Miguel Castro, et al v. USA
Plaintiff / Appellant: MIGUEL CASTRO and TERESA CASTRO
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 23-15841
Filed: June 5, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2023 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12743948] (CL) [Entered: 06/27/2023 01:37 PM]
June 14, 2023 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 06/27/2023, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12736301] (CL) [Entered: 06/14/2023 07:05 PM]
June 8, 2023 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 06/13/2023, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12731908] (CL) [Entered: 06/08/2023 01:43 PM]
June 8, 2023 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/08/2023. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12731815]. [23-15841] (AD) [Entered: 06/08/2023 12:44 PM]
June 8, 2023 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Miguel Castro and Teresa Castro Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/08/2023. [12731528] [23-15841] (Cienfuegos, Pablo) [Entered: 06/08/2023 09:28 AM]
June 5, 2023 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Miguel Castro and Teresa Castro Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/12/2023. Transcript ordered by 07/03/2023. Transcript due 08/03/2023. Appellants Miguel Castro and Teresa Castro opening brief due 09/12/2023. Appellee United States of America answering brief due 10/12/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12728543] (RT) [Entered: 06/05/2023 11:51 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Miguel Castro, et al v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MIGUEL CASTRO
Represented By: P. David Cienfuegos
Represented By: Pablo David Cienfuegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TERESA CASTRO
Represented By: P. David Cienfuegos
Represented By: Pablo David Cienfuegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Douglas Earl Johns
Represented By: Douglas E. Johns Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?