Robert Stanard v. Maria Dy, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: ROBERT A. STANARD, AKA Robert Allen Stanard
Defendant / Appellee: MARIA DY, Doctor, FDC SeaTac, DAN SPROUL, Warden, FDC SeaTac, K. MARTINEZ, Physician's Assistant, FDC SeaTac, MARY MITCHELL, Western Regional Director, IAN CONNERS, Administrator, National Inmate Appeals, LEEN, Health Services Administrator, FCI Sheridan, J. BALTAZAR, Western Regional Director, UNKNOWN PARTY, Medical Director of the FBOP, UNKNOWN PARTY, Regional Medical Director and MCDERMONT, Health Services Administrator, FDC SeaTac
Case Number: 21-35582
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Filing 6 MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 09/29/2021. See order for details. [12218689] (VS) [Entered: 09/02/2021 10:27 AM]
September 2, 2021 Filing 5 MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 09/15/2021. See order for details. [12218684] (VS) [Entered: 09/02/2021 10:25 AM]
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 09/02/2021, 10:00 a.m., Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant Robert A. Stanard opening brief due 10/18/2021. Appellees J. Baltazar, Leen, K. Martinez, McDermont, Mary Mitchell, Unknown Party, Ian Conners, Maria Dy and Dan Sproul answering brief due 11/17/2021. Appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [12205766] (VS) [Entered: 08/19/2021 10:37 AM]
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 08/19/2021, 10:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12193762] (VS) [Entered: 08/06/2021 08:57 AM]
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Samuel David Kinder Weiss (Rights Behind Bars. 416 Florida Avenue NW, Unit 26152. Washington, DC 20001) for Appellant Robert A. Stanard. Substitution for Party Robert A. Stanard. Date of service: 08/03/2021. (Party was previously proceeding pro se.) [12190187] [21-35582] (Weiss, Samuel) [Entered: 08/03/2021 08:22 AM]
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Robert A. Stanard opening brief due 09/17/2021. Appellees Maria Dy et al. answering brief due 10/18/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12179825] (JPD) [Entered: 07/22/2021 09:46 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Robert Stanard v. Maria Dy, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT A. STANARD, AKA Robert Allen Stanard
Represented By: Robert A. Stanard
Represented By: Samuel Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARIA DY, Doctor, FDC SeaTac
Represented By: Matt Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAN SPROUL, Warden, FDC SeaTac
Represented By: Matt Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: K. MARTINEZ, Physician's Assistant, FDC SeaTac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARY MITCHELL, Western Regional Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: IAN CONNERS, Administrator, National Inmate Appeals
Represented By: Matt Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEEN, Health Services Administrator, FCI Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. BALTAZAR, Western Regional Director
Represented By: Matt Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN PARTY, Medical Director of the FBOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN PARTY, Regional Medical Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MCDERMONT, Health Services Administrator, FDC SeaTac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?