WildEarth Guardians, et al v. Deb Haaland, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: WILDEARTH GUARDIANS, a non-profit organization, WESTERN WATERSHEDS PROJECT, a non-profit organization, WILDLANDS NETWORK, a non-profit organization and NEW MEXICO WILDERNESS ALLIANCE, a non-profit organization
Defendant / Appellee: DEB HAALAND, as Secretary of the Department of the Interior, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, a federal department, MARTHA WILLIAMS, as Acting Director of the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service and UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, a federal agency
Intervenor Defendant / Appellee: NEW MEXICO DEPARTMENT OF GAME AND FISH
Case Number: 22-15029
Filed: January 7, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2022 Filing 14 Filed order MEDIATION (RGA): A dial-in telephone conference will be held on March 16, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. Each participant will receive an email with dial-in information. The following cross-appeal briefing schedule shall govern these appeals: the first brief on cross-appeal for Deb Haaland, Amy Lueders, New Mexico Department of Game and Fish, United States Department of Justice and United States Fish and Wildlife Service is due May 02, 2022; the second brief on crossappeal for Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Endangered Wolf Center, David R. Parsons, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians and Wolf Conservation Center is due June 01, 2022; the third brief on cross-appeal Deb Haaland, Amy Lueders, New Mexico Department of Game and Fish, United States Department of Justice and United States Fish and Wildlife Service.is due July 01, 2022; Optional cross appeal Reply brief for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Endangered Wolf Center, David R. Parsons and Wolf Conservation Center is due within 21 days of service. [12372749] [22-15029, 22-15056, 22-15091] (WL) [Entered: 02/16/2022 04:45 PM]
January 28, 2022 Filing 13 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/28/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12354506]. [22-15029] (AD) [Entered: 01/28/2022 12:44 PM]
January 28, 2022 Filing 12 Filed (ECF) Appellants Center for Biological Diversity, DOW, Endangered Wolf Center, David R. Parsons and Wolf Conservation Center in 22-15091, Appellees Center for Biological Diversity, DOW, Endangered Wolf Center, David R. Parsons and Wolf Conservation Center in 22-15056 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/28/2022. [12354257] [22-15091, 22-15029, 22-15056] (Forsyth, Elizabeth) [Entered: 01/28/2022 10:41 AM]
January 27, 2022 Filing 11 Entered appearance of Appellants Wildlands Network and New Mexico Wilderness Alliance. [12353447] (WL) [Entered: 01/27/2022 01:37 PM]
January 27, 2022 Filing 10 Filed order MEDIATION (RGA): These appeals are consolidated. [12353194] [22-15029, 22-15056, 22-15091] (WL) [Entered: 01/27/2022 11:09 AM]
January 27, 2022 Filing 9 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 02/16/2022, 1:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. See order for instructions and details. [12353002] [22-15029, 22-15056, 22-15091] (VS) [Entered: 01/27/2022 09:37 AM]
January 14, 2022 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 01/28/2022, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12341378] (VS) [Entered: 01/14/2022 01:05 PM]
January 14, 2022 Filing 7 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/14/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12341356]. [22-15029] (AD) [Entered: 01/14/2022 12:44 PM]
January 14, 2022 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellants Western Watersheds Project and WildEarth Guardians Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/14/2022. [12341061] [22-15029] (Nokes, Kelly) [Entered: 01/14/2022 10:19 AM]
January 13, 2022 Filing 5 Added Attorney(s) James Maysonett for party(s) Appellee Martha Williams Appellee Deb Haaland Appellee USFWS Appellee USDOJ. [12339738] (RL) [Entered: 01/13/2022 09:18 AM]
January 13, 2022 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of James Anthony Maysonett (United States Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Washington DC) for Appellees Deb Haaland, USDOJ, USFWS and Martha Williams. Date of service: 01/13/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12339559] [22-15029] (Maysonett, James) [Entered: 01/13/2022 07:06 AM]
January 10, 2022 Filing 3 Added Attorney(s) Kelly E. Nokes for party(s) Appellant WildEarth Guardians Appellant Western Watersheds Project, in case 22-15029. [12335672] (RR) [Entered: 01/10/2022 11:20 AM]
January 10, 2022 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kelly Elizabeth Nokes (Western Environmental Law Center, P.O. Box 218, Buena Vista, CO 81211) for Appellants Western Watersheds Project and WildEarth Guardians. Date of service: 01/10/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12335396] [22-15029] (Nokes, Kelly) [Entered: 01/10/2022 09:52 AM]
January 7, 2022 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Western Watersheds Project and WildEarth Guardians Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/14/2022. Appellants Western Watersheds Project and WildEarth Guardians opening brief due 03/07/2022. Appellees Deb Haaland, et al. answering brief due 04/05/2022. Appellants' optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12334039] (HH) [Entered: 01/07/2022 09:58 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: WildEarth Guardians, et al v. Deb Haaland, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILDEARTH GUARDIANS, a non-profit organization
Represented By: Matthew Kellogg Bishop
Represented By: Kelly E. Nokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WESTERN WATERSHEDS PROJECT, a non-profit organization
Represented By: Matthew Kellogg Bishop
Represented By: Kelly E. Nokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILDLANDS NETWORK, a non-profit organization
Represented By: Matthew Kellogg Bishop
Represented By: Kelly E. Nokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NEW MEXICO WILDERNESS ALLIANCE, a non-profit organization
Represented By: Matthew Kellogg Bishop
Represented By: Kelly E. Nokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEB HAALAND, as Secretary of the Department of the Interior
Represented By: Anthony Dolendo Ortiz
Represented By: James Maysonett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, a federal department
Represented By: James Maysonett
Represented By: Anthony Dolendo Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARTHA WILLIAMS, as Acting Director of the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Anthony Dolendo Ortiz
Represented By: James Maysonett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, a federal agency
Represented By: Anthony Dolendo Ortiz
Represented By: James Maysonett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellee: NEW MEXICO DEPARTMENT OF GAME AND FISH
Represented By: Paul S. Weiland Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?