Alliance for the Wild Rockies v. Nathan Gassman, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: ALLIANCE FOR THE WILD ROCKIES
Defendant / Appellant: NATHAN GASSMAN, District Ranger, Kootenai National Forest, Libby Ranger District, CHAD BENSON, Forest Supervisor, Kootenai National Forest, KEITH LANNOM, Deputy Regional Forester, U.S. Forest Service Region One, U.S. FOREST SERVICE and UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Intervenor Defendant / Appellant: AMERICAN FOREST RESOURCE COUNCIL, LINCOLN COUNTY and KOOTENAI FOREST STAKEHOLDERS COALITION
Case Number: 23-35567
Filed: August 25, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2023 Filing 11 MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 11/03/2023. DIAL-IN Assessment Conference scheduled 09/19/2023 is cancelled. See order for details. [12795397] [23-35567, 23-35568] (BLS) [Entered: 09/19/2023 06:55 PM]
September 12, 2023 Filing 10 Added Attorney(s) Christopher Thomas Griffith for party(s) Appellee American Forest Resource Council Appellee Lincoln County Appellee Kootenai Forest Stakeholders Coalition. [12790541] (RL) [Entered: 09/12/2023 10:00 AM]
September 11, 2023 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Christopher T. Griffith (Haglund Kelley LLP, 2177 SW Broadway, Portland, OR 97201) for Appellees American Forest Resource Council, Kootenai Forest Stakeholders Coalition and Lincoln County. Date of service: 09/11/2023. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12790281] [23-35567] (Griffith, Christopher) [Entered: 09/11/2023 05:08 PM]
September 11, 2023 Filing 8 Added Attorney(s) Julie A. Weis for party(s) Appellee American Forest Resource Council Appellee Lincoln County Appellee Kootenai Forest Stakeholders Coalition. [12790279] (RL) [Entered: 09/11/2023 05:07 PM]
September 11, 2023 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Julie A. Weis (Halgund Kelley LLP, 2177 SW Broadway, Portland, OR 97201) for Appellees American Forest Resource Council, Kootenai Forest Stakeholders Coalition and Lincoln County. Date of service: 09/11/2023. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12790272] [23-35567] (Weis, Julie) [Entered: 09/11/2023 05:05 PM]
September 8, 2023 Filing 6 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 09/19/2023, 12:30 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12789151] [23-35567, 23-35568] (BLS) [Entered: 09/08/2023 02:43 PM]
August 29, 2023 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/29/2023. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12783178]. [23-35567] (AD) [Entered: 08/29/2023 06:44 PM]
August 29, 2023 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellants Chad Benson, Nathan Gassman, Keith Lannom, U.S. Forest Service and USFWS Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/29/2023. [12783171] [23-35567] (Melton, Michelle) [Entered: 08/29/2023 06:22 PM]
August 28, 2023 Filing 3 Added Attorney(s) Michelle Melton for party(s) Appellant Chad Benson Appellant Nathan Gassman Appellant Keith Lannom Appellant U.S. Forest Service Appellant USFWS. [12781849] (RL) [Entered: 08/28/2023 01:40 PM]
August 28, 2023 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michelle N. Melton (950 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Washington DC 20530) for Appellants USFWS, U.S. Forest Service, Chad Benson, Nathan Gassman and Keith Lannom. Date of service: 08/28/2023. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12781834] [23-35567] (Melton, Michelle) [Entered: 08/28/2023 01:34 PM]
August 25, 2023 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Chad Benson, Nathan Gassman, Keith Lannom, U.S. Forest Service and United States Fish and Wildlife Service Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/01/2023. Transcript ordered by 09/25/2023. Transcript due 10/24/2023. Appellants Chad Benson, Nathan Gassman, Keith Lannom, U.S. Forest Service and United States Fish and Wildlife Service opening brief due 12/04/2023. Appellee Alliance for the Wild Rockies answering brief due 01/04/2024. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12781118] (RT) [Entered: 08/25/2023 02:11 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Alliance for the Wild Rockies v. Nathan Gassman, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALLIANCE FOR THE WILD ROCKIES
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold Esquire
Represented By: Rebecca Kay Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: NATHAN GASSMAN, District Ranger, Kootenai National Forest, Libby Ranger District
Represented By: Rickey Doyle Turner Jr.
Represented By: John Tustin
Represented By: Michelle Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CHAD BENSON, Forest Supervisor, Kootenai National Forest
Represented By: Rickey Doyle Turner Jr.
Represented By: John Tustin
Represented By: Michelle Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KEITH LANNOM, Deputy Regional Forester, U.S. Forest Service Region One
Represented By: Rickey Doyle Turner Jr.
Represented By: John Tustin
Represented By: Michelle Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: U.S. FOREST SERVICE
Represented By: Rickey Doyle Turner Jr.
Represented By: John Tustin
Represented By: Michelle Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Represented By: Rickey Doyle Turner Jr.
Represented By: John Tustin
Represented By: Michelle Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellant: AMERICAN FOREST RESOURCE COUNCIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellant: LINCOLN COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellant: KOOTENAI FOREST STAKEHOLDERS COALITION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?