Verizon v. FCC, et al Featured Case

Petitioner: Verizon
Respondent: Federal Communications Commission and United States of America
Case Number: 11-1356
Filed: September 30, 2011
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2012 55 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1381799] by Earle Duncan Getchell, Jr. and co-counsel Wesley G. Russell, Jr. on behalf of Amicus Curiae for Appellant Commonwealth of Virginia in 11-1355. [11-1355, 11-1356, 11-1403, 11-1404, 11-1411] (Getchell, Earle)
July 2, 2012 54 APPELLANT BRIEF [1381714] filed by MetroPCS 700 MHz, LLC, MetroPCS AWS, LLC, MetroPCS California, LLC, MetroPCS Communications, Inc., MetroPCS Florida, LLC, MetroPCS Georgia, LLC, MetroPCS Massachusetts, LLC, MetroPCS Michigan, Inc., MetroPCS Networks California, LLC, MetroPCS Networks Florida, LLC and MetroPCS Texas, LLC in 11-1403, MetroPCS Communications, Inc. in 11-1404 [Service Date: 07/02/2012 ] Length of Brief: 3975 words. [11-1355, 11-1356, 11-1403, 11-1404, 11-1411] (Kinnaird, Stephen)
July 2, 2012 53 JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1381711] by Commonwealth of Virginia in 11-1355, 11-1356, 11-1403, 11-1404, 11-1411 to establish briefing schedule [Service Date: 07/02/2012 ] Pages: 1-10. [11-1355, 11-1356, 11-1403, 11-1404, 11-1411] (Elwood, John)
July 2, 2012 52 NOTICE filed [1381709] by Cato Institute, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Free State Foundation, TechFreedom to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 07/02/2012 ] [11-1355, 11-1356, 11-1403, 11-1404, 11-1411]--[Edited 07/03/2012 by LMF] (Elwood, John)
July 2, 2012 51 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1381703] by Free Press to dismiss case voluntarily [Service Date: 07/02/2012 ] Pages: 1-10. [11-1411] (Wood, Matthew)
July 2, 2012 50 JOINT APPELLANT BRIEF [1381604] filed by Verizon in 11-1355, 11-1356, MetroPCS 700 MHz, LLC, MetroPCS AWS, LLC, MetroPCS California, LLC, MetroPCS Communications, Inc., MetroPCS Florida, LLC, MetroPCS Georgia, LLC, MetroPCS Massachusetts, LLC, MetroPCS Michigan, Inc., MetroPCS Networks California, LLC, MetroPCS Networks Florida, LLC and MetroPCS Texas, LLC in 11-1403, MetroPCS Communications, Inc. in 11-1404 [Service Date: 07/02/2012 ] Length of Brief: 11,931. [11-1355, 11-1356, 11-1403, 11-1404, 11-1411] (Walker, Helgi)
June 22, 2012 49 NOTICE filed [1380388] by Commonwealth of Virginia of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 06/22/2012 ] [11-1355, 11-1356, 11-1403, 11-1404, 11-1411] (Getchell, Earle)
May 25, 2012 48 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1375672] considering motion concerning briefing format [1370142-2], setting briefing schedule and format: APPELLANTS Briefs due 07/02/2012. INTERVENOR for APPELLANTS Brief due 07/23/2012. APPELLEES Brief due on 09/10/2012. INTERVENORS for APPELLEES Brief due 10/03/2012. APPELLANTS Reply Brief due 10/24/2012. Appendix due 11/07/2012. Final Briefs due 11/21/2012. Before Judges: Rogers, Griffith and Kavanaugh. [11-1355, 11-1356, 11-1403, 11-1404, 11-1411]
April 23, 2012 47 JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1370142] by Verizon, FCC, Independent Telephone & Telecommunications Alliance and CTIA - The Wireless Association, National Association of Regulatory Utility Commissioners, Open Internet Coalition, Public Knowledge and Vonage Holdings Corporation in 11-1355, Verizon and FCC and USA in 11-1356, MetroPCS 700 MHz, LLC, MetroPCS AWS, LLC, MetroPCS California, LLC, MetroPCS Communications, Inc., MetroPCS Florida, LLC, MetroPCS Georgia, LLC, MetroPCS Massachusetts, LLC, MetroPCS Michigan, Inc., MetroPCS Networks California, LLC, MetroPCS Networks Florida, LLC, MetroPCS Texas, LLC and FCC and USA in 11-1403, MetroPCS Communications, Inc. and FCC and USA in 11-1404, Free Press and FCC and USA in 11-1411 concerning briefing format [Service Date: 04/23/2012 ] Pages: 1-10. [11-1355, 11-1356, 11-1403, 11-1404, 11-1411] (Marcus, Joel)
March 23, 2012 46 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1365288] directing party to file briefing format - Proposed formats due 04/23/2012 [11-1355, 11-1356, 11-1403, 11-1404, 11-1411]
March 1, 2012 45 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1361387] referring motions to dismiss case [1333584-2] [1340373-2] to the merits panel to which these cases are assigned. In 11-1355 and 11-1403; denying motion to hold case in abeyance [1344276-2] Before Judges: Henderson, Tatel and Griffith. [11-1355, 11-1356, 11-1403, 11-1404, 11-1411]
February 16, 2012 44 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1358777] by Kurt Rogers and co-counsel Brendan Kasper on behalf of Intervenor for Appellee Vonage Holdings Corporation in 11-1355. [11-1404, 11-1355] (Kasper, Brendan)
December 22, 2011 43 REPLY FILED [1349389] by FCC in 11-1355, 11-1356, 11-1403, 11-1404, 11-1411 to response [1347134-2], [1347120-2] [Service Date: 12/22/2011 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [11-1355, 11-1356, 11-1403, 11-1404, 11-1411] (Marcus, Joel)
December 12, 2011 42 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1347134] by Verizon in 11-1355, 11-1356 to motion to hold case in abeyance [1344276-2] [Service Date: 12/12/2011 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [11-1355, 11-1356] (Walker, Helgi)
December 12, 2011 41 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1347120] by MetroPCS 700 MHz, LLC, MetroPCS AWS, LLC, MetroPCS California, LLC, MetroPCS Communications, Inc., MetroPCS Florida, LLC, MetroPCS Georgia, LLC, MetroPCS Massachusetts, LLC, MetroPCS Michigan, Inc., MetroPCS Networks California, LLC, MetroPCS Networks Florida, LLC and MetroPCS Texas, LLC in 11-1403, MetroPCS Communications, Inc. in 11-1404 to motion to hold case in abeyance [1344276-2] [Service Date: 12/12/2011 by US Mail] Pages: 11-15. [11-1403, 11-1404] (Northrop, Carl)
December 8, 2011 40 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1346516] granting motion for leave to intervene. [1339587-2] in 11-1355, granting motion for leave to intervene. [1338609-2], granting motion for leave to intervene. [1338604-2], granting motion for leave to intervene. [1337934-2], granting motion for leave to intervene. [1336204-2] in 11-1355, granting motion for leave to intervene. [1333448-2] in 11-1355, granting motion for leave to intervene. [1338037-2] in 11-1356, 11-1403, 11-1404, 11-1411, granting motion for leave to intervene. [1342774-2] in 11-1404, granting motion for leave to intervene. [1337837-2] in 11-1411 [11-1355, 11-1356, 11-1403, 11-1404, 11-1411]
December 8, 2011 39 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1346462] vacating Clerk order [1337489-3] in 11-1403, 11-1404. FURTHER ORDERED that case Nos. 11-1356, 11-1403, 11-1404, and 11-1411 be consolided with lead case 11-1355 (Consolidation started 12/08/2011). [11-1355, 11-1356, 11-1403, 11-1404, 11-1411]
December 1, 2011 38 REPLY FILED [1345199] by FCC to response [1343295-2] [Service Date: 12/01/2011 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [11-1403] (Marcus, Joel)
November 29, 2011 37 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL LODGED [1344581] by MetroPCS 700 MHz, LLC, MetroPCS AWS, LLC, MetroPCS California, LLC, MetroPCS Communications, Inc., MetroPCS Florida, LLC, MetroPCS Georgia, LLC, MetroPCS Massachusetts, LLC, MetroPCS Michigan, Inc., MetroPCS Networks California, LLC, MetroPCS Networks Florida, LLC and MetroPCS Texas, LLC [Service Date: 11/29/2011 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [11-1403] (Northrop, Carl)
November 29, 2011 36 Featured Case UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1344580] by MetroPCS 700 MHz, LLC, MetroPCS AWS, LLC, MetroPCS California, LLC, MetroPCS Communications, Inc., MetroPCS Florida, LLC, MetroPCS Georgia, LLC, MetroPCS Massachusetts, LLC, MetroPCS Michigan, Inc., MetroPCS Networks California, LLC, MetroPCS Networks Florida, LLC and MetroPCS Texas, LLC [Service Date: 11/29/2011 ] [11-1403] (Northrop, Carl)
November 29, 2011 35 STATEMENT OF ISSUES LODGED [1344578] by MetroPCS 700 MHz, LLC, MetroPCS AWS, LLC, MetroPCS California, LLC, MetroPCS Communications, Inc., MetroPCS Florida, LLC, MetroPCS Georgia, LLC, MetroPCS Massachusetts, LLC, MetroPCS Michigan, Inc., MetroPCS Networks California, LLC, MetroPCS Networks Florida, LLC and MetroPCS Texas, LLC [Service Date: 11/29/2011 ] [11-1403] (Northrop, Carl)
November 29, 2011 34 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES LODGED [1344577] by MetroPCS 700 MHz, LLC, MetroPCS AWS, LLC, MetroPCS California, LLC, MetroPCS Communications, Inc., MetroPCS Florida, LLC, MetroPCS Georgia, LLC, MetroPCS Massachusetts, LLC, MetroPCS Michigan, Inc., MetroPCS Networks California, LLC, MetroPCS Networks Florida, LLC and MetroPCS Texas, LLC [Service Date: 11/29/2011 ] [11-1403] (Northrop, Carl)
November 29, 2011 33 DOCKETING STATEMENT LODGED [1344575] by MetroPCS 700 MHz, LLC, MetroPCS AWS, LLC, MetroPCS California, LLC, MetroPCS Communications, Inc., MetroPCS Florida, LLC, MetroPCS Georgia, LLC, MetroPCS Massachusetts, LLC, MetroPCS Michigan, Inc., MetroPCS Networks California, LLC, MetroPCS Networks Florida, LLC and MetroPCS Texas, LLC [Service Date: 11/29/2011 ] [11-1403] (Northrop, Carl)
November 29, 2011 32 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1344574] by MetroPCS 700 MHz, LLC, MetroPCS AWS, LLC, MetroPCS California, LLC, MetroPCS Communications, Inc., MetroPCS Florida, LLC, MetroPCS Georgia, LLC, MetroPCS Massachusetts, LLC, MetroPCS Michigan, Inc., MetroPCS Networks California, LLC, MetroPCS Networks Florida, LLC and MetroPCS Texas, LLC for leave to file initial submissions [Service Date: 11/29/2011 ] Pages: 1-10. [11-1403] (Northrop, Carl)
November 28, 2011 31 MOTION filed [1344276] by FCC in 11-1404, 11-1356, 11-1355, 11-1403, 11-1411 to hold case in abeyance (Response to Motion served by mail due on 12/12/2011) [Service Date: 11/28/2011 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [11-1404, 11-1355, 11-1356, 11-1403, 11-1411] (Marcus, Joel)
November 21, 2011 30 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1343321] by Joel Marcus and co-counsel Peter Karanjia on behalf of Respondent FCC in 11-1404. [11-1404, 11-1403] (Karanjia, Peter)
November 21, 2011 29 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1343295] by MetroPCS 700 MHz, LLC, MetroPCS AWS, LLC, MetroPCS California, LLC, MetroPCS Communications, Inc., MetroPCS Florida, LLC, MetroPCS Georgia, LLC, MetroPCS Massachusetts, LLC, MetroPCS Michigan, Inc., MetroPCS Networks California, LLC, MetroPCS Networks Florida, LLC and MetroPCS Texas, LLC to motion to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction [1340373-2] [Service Date: 11/21/2011 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 16-20. [11-1403] (Northrop, Carl)
November 21, 2011 28 CERTIFIED INDEX TO RECORD [1343134] by FCC [Service Date: 11/21/2011 ] [11-1356] (Marcus, Joel)
November 18, 2011 27 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION filed [1342774] by Vonage Holdings Corp. for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 11/18/2011] [11-1404]--[Edited 11/23/2011 by KRM] (Binder, Jeffrey)
November 9, 2011 26 CORRECTED CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1340742] by Verizon [Service Date: 11/09/2011 ] [11-1356] (Walker, Helgi)
November 9, 2011 25 CORRECTED DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1340741] by Verizon [Service Date: 11/09/2011 ] [11-1356] (Walker, Helgi)
November 7, 2011 24 MOTION filed [1340373] by FCC to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/21/2011) [Service Date: 11/07/2011 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [11-1403] (Marcus, Joel)
November 7, 2011 23 Featured Case UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1340352] by Verizon [Service Date: 11/07/2011 ] [11-1356] (Walker, Helgi)
November 7, 2011 22 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1340350] by Verizon [Service Date: 11/07/2011 ] [11-1356] (Walker, Helgi)
November 7, 2011 21 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1340349] by Verizon [Service Date: 11/07/2011 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [11-1356] (Walker, Helgi)
November 7, 2011 20 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1340348] by Verizon [Service Date: 11/07/2011 ] [11-1356] (Walker, Helgi)
November 7, 2011 19 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1340347] by Verizon [Service Date: 11/07/2011 ] [11-1356] (Walker, Helgi)
November 7, 2011 18 LETTER FILED [1340345] by Verizon regarding case status [Service Date: 11/07/2011 ] [11-1356] (Walker, Helgi)
November 2, 2011 17 MOTION filed [1339587] by Open Internet Coalition for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 10/31/2011 ] [11-1355] (Goldberg, Henry)
November 2, 2011 16 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1339558] by Nancy C. Garrison and co-counsel Catherine G. O'Sullivan Robert J. Wiggers on behalf of Respondent USA in 11-1356. [11-1356, 11-1404, 11-1408, 11-1409, 11-1410, 11-1411] (Garrison, Nancy)
October 31, 2011 15 REPLY FILED [1338812] by FCC to response [1336847-2] [Service Date: 10/31/2011 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [11-1355] (Marcus, Joel)
October 28, 2011 14 MOTION filed [1338744] by Mountain Area Information Network to dismiss case Pages: 1-10. [11-1410] (Schwartzman, Andrew)
October 28, 2011 13 MOTION filed [1338741] by Media Mobilizing Project to dismiss case Pages: 1-10. [11-1409] (Schwartzman, Andrew)
October 28, 2011 12 MOTION filed [1338740] by People's Production House to dismiss case Pages: 1-10. [11-1408] (Schwartzman, Andrew)
October 28, 2011 11 PUBLIC (REDACTED) MOTION filed [1338609] by ITTA - Independent Telephone & Telecommunications Alliance for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 10/28/2011 ] [11-1356, 11-1355, 11-1403, 11-1404, 11-1408, 11-1409, 11-1410, 11-1411] (Morelli, Genevieve)
October 28, 2011 10 MOTION filed [1338604] by ITTA - The Independent Telephone & Telecommunications Alliance for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 10/28/2011 ] [11-1355, 11-1356, 11-1403, 11-1404, 11-1408, 11-1409, 11-1410, 11-1411]--[Edited 10/31/2011 by LMF] (Morelli, Genevieve)
October 26, 2011 9 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION filed [1338037] by National Association of Regulatory Utility Commissioners in 11-1408 for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 10/26/2011 ] [11-1356, 11-1403, 11-1404, 11-1408, 11-1409, 11-1410, 11-1411]--[Edited 11/04/2011 by LMC] (Ramsay, James)
October 26, 2011 8 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION filed [1337934] by National Association of State Utility Consumer Advocates in 11-1408 for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 10/26/2011 ] [11-1356, 11-1355, 11-1403, 11-1404, 11-1408, 11-1409, 11-1410, 11-1411]--[Edited 11/04/2011 by LMC] (Bergmann, David)
October 26, 2011 7 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION filed [1337837] by CTIA - The Wireless Association in 11-1408 for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 10/26/2011 ] [11-1408, 11-1409, 11-1410, 11-1411]--[Edited 10/26/2011 by LMC] (Nuechterlein, Jonathan)
October 6, 2011 6 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1333898] directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 11/07/2011. PETITIONER certificate as to parties, etc. due 11/07/2011. PETITIONER statement of issues due 11/07/2011. PETITIONER underlying decision due 11/07/2011. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 11/07/2011. PETITIONER procedural motions due 11/07/2011. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 11/21/2011; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 11/07/2011. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 11/07/2011. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 11/21/2011. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 11/21/2011 [11-1356]
October 5, 2011 5 NOTICE FILED [1333667] by FCC concerning Multidistrict Litigation [Service Date: 10/05/2011 ] [11-1356] (Welch, Richard)
October 4, 2011 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1333202] by Joel Marcus and co-counsel Jacob M. Lewis and Richard K. Welch on behalf of Respondent FCC. [11-1356] (Marcus, Joel)
October 3, 2011 3 CERTIFIED COPY [1332906] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [1332904-2] [11-1356]
October 3, 2011 2 PETITION FOR REVIEW filed [1332904] by Verizon of a decision by federal agency [Service Date: 09/30/2011 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing [11-1356]
September 30, 2011 PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [11-1356]

Search for this case: Verizon v. FCC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Verizon
Represented By: Helgi C. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Communications Commission
Represented By: Jacob M. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?