Joshua Ebright, et al v. Alon USA Energy, Inc., et al
Defendant: BP WEST COAST PRODUCTS, LLC, CHEVRON U.S.A. INC., TESORO REFINING & MARKETING COMPANY, LLC, EQUILON ENTERPRISES, LLC, DBA Shell Oil Products US, EXXONMOBIL REFINING & SUPPLY COMPANY, EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, PHILLIPS 66 and VALERO MARKETING AND SUPPLY COMPANY
Plaintiff / Appellee: JOSHUA EBRIGHT, PAUL LEE and DAVID RINALDI, On Behalf of Themselves and All Others Similarly Situated
Defendant / Appellant: ALON USA ENERGY, INC.
Case Number: 22-56018
Filed: November 1, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2023 Filing 13 Terminated Robert A. Mittelstaedt for Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC in 22-56018 [12632576] (NAC) [Entered: 01/18/2023 10:29 AM]
January 18, 2023 Filing 12 Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Attorney Mr. Robert A. Mittelstaedt, Esquire for - Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC. Party proceeding without counsel: No. Date of service: 01/18/2023. [12632499] [22-56018] (Mittelstaedt, Robert) [Entered: 01/18/2023 09:53 AM]
January 12, 2023 Filing 11 ENTRY UPDATED. Streamlined request [10] by Appellant Alon USA Energy, Inc. to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Alon USA Energy, Inc. opening brief due 03/03/2023. Appellees Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee and David Rinaldi answering brief due 04/03/2023. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12629511]--[Edited 01/13/2023 by DLM] (DLM) [Entered: 01/12/2023 02:02 PM]
January 12, 2023 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Alon USA Energy, Inc.. New requested due date is 03/03/2023. [12629033] [22-56018] (Hittinger, Carl) [Entered: 01/12/2023 09:22 AM]
January 11, 2023 Filing 9 Filed order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): The parties stipulated motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 8 ]) for voluntary dismissal of No. 22-56017 is granted. No. 22-56017 is dismissed with prejudice. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). Costs and fees shall be allocated pursuant to the parties stipulation. This order served on the district court acts as the mandate of this court as to No. 22-56017 only. No. 22-56018 will proceed and the following briefing schedule will govern: Appellant Alon USA Energy, Inc.s opening brief is due February 10, 2023. Appellees Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, and David Rinaldis answering brief is due March 13, 2023. Appellant Alon USA Energy, Inc.s optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12628309] (AF) [Entered: 01/11/2023 01:26 PM]
December 21, 2022 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) Appellees ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company and Exxon Mobil Corporation Stipulated Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 12/21/2022. [12615354] [22-56017] --[COURT UPDATE: Spread to case 22-56018. 12/21/2022 by TYL] (Sestito, Dawn) [Entered: 12/21/2022 06:56 AM]
November 30, 2022 Filing 7 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: These cases are RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12599654] [22-56010, 22-56016, 22-56017, 22-56018] (CL) [Entered: 11/30/2022 05:14 PM]
November 10, 2022 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 11/30/2022, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12584686] [22-56017, 22-56018] (CL) [Entered: 11/10/2022 11:19 AM]
November 7, 2022 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/07/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12581637]. [22-56018] (AD) [Entered: 11/07/2022 12:44 PM]
November 7, 2022 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellants Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee and David Rinaldi in 22-56017 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/07/2022. [12581256] [22-56017, 22-56018] (Aguilar, George) [Entered: 11/07/2022 09:36 AM]
November 4, 2022 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/04/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12580466]. [22-56018] (AD) [Entered: 11/04/2022 12:44 PM]
November 4, 2022 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Alon USA Energy, Inc. in 22-56018, Appellee Alon USA Energy, Inc. in 22-56017 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/04/2022. [12580270] [22-56018, 22-56017] (Hittinger, Carl) [Entered: 11/04/2022 10:31 AM]
November 1, 2022 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Appellant Alon USA Energy, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/08/2022. First cross appeal brief due 02/06/2023 for Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee and David Rinaldi. Second brief on cross appeal due 03/07/2023 for Alon USA Energy, Inc., BP West Coast Products, LLC, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Equilon Enterprises, LLC, Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company, Phillips 66, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC and Valero Marketing and Supply Company. Third brief on cross appeal due 04/07/2023 for Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee and David Rinaldi. Optional cross appeal Reply brief for Alon USA Energy, Inc. is due within 21 days after service of Third brief on cross appeal. [12578111] [22-56018, 22-56017] (RT) [Entered: 11/01/2022 02:35 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Joshua Ebright, et al v. Alon USA Energy, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOSHUA EBRIGHT
Represented By: George C. Aguilar Esquire
Represented By: Michael J. Nicoud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PAUL LEE
Represented By: George C. Aguilar Esquire
Represented By: Michael J. Nicoud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID RINALDI, On Behalf of Themselves and All Others Similarly Situated
Represented By: George C. Aguilar Esquire
Represented By: Michael J. Nicoud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ALON USA ENERGY, INC.
Represented By: Tyson Herrold
Represented By: Carl Hittinger Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP WEST COAST PRODUCTS, LLC
Represented By: Diane Lee McGimsey
Represented By: Robert A. Sacks Esquire
Represented By: Robert M. W. Smith Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Thomas G. Hungar
Represented By: Samuel G. Liversidge
Represented By: Cynthia Richman
Represented By: Jagannathan Srinivasan
Represented By: Daniel Glen Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TESORO REFINING & MARKETING COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Eric Patrick Enson Esquire
Represented By: David Craig Kiernan
Represented By: Robert A. Mittelstaedt Esquire
Represented By: Rasha Gerges Shields
Represented By: Craig Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUILON ENTERPRISES, LLC, DBA Shell Oil Products US
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Represented By: Colin Charles West Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXXONMOBIL REFINING & SUPPLY COMPANY
Represented By: Hubert Kim
Represented By: Frederick William Kosmo Jr.
Represented By: Dawn Sestito
Represented By: Robin A. Wofford Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION
Represented By: Hubert Kim
Represented By: Frederick William Kosmo Jr.
Represented By: Dawn Sestito
Represented By: Robin A. Wofford Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIPS 66
Represented By: Joshua D. Lichtman
Represented By: Geraldine Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALERO MARKETING AND SUPPLY COMPANY
Represented By: Gerald Edward Hawxhurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?