Asst. and JASON BELL, Asst. Superintendent of Security
Plaintiff / Appellant: DASAY HOLLINQUEST
Case Number: 21-35194
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) Appellees Jason Bell, Steve Franke, Judy Gilmore, M. Gower, S. Graves, T. Jost, Mark Nooth, Michael Payne, Frank Serrano, D. Sheppard, I. Silva, J. Taylor and Leonard Williams reply to response to order to show cause dated 04/15/2021. Date of service: 04/16/2021. [12077732] [21-35194] (Fjordbeck, Denise) [Entered: 04/16/2021 03:10 PM]
April 15, 2021 Filing 6 Filed Appellant Dasay Hollinquest response to order to show cause (entitled: motion to show cause). [12076126] (NAC) [Entered: 04/15/2021 03:15 PM]
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Received copy of District Court order filed on 04/09/2021. Motion for Issuance of Certificate of Appealability 73 is DENIED for lack of jurisdiction. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/9/2021.) (pjg) [12070156] (NAC) [Entered: 04/11/2021 09:31 PM]
March 25, 2021 Filing 4 Attorney Robert E. Sullivan in 21-35194 substituted by Attorney Denise Gale Fjordbeck in 21-35194 [12053639] (NAC) [Entered: 03/25/2021 02:46 PM]
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Denise G. Fjordbeck (Oregon Department of Justice - Appellate Division, 1162 Court Street NE, Salem, Oregon 97301) for Appellees Jason Bell, Steve Franke, Judy Gilmore, M. Gower, S. Graves, T. Jost, Mark Nooth, Michael Payne, Frank Serrano, D. Sheppard, I. Silva, J. Taylor and Leonard Williams. Substitution for Attorney Robert E. Sullivan, Esquire for Appellees Jason Bell, Steve Franke, Judy Gilmore, M. Gower, S. Graves, T. Jost, Mark Nooth, Michael Payne, Frank Serrano, D. Sheppard, I. Silva, J. Taylor and Leonard Williams. Date of service: 03/25/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12053608] [21-35194] (Fjordbeck, Denise) [Entered: 03/25/2021 02:37 PM]
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): The district courts judgment was entered on the docket on January 19, 2021. Appellants notice of appeal was delivered to prison officials on March 8, 2021, and received by the district court on March 11, 2021. Accordingly, the record suggests that this court may lack jurisdiction over this appeal because the notice of appeal was not filed or delivered to prison officials within 30 days after entry of the district courts judgment. See 28 U.S.C. 2107(a); Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(1)(A), 4(c); United States v. Sadler, 480 F.3d 932, 937 (9th Cir. 2007) (requirement of timely notice of appeal is jurisdictional); Houston v. Lack, 487 U.S. 266, 270 (1988) (notice of appeal deemed filed when it was delivered to prison authorities for forwarding to the court). Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal, or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellant elects to show cause, a response may be filed within 10 days after service of the memorandum. If appellant does not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [12044949] (CKP) [Entered: 03/17/2021 03:36 PM]
March 16, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Dasay Hollinquest opening brief due 05/10/2021. Appellees Michael Payne, et al. answering brief due 06/09/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12042701] (JPD) [Entered: 03/16/2021 10:45 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Dasay Hollinquest v. Michael Payne, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: I. SILVA, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Robert E. Sullivan Esquire
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRANK SERRANO, Hearing Officer
Represented By: Robert E. Sullivan Esquire
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVE FRANKE, Eastside Institution Administrator
Represented By: Robert E. Sullivan Esquire
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK NOOTH, Superintendent
Represented By: Robert E. Sullivan Esquire
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL PAYNE
Represented By: Robert E. Sullivan Esquire
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: S. GRAVES, IMU Counselor
Represented By: Robert E. Sullivan Esquire
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: T. JOST, Captain
Represented By: Robert E. Sullivan Esquire
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. GOWER, Acting Inspector General
Represented By: Robert E. Sullivan Esquire
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEONARD WILLIAMS, Inspector General
Represented By: Robert E. Sullivan Esquire
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUDY GILMORE, Asst. Superintendent Correctional Rehabilitation Services
Represented By: Robert E. Sullivan Esquire
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: D. SHEPPARD, Lieutenant
Represented By: Robert E. Sullivan Esquire
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. TAYLOR, Grievance Superintendent Asst.
Represented By: Robert E. Sullivan Esquire
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JASON BELL, Asst. Superintendent of Security
Represented By: Robert E. Sullivan Esquire
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DASAY HOLLINQUEST
Represented By: Dasay Hollinquest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?