Daniel Davis, et al v. Blue Tongue Films, et al
Defendant: AMAZON.COM, INC. and AMAZON STUDIOS, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: DANIEL E. DAVIS, PETER CONTI and GRINGO HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant / Appellee: BLUE TONGUE FILMS, DENVER AND DELILAH PRODUCTIONS, A. J. DIX, NASH EDGERTON, EROS INTERNATIONAL MEDIA LTD., TRISH HOFFMAN, BETH KONO, MATTHEW STONE, ANTHONY TAMBAKIS, CHARLIZE THERON and REBECCA YELDHAM
Case Number: 22-55416
Filed: April 25, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2022 Filing 12 Added Attorney(s) Spencer Dreier for party(s) Appellant Peter Conti Appellant Gringo Holdings, LLC Appellant Daniel E. Davis, in case 22-55416. [12471342] (DJV) [Entered: 06/15/2022 07:07 AM]
June 14, 2022 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Spencer Douglas Dreier (Wachtel Missry LLP, One Dag Hammarskjold Plaza, 885 Second Avenue, New York, NY 10017) for Appellants Peter Conti, Daniel E. Davis and Gringo Holdings, LLC. Date of service: 06/14/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12471306] [22-55416] (Dreier, Spencer) [Entered: 06/14/2022 07:24 PM]
June 13, 2022 Filing 10 MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 06/15/2022, 1:30 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 06/07/2022). [12469987] (CL) [Entered: 06/13/2022 02:39 PM]
June 9, 2022 Filing 9 Streamlined request [8] by Appellants Peter Conti, Daniel E. Davis and Gringo Holdings, LLC to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Peter Conti, Daniel E. Davis and Gringo Holdings, LLC opening brief due 07/27/2022. Appellees Blue Tongue Films, Denver and Delilah Productions, A. J. Dix, Nash Edgerton, Eros International Media LTD., Trish Hoffman, Beth Kono, Matthew Stone, Anthony Tambakis, Charlize Theron and Rebecca Yeldham answering brief due 08/26/2022. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12467935] (DLM) [Entered: 06/09/2022 05:08 PM]
June 9, 2022 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants Peter Conti, Daniel E. Davis and Gringo Holdings, LLC. New requested due date is 07/27/2022. [12467747] [22-55416] (Grossabrdt, Jonah) [Entered: 06/09/2022 02:49 PM]
June 3, 2022 Filing 7 Added Attorney(s) Grace Zhang for party(s) Appellee Matthew Stone Appellee Charlize Theron Appellee Beth Kono Appellee Denver and Delilah Productions Appellee Trish Hoffman Appellee Anthony Tambakis Appellee A. J. Dix Appellee Rebecca Yeldham, in case 22-55416. [12462855] (DJV) [Entered: 06/03/2022 10:49 AM]
June 3, 2022 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Grace Zhang (Hueston Hennigan LLP, 523 W. 6th St., Suite 400, Los Angeles, CA 90014) for Appellees Denver and Delilah Productions, A. J. Dix, Eros International Media LTD., Trish Hoffman, Beth Kono, Matthew Stone, Anthony Tambakis, Charlize Theron and Rebecca Yeldham. Date of service: 06/03/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12462846] [22-55416] (Zhang, Grace) [Entered: 06/03/2022 10:44 AM]
May 24, 2022 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Appellants Peter Conti, Daniel E. Davis and Gringo Holdings, LLC Correspondence: Certificate of No Transcripts.. Date of service: 05/24/2022 [12455501] [22-55416] (Grossabrdt, Jonah) [Entered: 05/24/2022 04:35 PM]
May 23, 2022 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 06/07/2022, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12454193] (CL) [Entered: 05/23/2022 03:26 PM]
May 3, 2022 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/02/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12436536]. [22-55416] (AD) [Entered: 05/03/2022 06:44 AM]
May 2, 2022 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Peter Conti, Daniel E. Davis and Gringo Holdings, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/02/2022. [12436503] [22-55416] (Grossabrdt, Jonah) [Entered: 05/02/2022 10:02 PM]
April 25, 2022 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Peter Conti, Daniel E. Davis and Gringo Holdings, LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/02/2022. Appellants Peter Conti, Daniel E. Davis and Gringo Holdings, LLC opening brief due 06/27/2022. Appellees Blue Tongue Films, Denver and Delilah Productions, A. J. Dix, Nash Edgerton, Eros International Media LTD., Trish Hoffman, Beth Kono, Matthew Stone, Anthony Tambakis, Charlize Theron and Rebecca Yeldham answering brief due 07/27/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12430491] (RT) [Entered: 04/25/2022 03:56 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Daniel Davis, et al v. Blue Tongue Films, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DANIEL E. DAVIS
Represented By: Jonah A. Grossabrdt
Represented By: Matthew Laurence Rollin
Represented By: Spencer Dreier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PETER CONTI
Represented By: Jonah A. Grossabrdt
Represented By: Matthew Laurence Rollin
Represented By: Spencer Dreier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GRINGO HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Jonah A. Grossabrdt
Represented By: Matthew Laurence Rollin
Represented By: Spencer Dreier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLUE TONGUE FILMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENVER AND DELILAH PRODUCTIONS
Represented By: Moez Kaba
Represented By: Grace Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: A. J. DIX
Represented By: Moez Kaba
Represented By: Grace Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NASH EDGERTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EROS INTERNATIONAL MEDIA LTD.
Represented By: Moez Kaba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRISH HOFFMAN
Represented By: Moez Kaba
Represented By: Grace Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BETH KONO
Represented By: Moez Kaba
Represented By: Grace Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATTHEW STONE
Represented By: Moez Kaba
Represented By: Grace Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANTHONY TAMBAKIS
Represented By: Moez Kaba
Represented By: Grace Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLIZE THERON
Represented By: Moez Kaba
Represented By: Grace Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REBECCA YELDHAM
Represented By: Moez Kaba
Represented By: Grace Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON STUDIOS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?