Comcast Corporation v. FCC
Petitioner: Comcast Corporation
Respondent: Federal Communications Commission and United States of America
Intervenor For Petitioner: NBC Universal, National Cable & Telecommunications Association and Qwest Communications International Inc.
Intervenor For Respondent: Consumer Federation of America, Consumers Union, Free Press and Public Knowledge, Open Internet Coalition and Vuze, Inc.
Amicus Curiae For Petitioner: The Progress & Freedom Foundation, James B. Speta, Professor and Glen O. Robinson
Amicus Curiae For Respondent: Barbara van Schewick, Professor, Lawrence Lessig, Jack M. Balkin, Jim Chen and Timothy Wu
Case Number: 08-1291
Filed: September 4, 2008
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 6, 2010 Comcast Corporation v. FCC

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2010 MANDATE ISSUED to FCC [08-1291]
April 6, 2010 Filing 96 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1238303] withholding issuance of the mandate. [08-1291]
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 OPINION filed [1238302] (Pages: 36) for the Court by Judge Tatel [08-1291]
April 6, 2010 Filing 94 PER CURIAM JUDGMENT filed [1238300] that the petition for review is granted and the challenged order is vacated for the reasons in the accompanying opinion . Judge Sentelle, Tatel and Randolph [08-1291]
January 15, 2010 TRANSCRIPT [1225986] of oral argument [08-1291]
January 8, 2010 Filing 92 ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judge Sentelle, Tatel and Randolph [08-1291]
January 5, 2010 Filing 91 NOTICE FILED [1223623] by FCC to withdraw attorney Matthew Bradley Berry who represented FCC in 08-1291 [Service Date: 01/05/2010 ] [08-1291]
December 31, 2009 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Howard J. Symons, on behalf of Intervenors for Petitioner NBC Universal and National Cable & Telecommunications Association. [08-1291]
December 30, 2009 FORM 72 submitted by on behalf of Respondent FCC. Arguing Person Information Updated for: Austin C. Schlick [08-1291]
December 30, 2009 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Marvin Ammori, on behalf of Intervenors for Respondent Free Press and Public Knowledge and Open Internet Coalition. [08-1291]
December 29, 2009 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Helgi C. Walker, on behalf of Petitioner Comcast Corporation. [08-1291]
December 29, 2009 Filing 86 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1222587] allocating oral argument time as follows: Petitioner -- 25 Minutes, Respondent -- 25 Minutes; Each party is at liberty to cede any portion of its time it wishes to intervenor on its behalf; Directing parties to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney - due 01/05/2010. [08-1291]
November 23, 2009 Filing 85 INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1217234] filed by Consumer Federation of America, Consumers Union, Free Press and Public Knowledge, Open Internet Coalition and Vuze, Inc. [Service Date: 11/23/2009 ] Length of Brief: 8743 words. [08-1291]
November 23, 2009 Filing 84 PETITIONER FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1217178] filed by Comcast Corporation [Service Date: 11/23/2009 ] Length of Brief: 6,999 Words. [08-1291]
November 23, 2009 Filing 83 PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1217177] filed by Comcast Corporation [Service Date: 11/23/2009 ] Length of Brief: 13,899 Words. [08-1291]
November 23, 2009 Filing 82 INTERVENOR FOR PETITIONER FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1217125] filed by NBC Universal and National Cable & Telecommunications Association [Service Date: 11/23/2009 ] Length of Brief: 4369. [08-1291]
November 23, 2009 Filing 81 INTERVENOR FOR PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1217121] filed by NBC Universal and National Cable & Telecommunications Association [Service Date: 11/23/2009 ] Length of Brief: 8543. [08-1291]
November 23, 2009 Filing 80 RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1217072] filed by FCC and USA [Service Date: 11/23/2009 ] Length of Brief: 13867 words. [08-1291]
November 23, 2009 Filing 79 AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1217026] filed by Jack M. Balkin, Jim Chen, Mr. Lawrence Lessig, Timothy Wu and Barbara van Schewick [Service Date: 11/23/2009 ] Length of Brief: 6,997 Words. [08-1291]
November 20, 2009 Filing 78 AMICUS FOR PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1216788] filed by Mr. Glen O. Robinson, James B. Speta and The Progress & Freedom Foundation [Service Date: 11/20/2009 ] Length of Brief: 7,000 Words. [08-1291]
November 9, 2009 Filing 77 JOINT APPENDIX [1214819] filed [Volumes:2] [Service Date: 11/09/2009 ] [08-1291]
November 2, 2009 Filing 76 INTERVENOR FOR PETITIONER REPLY BRIEF [1213586] filed by NBC Universal and National Cable & Telecommunications Association [Service Date: 11/02/2009 ] Length of Brief: 4368 words. [08-1291]
October 28, 2009 Filing 75 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1212913] scheduling oral argument before Judges SENTELLE, TATEL, RANDOLPH 01/08/2010 AM [08-1291]
October 26, 2009 Filing 74 PETITIONER REPLY BRIEF [1212692] filed by Comcast Corporation [Service Date: 10/26/2009 ] Length of Brief: 6,999 words. [08-1291]
October 5, 2009 Filing 73 INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1209713] filed by Consumer Federation of America, Consumers Union, Free Press and Public Knowledge, Open Internet Coalition and Vuze, Inc. [Service Date: 10/05/2009 ] Length of Brief: 8743 words. [08-1291]
October 5, 2009 Filing 72 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1209551] filed by Balkin, Chen, Lessig, van Schewick and Wu [Service Date: 10/05/2009 ] Length of Brief: 6,997 words. [08-1291]--[Edited 10/05/2009 by MAL]
September 21, 2009 Filing 71 RESPONDENT BRIEF [1207215] filed by FCC and USA [Service Date: 09/21/2009 ] Length of Brief: 13880 words. [08-1291]
September 16, 2009 Filing 70 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1206524] by Harold Feld and co-counsel Jef Pearlman on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Free Press and Public Knowledge. [08-1291]
August 14, 2009 Filing 69 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1201171] granting motion to add party and to substitute attorney5-2]. Clerk directed to amend docket to reflect substitution of John Blevins, Esq. as counsel for amici and to add Prfessor Jack M. Balkin, Dean Jim Chen and Professor Timothy Wu as amici curiae in 08-1291 [08-1291]
August 13, 2009 Filing 68 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1200901] by and co-counsel Richard Kiser Welch on behalf of Respondent FCC. [08-1291]
August 10, 2009 INTERVENOR FOR PETITIONER BRIEF [1200566] filed by NBC Universal and National Cable & Telecommunications Association [Mail Service Date: 08/10/2009]. Length of Brief: Pages: 38; Word Count: 8,528. [08-1291]
August 10, 2009 Filing 66 AMICUS FOR PETITIONER BRIEF [1200481] filed by Mr. Glen O. Robinson, James B. Speta and The Progress & Freedom Foundation [Service Date: 08/10/2009 ] Length of Brief: 7,000 Words. [08-1291]
August 10, 2009 Filing 65 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1200410] filed by [Service Date: 08/10/2009 ] Length of Brief: Brief Amicus Curiae of Professors J. Speta, G. Robinson and Progress and Freedom Foundation in Support of Petitioner Comcast Corporation. [08-1291]--[Edited 08/10/2009 by MAL]
July 27, 2009 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1198571] by Mr. Elbert Lin for Comcast Corporation. [08-1291]
July 27, 2009 Filing 63 PETITIONER BRIEF [1198204] filed by Comcast Corporation [Service Date: 07/27/2009 ] Length of Brief: 13,895 Words. [08-1291]
July 16, 2009 MOTION filed [1197065] by Mr. Lawrence Lessig and Barbara van Schewick to substitute attorney John Blevins for Marvin Ammori to add additional amici curiae (Response to Motion served by mail due on 07/31/2009) [Service Date: 07/16/2009 by US mail] [08-1291]
July 1, 2009 Filing 61 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1194292] granting motion to participate as amicus curiae [1194172-2] [08-1291]
June 29, 2009 MOTION filed [1194172] by Mr. Glen O. Robinson to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Mail Service Date: 06/25/2009] [08-1291]
June 18, 2009 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1186696] by Mr. Howard Jeffrey Symons for National Cable & Telecommunications Association. [08-1291]
June 18, 2009 NOTICE FILED [1186694] by National Cable & Telecommunications Association to substitute attorney Daniel Leslie Brenner in 08-1291 substituted by Neal Morse Goldberg in 08-1291 [Service Date: 06/18/2009 ] [08-1291]
June 5, 2009 Filing 57 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1184155] considering motion concerning briefing format [1183947-2] and setting briefing format and schedule: brief for petitioner, 14,000 wds, due 7/27/09; joint brief for amici curiae supporting petitioner, 7,000 wds, due 8/10/09; joint brief for intervenors supporting petitioner, 8,750 wds, due 8/10/09; brief for respondents, 14,000 wds, due 9/21/09; joint brief for amici curiae supporting respondents, 7,000 wds, due 10/5/09; joint brief for intervenors supporting respondents, 8,750 wds due 10/5/09; reply brief for petitioner, 7,000 wds, due 10/26/09; joint reply brief for intervenors supporting petitioner, 4,375 wds, due 11/2/09; deferred appendix due 11/9/09; final briefs due 11/23/09. Parties will be informed by separate order of date of oral argument and composition of merits panel. [08-1291]
June 3, 2009 MOTION filed [1183947] by Comcast Corporation concerning briefing format (Titled "Comcast's submission on behalf of all parties and amici concerning proposed briefing format.") [Service Date: 06/03/2009 ] [08-1291]
June 3, 2009 STATEMENT FILED [1183737] by Qwest Communications International Inc. with Disclosure Listing [Service Date: 06/02/2009 ] [08-1291]
April 30, 2009 FIRST CLASS MAIL [1178863] RETURNED marked "Return to Sender, Unable to Forward". Mail had been sent to Atty Kyle Dixon. [08-1291]
April 28, 2009 Filing 53 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1178012] directing parties to file briefing format - Proposed formats due 06/03/2009 [08-1291]
April 1, 2009 Filing 52 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1173606] granting motion to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction [1162756-2] [08-1302, 08-1318, 08-1320 (Consolidation termed 04/01/2009) with 08-1291]; withholding issuance of the mandate. Judge Ginsburg, Rogers and Tatel [08-1302, 08-1318, 08-1320]
March 5, 2009 REPLY FILED [1168695] by Comcast Corporation in 08-1291, 08-1302 to response to motion to dismiss [1166635-2] [Service Date:03/05/2009 US mail] [08-1291, 08-1302, 08-1318, 08-1320]
February 23, 2009 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1166635] by PennPIRG in 08-1302, Consumers Union of United States, Inc. in 08-1318, Vuze, Inc. in 08-1320 to motion to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction,[1162756-2] [Service Date:02/23/2009 US mail] Copies: 5 (Response/Reply); Pages: 11-15; Disclosure Statement: Previously Filed; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing [08-1291, 08-1302, 08-1318, 08-1320]
February 17, 2009 Filing 49 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1165265] granting motion to extend time [1165184-2] in 08-1302,08-1318,08-1320; response to motion to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction [1162756-2] now due on 02/23/2009 in 08-1302,08-1318,08-1320 [08-1302, 08-1291, 08-1318, 08-1320]
February 13, 2009 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1165184] by PennPIRG in 08-1302, Consumers Union of United States, Inc. in 08-1318, Vuze, Inc. in 08-1320 to extend time to file response to 02/23/2009. [Mail Service Date:02/13/2009] [08-1302, 08-1318, 08-1320]
January 30, 2009 MOTION (styled "motion to dismiss petitions for review of PennPirg, Consumers Union and Vuze") filed [1162756] by Comcast Corporation in 08-1291 to dismiss cases 08-1302, 08-1318 and 08-1320 for lack of jurisdiction (Response to Motion served by mail due on 02/17/2009) in 08-1302,08-1318,08-1320 [Service Date:01/30/2009 ] Copies: 5 (Motion/Petition); Pages: 16-20; Disclosure Statement: Previously Filed; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing [08-1291, 08-1302, 08-1318, 08-1320]
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1159646] by PennPIRG in 08-1302, Consumers Union of United States, Inc. in 08-1318, Vuze, Inc. in 08-1320 [Service Date:01/15/2009 ] [08-1302, 08-1318, 08-1320]
January 15, 2009 STATEMENT of Issues FILED [1159645] by PennPIRG in 08-1302, Consumers Union of United States, Inc. in 08-1318, Vuze, Inc. in 08-1320 [Service Date:01/15/2009 ] [08-1302, 08-1318, 08-1320]
January 15, 2009 STATEMENT of intent as to deferring the appendix FILED [1159644] by PennPIRG in 08-1302, Consumers Union of United States, Inc. in 08-1318, Vuze, Inc. in 08-1320 [Service Date:01/15/2009 ] AppxDeferred [08-1302, 08-1318, 08-1320]
January 15, 2009 CERTIFICATE as to Parties, Rulings and Related Cases FILED [1159643] by PennPIRG in 08-1302, Consumers Union of United States, Inc. in 08-1318, Vuze, Inc. in 08-1320 [Service Date:01/15/2009 ] [08-1302, 08-1318, 08-1320]
January 15, 2009 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1159642] by PennPIRG in 08-1302, Consumers Union of United States, Inc. in 08-1318, Vuze, Inc. in 08-1320 [Service Date:01/15/2009 ] [08-1302, 08-1318, 08-1320]
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1159638] by Comcast Corporation [Service Date:01/15/2009 ] [08-1291]
January 15, 2009 STATEMENT FILED [1159635] by Comcast Corporation with Disclosure Listing [Service Date:01/15/2009 ] [08-1291]
January 15, 2009 STATEMENT of Issues FILED [1159631] by Comcast Corporation [Service Date:01/15/2009 ] [08-1291]
January 15, 2009 STATEMENT of intent as to deferring the appendix FILED [1159630] by Comcast Corporation [Service Date:01/15/2009 ] AppxDeferred [08-1291]
January 15, 2009 CERTIFICATE as to Parties, Rulings and Related Cases FILED [1159628] by Comcast Corporation [Service Date:01/15/2009 ] [08-1291]
January 15, 2009 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1159627] by Comcast Corporation [Service Date:01/15/2009 ] [08-1291]
December 16, 2008 Filing 35 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1154462] granting motion for leave to intervene. [1141252-2] [08-1302]
December 16, 2008 Filing 34 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1154457] dismissing as moot motion to extend time in light of initial submissions order filed 12/16/08 in 08-1291 et al. [1142299-2] [08-1291]
December 16, 2008 Filing 33 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1154438] directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 01/15/2009. PETITIONER certificate as to parties, etc. due 01/15/2009. PETITIONER statement of issues due 01/15/2009. PETITIONER underlying decision due 01/15/2009. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 01/15/2009. PETITIONER procedural motions due 01/15/2009. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 01/30/2009; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 01/15/2009. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 01/15/2009. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 01/30/2009 [08-1291, 08-1302, 08-1318, 08-1320]
December 16, 2008 Filing 32 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1154427] consolidating cases 08-1302, 08-1318, 08-1320 (Consolidation started 12/16/2008) with 08-1291 [08-1291, 08-1302, 08-1318, 08-1320]
December 12, 2008 LETTER FILED [1154945] by Comcast Corporation forwarding copies of documents previously submitted to court [Service Date:12/12/2008 ] [08-1291]
November 20, 2008 NOTICE FILED [1150519] filed by NBC Universal advising of their support of petitioner [Service Date:11/20/2008 ] [08-1291]
November 20, 2008 NOTICE FILED [1150431] filed by Qwest Communications International Inc. advising of their support of petitioner , and that Qwest does not plan to join in the intervenors brief. [Service Date:11/19/2008 ] [08-1291]
November 17, 2008 NOTICE FILED [1149699] filed by National Cable & Telecommunications Association advising of their support of petitioner [Service Date:11/17/2008 ] [08-1291]
November 12, 2008 CERTIFIED INDEX TO RECORD [1148617] by FCC [Service Date:10/30/2008 ] [08-1291] (also filed in 08-1302, 08-1318 and 08-1320)
November 5, 2008 Filing 26 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1147803] granting motion for leave to intervene. [1142718-2]; granting motion for leave to intervene. [1142683-2]; granting motion for leave to intervene. [1142386-2]; granting motion for leave to intervene. [1145394-2]; granting motion for leave to intervene. [1142150-2]; granting motion for leave to intervene. [1142140-2]; granting motion for leave to intervene. [1137222-2] [08-1291]
November 3, 2008 NOTICE filed [1147629] by Professor Lawrence Lessig and Professor Barbara van Schewick of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date:11/03/2008 ] [08-1291]
November 3, 2008 STATEMENT FILED [1147627] by The Progress & Freedom Foundation with Disclosure Listing (attached to notice) [Service Date:11/03/2008 ] [08-1291]
November 3, 2008 NOTICE filed [1147626] by James B. Speta and The Progress & Freedom Foundation of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date:11/03/2008 ] [08-1291]
October 6, 2008 STATEMENT FILED [1142720] by Open Internet Coalition with Disclosure Listing (attached to motion to intervene) [Service Date:10/06/2008 ] [08-1291]
October 6, 2008 MOTION filed [1142718] by Open Internet Coalition for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date:10/06/2008 ] [08-1291]
October 6, 2008 STATEMENT FILED [1142684] by NBC Universal with Disclosure Listing [Service Date:10/06/2008 ] [08-1291]
October 6, 2008 MOTION filed [1142683] by NBC Universal for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date:10/06/2008 ] [08-1291]
October 6, 2008 MOTION filed [1142386] by Qwest Communications International Inc. for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date:10/03/2008 ] [08-1291]
October 3, 2008 STATEMENT FILED [1145395] by Free Press and Public Knowledge with Disclosure Listing (attached to motion) [Service Date:10/03/2008 ] [08-1291]
October 3, 2008 MOTION filed [1145394] by Free Press and Public Knowledge for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date:10/03/2008 ] [08-1291]
October 3, 2008 "CONSENT" MOTION filed [1142299] by Comcast Corporation to extend time to file procedural and dispositive deadlines. [Service Date:10/03/2008 ] [08-1291]
October 3, 2008 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1142229] by Mr. Matthew Bradley Berry for FCC, Mr. Daniel McMullen Armstrong for FCC and Mr. Joel Marcus for FCC [08-1291]
October 3, 2008 STATEMENT FILED [1142151] by Consumer Federation of America and Consumers Union with Disclosure Listing (attached to motion) [Service Date:10/03/2008 ] [08-1291]
October 3, 2008 MOTION filed [1142150] by Consumer Federation of America and Consumers Union for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date:10/03/2008 ] [08-1291]
October 3, 2008 STATEMENT FILED [1142142] by Vuze, Inc. with Disclosure Listing (attached to motion to intervene)[Service Date:10/03/2008 ] [08-1291]
October 3, 2008 MOTION filed [1142140] by Vuze, Inc. for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date:10/03/2008 ] [08-1291]
September 18, 2008 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1139381] by Ms. Nancy Caroline Garrison and Ms. Catherine G. O'Sullivan for USA [08-1291]
September 15, 2008 Filing 8 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1138448] directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 10/15/2008. PETITIONER certificate as to parties, etc. due 10/15/2008. PETITIONER statement of issues due 10/15/2008. PETITIONER underlying decision due 10/15/2008. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 10/15/2008. PETITIONER procedural motions due 10/15/2008. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 10/30/2008; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 10/15/2008. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 10/15/2008. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 10/30/2008. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 10/30/2008 [08-1291]
September 9, 2008 NOTICE FILED [1138231] by MDL Panel concerning MultiDistLitigation consolidation order [Service Date:09/08/2008 ] [08-1291]
September 8, 2008 Relief Replaced - NOTICE FILED [1137704] by FCC of MultiCircuit Petitions for Review. [Service Date:09/05/2008 ] [08-1291]--[Edited 09/11/2008 by SMC]
September 5, 2008 STATEMENT FILED [1137224] by National Cable & Telecommunications Association with Disclosure Listing [Service Date:09/05/2008 ] [08-1291]
September 5, 2008 MOTION filed [1137222] by National Cable & Telecommunications Association for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date:09/05/2008 ] [08-1291]
September 4, 2008 STATEMENT FILED [1137206] by Comcast Corporation with Disclosure Listing [Service Date:09/04/2008 ] [08-1291]
September 4, 2008 PETITION FOR REVIEW filed [1137205] by Comcast Corporation of decision of federal agency. Disclosure Statement: Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing [08-1291]
September 4, 2008 PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [08-1291]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Comcast Corporation v. FCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Comcast Corporation
Represented By: James Lund Casserly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Communications Commission
Represented By: Daniel McMullen Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Nancy Caroline Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor for petitioner: NBC Universal
Represented By: Richard Cotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor for petitioner: National Cable & Telecommunications Association
Represented By: Neal Morse Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor for petitioner: Qwest Communications International Inc.
Represented By: Robert B. McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor for respondent: Consumer Federation of America
Represented By: Harold Jay Feld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor for respondent: Consumers Union
Represented By: Harold Jay Feld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor for respondent: Free Press and Public Knowledge
Represented By: Marvin Ammori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor for respondent: Open Internet Coalition
Represented By: Henry Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor for respondent: Vuze, Inc.
Represented By: Harold Jay Feld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae for petitioner: The Progress & Freedom Foundation
Represented By: Kyle David Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae for petitioner: James B. Speta, Professor
Represented By: Kyle David Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae for petitioner: Glen O. Robinson
Represented By: Kyle David Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae for respondent: Barbara van Schewick, Professor
Represented By: John Forbes Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae for respondent: Lawrence Lessig
Represented By: John Forbes Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae for respondent: Jack M. Balkin
Represented By: John Forbes Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae for respondent: Jim Chen
Represented By: John Forbes Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae for respondent: Timothy Wu
Represented By: John Forbes Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?