Williams v. Gonzalez, et al.
Plaintiff / Appellant: BRANDON CHRISTOPHER WILLIAMS and Tricky
Defendant / Appellee: O. GONZALEZ, J. ANDRADE, E. CARMONA WALLACE, S. KALETA and A. REYNA
Case Number: 23-1394
Filed: July 10, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2023 Filing 6 Miscellaneous Pro Se Filings Filed [Entered: 10/04/2023 03:01 PM]
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FILED. A review of the record suggests that this court may lack jurisdiction over this appeal of the district courts May 30, 2023 order dismissing the complaint with leave to amend. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; WMX Techs., Inc. v. Miller, 104 F.3d 1133, 1136 (9th Cir. 1997) (en banc) (dismissal of complaint with leave to amend is not immediately appealable). Appellants notice of appeal was filed on June 29, 2023. A review of the district court docket reflects that, on August 14, 2023, the district court entered a final order dismissing the action and entered judgment. To date, appellant has not filed a notice of appeal from the August 14, 2023 judgment. See Brown v. Rawson-Neal Psychiatric Hospital, 840 F.3d 1146, 1148 (9th Cir. 2016) (finding district courts prior order dismissing complaint with leave to amend under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) was not reviewable on appeal from district courts final order dismissing action as a sanction under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b)). Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant must move for voluntary dismissal of this appeal or file a statement explaining why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellant does not comply with this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing remains suspended pending disposition of this order and appellants motions for appointment of counsel and to proceed in forma pauperis. See 9th Cir. R. 27-11. [Entered: 09/21/2023 03:42 PM]
July 24, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Brandon Christopher Williams. [Entered: 07/28/2023 08:48 AM]
July 24, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Brandon Christopher Williams. [Entered: 07/27/2023 02:07 PM]
July 10, 2023 Filing 2 SCHEDULE NOTICE. Appeal No RT Opening Brief Due 9/1/2023. All briefs shall be served and filed pursuant to FRAP 31 and 9th Cir. R. 31-2.1. Failure of the petitioner(s)/appellant(s) to comply with this briefing schedule will result in automatic dismissal of the appeal. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [Entered: 07/10/2023 12:03 PM]
July 10, 2023 Filing 1 CASE OPENED. A copy of your notice of appeal / petition filed in 2:23-cv-02801-FMO-E has been received in the Clerk's office of the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. The U.S. Court of Appeals docket number 23-1394 has been assigned to this case. All communications with the court must indicate this Court of Appeals docket number. Please carefully review the docket to ensure the name(s) and contact information are correct. It is your responsibility to alert the court if your contact information changes. Resources Available For more information about case processing and to assist you in preparing your brief, please review the Case Opening Information (for #attorneys and #pro se litigants) and review the #Appellate Practice Guide. Counsel should consider contacting the court's #Appellate Mentoring Program for help with the brief and argument. [Entered: 07/10/2023 11:59 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Williams v. Gonzalez, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRANDON CHRISTOPHER WILLIAMS
Represented By: Brandon Christopher Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Tricky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: O. GONZALEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. ANDRADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: E. CARMONA WALLACE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: S. KALETA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: A. REYNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?