Idaho State Snowmobile Assoc. v. USFS, et al
Defendant: UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE, SAWTOOTH NATIONAL FOREST, FOREST SUPERVISOR JIM DEMAAGD, in his capacity as Acting Forest Supervisor for the Sawtooth National Forest and DISTRICT RANGER MIKE DETTORI, in his capacity as District Ranger for the Fairfield Ranger District
Plaintiff / Appellee: IDAHO STATE SNOWMOBILE ASSOCIATION
Intervenor Defendant / Appellant: WINTER WILDLANDS ALLIANCE and WILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Case Number: 21-35990
Filed: November 30, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Filing 9 Filed order MEDIATION (CG): These appeals are consolidated. The briefing schedule previously set by the court vacated. The consolidated briefing schedule is as follows: appellants opening briefs are due May 24, 2022; appellee's answering brief is due June 23, 2022; appellants optional reply briefs are due within 21 days from the service date of the answering brief. On or before March 02, 2022, counsel is requested to contact the mediator (Chris_Goelz@ca9.uscourts.gov) to report on the status of the case. Counsel are requested to include the Ninth Circuit case name and number in the subject line. [12341731] [21-35955, 21-35990] (SB) [Entered: 01/14/2022 03:09 PM]
January 10, 2022 Filing 8 Terminated participation of Court Reporter Wendy Messuri from open cases (for housekeeping purposes, retired) . [12335799] [19-30193, 20-30051, 20-30214, 20-35813, 20-35815, 20-35862, 20-35886, 20-35990, 21-30100, 21-30104, 21-30109, 21-30110, 21-30114, 21-30167, 21-30197, 21-30209, 21-30220, 21-30221, 21-30222, 21-30227, 21-30231, 21-30250, 21-30260, 21-30264, 21-30271, 21-30276, 21-30280, 21-35011, 21-35105, 21-35231, 21-35368, 21-35504, 21-35648, 21-35671, 21-35673, 21-35826, 21-35837, 21-35864, 21-35955, 21-35990, 22-30000] (RY) [Entered: 01/10/2022 12:30 PM]
January 4, 2022 Filing 7 Added Attorney Garrett Max Kitamura for Appellee Idaho State Snowmobile Association, in case 21-35990. [12331310] (HH) [Entered: 01/04/2022 05:04 PM]
January 4, 2022 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Garrett M. Kitamura (Parsons Behle & Latimer - 800 W. Main Street, Suite 1300; Boise, ID 83702) for Appellee Idaho State Snowmobile Association. Date of service: 01/04/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12331289] [21-35990] (Kitamura, Garrett) [Entered: 01/04/2022 04:50 PM]
December 9, 2021 Filing 5 Added Attorney(s) Marla Fox for party(s) Appellant WildEarth Guardians, in case 21-35990. [12311594] (NAC) [Entered: 12/09/2021 01:43 PM]
December 9, 2021 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Marla Starkweather Fox (WildEarth Guardians, PO Box 13086, Portland OR 97213) for Appellant WildEarth Guardians. Date of service: 12/09/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12311580] [21-35990] (Fox, Marla) [Entered: 12/09/2021 01:37 PM]
December 7, 2021 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/07/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12309296]. [21-35990] (AD) [Entered: 12/07/2021 06:44 PM]
December 7, 2021 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants WildEarth Guardians and Winter Wildlands Alliance Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/07/2021. [12308556] [21-35990] (Rule, Lauren) [Entered: 12/07/2021 12:59 PM]
November 30, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants WildEarth Guardians and Winter Wildlands Alliance Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/07/2021. Transcript ordered by 12/29/2021. Transcript due 01/28/2022. Appellants WildEarth Guardians and Winter Wildlands Alliance opening brief due 03/09/2022. Appellee Idaho State Snowmobile Association answering brief due 04/08/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12301017] (JBS) [Entered: 11/30/2021 10:43 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Idaho State Snowmobile Assoc. v. USFS, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: IDAHO STATE SNOWMOBILE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Garrett Max Kitamura
Represented By: Norman M. Semanko Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAWTOOTH NATIONAL FOREST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOREST SUPERVISOR JIM DEMAAGD, in his capacity as Acting Forest Supervisor for the Sawtooth National Forest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT RANGER MIKE DETTORI, in his capacity as District Ranger for the Fairfield Ranger District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellant: WINTER WILDLANDS ALLIANCE
Represented By: Lauren Marie Rule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellant: WILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Represented By: Lauren Marie Rule
Represented By: Marla Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?