Myong Oh v. Reconstrust Company, NA, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: MYONG SUK OH, an individual
Defendant / Appellee: RECONSTRUST COMPANY, NA, a US corporation and wholly owned subsidiary of Bank of America Corporation, BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORP., an American worldwide banking and financial service holding company commonly known as BNY Mellon, MTC FINANCIAL, INC., a California corporation, DBA Trustee Corps, BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, AUCTION.COM, INC., NEWREZ, LLC, a Delaware Corporation, DBA Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and DOES, 1 through 250, inclusive
Case Number: 22-55711
Filed: July 27, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Civil (Rico)
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2022 Filing 6 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): Appellants unopposed motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 5 ]) for an extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. The opening brief is due October 17, 2022. The answering brief is due November 16, 2022. The optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12545580] (RY) [Entered: 09/21/2022 11:45 AM]
September 18, 2022 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Appellant Myong Suk Oh Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 10/17/2022. Date of service: 09/18/2022. [12542774] [22-55711] (Oh, Yi) [Entered: 09/18/2022 04:46 PM]
September 15, 2022 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12540887] (CL) [Entered: 09/15/2022 09:16 AM]
August 18, 2022 Filing 3 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 09/01/2022, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12520144] (CL) [Entered: 08/18/2022 01:52 PM]
August 8, 2022 Filing 2 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12512447] (BLS) [Entered: 08/08/2022 04:12 PM]
July 27, 2022 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Myong Suk Oh Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/03/2022. Appellant Myong Suk Oh opening brief due 09/19/2022. Appellees Auction.com, Inc., Bank of New York Mellon Corp., Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, Does, MTC Financial, Inc., Newrez, LLC and Reconstrust Company, NA answering brief due 10/18/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12503349] (JMR) [Entered: 07/27/2022 11:47 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Myong Oh v. Reconstrust Company, NA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MYONG SUK OH, an individual
Represented By: Yi Yong Oh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RECONSTRUST COMPANY, NA, a US corporation and wholly owned subsidiary of Bank of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORP., an American worldwide banking and financial service holding company commonly known as BNY Mellon
Represented By: Roberto Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MTC FINANCIAL, INC., a California corporation, DBA Trustee Corps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Cathy K. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AUCTION.COM, INC.
Represented By: Meagan S. Tom
Represented By: Regina J. McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEWREZ, LLC, a Delaware Corporation, DBA Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOES, 1 through 250, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?