Foster Taft v. Ventura County Medical Center, et al
Defendant / Appellee: CAROL LASHBROOK and VENTURA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER
Plaintiff / Appellant: FOSTER TAFT
Case Number: 21-55216
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 Received 6 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 3 ] filed by Foster Taft. [12066263] (SD) [Entered: 04/07/2021 10:01 AM]
March 30, 2021 Filing 5 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 3 ] submitted by Foster Taft is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: not applicable. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12058649] (LA) [Entered: 03/30/2021 03:37 PM]
March 29, 2021 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant Foster Taft Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion for hearing en banc]. Date of service: 03/29/2021. [12057316] [21-55216] (Taft, Foster) [Entered: 03/29/2021 05:21 PM]
March 29, 2021 Filing 3 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Foster Taft. Date of service: 03/29/2021. [12057300] [21-55216]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached searchable PDF. 03/30/2021 by LA] (Taft, Foster) [Entered: 03/29/2021 05:11 PM]
March 23, 2021 Filing 2 Terminated duplicate party Appellant Foster Taft in 21-55216 entered in error. [12051145] (JMR) [Entered: 03/23/2021 03:37 PM]
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Foster Taft opening brief due 05/04/2021. Appellees Carol Lashbrook and Ventura County Medical Center answering brief due 06/03/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12029561] (JMR) [Entered: 03/09/2021 01:45 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Foster Taft v. Ventura County Medical Center, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAROL LASHBROOK
Represented By: Cathy Elaine Anderson
Represented By: William Clinkenbeard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VENTURA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Cathy Elaine Anderson
Represented By: William Clinkenbeard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FOSTER TAFT
Represented By: Foster Taft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?