SaurikIT, LLC v. Apple, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: SAURIKIT, LLC
Defendant / Appellee: APPLE, INC.
Case Number: 22-16527
Filed: October 5, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2022 Filing 13 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12582501] (CL) [Entered: 11/08/2022 10:11 AM]
November 3, 2022 Filing 12 Filed (ECF) Appellant SaurikIT, LLC Correspondence: Notice That No Transcripts Will Be Ordered. Date of service: 11/03/2022 [12579916] [22-16527] (Wolfson, Adam) [Entered: 11/03/2022 03:59 PM]
October 21, 2022 Filing 11 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 11/04/2022, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12570509] (CL) [Entered: 10/21/2022 03:01 PM]
October 17, 2022 Filing 10 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/17/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12564998]. [22-16527] (AD) [Entered: 10/17/2022 12:44 PM]
October 17, 2022 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) Appellee Apple, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/17/2022. [12564401] [22-16527] (Boutrous, Theodore) [Entered: 10/17/2022 07:47 AM]
October 17, 2022 Filing 8 Added Attorney(s) Julian Kleinbrodt, Theodore J. Boutrous Jr. for party(s) Appellee Apple, Inc., in case 22-16527. [12564392] (DJV) [Entered: 10/17/2022 07:41 AM]
October 14, 2022 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Julian W. Kleinbrodt (Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, 555 Mission St., Suite 3000, San Francisco, CA 94105) for Appellee Apple, Inc.. Date of service: 10/14/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12564246] [22-16527] (Kleinbrodt, Julian) [Entered: 10/14/2022 07:22 PM]
October 14, 2022 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr. (Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, 333 S. Grand Ave., Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197) for Appellee Apple, Inc.. Date of service: 10/14/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12564245] [22-16527] (Boutrous, Theodore) [Entered: 10/14/2022 07:15 PM]
October 11, 2022 Filing 5 Added Attorney(s) David Michael Cooper for party(s) Appellant SaurikIT, LLC, in case 22-16527. [12559231] (DJV) [Entered: 10/11/2022 07:22 AM]
October 10, 2022 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/10/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12559126]. [22-16527] (AD) [Entered: 10/10/2022 12:44 PM]
October 10, 2022 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant SaurikIT, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/10/2022. [12559117] [22-16527] (Wolfson, Adam) [Entered: 10/10/2022 12:00 PM]
October 10, 2022 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of David Michael Cooper (Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP -- 51 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor, New York, NY 10010) for Appellant SaurikIT, LLC. Date of service: 10/10/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12559115] [22-16527] (Cooper, David) [Entered: 10/10/2022 11:56 AM]
October 5, 2022 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant SaurikIT, LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/12/2022. Transcript ordered by 11/02/2022. Transcript due 12/02/2022. Appellant SaurikIT, LLC opening brief due 01/11/2023. Appellee Apple, Inc. answering brief due 02/10/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12556900] (JBS) [Entered: 10/05/2022 04:12 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: SaurikIT, LLC v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SAURIKIT, LLC
Represented By: Adam Wolfson
Represented By: David Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: APPLE, INC.
Represented By: Dana Lynn Craig
Represented By: Cynthia Richman
Represented By: Jagannathan Srinivasan
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Julian Kleinbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?