Chemeon Surface Technology LLC v. Metalast International, Inc., et al
Defendant: MARC HARRIS and MHA GROUP
Plaintiff / Appellant: CHEMEON SURFACE TECHNOLOGY LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company
Defendant / Appellee: METALAST INTERNATIONAL, INC., METALAST, INC., SIERRA DORADO, INC., DAVID M. SEMAS, GREG D. SEMAS and WENDI SEMAS-FAURIA
Counter Claimant: DEAN MEILING and MADYLON MEILING
Case Number: 23-15291
Filed: March 1, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2023 Filing 7 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12695449] (VS) [Entered: 04/13/2023 04:33 PM]
March 13, 2023 Filing 6 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 04/13/2023, 2:00 p.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12673107] (VS) [Entered: 03/13/2023 03:13 PM]
March 8, 2023 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/08/2023. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12670214]. [23-15291] (AD) [Entered: 03/08/2023 06:44 PM]
March 8, 2023 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant Chemeon Surface Technology LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/08/2023. [12670130] [23-15291] (Halen, Joshua) [Entered: 03/08/2023 04:36 PM]
March 6, 2023 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/06/2023. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12668487]. [23-15291] (AD) [Entered: 03/06/2023 06:44 PM]
March 6, 2023 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellee David M. Semas Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/06/2023. [12667923] [23-15291] (Hoy, Michael) [Entered: 03/06/2023 01:18 PM]
March 1, 2023 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Chemeon Surface Technology LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/08/2023. Transcript ordered by 03/29/2023. Transcript due 04/28/2023. Appellant Chemeon Surface Technology LLC opening brief due 06/08/2023. Appellees Metalast International, Inc., Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas, Greg D. Semas, Wendi Semas-Fauria and Sierra Dorado, Inc. answering brief due 07/10/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12665257] (RT) [Entered: 03/01/2023 03:16 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Chemeon Surface Technology LLC v. Metalast International, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHEMEON SURFACE TECHNOLOGY LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Joshua Michael Halen
Represented By: Adam Hosmer-Henner
Represented By: Chelsea Latino
Represented By: Timothy A. Lukas Esquire
Represented By: Robert C. Ryan
Represented By: Jane Susskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: METALAST INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Michael D. Hoy Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: METALAST, INC.
Represented By: Michael D. Hoy Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SIERRA DORADO, INC.
Represented By: Michael D. Hoy Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID M. SEMAS
Represented By: Michael D. Hoy Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREG D. SEMAS
Represented By: Michael D. Hoy Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WENDI SEMAS-FAURIA
Represented By: Michael D. Hoy Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARC HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHA GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: DEAN MEILING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: MADYLON MEILING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?