Nexon Korea Corporation v. Ironmace Co Ltd., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: NEXON KOREA CORPORATION, a Korean Corporation
Defendant / Appellee: IRONMACE CO LTD., a Korean corporation, JU-HYUN CHOI, individually and TERENCE SEUNGHA PARK, individually
Case Number: 23-35600
Filed: September 15, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2023 Filing 5 Streamlined request [4] by Appellant Nexon Korea Corporation to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Nexon Korea Corporation opening brief due 12/18/2023. Appellees Ju-Hyun Choi, Ironmace Co Ltd. and Terence Seungha Park answering brief due 01/17/2024. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12819735] (DLM) [Entered: 11/03/2023 02:59 PM]
November 3, 2023 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Nexon Korea Corporation. New requested due date is 12/18/2023. [12819632] [23-35600] (SeLegue, Sean) [Entered: 11/03/2023 01:44 PM]
September 21, 2023 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/21/2023. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12796960]. [23-35600] (AD) [Entered: 09/21/2023 06:44 PM]
September 21, 2023 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Nexon Korea Corporation Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/21/2023. [12796754] [23-35600] (SeLegue, Sean) [Entered: 09/21/2023 03:10 PM]
September 15, 2023 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Nexon Korea Corporation Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/22/2023. Appellant Nexon Korea Corporation opening brief due 11/16/2023. Appellees Ju-Hyun Choi, Ironmace Co Ltd. and Terence Seungha Park answering brief due 12/18/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12793534] (RT) [Entered: 09/15/2023 04:26 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Nexon Korea Corporation v. Ironmace Co Ltd., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NEXON KOREA CORPORATION, a Korean Corporation
Represented By: James S. Blackburn Esquire
Represented By: Shannon Jost
Represented By: James Lee
Represented By: Oscar Daniel Ramallo
Represented By: Sean M. SeLegue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: IRONMACE CO LTD., a Korean corporation
Represented By: Emily Avazian
Represented By: Michael Chait
Represented By: Joshua Geller Esquire
Represented By: Aaron J. Moss Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JU-HYUN CHOI, individually
Represented By: Emily Avazian
Represented By: Michael Chait
Represented By: Joshua Geller Esquire
Represented By: Aaron J. Moss Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TERENCE SEUNGHA PARK, individually
Represented By: Emily Avazian
Represented By: Michael Chait
Represented By: Joshua Geller Esquire
Represented By: Aaron J. Moss Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?