K. W., et al v. Richard Armstrong, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: K. W., by his next friend D.W., C. M., C. L., A. L., through her guardian E.B., K. S., through his next friend S.S., M. S., through his guardian V.S., N. R., through her next friend G.R., T. F., through her guardian R.F., T. M., through his guardian T.W., B. B., through his next friend D.B., R. P., through her guardian T.P., M. S., through her guardian D.S., E. L., TOBY SCHULTZ, by and through his legal guardian Jana Schultz on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated, BREANNA MULLIC, by and through her legal guardian Brenda Passmore and CALEB HALL, by and through his next friend Melanie Hall
Defendant / Appellant: RICHARD ARMSTRONG, in his official capacity as Director of the Idaho Department of Health and Welfare, LISA HETTINGER, in his official capacity as Medicaid Administrator of the Idaho Department of Health and Welfare and IDAHO DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND WELFARE, a department of the State of Idaho
Case Number: 23-35615
Filed: September 25, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2023 Filing 15 Filed order (Deputy Clerk: MCD): Appellants motion for voluntary dismissal of this appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 10 ]) is granted. This appeal is dismissed. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The motion to dismiss (Docket Entry No. [ # 6 ]) is denied as moot. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. [12819535] (AF) [Entered: 11/03/2023 11:24 AM]
November 1, 2023 Filing 14 Filed (ECF) Appellants Richard Armstrong, Lisa Hettinger and Idaho Department of Health and Welfare reply to response (). Date of service: 11/01/2023. [12818347] [23-35615] (Green, Aaron) [Entered: 11/01/2023 12:57 PM]
October 25, 2023 Filing 13 Filed (ECF) Appellees B. B., T. F., Caleb Hall, A. L., C. L., E. L., C. M., T. M., Breanna Mullic, R. P., N. R., K. S., M. S., Toby Schultz and K. W. response non-opposing motion ([ # 10 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 10 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 10/25/2023. [12815439] [23-35615] (Brown, Daniel) [Entered: 10/25/2023 04:59 PM]
October 24, 2023 Filing 12 Added Attorney Emily Myrei Croston for Appellees K. W., et al., in case 23-35615. [12814584] (HH) [Entered: 10/24/2023 01:31 PM]
October 24, 2023 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Emily Myrei Croston (American Civil Liberties Union of Idaho Foundation P.O. Box 1897 Boise, ID 83701) for Appellees B. B., T. F., Caleb Hall, A. L., C. L., E. L., C. M., T. M., Breanna Mullic, R. P., N. R., K. S., M. S., M. S., Toby Schultz and K. W.. Date of service: 10/24/2023. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12814532] [23-35615] (Croston, Emily) [Entered: 10/24/2023 12:06 PM]
October 16, 2023 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Appellants Richard Armstrong, Idaho Department of Health and Welfare and Lisa Hettinger Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 10/16/2023. [12810394] [23-35615] (Green, Aaron) [Entered: 10/16/2023 03:13 PM]
October 10, 2023 Filing 9 Added Attorneys Daniel L. Brown and Katherine Anne Boy Skipsey for Appellees K. W., et al., in case 23-35615. [12807063] (HH) [Entered: 10/10/2023 10:47 AM]
October 9, 2023 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Katherine Anne Boy Skipsey (Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP/ 30 Rockefeller Plaza, New York, New York 10112) for Appellees B. B., T. F., Caleb Hall, A. L., C. L., E. L., C. M., T. M., Breanna Mullic, R. P., N. R., K. S., M. S., Toby Schultz and K. W.. Date of service: 10/09/2023. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12806660] [23-35615] (Boy Skipsey, Katherine Anne) [Entered: 10/09/2023 02:33 PM]
October 9, 2023 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Daniel Lewis Brown (Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP/ 30 Rockefeller Plaza, New York, New York 10112) for Appellees B. B., T. F., Caleb Hall, A. L., C. L., E. L., C. M., T. M., Breanna Mullic, R. P., N. R., K. S., M. S., Toby Schultz and K. W.. Date of service: 10/09/2023. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12806656] [23-35615] (Brown, Daniel) [Entered: 10/09/2023 02:13 PM]
October 6, 2023 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellees B. B., A. L., T. M., R. P., K. S., M. S., M. S., Toby Schultz and K. W. Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 10/06/2023. [12806373] [23-35615] (Eppink, Richard) [Entered: 10/06/2023 03:09 PM]
October 2, 2023 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/02/2023. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12802962]. [23-35615] (AD) [Entered: 10/02/2023 06:44 PM]
October 2, 2023 Filing 4 Added Attorney Aaron Michael Green for Appellants Richard Armstrong, Lisa Hettinger and Idaho Department of Health and Welfare, in case 23-35615. [12802662] (HH) [Entered: 10/02/2023 03:02 PM]
October 2, 2023 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Aaron Michael Green (Office of the Attorney General, P.O. Box 83720, Boise, ID 83720-0010) for Appellants Richard Armstrong, Lisa Hettinger and Idaho Department of Health and Welfare. Date of service: 10/02/2023. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12802511] [23-35615] (Green, Aaron) [Entered: 10/02/2023 01:42 PM]
October 2, 2023 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Richard Armstrong, Lisa Hettinger and Idaho Department of Health and Welfare Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/02/2023. [12802476] [23-35615] (Wilson, Lincoln) [Entered: 10/02/2023 01:21 PM]
September 25, 2023 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Richard Armstrong, Lisa Hettinger and Idaho Department of Health and Welfare Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/02/2023. Transcript ordered by 10/24/2023. Transcript due 11/22/2023. Appellants Richard Armstrong, Lisa Hettinger and Idaho Department of Health and Welfare opening brief due 01/05/2024. Appellees B. B., T. F., Caleb Hall, A. L., C. L., E. L., C. M., T. M., Breanna Mullic, R. P., N. R., K. S., M. S., Toby Schultz and K. W. answering brief due 02/05/2024. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12798682] (RT) [Entered: 09/25/2023 04:27 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: K. W., et al v. Richard Armstrong, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: K. W., by his next friend D.W.
Represented By: Marty Durand
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Dina Marie Flores-Brewer
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Katherine Anne Boy Skipsey
Represented By: Daniel L. Brown
Represented By: Emily Myrei Croston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: C. M.
Represented By: Marty Durand
Represented By: Dina Marie Flores-Brewer
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Katherine Anne Boy Skipsey
Represented By: Daniel L. Brown
Represented By: Emily Myrei Croston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: C. L.
Represented By: Marty Durand
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Dina Marie Flores-Brewer
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Katherine Anne Boy Skipsey
Represented By: Daniel L. Brown
Represented By: Emily Myrei Croston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: A. L., through her guardian E.B.
Represented By: Marty Durand
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Dina Marie Flores-Brewer
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Katherine Anne Boy Skipsey
Represented By: Daniel L. Brown
Represented By: Emily Myrei Croston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: K. S., through his next friend S.S.
Represented By: Marty Durand
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Dina Marie Flores-Brewer
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Katherine Anne Boy Skipsey
Represented By: Daniel L. Brown
Represented By: Emily Myrei Croston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: M. S., through his guardian V.S.
Represented By: Marty Durand
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Dina Marie Flores-Brewer
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Katherine Anne Boy Skipsey
Represented By: Daniel L. Brown
Represented By: Emily Myrei Croston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: N. R., through her next friend G.R.
Represented By: Marty Durand
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Dina Marie Flores-Brewer
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Katherine Anne Boy Skipsey
Represented By: Daniel L. Brown
Represented By: Emily Myrei Croston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: T. F., through her guardian R.F.
Represented By: Marty Durand
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Dina Marie Flores-Brewer
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Katherine Anne Boy Skipsey
Represented By: Daniel L. Brown
Represented By: Emily Myrei Croston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: T. M., through his guardian T.W.
Represented By: Marty Durand
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Dina Marie Flores-Brewer
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Katherine Anne Boy Skipsey
Represented By: Daniel L. Brown
Represented By: Emily Myrei Croston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: B. B., through his next friend D.B.
Represented By: Marty Durand
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Dina Marie Flores-Brewer
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Katherine Anne Boy Skipsey
Represented By: Daniel L. Brown
Represented By: Emily Myrei Croston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: R. P., through her guardian T.P.
Represented By: Marty Durand
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Dina Marie Flores-Brewer
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Katherine Anne Boy Skipsey
Represented By: Daniel L. Brown
Represented By: Emily Myrei Croston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: M. S., through her guardian D.S.
Represented By: Marty Durand
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Dina Marie Flores-Brewer
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: E. L.
Represented By: Marty Durand
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Dina Marie Flores-Brewer
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Katherine Anne Boy Skipsey
Represented By: Daniel L. Brown
Represented By: Emily Myrei Croston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TOBY SCHULTZ, by and through his legal guardian Jana Schultz on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Marty Durand
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Dina Marie Flores-Brewer
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Katherine Anne Boy Skipsey
Represented By: Daniel L. Brown
Represented By: Emily Myrei Croston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BREANNA MULLIC, by and through her legal guardian Brenda Passmore
Represented By: Marty Durand
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Dina Marie Flores-Brewer
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Katherine Anne Boy Skipsey
Represented By: Daniel L. Brown
Represented By: Emily Myrei Croston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CALEB HALL, by and through his next friend Melanie Hall
Represented By: Marty Durand
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Dina Marie Flores-Brewer
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Katherine Anne Boy Skipsey
Represented By: Daniel L. Brown
Represented By: Emily Myrei Croston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RICHARD ARMSTRONG, in his official capacity as Director of the Idaho Department of Health and Welfare
Represented By: Brian Vernon Church
Represented By: Lincoln Davis Wilson
Represented By: Aaron Michael Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LISA HETTINGER, in his official capacity as Medicaid Administrator of the Idaho Department of Health and Welfare
Represented By: Brian Vernon Church
Represented By: Lincoln Davis Wilson
Represented By: Aaron Michael Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: IDAHO DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND WELFARE, a department of the State of Idaho
Represented By: Brian Vernon Church
Represented By: Lincoln Davis Wilson
Represented By: Aaron Michael Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?