Masoud Khazali v. State of Washington
Plaintiff / Appellant: MASOUD KHAZALI
Defendant / Appellee: STATE OF WASHINGTON, State of George Washington
Case Number: 23-35454
Filed: July 6, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2023 Filing 9 Received notice of change of address dated 08/23/2023 from Masoud Khazali. New address: 10017 12th Ave. NE, Seattle, WA 98125. [12782735]--[Edited: address updated. 08/29/2023 by SLM] (RL) [Entered: 08/29/2023 01:09 PM]
August 28, 2023 Filing 8 Filed Appellant Masoud Khazali statement that appeal should go forward. Served on 08/15/2023. [12782731] (RL) [Entered: 08/29/2023 01:07 PM]
August 28, 2023 Filing 7 Filed original and 0 copies of Appellant Masoud Khazali opening brief of 1 pages (Informal: No). Served on 08/23/2023. (briefing remains stayed) [12782728] (KT) [Entered: 08/29/2023 01:06 PM]
August 28, 2023 Filing 6 Filed Appellant Masoud Khazali FORM 4 motion and affidavit for permission to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 08/18/2023. [12782727] (RL) [Entered: 08/29/2023 01:05 PM]
August 14, 2023 Filing 5 Filed Appellant Masoud Khazali conflicts of interests. Dated 07/29/2023. Paper filing deficiency: None. [12774153] (RL) [Entered: 08/15/2023 09:15 AM]
July 13, 2023 Filing 4 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: MCD): A review of the district courts docket reflects that the district court has certified that this appeal is not taken in good faith and has revoked appellants in forma pauperis status. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). This court may dismiss a case at any time, if the court determines the case is frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Within 35 days after the date of this order, appellant must: (1) file a motion to dismiss this appeal, see Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or (2) file a statement explaining why the appeal is not frivolous and should go forward. If appellant files a statement that the appeal should go forward, appellant also must: (1) file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, OR (2) pay to the district court $505.00 for the filing and docketing fees for this appeal AND file in this court proof that the $505.00 was paid. If appellant does not respond to this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute, without further notice. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. If appellant files a motion to dismiss the appeal, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). If appellant submits any response to this order other than a motion to dismiss the appeal, the court may dismiss this appeal as frivolous, without further notice. The briefing schedule for this appeal is stayed. The Clerk will serve on appellant: (1) a form motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal, (2) a form statement that the appeal should go forward, and (3) a Form 4 financial affidavit. Appellant may use the enclosed forms for any motion to dismiss the appeal, statement that the appeal should go forward, and/or motion to proceed in forma pauperis. [12754950] (CKP) [Entered: 07/13/2023 03:42 PM]
July 11, 2023 Filing 3 Received copy of District Court order filed on 07/11/2023 ORDER. The court finds that Mr. Khazalis appeal is frivolous and therefore REVOKES his IFP status on appeal. The court DIRECTS the Clerk to forward a copy of this order to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit and to Mr. Khazali. [12753049] (RL) [Entered: 07/11/2023 02:23 PM]
July 10, 2023 Filing 2 Filed referral notice (Deputy Clerk: MCD: Referring to the district court for determination whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal. [12751858] (CKP) [Entered: 07/10/2023 02:00 PM]
July 6, 2023 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES.. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Masoud Khazali opening brief due 08/29/2023. [12750023] (JMR) [Entered: 07/06/2023 03:07 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Masoud Khazali v. State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MASOUD KHAZALI
Represented By: Masoud Khazali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE OF WASHINGTON, State of George Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?