White Stallion Energy Center v. EPA
Petitioner: White Stallion Energy Center, LLC
Respondent: Environmental Protection Agency
Intervenor: Chase Power Development, LLC, American Public Health Association, State of North Carolina, City of Baltimore, State of California, Environmental Defense Fund, Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition, State of Massachusetts, Exelon Corporation, Institute for Liberty, State of New Mexico, State of Illinois, Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, Peabody Energy Corporation, American Academy of Pediatrics, National Mining Association, Eco Power Solutions (USA) Corporation, City of Chicago, Waterkeeper Alliance, National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, State of Iowa, Calpine Corporation, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Utility Air Regulatory Group, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Clean Air Council, American Nurses Association, Public Service Enterprise Group, Inc., State of Oregon, Lignite Energy Council, Environment America, Ohio Environmental Council, National Black Chamber of Commerce, State of New Hampshire, State of Delaware, Natural Resources Defense Council, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of New York, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., District of Columbia, Izaak Walton League of America, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC, Conservation Law Foundation, County of Erie, New York, American Lung Association, State of Connecticut, State of Vermont, State of Minnesota, Sierra Club, State of Rhode Island, National Grid Generation, LLC and City of New York
Amicus Curiae: American College of Chest Physicians, Richard J. Lazarus, Oliver A. Houck, Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law, Jody Freeman, William W. Buzbee, American College of Preventive Medicine, National Association for the Medical Direction of Respiratory Care, Zygmunt J.B. Plater, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Robert V. Percival, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine and American Thoracic Society
Case Number: 12-1100
Filed: February 16, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2016 NOTICE [1648796] filed to substitute attorney Tannis Fox substituted by William Grantham filed by State of New Mexico [Service Date: 12/01/2016 ] [12-1100] (Grantham, William) [Entered: 12/01/2016 01:28 PM]
December 1, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1648795] filed by William Grantham on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent State of New Mexico. [12-1100] (Grantham, William) [Entered: 12/01/2016 01:22 PM]
June 13, 2016 LETTER [1619021] received from the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court of the following activity in case No. 15-1152: The petition for writ of certiorari was denied on 06/13/2016. [12-1100, 12-1186, 12-1190, 12-1196] [Entered: 06/13/2016 03:07 PM]
April 18, 2016 NOTICE [1609303] filed by State of California in 12-1100 to substitute attorney Raissa S. Lerner substituted by David A. Zonana [Service Date: 04/18/2016 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Zonana, David) [Entered: 04/18/2016 06:18 PM]
March 16, 2016 LETTER [1604538] received from the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court of the following activity in the case before it: A petition for writ of certiorari was filed and placed on the docket on 03/16/2016 as No. 15-1152. [12-1100, 12-1186, 12-1190, 12-1196] [Entered: 03/17/2016 03:58 PM]
March 2, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1601902] filed by John Suttles and co-counsel Myra Blake on behalf of Intervenors for Respondent American Academy of Pediatrics, American Lung Association, American Nurses Association, American Public Health Association and Physicians for Social Responsibility in 12-1100. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Blake, Myra) [Entered: 03/02/2016 01:33 PM]
February 10, 2016 MANDATE ISSUED to Environmental Protection Agency [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 02/10/2016 10:34 AM]
December 30, 2015 FIRST CLASS MAIL RETURNED [1597721] marked "return to sender - not deliverable as addressed - unable to forward". Mail had been sent to Attorney Mr. Drew J. Fossum for Petitioner Tenaska Trailblazer Partners, LLC in 12-1180. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 02/08/2016 12:14 PM]
December 17, 2015 TRANSCRIPT [1589215] of oral argument [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 12/17/2015 03:02 PM]
December 15, 2015 PER CURIAM ORDER [1588459] filed [SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS] considering motions to govern future proceedings [ # 1574838-2 ], [ # 1574825-2 ], [ # 1574820-2 ], [ # 1574817-2 ], [ # 1574809-2 ], ORDERED that the proceeding be remanded to EPA without vacatur of the Mercury and Air Toxics Standards final rule. Pursuant to D.C. Cir. Rule 36, this disposition will not be published. The Clerk is directed to withhold the issuance of the mandate herein until seven days after resolution of any timely petition for rehearing or petition for rehearing en banc. See Fed. R. App. P. 41(b); D.C. Cir. Rule 41. Before Judges: Garland, Rogers and Kavanaugh. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 12/15/2015 08:00 AM]
December 9, 2015 NOTICE [1587569] filed by State of Wyoming in 12-1196 to change party information [Service Date: 12/09/2015 ] [12-1100, 12-1196] (McGrady, Michael) [Entered: 12/09/2015 10:21 AM]
December 4, 2015 ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Garland, Rogers and Kavanaugh. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Accursio, John) [Entered: 01/13/2016 11:39 AM]
December 2, 2015 AMENDED motion to govern future proceedings, response , reply [1586473] filed by Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178 [Service Date: 12/02/2015 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Holmstead, Jeffrey) [Entered: 12/02/2015 11:24 PM]
December 2, 2015 RESPONSE [1586437] filed by Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1147 to letter Rule 28j authorities [ # 1584773-2 ], letter [ # 1584773-3 ] [Service Date: 12/02/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Nickel, Henry) [Entered: 12/02/2015 04:52 PM]
December 2, 2015 LETTER [1586231] filed by Calpine Corporation, Exelon Corporation, National Grid Generation, LLC and Public Service Enterprise Group, Inc. in 12-1100 concerning oral argument format [Service Date: 12/02/2015 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Collins, Brendan) [Entered: 12/02/2015 08:55 AM]
November 25, 2015 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Sean H. Donahue, on behalf of Intervenors for Respondent American Academy of Pediatrics, American Lung Association, American Nurses Association, American Public Health Association, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, Clean Air Council, Conservation Law Foundation, Environment America, Environmental Defense Fund, NAACP, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Sierra Club and Waterkeeper Alliance in 12-1100 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 11/25/2015 04:55 PM]
November 25, 2015 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Aaron D. Lindstrom, on behalf of Petitioner White Stallion Energy Center, LLC in 12-1100, Petitioner National Mining Association in 12-1101, Petitioner State of Arkansas in 12-1190, Petitioners Railroad Commission of Texas, State of Texas, Texas Commission on Environmental Quality and Texas Public Utility Commission in 12-1185, Petitioner Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 12-1187, Petitioner Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition in 12-1188, Petitioners Terry E. Branstad, John William Conway, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Michigan, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Utah, State of West Virginia and State of Wyoming in 12-1196 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Lindstrom, Aaron) [Entered: 11/25/2015 12:14 PM]
November 25, 2015 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Stephanie J. Talbert, on behalf of Respondent EPA in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, Respondents EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, Appellee EPA in 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1182, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1186, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1192, 12-1195, 12-1196 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 11/25/2015 12:10 PM]
November 24, 2015 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Brendan K. Collins, on behalf of Intervenors for Respondent Calpine Corporation, Exelon Corporation, National Grid Generation, LLC and Public Service Enterprise Group, Inc. (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [12-1100] (Collins, Brendan) [Entered: 11/24/2015 04:26 PM]
November 24, 2015 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Melissa Hoffer, on behalf of Intervenors for Respondent City of Baltimore, City of Chicago, City of New York, County of Erie, New York, DC, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island and State of Vermont in 12-1100 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Triplett, Tracy) [Entered: 11/24/2015 04:13 PM]
November 20, 2015 LETTER [1584773] filed by EPA in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1182, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1186, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1192, 12-1195, 12-1196 pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 11/20/2015 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 11/20/2015 07:45 PM]
November 20, 2015 PER CURIAM ORDER [1584764] filed scheduling oral argument on Friday, 12/04/2015 at 11:00 a.m., allocating oral argument time as follows: Petitioners - 20 Minutes (to be divided as they see fit), Respondent/Respondent-Intevenors - 20 Minutes (to be divided as they see fit); directing party to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney by 11/25/2015 [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 11/20/2015 05:03 PM]
November 10, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1582880] filed by Lee Rudofsky and co-counsel Jamie L. Ewing on behalf of Petitioner State of Arkansas in 12-1190. [12-1190, 12-1100] (Ewing, Jamie) [Entered: 11/10/2015 11:39 AM]
November 4, 2015 REPLY [1582027] filed by Calpine Corporation, Exelon Corporation, National Grid Generation, LLC and Public Service Enterprise Group, Inc. in 12-1100 to response [ # 1579258-2 ], [ # 1579227-2 ], [ # 1579194-2 ] [Service Date: 11/04/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Boudreau, Lorene) [Entered: 11/04/2015 06:17 PM]
November 4, 2015 REPLY [1581996] filed by EPA in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1182, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1186, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1192, 12-1195, 12-1196 to response [ # 1579258-2 ], [ # 1579227-2 ], [ # 1579194-2 ] [Service Date: 11/04/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 11/04/2015 04:13 PM]
November 4, 2015 REPLY [1581995] filed by Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178 to response [ # 1579252-2 ], [ # 1579245-2 ], [ # 1579186-2 ] [Service Date: 11/04/2015 by Clerk, US Mail, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Holmstead, Jeffrey) [Entered: 11/04/2015 04:12 PM]
November 4, 2015 REPLY [1581957] filed by White Stallion Energy Center, LLC in 12-1100, National Mining Association in 12-1101, State of Arkansas in 12-1190, Railroad Commission of Texas, State of Texas, Texas Commission on Environmental Quality and Texas Public Utility Commission in 12-1185, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 12-1187, Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition in 12-1188, Terry E. Branstad, John William Conway, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Michigan, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Utah, State of West Virginia and State of Wyoming in 12-1196 to response [ # 1579186-2 ], [ # 1579252-2 ], [ # 1579245-2 ] [Service Date: 11/04/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Gordon, Neil) [Entered: 11/04/2015 02:35 PM]
November 4, 2015 JOINT REPLY [1581955] filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Lung Association, American Nurses Association, American Public Health Association, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, City of Baltimore, City of Chicago, City of New York, Clean Air Council, Conservation Law Foundation, County of Erie, New York, DC, Environment America, Environmental Defense Fund, Izaak Walton League of America, NAACP, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Sierra Club, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and Waterkeeper Alliance in 12-1100 to response [ # 1579258-2 ], [ # 1579227-2 ], [ # 1579194-2 ] [Service Date: 11/04/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Triplett, Tracy) [Entered: 11/04/2015 02:32 PM]
November 3, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1581737] filed by Justin D. Lavene on behalf of Petitioner State of Nebraska in 12-1196. [12-1100, 12-1196] (Lavene, Justin) [Entered: 11/03/2015 02:30 PM]
October 26, 2015 NOTICE [1580022] filed by State of Indiana to substitute attorney Valerie Tachtiris substituted by Timothy J. Junk [Service Date: 10/26/2015 ] [12-1196] (Junk, Timothy) [Entered: 10/26/2015 03:18 PM]
October 21, 2015 RESPONSE [1579258] filed by Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1147 to motion to govern future proceedings [ # 1574825-2 ] [Service Date: 10/21/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Brownell, F.) [Entered: 10/21/2015 09:05 PM]
October 21, 2015 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1579252] filed by Calpine Corporation, Exelon Corporation, National Grid Generation, LLC and Public Service Enterprise Group, Inc. in 12-1100 to motion to govern future proceedings [ # 1574817-2 ], motion to govern future proceedings [ # 1574809-2 ] [Service Date: 10/21/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Collins, Brendan) [Entered: 10/21/2015 06:18 PM]
October 21, 2015 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1579245] filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Lung Association, American Nurses Association, American Public Health Association, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, City of Baltimore, City of Chicago, City of New York, Clean Air Council, Conservation Law Foundation, County of Erie, New York, DC, Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Sierra Club, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and Waterkeeper Alliance in 12-1100 to motion to govern future proceedings [ # 1574817-2 ], motion to govern future proceedings [ # 1574809-2 ] [Service Date: 10/21/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 21-30. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 10/21/2015 05:25 PM]
October 21, 2015 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1579227] filed by Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178 to motion to govern future proceedings [ # 1574838-2 ], motion to govern future proceedings [ # 1574825-2 ], motion to govern future proceedings [ # 1574820-2 ] [Service Date: 10/21/2015 by Clerk, CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 11-15. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Holmstead, Jeffrey) [Entered: 10/21/2015 04:27 PM]
October 21, 2015 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1579194] filed by White Stallion Energy Center, LLC in 12-1100, National Mining Association in 12-1101, State of Arkansas in 12-1190, Railroad Commission of Texas, State of Texas, Texas Commission on Environmental Quality and Texas Public Utility Commission in 12-1185, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 12-1187, Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition in 12-1188, Terry E. Branstad, John William Conway, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Michigan, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Utah, State of West Virginia and State of Wyoming in 12-1196 to motion to govern future proceedings [ # 1574825-2 ], motion to govern future proceedings [ # 1574838-2 ], motion to govern future proceedings [ # 1574820-2 ] [Service Date: 10/21/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Gordon, Neil) [Entered: 10/21/2015 03:00 PM]
October 21, 2015 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1579186] filed by EPA in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1182, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1186, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1192, 12-1195, 12-1196 to motion to govern future proceedings [ # 1574817-2 ], motion to govern future proceedings [ # 1574809-2 ] [Service Date: 10/21/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 21-30. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 10/21/2015 02:33 PM]
October 2, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1576381] filed by Michael McGrady on behalf of Petitioner State of Wyoming in 12-1196. [12-1100, 12-1196] (McGrady, Michael) [Entered: 10/02/2015 04:17 PM]
September 24, 2015 MOTION [1574838] filed by Calpine Corporation, Exelon Corporation, National Grid Generation, LLC and Public Service Enterprise Group, Inc. in 12-1100 to govern future proceedings. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/08/2015) [Service Date: 09/24/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 21-30. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Collins, Brendan) [Entered: 09/24/2015 06:30 PM]
September 24, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1574837] filed by Sean H. Donahue and co-counsel Graham G. McCahan on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Environmental Defense Fund in 12-1100. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (McCahan, Graham) [Entered: 09/24/2015 06:18 PM]
September 24, 2015 MOTION [1574825] filed by EPA in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1182, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1186, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1192, 12-1195, 12-1196 to govern future proceedings. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/09/2014) [Service Date: 09/24/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 21-30. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196]--[Edited 10/01/2015 by JJA] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 09/24/2015 05:31 PM]
September 24, 2015 JOINT MOTION [1574820] filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Lung Association, American Nurses Association, American Public Health Association, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, City of Baltimore, City of Chicago, City of New York, Clean Air Council, Conservation Law Foundation, County of Erie, New York, DC, Environment America, Environmental Defense Fund, Izaak Walton League of America, NAACP, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Sierra Club, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and Waterkeeper Alliance in 12-1100 to govern future proceedings. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/08/2015) [Service Date: 09/24/2015 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: Exceeds Limits. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Triplett, Tracy) [Entered: 09/24/2015 05:13 PM]
September 24, 2015 MOTION [1574817] filed by Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178 to govern future proceedings. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/08/2015) [Service Date: 09/24/2015 by Clerk, CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 16-20. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Holmstead, Jeffrey) [Entered: 09/24/2015 05:03 PM]
September 24, 2015 JOINT MOTION [1574809] filed by White Stallion Energy Center, LLC in 12-1100, National Mining Association in 12-1101, State of Arkansas in 12-1190, Railroad Commission of Texas, State of Texas, Texas Commission on Environmental Quality and Texas Public Utility Commission in 12-1185, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 12-1187, Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition in 12-1188, Terry E. Branstad, John William Conway, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Michigan, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Utah, State of West Virginia and State of Wyoming in 12-1196 to govern future proceedings. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/08/2015) [Service Date: 09/23/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 21-30. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Gordon, Neil) [Entered: 09/24/2015 04:15 PM]
September 22, 2015 NOTICE [1574376] filed by Railroad Commission of Texas, State of Texas, Texas Commission on Environmental Quality and Texas Public Utility Commission in 12-1185 to withdraw attorney Jonathan Karl Niermann who represented Texas Public Utility Commission, Texas Commission on Environmental Quality, State of Texas and Railroad Commission of Texas in 12-1185 [Service Date: 09/22/2015 ] [12-1100, 12-1185] (Niermann, Jonathan) [Entered: 09/22/2015 03:30 PM]
September 8, 2015 PER CURIAM ORDER [1571820] filed granting the joint motion to extend the deadline for motions to govern and for a briefing schedule for responses and replies. Motions to govern future proceedings are now due September 24, 2015. Any responses are due October 21, 2015, and any replies are due November 4, 2015. To the extent possible, the parties are strongly encouraged to file jointly. The parties are reminded that the Court looks with disfavor upon duplicative submissions. Before Judges: Garland, Rogers and Kavanaugh. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 09/08/2015 12:45 PM]
September 3, 2015 JOINT MOTION [1571339] filed by EPA in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1173, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1182, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1186, 12-1189, 12-1192, 12-1195, 12-1196 to extend time to file motion to 09/24/2015. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 09/17/2015) [Service Date: 09/03/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 09/03/2015 12:58 PM]
September 1, 2015 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged response [ # 1570391-2 ], response [ # 1570376-2 ] are filed [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 09/01/2015 09:33 AM]
September 1, 2015 PER CURIAM ORDER [1570784] that the motions for leave to file be granted. The Clerk is directed to file the lodged documents. It is FURTHER ORDERED that in light of EPAs representation that it has extended Tri-States impending deadlines, and because Tri-State may now seek administrative relief during this interim period, the motion be denied. This denial is without prejudice to Tri-State filing a motion should administrative relief be denied. Before Judges: Garland, Rogers and Kavanaugh. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 09/01/2015 09:32 AM]
August 31, 2015 REPLY [1570496] filed by Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178 to response [ # 1570353-2 ] [Service Date: 08/31/2015 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail, Clerk] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Holmstead, Jeffrey) [Entered: 08/31/2015 10:30 AM]
August 28, 2015 MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION LODGED [1570391] by Calpine Corporation, Exelon Corporation, National Grid Generation, LLC and Public Service Enterprise Group, Inc. in 12-1100 to motion for other relief [ # 1569466-2 ] [Service Date: 08/28/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196]--[Edited 08/31/2015 by JJA] (Collins, Brendan) [Entered: 08/28/2015 03:50 PM]
August 28, 2015 MOTION filed [1570388] by Calpine Corporation, Exelon Corporation, National Grid Generation, LLC and Public Service Enterprise Group, Inc. in 12-1100 for leave to file response (Response to Motion served by mail due on 09/11/2015) [Service Date: 08/28/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Collins, Brendan) [Entered: 08/28/2015 03:48 PM]
August 28, 2015 MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION LODGED [1570376] by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Lung Association, American Nurses Association, American Public Health Association, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Clean Air Council, Conservation Law Foundation, Environment America, Environmental Defense Fund, Izaak Walton League of America, NAACP, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Sierra Club and Waterkeeper Alliance in 12-1100 to motion for other relief [ # 1569466-2 ] [Service Date: 08/28/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196]--[Edited 08/31/2015 by JJA] (Narayan, Sanjay) [Entered: 08/28/2015 03:33 PM]
August 28, 2015 MOTION filed [1570368] by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Lung Association, American Nurses Association, American Public Health Association, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Clean Air Council, Conservation Law Foundation, Environment America, Environmental Defense Fund, Izaak Walton League of America, NAACP, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Sierra Club and Waterkeeper Alliance in 12-1100 for leave to file response (Response to Motion served by mail due on 09/11/2015) [Service Date: 08/28/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Narayan, Sanjay) [Entered: 08/28/2015 03:21 PM]
August 28, 2015 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1570353] by EPA in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1182, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1186, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1192, 12-1195, 12-1196 to motion for other relief [ # 1569466-2 ] [Service Date: 08/28/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 21-30. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 08/28/2015 02:51 PM]
August 25, 2015 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1569676] that respondent EPA file a response to the emergency motion for suspension by 4:00 p.m., Friday, August 28, 2015. Any reply is due by 12:00 noon on Monday, August 31, 2015. In addition to electronic filing, the parties are directed to deliver paper copies of their submissions to the court by the time and date due. Before Judges: Garland, Rogers and Kavanaugh. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 08/25/2015 03:27 PM]
August 24, 2015 CORRECTED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1569477] filed by James C. McKay, Jr. and co-counsel Todd S. Kim Loren L. Alikhan on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent DC. [12-1100] (McKay, James) [Entered: 08/24/2015 04:53 PM]
August 24, 2015 EMERGENCY MOTION filed [1569466] by Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178 Suspension of one compliance obligation for one power plant pending a decision on remand, and emergency motion to expedite briefing. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 09/08/2015) [Service Date: 08/24/2015 by Clerk, US Mail, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Holmstead, Jeffrey) [Entered: 08/24/2015 04:19 PM]
August 24, 2015 NOTICE FILED [1569419] by DC to withdraw attorney Amy E McDonnell who represented DC in 12-1100, Irvin B. Nathan who represented DC in 12-1100 [Service Date: 08/24/2015 ] [12-1100] (McKay, James) [Entered: 08/24/2015 02:56 PM]
August 24, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1569418] filed by James C. McKay, Jr. and co-counsel Todd S. Kim Loren L. Alikhan on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent DC. [12-1100] (McKay, James) [Entered: 08/24/2015 02:54 PM]
August 19, 2015 NOTICE FILED [1568639] by Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition in 12-1100, 12-1188 to substitute attorney Bill Cobb substituted by Mark L. Walters [Service Date: 08/19/2015 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Walters, Mark) [Entered: 08/19/2015 11:34 AM]
August 17, 2015 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1568181] that the motions for leave to file be granted. The Clerk is directed to file the lodged documents. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the emergency motion be denied without prejudice to refiling if Tri-State cannot obtain timely administrative relief. Before Judges: Garland, Rogers and Kavanaugh. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196]--[Edited 08/18/2015 by MCM--INCORRECT PDF WAS ATTACHED] [Entered: 08/17/2015 12:34 PM]
August 13, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1567711] filed by Aaron D. Lindstrom on behalf of Petitioner State of Michigan in 12-1196. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Lindstrom, Aaron) [Entered: 08/13/2015 02:32 PM]
August 11, 2015 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1567220] ORDERED, on the courts own motion, that the parties file motions to govern future proceedings on or before September 10, 2015. To the extent possible, the parties are strongly encouraged to file jointly. The parties are reminded that the Court looks with disfavor upon duplicative submissions. Before Judges: Garland, Rogers and Kavanaugh. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 08/11/2015 12:35 PM]
August 10, 2015 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1567035] by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Lung Association, American Nurses Association, American Public Health Association, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, Clean Air Council, Conservation Law Foundation, Environment America, Environmental Defense Fund, Izaak Walton League of America, NAACP, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Sierra Club and Waterkeeper Alliance in 12-1100 to motion for other relief [ # 1565685-2 ] [Service Date: 08/10/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Gormley, Neil) [Entered: 08/10/2015 03:09 PM]
August 10, 2015 MOTION filed [1567034] by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Lung Association, American Nurses Association, American Public Health Association, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Clean Air Council, Conservation Law Foundation, Environment America, Environmental Defense Fund, Izaak Walton League of America, NAACP, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Sierra Club and Waterkeeper Alliance in 12-1100 for leave to file response (Response to Motion served by mail due on 08/24/2015) [Service Date: 08/10/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Gormley, Neil) [Entered: 08/10/2015 03:06 PM]
August 10, 2015 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1567031] by EPA in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1181, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1182, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1186, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1192, 12-1195, 12-1196 to motion for other relief [ # 1565685-2 ] [Service Date: 08/10/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 08/10/2015 03:03 PM]
August 10, 2015 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1567025] by Calpine Corporation, Exelon Corporation, National Grid Generation, LLC and Public Service Enterprise Group, Inc. in 12-1100 to motion for other relief [ # 1565685-2 ] [Service Date: 08/10/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 21-30. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Collins, Brendan) [Entered: 08/10/2015 02:53 PM]
August 10, 2015 MOTION filed [1567023] by Calpine Corporation, Exelon Corporation, National Grid Generation, LLC and Public Service Enterprise Group, Inc. in 12-1100 for leave to file response (Response to Motion served by mail due on 08/24/2015) [Service Date: 08/10/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Collins, Brendan) [Entered: 08/10/2015 02:49 PM]
August 6, 2015 NOTICE FILED [1566527] by Railroad Commission of Texas, State of Texas, Texas Commission on Environmental Quality and Texas Public Utility Commission in 12-1185 to substitute attorney Mark L. Walters substituted by Mary E. Smith [Service Date: 08/06/2015 ] [12-1185, 12-1100] (Smith, Mary) [Entered: 08/06/2015 11:51 AM]
August 3, 2015 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1565853] ORDERED, on the courts own motion, that respondent EPA file a response to the emergency motion for suspension of one compliance obligation for one power plant pending a decision on remand by 4:00 p.m. on August 10, 2015. In addition to electronic filing, EPA is directed to hand-deliver paper copies of its submission to the court by the time and date due. Before Judges: Garland, Rogers and Kavanaugh. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 08/03/2015 02:08 PM]
July 31, 2015 EMERGENCY MOTION filed [1565685] by Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178 Tri-State respectfully requests that this Court take action before September 1, 2015 to suspend the HCl compliance obligation for Nucla Station until EPA makes a new appropriate and necessary finding in light of the Supreme Court's decision in Michigan. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 08/13/2015) [Service Date: 07/31/2015 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA, Clerk] Pages: 16-20. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Holmstead, Jeffrey) [Entered: 07/31/2015 04:57 PM]
July 31, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1565675] filed by Eric G. Hostetler and co-counsel Stephanie J. Talbert on behalf of Respondent EPA in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, Respondents EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, Appellee EPA in 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1182, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1186, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1192, 12-1195, 12-1196. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 07/31/2015 04:06 PM]
July 31, 2015 MANDATE RETURNED [1565659]. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 07/31/2015 03:29 PM]
July 31, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1565657] recalling mandate from EPA [1496780-2] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 07/31/2015 03:28 PM]
July 31, 2015 JUDGMENT RECEIVED [1565648] from the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court of the formal disposition of case No. 14-46, 14-47, and 14-49. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 07/31/2015 03:03 PM]
June 29, 2015 OPINION RECEIVED [1560195] from the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court of the following disposition of case Nos. 14-46, 14-47, and 14-49 argued on 03/25/2015: the lower court decision was reversed and the case remanded on 06/29/2015. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 06/30/2015 01:55 PM]
February 10, 2015 LETTER SENT [1536832] to USSC. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Accursio, John) [Entered: 02/10/2015 01:36 PM]
November 25, 2014 LETTER filed [1525144] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court of the following activity in case No. 14-49: The petition for writ of certiorari was granted on 11/25/2014. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 12/02/2014 08:27 PM]
November 25, 2014 LETTER filed [1525143] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court of the following activity in case No. 14-47: The petition for writ of certiorari was granted on 11/25/2014. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 12/02/2014 08:26 PM]
November 25, 2014 LETTER filed [1525142] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court of the following activity in case No. 14-46: The petition for writ of certiorari was granted on 11/25/2014. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 12/02/2014 08:25 PM]
August 27, 2014 NOTICE FILED [1509564] by State of California to substitute attorney Janill L. Richards substituted by Raissa S. Lerner [Service Date: 08/27/2014 ] [12-1100] (Lerner, Raissa) [Entered: 08/27/2014 01:27 PM]
July 16, 2014 LETTER filed [1503811] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court of the following activity in the case before it: A petition for writ of certiorari was filed and placed on the docket on 07/16/2014 as No. 14-49. [12-1101, 12-1100, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 07/21/2014 06:10 PM]
July 16, 2014 LETTER filed [1503810] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court of the following activity in the case before it: A petition for writ of certiorari was filed and placed on the docket on 07/16/2014 as No. 14-47. [12-1147, 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 07/21/2014 06:07 PM]
July 16, 2014 LETTER filed [1503809] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court of the following activity in the case before it: A petition for writ of certiorari was filed and placed on the docket on 07/16/2014 as No. 14-46. [12-1196, 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195] [Entered: 07/21/2014 06:05 PM]
June 10, 2014 MANDATE ISSUED to Environmental Protection Agency [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 06/10/2014 09:20 AM]
June 3, 2014 FIRST CLASS MAIL RETURNED [1496206] marked "RTS ". Mail had been sent to Attorney Mr. David Finley Crabtree for Petitioner Deseret Power Electric Cooperative. [12-1176] [Entered: 06/05/2014 11:31 AM]
April 15, 2014 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1488347] withholding issuance of the mandate. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 04/15/2014 10:05 AM]
April 15, 2014 OPINION filed [1488346] PER CURIAM OPINION (Pages: 61), CONCURRING/DISSENTING OPINION (Pages: 29) by Judge Kavanaugh [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 04/15/2014 10:03 AM]
April 15, 2014 PER CURIAM JUDGMENT filed [1488343] that the petitions for review be denied except that the petition for review in No. 12-1174, Julander Energy Co. v. EPA, be dismissed for lack of standing for the reasons in the accompanying opinion . Before Judges: Garland, Rogers and Kavanaugh. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 04/15/2014 09:59 AM]
March 11, 2014 RESPONSE FILED [1483300] by EPA to letter Rule 28j authorities [ # 1481306-2 ], letter [ # 1481306-3 ] [Service Date: 03/11/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100] (Berman, Amanda) [Entered: 03/11/2014 11:50 AM]
March 4, 2014 RESPONSE FILED [1482295] by EPA to letter for other relief [ # 1480139-2 ], letter [ # 1480139-3 ] [Service Date: 03/04/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100] (Berman, Amanda) [Entered: 03/04/2014 05:01 PM]
February 27, 2014 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged letter Rule 28j authorities [ # 1481306-2 ] is filed [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 02/27/2014 12:00 PM]
February 27, 2014 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1481809] granting the motion of petitioners' Chesapeake Climate Action Netork and Environmental Integrity Project for leave to submit Rule 28(j) letter of supplemental authorities [ # 1481170-2 ] in 12-1100, 12-1194; The Clerk is directed to file the lodged letter Rule 28j authorities [ # 1481306-2 ]. Before Judges: Garland, Rogers and Kavanaugh. [12-1100, 12t-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 02/27/2014 11:47 AM]
February 26, 2014 LETTER FILED [1481590] by Chesapeake Climate Action Network and Environmental Integrity Project in 12-1194 pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 02/26/2014 ] [12-1100, 12-1194] (Ferrell, Whitney) [Entered: 02/26/2014 11:16 AM]
February 24, 2014 MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED-- CORRECTED LETTER LODGED [1481306] by Chesapeake Climate Action Network and Environmental Integrity Project in 12-1194 pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 02/24/2014 ] [12-1100, 12-1194]--[Edited 02/25/2014 by AY] (Ferrell, Whitney) [Entered: 02/24/2014 05:41 PM]
February 24, 2014 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--LETTER FILED [1481289] by Chesapeake Climate Action Network and Environmental Integrity Project in 12-1194 pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 02/24/2014 ] [12-1100, 12-1194]--[Edited 02/25/2014 by AY] (Ferrell, Whitney) [Entered: 02/24/2014 04:49 PM]
February 24, 2014 MOTION filed [1481170] by Chesapeake Climate Action Network and Environmental Integrity Project in 12-1194 for leave to file letter (Response to Motion served by mail due on 03/10/2014) [Service Date: 02/24/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1194] (Ferrell, Whitney) [Entered: 02/24/2014 12:23 PM]
February 14, 2014 LETTER FILED [1480139] by Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Integrity Project and Sierra Club in 12-1194 pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities. [Service Date: 02/14/2014 ] [12-1100, 12-1194] (Ferrell, Whitney) [Entered: 02/14/2014 05:51 PM]
February 6, 2014 NOTICE FILED [1478684] by Chesapeake Climate Action Network and Environmental Integrity Project in 12-1194 of attorney address change. [Service Date: 02/06/2014 ] [12-1100, 12-1194]--[Edited 02/07/2014 by AY] (Ferrell, Whitney) [Entered: 02/06/2014 02:40 PM]
January 6, 2014 TRANSCRIPT [1473710] of oral argument [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 01/06/2014 03:52 PM]
December 30, 2013 NOTICE FILED [1472991] by Georgia Association of Manufacturers, Inc., Indiana Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Indiana Coal Council, Inc., Kentucky Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Kentucky Coal Association, Inc., North Carolina Chamber, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Pennsylvania Coal Association, South Carolina Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Coal Association, Incorporated, West Virginia Chamber of Commerce, West Virginia Coal Association, Inc. and Wisconsin Industrial Energy Group, Inc. in 12-1182 to withdraw attorney Gale Lea Rubrecht who represented Wisconsin Industrial Energy Group, Inc., West Virginia Coal Association, Inc., West Virginia Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Coal Association, Incorporated, The Virginia Chamber of Commerce, South Carolina Chamber of Commerce, Pennsylvania Coal Association, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, North Carolina Chamber, Kentucky Coal Association, Inc., Kentucky Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Indiana Coal Council, Inc., Indiana Chamber of Commerce, Inc. and Georgia Association of Manufacturers, Inc. in 12-1182 [Service Date: 12/30/2013 ] [12-1100, 12-1182] (Rubrecht, Gale Lea) [Entered: 12/30/2013 04:14 PM]
December 30, 2013 NOTICE FILED [1472988] by Midwest Ozone Group in 12-1172 to withdraw attorney Gale Lea Rubrecht who represented Midwest Ozone Group in 12-1172 [Service Date: 12/30/2013 ] [12-1100, 12-1172] (Rubrecht, Gale Lea) [Entered: 12/30/2013 04:09 PM]
December 19, 2013 NOTICE FILED [1471492] by State of Michigan to terminate attorney [Service Date: 12/19/2013 ] [12-1196] (Bursch, John) [Entered: 12/19/2013 03:19 PM]
December 10, 2013 ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Garland, Rogers and Kavanaugh. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 12/10/2013 09:58 AM]
December 5, 2013 LETTER FILED [1469245] by EPA in 12-1100, 12-1194 Response to 28(j) Letter filed by Environmental Petitioners. [Service Date: 12/05/2013 ] [12-1100, 12-1194] (Berman, Amanda) [Entered: 12/05/2013 06:05 PM]
December 3, 2013 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Eric Schaeffer, on behalf of Petitioners Chesapeake Climate Action Network and Environmental Integrity Project in 12-1194. [12-1194, 12-1100] (Schaeffer, Eric) [Entered: 12/03/2013 02:41 PM]
December 2, 2013 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, David Bookbinder, on behalf of Petitioner Julander Energy Company in 12-1174. [12-1100, 12-1174] (Bookbinder, David) [Entered: 12/02/2013 06:29 PM]
December 2, 2013 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Eric G. Hostetler, Matthew R. Oakes and Amanda Shafer Berman, on behalf of Respondent EPA in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, Appellee EPA in 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1182, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1186, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1192, 12-1195, 12-1196. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 12/02/2013 04:44 PM]
December 2, 2013 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Bill Cobb, on behalf of Individual Issue Industry Petitioners and, on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition. [12-1100] (Cobb, William) [Entered: 12/02/2013 12:53 PM]
November 27, 2013 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Sean H. Donahue, on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Environmental Defense Fund in 12-1100. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 11/27/2013 04:49 PM]
November 27, 2013 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Sanjay Narayan, on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Sierra Club in 12-1100. [12-1100, 12-1194] (Narayan, Sanjay) [Entered: 11/27/2013 04:15 PM]
November 27, 2013 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1468297] by Tracy Triplett and co-counsel Melissa Hoffer on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent State of Massachusetts in 12-1100. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Hoffer, Melissa) [Entered: 11/27/2013 03:43 PM]
November 27, 2013 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Melissa Hoffer, on behalf of Intervenors for Respondent City of Baltimore, City of Chicago, City of New York, County of Erie, New York, DC, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island and State of Vermont in 12-1100. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Hoffer, Melissa) [Entered: 11/27/2013 03:22 PM]
November 26, 2013 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Lee B. Zeugin, on behalf of Petitioner Utility Air Regulatory Group. [12-1147] (Zeugin, Lee) [Entered: 11/26/2013 05:48 PM]
November 26, 2013 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Neil D. Gordon, on behalf of Petitioner State of Michigan in 12-1196. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Gordon, Neil) [Entered: 11/26/2013 10:49 AM]
November 25, 2013 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Brendan K. Collins, on behalf of Intervenors for Respondent Calpine Corporation, Exelon Corporation, National Grid Generation, LLC and Public Service Enterprise Group, Inc. in 12-1100. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Collins, Brendan) [Entered: 11/25/2013 04:31 PM]
November 22, 2013 LETTER FILED [1467614] by Sierra Club in 12-1194 pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 11/22/2013 ] [12-1100, 12-1194] (Narayan, Sanjay) [Entered: 11/22/2013 05:32 PM]
November 22, 2013 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1467592] that in consideration of the joint proposal concerning format for oral argument, that the following format apply in these two sets of consolidated case, which are set for oral argument at 9:30 am on Tuesday, December 10, 2013. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS); directing party to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney - due 12/03/2013 [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1366, 12-1420, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 11/22/2013 03:38 PM]
November 12, 2013 JOINT RESPONSE FILED [1465840] by EPA in 12-1100 to letter oral argument format [ # 1463558-2 ] [Service Date: 11/12/2013 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 11/12/2013 06:35 PM]
October 29, 2013 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1463584] by Whitney Ferrell on behalf of Petitioners Chesapeake Climate Action Network and Environmental Integrity Project in 12-1194. [12-1100, 12-1194] (Ferrell, Whitney) [Entered: 10/29/2013 11:19 AM]
October 29, 2013 LETTER SENT [1463558] concerning oral argument format - Proposed formats due 11/12/2013 . Clerk order [ # 1463177-3 ] [12-1101, 12-1100, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 10/29/2013 09:58 AM]
October 25, 2013 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1463177] scheduling oral argument before Judges GARLAND, ROGERS, KAVANAUGH Tuesday, 12/10/2013 AM [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 10/25/2013 01:57 PM]
September 18, 2013 LETTER FILED [1457237] by EPA in 12-1100 regarding oral argument matter [Request that oral argument not be scheduled for period between 12/30/13 and 1/10/14] [Service Date: 09/18/2013 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 09/18/2013 04:07 PM]
September 4, 2013 MODIFIED DOCKET TEXT--NOTICE FILED [1454818] by Commonwealth of Pennsylvania in 12-1196 to substitute attorney Robert Mayer Wolff in 12-1196 substituted by Robert A. Reiley in 12-1196 [Service Date: 09/04/2013 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196]--[Edited 09/05/2013 by AY] (Reiley, Robert) [Entered: 09/04/2013 03:47 PM]
July 1, 2013 MODIFIED EVENT--NOTICE FILED [1444495] by State of California in 12-1100 to substitute attorney Susan Lea Durbin in 12-1100 substituted by Janill Loreen Richards in 12-1100 [Service Date: 07/01/2013 ] [12-1100, 12-1147]--[Edited 07/02/2013 by AY] (Richards, Janill) [Entered: 07/01/2013 03:13 PM]
June 18, 2013 RESPONSE FILED [1441860] by Julander Energy Company in 12-1174 to letter Rule 28j authorities [ # 1441133-2 ], letter [ # 1441133-3 ] [Service Date: 06/18/2013 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1174] (Bookbinder, David) [Entered: 06/18/2013 03:09 PM]
June 13, 2013 LETTER FILED [1441133] by EPA in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1181, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1182, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1186, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1192, 12-1195, 12-1196 pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 06/13/2013 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Oakes, Matthew) [Entered: 06/13/2013 03:49 PM]
May 29, 2013 NOTICE FILED [1438378] by State of Minnesota to substitute attorney Beverly M. Conerton substituted by Max H. Kieley [Service Date: 05/29/2013 ] [12-1100] (Kieley, Max) [Entered: 05/29/2013 04:10 PM]
May 29, 2013 NOTICE FILED [1438357] by State of West Virginia in 12-1196 to substitute attorney Silas B. Taylor substituted by Elbert Lin [Service Date: 05/29/2013 ] [12-1196, 12-1100] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 05/29/2013 03:24 PM]
May 16, 2013 RESPONSE FILED [1436521] by EPA in 12-1100, 12-1194 [Service Date: 05/16/2013 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1194] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 05/16/2013 04:59 PM]
May 13, 2013 LETTER FILED [1435957] by Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Integrity Project and Sierra Club in 12-1194 pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 05/13/2013 ] [12-1100, 12-1194] (Pew, James) [Entered: 05/13/2013 07:56 PM]
May 3, 2013 NOTICE FILED [1434328] filed by State of Alaska advising of their support of petitioner [Service Date: 05/03/2013 ] [12-1196] (Mulder, Steven) [Entered: 05/03/2013 11:14 PM]
May 3, 2013 MODIFIED EVENT--NOTICE FILED [1434314] filed by Railroad Commission of Texas, State of Texas, Texas Commission on Environmental Quality and Texas Public Utility Commission in 12-1185 to participate. [Service Date: 05/03/2013 ] [12-1185, 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196]--[Edited 05/07/2013 by LMF] (Walters, Mark) [Entered: 05/03/2013 05:51 PM]
May 3, 2013 MODIFIED EVENT--NOTICE filed [1434205] of intention to paricipate as a party to appeal by Dale T. Vitale and co-counsel Gregg H. Bachmann Cameron F. Simmons Aaron S. Farmer on behalf of Petitioner State of Ohio in 12-1196. [12-1196, 12-1100]--[Edited 05/03/2013 by LMF] (Farmer, Aaron) [Entered: 05/03/2013 10:58 AM]
April 30, 2013 NOTICE FILED [1433370] filed by Edgecombe Genco, LLC and Spruance Genco, LLC in 12-1193 . [Service Date: 04/30/2013 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Jaeger, Lisa) [Entered: 04/30/2013 12:14 PM]
April 17, 2013 CORRECTED PETITIONER BRIEF [1431365] filed by Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Integrity Project and Sierra Club in 12-1194 [Service Date: 04/17/2013 ] [12-1194, 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Narayan, Sanjay) [Entered: 04/17/2013 07:10 PM]
April 15, 2013 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged appendix [ # 1429356-2 ] is filed [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 04/15/2013 05:15 PM]
April 15, 2013 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1430853] granting motion for leave to file [ # 1429297-2 ]; the Clerk is directed to file supplemental appendix [ # 1429356-2 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 04/15/2013 05:08 PM]
April 8, 2013 JOINT PETITIONER FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1429638] filed by White Stallion Energy Center, LLC in 12-1100, National Mining Association in 12-1101, Institute for Liberty and National Black Chamber of Commerce in 12-1102, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1147, Midwest Ozone Group in 12-1172, American Public Power Association in 12-1173, Peabody Energy Corporation in 12-1175, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178, ARIPPA in 12-1181, United Mine Workers of America in 12-1183, Georgia Association of Manufacturers, Inc., Indiana Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Indiana Coal Council, Inc., Kentucky Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Kentucky Coal Association, Inc., North Carolina Chamber, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Pennsylvania Coal Association, South Carolina Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Coal Association, Incorporated, West Virginia Chamber of Commerce, West Virginia Coal Association, Inc. and Wisconsin Industrial Energy Group, Inc. in 12-1182, State of Arkansas in 12-1190, Chase Power Development, LLC in 12-1191, Railroad Commission of Texas, State of Texas, Texas Commission on Environmental Quality and Texas Public Utility Commission in 12-1185, Edgecombe Genco, LLC and Spruance Genco, LLC in 12-1193, Kansas City Board of Public Utilities in 12-1186, FirstEnergy Generation Corp. in 12-1192, Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 12-1195, Terry E. Branstad, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, John William Conway, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Michigan, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Utah, State of West Virginia and State of Wyoming in 12-1196 [Service Date: 04/08/2013 ] Length of Brief: 7,224 words. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Brownell, F.) [Entered: 04/08/2013 11:04 PM]
April 8, 2013 ERRATA FILED [1429637] by White Stallion Energy Center, LLC in 12-1100, National Mining Association in 12-1101, Institute for Liberty and National Black Chamber of Commerce in 12-1102, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1147, Midwest Ozone Group in 12-1172, American Public Power Association in 12-1173, Peabody Energy Corporation in 12-1175, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178, ARIPPA in 12-1181, United Mine Workers of America in 12-1183, Georgia Association of Manufacturers, Inc., Indiana Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Indiana Coal Council, Inc., Kentucky Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Kentucky Coal Association, Inc., North Carolina Chamber, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Pennsylvania Coal Association, South Carolina Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Coal Association, Incorporated, West Virginia Chamber of Commerce, West Virginia Coal Association, Inc. and Wisconsin Industrial Energy Group, Inc. in 12-1182, State of Arkansas in 12-1190, Chase Power Development, LLC in 12-1191, Railroad Commission of Texas, State of Texas, Texas Commission on Environmental Quality and Texas Public Utility Commission in 12-1185, Edgecombe Genco, LLC and Spruance Genco, LLC in 12-1193, Kansas City Board of Public Utilities in 12-1186, FirstEnergy Generation Corp. in 12-1192, Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 12-1195, Terry E. Branstad, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, John William Conway, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Michigan, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Utah, State of West Virginia and State of Wyoming in 12-1196 to Appellant/Petitioner reply brief [ # 1427262-2 ] . Reason for errata: To correct citations and wording. [Service Date: 04/08/2013 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Brownell, F.) [Entered: 04/08/2013 10:58 PM]
April 8, 2013 LETTER FILED [1429636] by Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1147 Notice of Amended Final Form Joint Brief of State, Industry & Labor Petitioners in light of Court Order. [Service Date: 04/08/2013 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Brownell, F.) [Entered: 04/08/2013 10:44 PM]
April 8, 2013 JOINT PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1429635] filed by White Stallion Energy Center, LLC in 12-1100, National Mining Association in 12-1101, Institute for Liberty and National Black Chamber of Commerce in 12-1102, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1147, Midwest Ozone Group in 12-1172, American Public Power Association in 12-1173, Peabody Energy Corporation in 12-1175, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178, ARIPPA in 12-1181, United Mine Workers of America in 12-1183, Georgia Association of Manufacturers, Inc., Indiana Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Indiana Coal Council, Inc., Kentucky Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Kentucky Coal Association, Inc., North Carolina Chamber, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Pennsylvania Coal Association, South Carolina Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Coal Association, Incorporated, West Virginia Chamber of Commerce, West Virginia Coal Association, Inc. and Wisconsin Industrial Energy Group, Inc. in 12-1182, State of Arkansas in 12-1190, Chase Power Development, LLC in 12-1191, Railroad Commission of Texas, State of Texas, Texas Commission on Environmental Quality and Texas Public Utility Commission in 12-1185, Edgecombe Genco, LLC and Spruance Genco, LLC in 12-1193, Kansas City Board of Public Utilities in 12-1186, FirstEnergy Generation Corp. in 12-1192, Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 12-1195, Terry E. Branstad, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, John William Conway, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Michigan, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Utah, State of West Virginia and State of Wyoming in 12-1196 [Service Date: 04/08/2013 ] Length of Brief: 14,331 words. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Brownell, F.) [Entered: 04/08/2013 10:37 PM]
April 8, 2013 INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1429622] filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Lung Association, American Nurses Association, American Public Health Association, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, Clean Air Council, Conservation Law Foundation, Environment America, Environmental Defense Fund, Izaak Walton League of America, NAACP, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Sierra Club and Waterkeeper Alliance in 12-1100 [Service Date: 04/08/2013 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Narayan, Sanjay) [Entered: 04/08/2013 07:37 PM]
April 8, 2013 ERRATA FILED [1429616] by Sierra Club in 12-1100 to Appellant/Petitioner brief [ # 1401254-2 ], Appellant/Petitioner reply brief [ # 1427247-2 ] . Reason for errata: [Service Date: 04/08/2013 ] [12-1194, 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Narayan, Sanjay) [Entered: 04/08/2013 05:54 PM]
April 8, 2013 PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1429613] filed by Sierra Club in 12-1194 [Service Date: 04/08/2013 ] [12-1194, 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Narayan, Sanjay) [Entered: 04/08/2013 05:46 PM]
April 8, 2013 SUPPLEMENT [1429612] to appendix [ # 1428379-2 ] filed by Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1100 [Service Date: 04/08/2013 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Freeman, Lauren) [Entered: 04/08/2013 05:36 PM]
April 8, 2013 JOINT INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1429603] filed by Institute for Liberty, National Black Chamber of Commerce, National Mining Association, Peabody Energy Corporation, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1100, White Stallion Energy Center, LLC in 12-1194 [Service Date: 04/08/2013 ] Length of Brief: 3745. [12-1100, 12-1194] (Freeman, Lauren) [Entered: 04/08/2013 05:17 PM]
April 8, 2013 PETITIONER FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1429602] filed by Sierra Club in 12-1194 [Service Date: 04/08/2013 ] [12-1194, 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Narayan, Sanjay) [Entered: 04/08/2013 05:13 PM]
April 8, 2013 PETITIONER FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1429599] filed by Julander Energy Company in 12-1174 [Service Date: 04/08/2013 ] Length of Brief: 750 words. [12-1100, 12-1174] (Bookbinder, David) [Entered: 04/08/2013 05:04 PM]
April 8, 2013 PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1429596] filed by Julander Energy Company in 12-1174 [Service Date: 04/08/2013 ] Length of Brief: 1496 words. [12-1100, 12-1174] (Bookbinder, David) [Entered: 04/08/2013 05:02 PM]
April 8, 2013 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1429594] filed by Sierra Club [Service Date: 04/08/2013 ] [12-1100]--[Edited 04/09/2013 by AY] (Narayan, Sanjay) [Entered: 04/08/2013 04:58 PM]
April 8, 2013 JOINT PETITIONER FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1429575] filed by American Public Power Association in 12-1173, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178, ARIPPA in 12-1181, Chase Power Development, LLC in 12-1191, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 12-1187, Kansas City Board of Public Utilities in 12-1186, Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition in 12-1188, Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority in 12-1189, FirstEnergy Generation Corp. in 12-1192, Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 12-1195 [Service Date: 04/08/2013 ] Length of Brief: 2,000 Words. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Holmstead, Jeffrey) [Entered: 04/08/2013 04:32 PM]
April 8, 2013 JOINT PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1429574] filed by American Public Power Association in 12-1173, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178, ARIPPA in 12-1181, Chase Power Development, LLC in 12-1191, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 12-1187, Kansas City Board of Public Utilities in 12-1186, Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition in 12-1188, Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority in 12-1189, FirstEnergy Generation Corp. in 12-1192, Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 12-1195 [Service Date: 04/08/2013 ] Length of Brief: 3,991 words. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Holmstead, Jeffrey) [Entered: 04/08/2013 04:28 PM]
April 8, 2013 MODIFIED EVENT--INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1429570] filed by Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition, Institute for Liberty, Lignite Energy Council, National Black Chamber of Commerce and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1100, National Mining Association, Peabody Energy Corporation and Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1174, White Stallion Energy Center, LLC in 12-1194 [Service Date: 04/08/2013 ] Length of Brief: 937 Words. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196]--[Edited 04/11/2013 by AY] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 04/08/2013 04:22 PM]
April 8, 2013 RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1429467] filed by EPA in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1182, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1186, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1192, 12-1195, 12-1196 [Service Date: 04/08/2013 ] Length of Brief: 25,956 Words. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 04/08/2013 01:29 PM]
April 8, 2013 MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT APPENDIX [1429356] LODGED [Volumes: 1] [Service Date:04/08/2013 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196]--[Edited 04/08/2013 by AY] (Oakes, Matthew) [Entered: 04/08/2013 09:54 AM]
April 8, 2013 INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1429332] filed by Calpine Corporation, Exelon Corporation, National Grid Generation, LLC and Public Service Enterprise Group, Inc. in 12-1100 [Service Date: 04/08/2013 ] Length of Brief: 3,118 Words. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Collins, Brendan) [Entered: 04/08/2013 09:01 AM]
April 5, 2013 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1429297] by EPA in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1182, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1186, 12-1188, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 12-1189, 12-1192, 12-1195, 12-1196 for leave to file appendix [Service Date: 04/04/2013 ] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Oakes, Matthew) [Entered: 04/05/2013 04:53 PM]
April 5, 2013 INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1429198] filed by City of Baltimore, City of Chicago, City of New York, County of Erie, New York, DC, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island and State of Vermont in 12-1100 [Service Date: 04/05/2013 ] Length of Brief: 3065 words. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Triplett, Tracy) [Entered: 04/05/2013 11:24 AM]
April 5, 2013 ERRATA FILED [1429177] by City of Baltimore, City of Chicago, City of New York, County of Erie, New York, DC, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island and State of Vermont in 12-1100 to Intervenor brief [ # 1421767-2 ] . Reason for errata: joint appendix citation error, table of authorities error. [Service Date: 04/05/2013 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Triplett, Tracy) [Entered: 04/05/2013 10:41 AM]
April 5, 2013 NOTICE FILED [1429141] by State of Massachusetts in 12-1100 to substitute attorney William Lyon Pardee substituted by Tracy L. Triplett [Service Date: 04/05/2013 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Triplett, Tracy) [Entered: 04/05/2013 09:44 AM]
April 3, 2013 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1428725] ORDERED that the motion to sever and hold in abeyance be granted. Any petitioner or intervenor in Nos. 12-1100, et al., who wishes to participate in No. 13-1106 is directed to notify the court in writing within 30 days of the date of this order, and to indicate which party it supports. Respondent is directed to file status reports in No. 13-1106 at 90-day intervals. The parties are directed to file motions to govern further proceedings in No. 13-1106 within 60 days of the conclusion of administrative proceedings on reconsideration of the startup/shutdown issues. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196, 13-1106] [Entered: 04/03/2013 11:13 AM]
April 2, 2013 ERRATA FILED [1428408] by American Public Power Association in 12-1173, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178, ARIPPA in 12-1181, Chase Power Development, LLC in 12-1191, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 12-1187, Kansas City Board of Public Utilities in 12-1186, Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition in 12-1188, Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority in 12-1189, FirstEnergy Generation Corp. in 12-1192, Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 12-1195 to Appellant/Petitioner reply brief [ # 1427259-2 ] . Reason for errata: To correct inadvertant omission of asterisk on Table of Authorities. [Service Date: 04/02/2013 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Holmstead, Jeffrey) [Entered: 04/02/2013 09:37 AM]
April 1, 2013 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1428380] to appendix [ # 1428379-2 ] filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, American College of Preventive Medicine, American Thoracic Society, William W. Buzbee, Jody Freeman, Mr. Oliver A. Houck, Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law, Richard J. Lazarus, National Association for the Medical Direction of Respiratory Care, Mr. Robert V. Percival, Zygmunt J.B. Plater, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Lung Association, American Nurses Association, American Public Health Association, Calpine Corporation, Chase Power Development, LLC, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, City of Baltimore, City of Chicago, City of New York, Clean Air Council, Conservation Law Foundation, County of Erie, New York, DC, Eco Power Solutions (USA) Corporation, Environment America, Environmental Defense Fund, Exelon Corporation, Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition, Institute for Liberty, Izaak Walton League of America, Lignite Energy Council, NAACP, National Black Chamber of Commerce, National Grid Generation, LLC, National Mining Association, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC, Ohio Environmental Council, Peabody Energy Corporation, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Public Service Enterprise Group, Inc., Sierra Club, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Utility Air Regulatory Group, Waterkeeper Alliance, White Stallion Energy Center, LLC and EPA in 12-1100, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, American College of Preventive Medicine, American Thoracic Society, William W. Buzbee, Jody Freeman, Mr. Oliver A. Houck, Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law, Richard J. Lazarus, National Association for the Medical Direction of Respiratory Care, Mr. Robert V. Percival, Zygmunt J.B. Plater, National Mining Association and EPA in 12-1101, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, American College of Preventive Medicine, American Thoracic Society, William W. Buzbee, Jody Freeman, Mr. Oliver A. Houck, Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law, Richard J. Lazarus, National Association for the Medical Direction of Respiratory Care, Mr. Robert V. Percival, Zygmunt J.B. Plater, Institute for Liberty, National Black Chamber of Commerce and EPA in 12-1102, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, American College of Preventive Medicine, American Thoracic Society, William W. Buzbee, Jody Freeman, Mr. Oliver A. Houck, Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law, Richard J. Lazarus, National Association for the Medical Direction of Respiratory Care, Mr. Robert V. Percival, Zygmunt J.B. Plater, Utility Air Regulatory Group and EPA in 12-1147, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, American College of Preventive Medicine, American Thoracic Society, William W. Buzbee, Jody Freeman, Mr. Oliver A. Houck, Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law, Richard J. Lazarus, National Association for the Medical Direction of Respiratory Care, Mr. Robert V. Percival, Zygmunt J.B. Plater, Midwest Ozone Group and EPA in 12-1172, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, American College of Preventive Medicine, American Thoracic Society, William W. Buzbee, Jody Freeman, Mr. Oliver A. Houck, Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law, Richard J. Lazarus, National Association for the Medical Direction of Respiratory Care, Mr. Robert V. Percival, Zygmunt J.B. Plater, American Public Power Association and EPA in 12-1173, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, American College of Preventive Medicine, American Thoracic Society, William W. Buzbee, Jody Freeman, Mr. Oliver A. Houck, Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law, Richard J. Lazarus, National Association for the Medical Direction of Respiratory Care, Mr. Robert V. Percival, Zygmunt J.B. Plater, Deseret Power Electric Cooperative, National Mining Association, Peabody Energy Corporation, Power4Georgians, LLC, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tenaska Trailblazer Partners, LLC, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc., White Stallion Energy Center, LLC, Julander Energy Company and EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 12-1174, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, American College of Preventive Medicine, American Thoracic Society, William W. Buzbee, Jody Freeman, Mr. Oliver A. Houck, Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law, Richard J. Lazarus, National Association for the Medical Direction of Respiratory Care, Mr. Robert V. Percival, Zygmunt J.B. Plater, Peabody Energy Corporation and EPA in 12-1175, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, American College of Preventive Medicine, American Thoracic Society, William W. Buzbee, Jody Freeman, Mr. Oliver A. Houck, Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law, Richard J. Lazarus, National Association for the Medical Direction of Respiratory Care, Mr. Robert V. Percival, Zygmunt J.B. Plater, Deseret Power Electric Cooperative and EPA in 12-1176, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, American College of Preventive Medicine, American Thoracic Society, William W. Buzbee, Jody Freeman, Mr. Oliver A. Houck, Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law, Richard J. Lazarus, National Association for the Medical Direction of Respiratory Care, Mr. Robert V. Percival, Zygmunt J.B. Plater, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation and EPA in 12-1177, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, American College of Preventive Medicine, American Thoracic Society, William W. Buzbee, Jody Freeman, Mr. Oliver A. Houck, Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law, Richard J. Lazarus, National Association for the Medical Direction of Respiratory Care, Mr. Robert V. Percival, Zygmunt J.B. Plater, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. and EPA in 12-1178, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, American College of Preventive Medicine, American Thoracic Society, William W. Buzbee, Jody Freeman, Mr. Oliver A. Houck, Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law, Richard J. Lazarus, National Association for the Medical Direction of Respiratory Care, Mr. Robert V. Percival, Zygmunt J.B. Plater, EPA and Tenaska Trailblazer Partners, LLC in 12-1180, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, American College of Preventive Medicine, American Thoracic Society, William W. Buzbee, Jody Freeman, Mr. Oliver A. Houck, Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law, Richard J. Lazarus, National Association for the Medical Direction of Respiratory Care, Mr. Robert V. Percival, Zygmunt J.B. Plater, ARIPPA and EPA in 12-1181, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, American College of Preventive Medicine, American Thoracic Society, William W. Buzbee, Jody Freeman, Mr. Oliver A. Houck, Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law, Richard J. Lazarus, National Association for the Medical Direction of Respiratory Care, Mr. Robert V. Percival, Zygmunt J.B. Plater, United Mine Workers of America and EPA in 12-1183, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, American College of Preventive Medicine, American Thoracic Society, William W. Buzbee, Jody Freeman, Mr. Oliver A. Houck, Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law, Richard J. Lazarus, National Association for the Medical Direction of Respiratory Care, Mr. Robert V. Percival, Zygmunt J.B. Plater, Power4Georgians, LLC and EPA in 12-1184, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, American College of Preventive Medicine, American Thoracic Society, William W. Buzbee, Jody Freeman, Mr. Oliver A. Houck, Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law, Richard J. Lazarus, National Association for the Medical Direction of Respiratory Care, Mr. Robert V. Percival, Zygmunt J.B. Plater, Georgia Association of Manufacturers, Inc., Indiana Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Indiana Coal Council, Inc., Kentucky
April 1, 2013 JOINT APPENDIX [1428379] filed [Volumes: 7] [Service Date: 04/01/2013 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Brownell, F.) [Entered: 04/01/2013 09:43 PM]
March 28, 2013 ERRATA FILED [1427877] by Julander Energy Company in 12-1174 to Appellant/Petitioner reply brief [ # 1427849-2 ] . Reason for errata: Corrected Table of Authorities. [Service Date: 03/28/2013 ] [12-1100, 12-1174] (Bookbinder, David) [Entered: 03/28/2013 03:02 PM]
March 28, 2013 PETITIONER REPLY BRIEF [1427849] filed by Julander Energy Company in 12-1174 [Service Date: 03/28/2013 ] Length of Brief: 750 words. [12-1100, 12-1174] (Bookbinder, David) [Entered: 03/28/2013 02:00 PM]
March 25, 2013 JOINT PETITIONER REPLY BRIEF [1427262] filed by White Stallion Energy Center, LLC in 12-1100, National Mining Association in 12-1101, Institute for Liberty and National Black Chamber of Commerce in 12-1102, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1147, Midwest Ozone Group in 12-1172, American Public Power Association in 12-1173, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178, ARIPPA in 12-1181, United Mine Workers of America in 12-1183, Georgia Association of Manufacturers, Inc., Indiana Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Indiana Coal Council, Inc., Kentucky Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Kentucky Coal Association, Inc., North Carolina Chamber, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Pennsylvania Coal Association, South Carolina Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Coal Association, Incorporated, West Virginia Chamber of Commerce, West Virginia Coal Association, Inc. and Wisconsin Industrial Energy Group, Inc. in 12-1182, State of Arkansas in 12-1190, Chase Power Development, LLC in 12-1191, Railroad Commission of Texas, State of Texas, Texas Commission on Environmental Quality and Texas Public Utility Commission in 12-1185, Edgecombe Genco, LLC and Spruance Genco, LLC in 12-1193, Kansas City Board of Public Utilities in 12-1186, FirstEnergy Generation Corp. in 12-1192, Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 12-1195, Terry E. Branstad, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, John William Conway, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Michigan, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Utah, State of West Virginia and State of Wyoming in 12-1196 [Service Date: 03/25/2013 ] Length of Brief: 7,193 words. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Brownell, F.) [Entered: 03/25/2013 09:43 PM]
March 25, 2013 JOINT PETITIONER REPLY BRIEF [1427259] filed by American Public Power Association in 12-1173, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178, ARIPPA in 12-1181, Chase Power Development, LLC in 12-1191, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 12-1187, Kansas City Board of Public Utilities in 12-1186, Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition in 12-1188, Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority in 12-1189, FirstEnergy Generation Corp. in 12-1192, Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 12-1195 [Service Date: 03/25/2013 ] Length of Brief: 2,000 Words. [12-1173, 12-1178, 12-1181, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1195] (Holmstead, Jeffrey) [Entered: 03/25/2013 07:34 PM]
March 25, 2013 PETITIONER REPLY BRIEF [1427247] filed by Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Integrity Project and Sierra Club in 12-1194 [Service Date: 03/25/2013 ] Length of Brief: 2,988 Words. [12-1194] (Pew, James) [Entered: 03/25/2013 06:07 PM]
March 25, 2013 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1427218] granting the motion of petitioner Julander Energy to extend time to file its reply brief [ # 1426939-2 ], The following revised briefing schedule for No. 12-1174 is as follows: PETITIONER Reply Brief due 03/28/2013. Final Brief due 04/08/2013 (unchanged). [12-1174] [Entered: 03/25/2013 03:50 PM]
March 22, 2013 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1426939] by Julander Energy Company in 12-1174 to extend time to file reply to 03/28/2013. [Service Date: 03/22/2013 ] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1174] (Bookbinder, David) [Entered: 03/22/2013 03:36 PM]
February 21, 2013 JOINT INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1421812] filed by Institute for Liberty, National Black Chamber of Commerce, National Mining Association, Peabody Energy Corporation, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1100, White Stallion Energy Center, LLC in 12-1194 [Service Date: 02/21/2013 ] Length of Brief: 3723 words. [12-1100, 12-1194] (Freeman, Lauren) [Entered: 02/21/2013 06:12 PM]
February 21, 2013 INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1421808] filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Lung Association, American Nurses Association, American Public Health Association, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, Clean Air Council, Conservation Law Foundation, Environment America, Environmental Defense Fund, Izaak Walton League of America, NAACP, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Sierra Club and Waterkeeper Alliance in 12-1100 [Service Date: 02/21/2013 ] Length of Brief: 3120 Words. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Schroeder, Darin) [Entered: 02/21/2013 05:50 PM]
February 21, 2013 JOINT INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1421806] filed by Calpine Corporation, Exelon Corporation, National Grid Generation, LLC and Public Service Enterprise Group, Inc. in 12-1100 [Service Date: 02/21/2013 ] Length of Brief: 3,118 Words. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Collins, Brendan) [Entered: 02/21/2013 05:46 PM]
February 21, 2013 JOINT INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1421767] filed by City of Baltimore, City of Chicago, City of New York, County of Erie, New York, DC, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island and State of Vermont [Service Date: 02/21/2013 ] Length of Brief: 3065 words. [12-1100] (Triplett, Tracy) [Entered: 02/21/2013 04:46 PM]
February 21, 2013 JOINT INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1421665] filed by Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition, Institute for Liberty, Lignite Energy Council, National Black Chamber of Commerce, National Mining Association, Peabody Energy Corporation and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1100, National Mining Association, Peabody Energy Corporation, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. and White Stallion Energy Center, LLC in 12-1174 [Service Date: 02/21/2013 ] Length of Brief: 937. [12-1100, 12-1174] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 02/21/2013 12:27 PM]
February 15, 2013 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1420777] by Tomas Carbonell on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Environmental Defense Fund in 12-1100. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Carbonell, Tomas) [Entered: 02/15/2013 11:14 AM]
February 11, 2013 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged Amicus brief [ # 1417795-2 ] is filed [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 02/11/2013 01:57 PM]
February 11, 2013 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1419810] granting motion to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1417511-2 ]; the Clerk is directed to file Amicus brief [ # 1417795-2 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 02/11/2013 01:48 PM]
January 29, 2013 MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1417795] LODGED by Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law and American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, American College of Preventive Medicine, American Thoracic Society, William W. Buzbee, Jody Freeman, Mr. Oliver A. Houck, Richard J. Lazarus, National Association for the Medical Direction of Respiratory Care, Mr. Robert V. Percival and Zygmunt J.B. Plater in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1182, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1186, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1192, 12-1195, 12-1196 [Service Date: 01/29/2013 ] Length of Brief: 6,974 Words. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196]--[Edited 01/30/2013 by AY] (Livermore, Michael) [Entered: 01/29/2013 03:24 PM]
January 28, 2013 MOTION filed [1417511] by American Thoracic Society, American College of Preventive Medicine, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, National Association for the Medical Direction of Respiratory Care, American College of Chest Physicians, William W. Buzbe to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 01/28/2013 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Babich, Adam) [Entered: 01/28/2013 02:54 PM]
January 22, 2013 RESPONDENT BRIEF [1416613] filed by EPA in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1182, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1186, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1192, 12-1195, 12-1196 [Service Date: 01/22/2012 ] Length of Brief: 25,958. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 01/22/2013 05:17 PM]
January 16, 2013 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1415430] Upon consideration of the unopposed motion of the Utility Air Regulation Group and Oak Grove Management Company, LLC, for intervenor status in Nos. 12-1174 and 12-1194, it is ORDERED that the motion be granted. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 01/16/2013 10:39 AM]
January 6, 2013 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1413645] by EPA in 12-1100 to sever issue, to hold case in abeyance, concerning briefing format [Service Date: 01/06/2013 ] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Oakes, Matthew) [Entered: 01/06/2013 08:15 PM]
January 6, 2013 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--MOTION filed [1413644] by EPA in 12-1100 to sever issue (Response to Motion served by mail due on 01/22/2013), to hold case in abeyance (Response to Motion served by mail due on 01/22/2013), concerning briefing format (Response to Motion served by mail due on 01/22/2013) [Service Date: 01/06/2013 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196]--[Edited 01/07/2013 by AY] (Oakes, Matthew) [Entered: 01/06/2013 08:13 PM]
December 11, 2012 JOINT MOTION filed [1409494] by Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1100 Motion to Grant Intervenor Status. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 12/26/2012) [Service Date: 12/11/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1174, 12-1194] (Zeugin, Lee) [Entered: 12/11/2012 05:26 PM]
December 6, 2012 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1408727] granting motion to dismiss case voluntarily [ # 1398967-2 ] [12-1170 (Consolidation termed 12/06/2012) with 12-1100], issuing mandate [12-1170] [Entered: 12/06/2012 03:55 PM]
November 30, 2012 ERRATA FILED [1407765] by White Stallion Energy Center, LLC in 12-1100, National Mining Association in 12-1101, Institute for Liberty and National Black Chamber of Commerce in 12-1102, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1147, Midwest Ozone Group in 12-1172, American Public Power Association in 12-1173, Peabody Energy Corporation in 12-1175, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178, ARIPPA in 12-1181, United Mine Workers of America in 12-1183, Georgia Association of Manufacturers, Inc., Indiana Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Indiana Coal Council, Inc., Kentucky Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Kentucky Coal Association, Inc., North Carolina Chamber, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Pennsylvania Coal Association, South Carolina Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Coal Association, Incorporated, West Virginia Chamber of Commerce, West Virginia Coal Association, Inc. and Wisconsin Industrial Energy Group, Inc. in 12-1182, State of Arkansas in 12-1190, Chase Power Development, LLC in 12-1191, Railroad Commission of Texas, State of Texas, Texas Commission on Environmental Quality and Texas Public Utility Commission in 12-1185, Edgecombe Genco, LLC and Spruance Genco, LLC in 12-1193, Kansas City Board of Public Utilities in 12-1186, FirstEnergy Generation Corp. in 12-1192, Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 12-1195, Terry E. Branstad, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, John William Conway, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Michigan, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Utah, State of West Virginia and State of Wyoming in 12-1196 to Appellant/Petitioner brief [ # 1401252-2 ] . Reason for errata: Correction of Table of Contents, Spelling, Certificate of Compliance. [Service Date: 11/30/2012 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Brownell, F.) [Entered: 11/30/2012 09:15 PM]
November 29, 2012 NOTICE FILED [1407489] by State of Oregon in 12-1100 to substitute attorney Paul S. Logan substituted by Paul A. Garrahan [Service Date: 11/29/2012 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Garrahan, Paul) [Entered: 11/29/2012 05:21 PM]
November 2, 2012 ERRATA FILED [1403033] by American Public Power Association in 12-1173, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178, ARIPPA in 12-1181, Chase Power Development, LLC in 12-1191, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 12-1187, Kansas City Board of Public Utilities in 12-1186, Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition in 12-1188, Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority in 12-1189, FirstEnergy Generation Corp. in 12-1192, Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 12-1195 to Appellant/Petitioner brief [ # 1401247-2 ] . Reason for errata: Correction of Corporate Disclosure Statement. [Service Date: 11/02/2012 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Holmstead, Jeffrey) [Entered: 11/02/2012 05:34 PM]
October 30, 2012 AMICUS FOR PETITIONER BRIEF [1402141] filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1182, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1186, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1192, 12-1195, 12-1196 [Service Date: 10/30/2012 ] Length of Brief: 6767 words. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Wigmore, Michael) [Entered: 10/30/2012 09:44 PM]
October 24, 2012 PETITIONER BRIEF [1401322] filed by Julander Energy Company in 12-1174 [Service Date: 10/24/2012 ] Length of Brief: 1496 words. [12-1100, 12-1174] (Bookbinder, David) [Entered: 10/24/2012 11:19 AM]
October 23, 2012 PETITIONER BRIEF [1401254] filed by Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Integrity Project and Sierra Club in 12-1194 [Service Date: 10/23/2012 ] Length of Brief: 5,961 words. [12-1194, 12-1100] (Pew, James) [Entered: 10/23/2012 11:52 PM]
October 23, 2012 PETITIONER BRIEF [1401252] filed by White Stallion Energy Center, LLC in 12-1100, National Mining Association in 12-1101, Institute for Liberty and National Black Chamber of Commerce in 12-1102, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1147, Midwest Ozone Group in 12-1172, American Public Power Association in 12-1173, Peabody Energy Corporation in 12-1175, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178, ARIPPA in 12-1181, United Mine Workers of America in 12-1183, Georgia Association of Manufacturers, Inc., Indiana Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Indiana Coal Council, Inc., Kentucky Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Kentucky Coal Association, Inc., North Carolina Chamber, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Pennsylvania Coal Association, South Carolina Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Coal Association, Incorporated, West Virginia Chamber of Commerce, West Virginia Coal Association, Inc. and Wisconsin Industrial Energy Group, Inc. in 12-1182, State of Arkansas in 12-1190, Chase Power Development, LLC in 12-1191, Railroad Commission of Texas, State of Texas, Texas Commission on Environmental Quality and Texas Public Utility Commission in 12-1185, Edgecombe Genco, LLC and Spruance Genco, LLC in 12-1193, Kansas City Board of Public Utilities in 12-1186, FirstEnergy Generation Corp. in 12-1192, Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 12-1195, Terry E. Branstad, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, John William Conway, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Michigan, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Utah, State of West Virginia and State of Wyoming in 12-1196 [Service Date: 10/23/2012 ] Length of Brief: 14,879 words. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Brownell, F.) [Entered: 10/23/2012 11:42 PM]
October 23, 2012 PETITIONER BRIEF [1401247] filed by American Public Power Association in 12-1173, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178, ARIPPA in 12-1181, Chase Power Development, LLC in 12-1191, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 12-1187, Kansas City Board of Public Utilities in 12-1186, Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition in 12-1188, Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority in 12-1189, FirstEnergy Generation Corp. in 12-1192, Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 12-1195 [Service Date: 10/23/2012 ] Length of Brief: 3,990 words. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Holmstead, Jeffrey) [Entered: 10/23/2012 08:06 PM]
October 23, 2012 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD (corrected version filed 10/24/12)--PETITIONER BRIEF [1401227] filed by Julander Energy Company in 12-1174 [Service Date: 10/23/2012 ] Length of Brief: 1,498 words. [12-1100, 12-1174]--[Edited 10/24/2012 by AY] (Bookbinder, David) [Entered: 10/23/2012 04:12 PM]
October 10, 2012 MOTION filed [1398967] by Eco Power Solutions (USA) Corporation in 12-1100 to dismiss case voluntarily (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/25/2012) [Service Date: 10/10/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Bernstein, Norman) [Entered: 10/10/2012 04:54 PM]
October 9, 2012 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1398646] denying motion for reconsideration of the court's August 24, 2012, order [ # 1393208-2 ]. Before Judges: Henderson and Griffith. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 10/09/2012 12:18 PM]
September 27, 2012 NOTICE filed [1396947] by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 09/27/2012 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Wigmore, Michael) [Entered: 09/27/2012 07:16 PM]
September 26, 2012 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1396523] granting motion to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1393789-2 ], setting briefing schedule: AMICUS for RESPONDENT Brief due 01/29/2013 [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 09/26/2012 10:49 AM]
September 21, 2012 REPLY FILED [1395901] by Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Integrity Project and Sierra Club in 12-1194 to response [ # 1394352-2 ], [ # 1394161-2 ], [ # 1393969-2 ] [Service Date: 09/21/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1194] (Pew, James) [Entered: 09/21/2012 03:17 PM]
September 13, 2012 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT FILED [1394352] by Eco Power Solutions (USA) Corporation to motion to reconsider [ # 1393208-2 ] [Service Date: 09/13/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100] (Bernstein, Norman) [Entered: 09/13/2012 04:42 PM]
September 12, 2012 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1394161] by Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition [Service Date: 09/12/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100] (Cobb, William) [Entered: 09/12/2012 06:03 PM]
September 11, 2012 JOINT RESPONSE FILED [1393969] by Chase Power Development, LLC, Institute for Liberty, National Black Chamber of Commerce, National Mining Association, Peabody Energy Corporation and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1100, National Mining Association in 12-1101, Institute for Liberty and National Black Chamber of Commerce in 12-1102, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1147, Midwest Ozone Group in 12-1172, American Public Power Association in 12-1173, Peabody Energy Corporation in 12-1175, United Mine Workers of America in 12-1183, Georgia Association of Manufacturers, Inc., Indiana Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Indiana Coal Council, Inc., Kentucky Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Kentucky Coal Association, Inc., North Carolina Chamber, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Pennsylvania Coal Association, South Carolina Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Coal Association, Incorporated, West Virginia Chamber of Commerce, West Virginia Coal Association, Inc. and Wisconsin Industrial Energy Group, Inc. in 12-1182, Chase Power Development, LLC in 12-1191, Railroad Commission of Texas, State of Texas, Texas Commission on Environmental Quality and Texas Public Utility Commission in 12-1185, Edgecombe Genco, LLC and Spruance Genco, LLC in 12-1193, Kansas City Board of Public Utilities in 12-1186, Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority in 12-1189, FirstEnergy Generation Corp. in 12-1192, Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 12-1195, Terry E. Branstad, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, John William Conway, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Michigan, State of Mississippi, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Utah, State of West Virginia and State of Wyoming in 12-1196 to motion to reconsider [ # 1393208-2 ] [Service Date: 09/11/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1175, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1189, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Brownell, F.) [Entered: 09/11/2012 08:07 PM]
September 11, 2012 MOTION filed [1393789] by Institute for Policy Integrity at NYU School of Law to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 09/11/2012 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Livermore, Michael) [Entered: 09/11/2012 11:46 AM]
September 6, 2012 MOTION filed [1393208] by Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Integrity Project and Sierra Club in 12-1194 to reconsider order [ # 1391295-8 ],order [ # 1391295-2 ],order [ # 1391295-5 ],order [ # 1391295-6 ] (Response to Motion served by mail due on 09/20/2012) [Service Date: 09/06/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1194] (Pew, James) [Entered: 09/06/2012 06:23 PM]
August 30, 2012 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1392245] by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Lung Association, American Nurses Association, American Public Health Association, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, Clean Air Council, Environment America, NAACP, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Sierra Club and Waterkeeper Alliance in 12-1100, Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Integrity Project and Sierra Club in 12-1194 to extend time to file motion to 09/24/2012. [Service Date: 08/30/2012 ] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Pew, James) [Entered: 08/30/2012 06:45 PM]
August 27, 2012 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1391385] by Pamela Campos on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Environmental Defense Fund in 12-1100. [12-1100] (Campos, Pamela) [Entered: 08/27/2012 08:57 AM]
August 24, 2012 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1391295] that No. 12-1166, UARG v. EPA, be deconsolidated from No. 12-1100, et al.; and that the NSPS issues in Nos. 12-1170, Eco Power Solutions (USA) Co. v. EPA, and 12-1185, State of Texas v. EPA, be severed and assigned to a new docket, No. 12-1366, Eco Power Solutions (USA) Co. v. EPA, and consolidated with No. 12-1166. Any petitioners or intervenors in Nos. 12-1100, et al., who wish to intervene in No. 12-1166, et al., are directed to file in No. 12-1166, et al., a motion to intervene within seven days of the date of this order and to indicate which party the intervenor supports. Denying motions to sever and hold in abeyance certain issues [ # 1377880-1 ] [ # 1377881-1 ] [ # 1379994-1 ] otherwise. Referring the motion to intervene in Nos. 12-1170, 12-1174, and 12-1194 [ # 1373682-2 ] to the merits panel to which No. 12-1100, et al., are assigned. Setting briefing schedule and format (See Order for Details). The Clerk is directed to calendar this case for argument on the same day and before the same panel as No. 12-1166, et al. Before Judges: Henderson and Griffith. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1366, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 08/24/2012 03:00 PM]
August 21, 2012 CORRECTED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1390371] by Darin Schroeder on behalf of Petitioner Conservation Law Foundation. [12-1194] (Schroeder, Darin) [Entered: 08/21/2012 11:40 AM]
August 21, 2012 INCOMPLETE PDF WAS ATTACHED--DISREGARD--ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1390298] by Darin Schroeder on behalf of Petitioner Conservation Law Foundation. [12-1194] (Schroeder, Darin) [Entered: 08/21/2012 09:21 AM]
August 6, 2012 AMENDED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1387664] by Amy E. McDonnell on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent DC in 12-1100. [12-1100] (McDonnell, Amy) [Entered: 08/06/2012 11:22 AM]
July 2, 2012 REPLY FILED [1381715] by Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1147 to response [ # 1380168-2 ], [ # 1380160-2 ], [ # 1380134-2 ], [ # 1379989-2 ] [Service Date: 07/02/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1147, 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Zeugin, Lee) [Entered: 07/02/2012 06:57 PM]
July 2, 2012 REPLY FILED [1381704] by Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Integrity Project and Sierra Club in 12-1194 to response [ # 1380005-2 ], [ # 1380149-2 ] [Service Date: 07/02/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1194, 12-1100] (Pew, James) [Entered: 07/02/2012 05:32 PM]
July 2, 2012 REPLY FILED [1381629] by Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1147 to response [ # 1380002-2 ], [ # 1380164-2 ] [Service Date: 07/02/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1147, 12-1100] (Freeman, Lauren) [Entered: 07/02/2012 03:29 PM]
July 2, 2012 REPLY FILED [1381627] by Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1166 to response [ # 1379994-4 ], [ # 1380134-2 ] [Service Date: 07/02/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1166, 12-1100] (Freeman, Lauren) [Entered: 07/02/2012 03:26 PM]
June 28, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1381149] by FirstEnergy Generation Corp. in 12-1192 [Service Date: 06/28/2012 ] [12-1192] (Clement, Paul) [Entered: 06/28/2012 02:31 PM]
June 28, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1381147] by FirstEnergy Generation Corp. in 12-1192 [Service Date: 06/28/2012 ] [12-1192] (Clement, Paul) [Entered: 06/28/2012 02:29 PM]
June 28, 2012 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged reply [ # 1376581-2 ] is filed [12-1100, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1184] [Entered: 06/28/2012 01:14 PM]
June 28, 2012 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1381112] Upon consideration of the motion to sever and expedite, the responses thereto, the motion for leave to file a consolidated reply, and the lodged reply, it is ORDERED that the motion for leave to file a consolidated reply be granted. The Clerk is directed to file the lodged document. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to sever and expedite be granted. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to sever from Nos. 12-1100, et al., the issues identified in the May 9, 2012, Notice of Further Clarification and Modification of Relief Requested, and assign them new docket No. 12-1272, White Stallion Energy Center v. EPA. The following briefing format and schedule, to which all intervenors must adhere, shall apply in No. 12-1272: PETITIONERS' JOINT BRIEF due 07/27/2012. JOINT BRIEF OF INTERVENORS IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS BRIEF due 08/06/2012. RESPONDENT EPA's BRIEF due on 09/05/2012. JOINT BRIEF OF ANY STATE/LOCAL GOVERNMENT INTERVENORS IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENTS due 09/17/2012. JOINT BRIEF OF OTHER INTERVENORS IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENTS due 09/17/2012. PETITIONERS' JOINT REPLY BRIEF due 09/27/2012. JOINT REPLY BRIEF OF INTERVENORS IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS due 09/27/2012. APPENDIX due 09/27/2012. ALL FINAL BRIEFS DUE 10/04/2012. The Clerk is directed to calendar this case for argument on the first appropriate date after the completion of briefing. (SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DETAILS) Before Judges: Tatel, Garland and Brown. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196, 12-1272] [Entered: 06/28/2012 01:08 PM]
June 26, 2012 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1380803] granting motion to terminate party in case [ # 1380500-2 ] Pennsylvania Chamber of Business and Industry in 12-1182 [12-1182] [Entered: 06/26/2012 03:47 PM]
June 26, 2012 REPLY FILED [1380682] by Eco Power Solutions (USA) Corporation to response [ # 1380158-2 ] [Service Date: 06/26/2012 by Clerk, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100] (Bernstein, Norman) [Entered: 06/26/2012 10:06 AM]
June 25, 2012 MOTION filed [1380500] by Georgia Association of Manufacturers, Inc., Indiana Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Indiana Coal Council, Inc., Kentucky Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Kentucky Coal Association, Inc., North Carolina Chamber, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Pennsylvania Chamber of Business and Industry, Pennsylvania Coal Association, South Carolina Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Coal Association, Incorporated, West Virginia Chamber of Commerce, West Virginia Coal Association, Inc. and Wisconsin Industrial Energy Group, Inc.. to terminate party (Response to Motion served by mail due on 07/09/2012) [Service Date: 06/25/2012 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1182]--[Edited 06/25/2012 by TAG]--[Edited 06/25/2012 by TAG] (Rubrecht, Gale Lea) [Entered: 06/25/2012 10:53 AM]
June 21, 2012 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1380168] by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Lung Association, American Nurses Association, American Public Health Association, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, Clean Air Council, Conservation Law Foundation, Environment America, Environmental Defense Fund, Izaak Walton League of America, NAACP, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Sierra Club and Waterkeeper Alliance in 12-1100 to motion to sever issue [ # 1377880-2 ], motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1377880-3 ] [Service Date: 06/21/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1147] (Pew, James) [Entered: 06/21/2012 06:27 PM]
June 21, 2012 REPLY FILED [1380165] by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Lung Association, American Nurses Association, American Public Health Association, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, City of Baltimore, City of Chicago, City of New York, Clean Air Council, Conservation Law Foundation, County of Erie, New York, DC, Environment America, Environmental Defense Fund, Izaak Walton League of America, NAACP, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Sierra Club, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and Waterkeeper Alliance in 12-1100 to Response and RESPONSE FILED to Cross Motion [ # 1377902-2 ],[ # 1377902-3 ], [ # 1377904-2 ],[ # 1377904-3 ], [ # 1377906-2 ],[ # 1377906-3 ](Reply to Response by Mail to Cross Motion due on 07/02/2012)(Reply to Response by Mail to Cross Motion due on 07/02/2012) [Service Date: 06/21/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Pew, James) [Entered: 06/21/2012 06:01 PM]
June 21, 2012 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1380164] by Calpine Corporation, Exelon Corporation, National Grid Generation, LLC and Public Service Enterprise Group, Inc. in 12-1100 to motion to sever issue [ # 1377881-2 ], motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1377881-3 ] [Service Date: 06/21/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1147, 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Collins, Brendan) [Entered: 06/21/2012 06:01 PM]
June 21, 2012 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1380163] by Calpine Corporation, Exelon Corporation, National Grid Generation, LLC and Public Service Enterprise Group, Inc. in 12-1100 to motion to sever issue [ # 1377901-2 ], motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1377901-3 ] [Service Date: 06/21/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1194, 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Collins, Brendan) [Entered: 06/21/2012 05:58 PM]
June 21, 2012 RESPONSE FILED [1380162] by Calpine Corporation, Exelon Corporation, National Grid Generation, LLC and Public Service Enterprise Group, Inc. in 12-1100 to order and to motion [ # 1377906-2 ],[ # 1377906-3 ], [ # 1377904-2 ],[ # 1377904-3 ], [ # 1377902-2 ],[ # 1377902-3 ] [Service Date: 06/21/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Collins, Brendan) [Entered: 06/21/2012 05:55 PM]
June 21, 2012 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1380160] by Calpine Corporation, Exelon Corporation, National Grid Generation, LLC and Public Service Enterprise Group, Inc. in 12-1100 to motion to sever issue [ # 1377880-2 ], motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1377880-3 ] [Service Date: 06/21/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Collins, Brendan) [Entered: 06/21/2012 05:39 PM]
June 21, 2012 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1380158] by National Mining Association in 12-1101, Institute for Liberty and National Black Chamber of Commerce in 12-1102, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1147, 12-1166, Midwest Ozone Group in 12-1172, American Public Power Association in 12-1173, Peabody Energy Corporation in 12-1175, ARIPPA in 12-1181, United Mine Workers of America in 12-1183, Georgia Association of Manufacturers, Inc., Indiana Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Indiana Coal Council, Inc., Kentucky Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Kentucky Coal Association, Inc., North Carolina Chamber, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Pennsylvania Chamber of Business and Industry, Pennsylvania Coal Association, South Carolina Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Coal Association, Incorporated, West Virginia Chamber of Commerce, West Virginia Coal Association, Inc. and Wisconsin Industrial Energy Group, Inc. in 12-1182, State of Arkansas in 12-1190, Chase Power Development, LLC in 12-1191, Railroad Commission of Texas, State of Texas, Texas Commission on Environmental Quality and Texas Public Utility Commission in 12-1185, Edgecombe Genco, LLC and Spruance Genco, LLC in 12-1193, Kansas City Board of Public Utilities in 12-1186, Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority in 12-1189, FirstEnergy Generation Corp. in 12-1192, Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 12-1195, Terry E. Branstad, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, Jack Conway, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Michigan, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Utah, State of West Virginia and State of Wyoming in 12-1196 to motion concerning briefing format [ # 1377895-2 ] [Service Date: 06/21/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1175, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Brownell, F.) [Entered: 06/21/2012 05:37 PM]
June 21, 2012 RESPONSE FILED [1380149] by Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1100 to motion to sever issue [ # 1377901-2 ], motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1377901-3 ] [Service Date: 06/21/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [12-1194, 12-1100] (Zeugin, Lee) [Entered: 06/21/2012 05:03 PM]
June 21, 2012 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1380134] by City of Baltimore, City of Chicago, City of New York, County of Erie, New York, DC, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island and State of Vermont in 12-1100 to motion to sever issue [ # 1377880-2 ], motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1377880-3 ], motion to unconsolidate case [ # 1377883-2 ], motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1377883-3 ] [Service Date: 06/21/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1147, 12-1100, 12-1166] (Iancu, Carol) [Entered: 06/21/2012 04:34 PM]
June 21, 2012 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1380099] by Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition and Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 12-1100 to motion to sever issue [ # 1377901-2 ], motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1377901-3 ] [Service Date: 06/21/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1194, 12-1100] (Gidiere, Philip) [Entered: 06/21/2012 03:44 PM]
June 21, 2012 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1380005] by EPA in 12-1194 to motion to sever issue [ # 1377901-2 ], motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1377901-3 ] [Service Date: 06/21/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1194, 12-1100] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 06/21/2012 01:23 PM]
June 21, 2012 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1380002] by EPA in 12-1147 to motion to sever issue [ # 1377881-2 ], motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1377881-3 ] [Service Date: 06/08/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1147, 12-1100] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 06/21/2012 01:15 PM]
June 21, 2012 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1379994] to motion to unconsolidate case [ # 1377883-2 ], motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1377883-3 ](Reply to Response by Mail and Response to Cross Motion due on 07/05/2012) combined with a MOTION FILED by EPA in 12-1166 to sever issue [Service Date: 06/21/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1166, 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 06/21/2012 01:02 PM]
June 21, 2012 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1379989] by EPA in 12-1147 to motion to sever issue [ # 1377880-2 ], motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1377880-3 ] [Service Date: 06/21/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1147, 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 06/21/2012 12:42 PM]
June 21, 2012 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1379976] by John K. McManus on behalf of Petitioner State of Missouri in 12-1196. [12-1196, 12-1100] (McManus, John) [Entered: 06/21/2012 12:05 PM]
June 14, 2012 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1378838] by White Stallion Energy Center, LLC in 12-1100, Deseret Power Electric Cooperative in 12-1176, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation in 12-1177, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178, Tenaska Trailblazer Partners, LLC in 12-1180, Power4Georgians, LLC in 12-1184 to motion concerning briefing format [ # 1377895-2 ] [Service Date: 06/14/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1184] (Fortuna, John) [Entered: 06/14/2012 10:00 PM]
June 14, 2012 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1378737] granting motion for leave to intervene. [ # 1378563-2 ] [12-1174] [Entered: 06/14/2012 01:33 PM]
June 14, 2012 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1378734] by P. Stephen Gidiere III and co-counsel Leslie Garrett Allen on behalf of Petitioner Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 12-1187. [12-1187, 12-1100] (Allen, Leslie) [Entered: 06/14/2012 01:22 PM]
June 13, 2012 MODIFIED PARTY FILER-- JOINT MOTION filed [1378563] by Peabody Energy Corporation and National Mining Association for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Previously Filed] [Service Date: 06/13/2012 ] [12-1174, 12-1100]--[Edited 06/14/2012 by KRM] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 06/13/2012 03:25 PM]
June 13, 2012 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1378537] granting motions for leave to intervene [ # 1373909-2 ], [ # 1373910-2 ], [ # 1374071-2 ], [ # 1374074-2 ], [ # 1374075-2 ], [ # 1374099-2 ], [ # 1374106-2 ], [ # 1374118-2 ], [ # 1374122-2 ], [ # 1374134-2 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 06/13/2012 02:27 PM]
June 13, 2012 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1378460] granting motion for leave to intervene. [ # 1378046-2 ] [12-1174] [Entered: 06/13/2012 11:02 AM]
June 12, 2012 CORRECTED RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1378340] by Eco Power Solutions (USA) Corporation in 12-1170 to motion concerning briefing format [ # 1377895-2 ] [Service Date: 06/12/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1170, 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Bernstein, Norman) [Entered: 06/12/2012 03:55 PM]
June 11, 2012 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1378107] by Eco Power Solutions (USA) Corporation in 12-1170 to motion concerning briefing format [ # 1377895-2 ] [Service Date: 06/11/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1170, 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196]--[Edited 06/13/2012 by AY] (Bernstein, Norman) [Entered: 06/11/2012 06:15 PM]
June 11, 2012 CERTIFIED INDEX TO RECORD [1377996] by EPA in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1182, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1186, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1192, 12-1195, 12-1196 [Service Date: 06/11/2012 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 06/11/2012 01:29 PM]
June 8, 2012 RESPONSE FILED [1377906] to order [ # 1376935-2 ] combined with a MOTION FILED by FirstEnergy Generation Corp. in 12-1192 to file separate briefs (Response to Motion served by mail due on 06/21/2012) [Service Date: 06/08/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1192, 12-1100] (Clement, Paul) [Entered: 06/08/2012 09:14 PM]
June 8, 2012 RESPONSE FILED [1377904] to order [ # 1376935-2 ] combined with a MOTION FILED by Julander Energy Company in 12-1174 to file separate briefs (Response to Motion served by mail due on 06/21/2012) [Service Date: 06/08/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1174] (Bookbinder, David) [Entered: 06/08/2012 07:56 PM]
June 8, 2012 RESPONSE FILED [1377903] by Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178 to order [ # 1376935-2 ] [Service Date: 06/08/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1178] (Holmstead, Jeffrey) [Entered: 06/08/2012 07:45 PM]
June 8, 2012 RESPONSE FILED [1377902] to order [ # 1376935-2 ] combined with a MOTION FILED by American Public Power Association in 12-1173, Kansas City Board of Public Utilities in 12-1186 concerning briefing format (Response to Motion served by mail due on 06/21/2012) [Service Date: 06/08/2012 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1173, 12-1186] (Ritts, Leslie) [Entered: 06/08/2012 07:00 PM]
June 8, 2012 MOTION filed [1377901] by Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Integrity Project and Sierra Club to sever issue (Response to Motion served by mail due on 06/21/2012), to hold case in abeyance (Response to Motion served by mail due on 06/21/2012) [Service Date: 06/08/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1194] (Pew, James) [Entered: 06/08/2012 06:45 PM]
June 8, 2012 RESPONSE FILED [1377900] by Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority in 12-1189 to order [Service Date: 06/08/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1189] (Hayes, John) [Entered: 06/08/2012 06:30 PM]
June 8, 2012 JOINT RESPONSE FILED [1377899] by National Mining Association in 12-1101, Institute for Liberty and National Black Chamber of Commerce in 12-1102, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1147, 12-1166, Midwest Ozone Group in 12-1172, American Public Power Association in 12-1173, Peabody Energy Corporation in 12-1175, ARIPPA in 12-1181, United Mine Workers of America in 12-1183, Georgia Association of Manufacturers, Inc., Indiana Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Indiana Coal Council, Inc., Kentucky Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Kentucky Coal Association, Inc., North Carolina Chamber, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Pennsylvania Chamber of Business and Industry, Pennsylvania Coal Association, South Carolina Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Coal Association, Incorporated, West Virginia Chamber of Commerce, West Virginia Coal Association, Inc. and Wisconsin Industrial Energy Group, Inc. in 12-1182, State of Arkansas in 12-1190, Chase Power Development, LLC in 12-1191, Railroad Commission of Texas, State of Texas, Texas Commission on Environmental Quality and Texas Public Utility Commission in 12-1185, Edgecombe Genco, LLC and Spruance Genco, LLC in 12-1193, Kansas City Board of Public Utilities in 12-1186, Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority in 12-1189, FirstEnergy Generation Corp. in 12-1192, Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 12-1195, Terry E. Branstad, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, Jack Conway, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Michigan, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Utah, State of West Virginia and State of Wyoming in 12-1196 to order [ # 1376935-2 ] [Service Date: 06/08/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Brownell, F.) [Entered: 06/08/2012 06:16 PM]
June 8, 2012 RESPONSE FILED [1377898] by Chase Power Development, LLC in 12-1100 to order [ # 1376935-2 ] [Service Date: 06/08/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1191] (Thiele, Christopher) [Entered: 06/08/2012 06:14 PM]
June 8, 2012 JOINT RESPONSE FILED [1377896] by Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition in 12-1188, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 12-1100 to order [ # 1376935-2 ] [Service Date: 06/08/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1188, 12-1100, 12-1187] (Gidiere, Philip) [Entered: 06/08/2012 05:43 PM]
June 8, 2012 MOTION filed [1377895] by EPA in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1182, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1186, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1192, 12-1195, 12-1196 concerning briefing format (Response to Motion served by mail due on 06/21/2012) [Service Date: 06/08/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 06/08/2012 05:40 PM]
June 8, 2012 RESPONSE FILED [1377888] by Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 12-1195 to order [ # 1376935-2 ], [ # 1370428-4 ] [Service Date: 06/08/2012 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 1-10. [12-1195, 12-1100] (Kohl, Steven) [Entered: 06/08/2012 05:06 PM]
June 8, 2012 RESPONSE FILED [1377886] by ARIPPA in 12-1181 to order [ # 1376935-2 ] [Service Date: 06/08/2012 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1181, 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Vaccaro, Katherine) [Entered: 06/08/2012 04:57 PM]
June 8, 2012 MOTION filed [1377883] by Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1166 to unconsolidate case (Response to Motion served by mail due on 06/21/2012), to hold case in abeyance (Response to Motion served by mail due on 06/21/2012) [Service Date: 06/08/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1166] (Freeman, Lauren) [Entered: 06/08/2012 04:42 PM]
June 8, 2012 MOTION filed [1377881] by Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1147 to sever issue (Response to Motion served by mail due on 06/21/2012), to hold case in abeyance (Response to Motion served by mail due on 06/21/2012) [Service Date: 06/08/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1147, 12-1100] (Freeman, Lauren) [Entered: 06/08/2012 04:39 PM]
June 8, 2012 MOTION filed [1377880] by Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1147 to sever issue (Response to Motion served by mail due on 06/21/2012), to hold case in abeyance (Response to Motion served by mail due on 06/21/2012) [Service Date: 06/08/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1147, 12-1100] (Freeman, Lauren) [Entered: 06/08/2012 04:35 PM]
June 7, 2012 RESPONSE FILED [1377496] by White Stallion Energy Center, LLC in 12-1100 to notice to join in response [ # 1376691-2 ] [Service Date: 06/07/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1174] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 06/07/2012 10:14 AM]
June 4, 2012 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1376935] granting motion to extend time [ # 1375381-2 ] in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1182, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1195, 12-1196; procedural motions for all parties now due 06/08/2012 [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 06/04/2012 03:10 PM]
June 1, 2012 MODIFIED EVENT FROM LODGED TO FILED--REPLY FILED [1376749] by Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1100 to response [ # 1375842-2 ] [Service Date: 06/01/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1170, 12-1100]--[Edited 06/05/2012 by AY] (Zeugin, Lee) [Entered: 06/01/2012 05:33 PM]
June 1, 2012 NOTICE FILED [1376691] by Julander Energy Company in 12-1174 to join response [ # 1374330-2 ] filed by Respondent in 12-1100, 12-1174. [Service Date: 06/01/2012 ] [12-1100, 12-1174] (Bookbinder, David) [Entered: 06/01/2012 03:31 PM]
June 1, 2012 MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED-- CORRECTED REPLY LODGED [1376581] by White Stallion Energy Center, LLC in 12-1100, Deseret Power Electric Cooperative in 12-1176, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation in 12-1177, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178, Tenaska Trailblazer Partners, LLC in 12-1180, Power4Georgians, LLC in 12-1184 to response [ # 1374330-2 ], [ # 1374325-2 ], [ # 1374331-2 ], [ # 1374363-2 ], [ # 1374332-5 ], [ # 1374288-2 ], [ # 1374277-2 ] [Service Date: 06/01/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [12-1100, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1184]--[Edited 06/01/2012 by AY] (Fortuna, John) [Entered: 06/01/2012 12:01 PM]
May 30, 2012 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED-- JOINT REPLY LODGED [1376298] by White Stallion Energy Center, LLC in 12-1100, Deseret Power Electric Cooperative in 12-1176, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation in 12-1177, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178, Tenaska Trailblazer Partners, LLC in 12-1180, Power4Georgians, LLC in 12-1184 to response [ # 1374330-2 ], [ # 1374325-2 ], [ # 1374331-2 ], [ # 1374363-2 ], [ # 1374332-5 ], [ # 1374288-2 ], [ # 1374277-2 ] [Service Date: 05/30/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [12-1100, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1184]--[Edited 05/31/2012 by AY]--[Edited 06/01/2012 by AY] (Fortuna, John) [Entered: 05/30/2012 08:07 PM]
May 30, 2012 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1376197] consolidating cases 12-1186, 12-1192 (Consolidation started 05/30/2012) with 12-1100; directing party to file in 12-1192 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 06/29/2012. PETITIONER statement of issues due 06/29/2012 [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1186, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1192, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 05/30/2012 02:40 PM]
May 25, 2012 CORRECTED RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1375842] by Eco Power Solutions (USA) Corporation in 12-1170 to motion for leave to intervene. [ # 1373682-2 ] [Service Date: 05/25/2012 by CM/ECF NDA, Clerk] Pages: 16-20. [12-1170, 12-1100] (Bernstein, Norman) [Entered: 05/25/2012 06:22 PM]
May 25, 2012 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1375841] by Power4Georgians, LLC [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1184] (Fortuna, John) [Entered: 05/25/2012 06:15 PM]
May 25, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1375840] by Power4Georgians, LLC [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1184] (Fortuna, John) [Entered: 05/25/2012 06:11 PM]
May 25, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1375839] by Power4Georgians, LLC [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1184] (Fortuna, John) [Entered: 05/25/2012 06:09 PM]
May 25, 2012 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1375838] by John L. Fortuna on behalf of Petitioner Power4Georgians, LLC. [12-1184] (Fortuna, John) [Entered: 05/25/2012 06:03 PM]
May 25, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1375827] by Chase Power Development, LLC in 12-1191 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1191] (Thiele, Christopher) [Entered: 05/25/2012 05:32 PM]
May 25, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1375826] by Eco Power Solutions (USA) Corporation in 12-1170 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1170] (Bernstein, Norman) [Entered: 05/25/2012 05:31 PM]
May 25, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1375824] by Chase Power Development, LLC in 12-1191 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1191] (Thiele, Christopher) [Entered: 05/25/2012 05:30 PM]
May 25, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1375823] by Eco Power Solutions (USA) Corporation in 12-1170 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1170] (Bernstein, Norman) [Entered: 05/25/2012 05:29 PM]
May 25, 2012 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1375813] by White Stallion Energy Center, LLC in 12-1100, Deseret Power Electric Cooperative in 12-1176, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation in 12-1177, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178, Tenaska Trailblazer Partners, LLC in 12-1180, Power4Georgians, LLC in 12-1184 . [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1184] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 05/25/2012 04:58 PM]
May 25, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1375807] by Edgecombe Genco, LLC and Spruance Genco, LLC in 12-1193 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1193] (Jaeger, Lisa) [Entered: 05/25/2012 04:37 PM]
May 25, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1375805] by Edgecombe Genco, LLC and Spruance Genco, LLC in 12-1193 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1193] (Jaeger, Lisa) [Entered: 05/25/2012 04:36 PM]
May 25, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1375802] by Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 12-1195 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1195] (Kohl, Steven) [Entered: 05/25/2012 04:27 PM]
May 25, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1375800] by Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 12-1195 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1195] (Kohl, Steven) [Entered: 05/25/2012 04:22 PM]
May 25, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1375797] by Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1188] (Cobb, William) [Entered: 05/25/2012 04:19 PM]
May 25, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1375794] by Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1188] (Cobb, William) [Entered: 05/25/2012 04:16 PM]
May 25, 2012 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1375791] by Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1100, 12-1178] (Holmstead, Jeffrey) [Entered: 05/25/2012 04:13 PM]
May 25, 2012 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1375787] by National Mining Association in 12-1101 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [12-1101] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 05/25/2012 04:09 PM]
May 25, 2012 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1375786] by National Mining Association in 12-1101 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1101] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 05/25/2012 04:07 PM]
May 25, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1375783] by National Mining Association in 12-1101 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1101] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 05/25/2012 04:07 PM]
May 25, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1375782] by National Mining Association in 12-1101 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1101] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 05/25/2012 04:06 PM]
May 25, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1375781] by Sunflower Electric Power Corporation in 12-1177 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1177, 12-1100] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 05/25/2012 04:04 PM]
May 25, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1375780] by Sunflower Electric Power Corporation in 12-1177 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1177, 12-1100] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 05/25/2012 04:03 PM]
May 25, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1375778] by Tenaska Trailblazer Partners, LLC in 12-1180 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1180] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 05/25/2012 04:00 PM]
May 25, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1375776] by Tenaska Trailblazer Partners, LLC in 12-1180 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1180] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 05/25/2012 03:59 PM]
May 25, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1375774] by Peabody Energy Corporation in 12-1175 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1175, 12-1100] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 05/25/2012 03:56 PM]
May 25, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1375772] by Peabody Energy Corporation [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1175] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 05/25/2012 03:55 PM]
May 25, 2012 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1375767] by Julander Energy Company in 12-1174 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1174] (Bookbinder, David) [Entered: 05/25/2012 03:52 PM]
May 25, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1375765] by Julander Energy Company in 12-1174 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1174] (Bookbinder, David) [Entered: 05/25/2012 03:50 PM]
May 25, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1375764] by Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1178] (Holmstead, Jeffrey) [Entered: 05/25/2012 03:49 PM]
May 25, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1375763] by Deseret Power Electric Cooperative in 12-1176 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1176] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 05/25/2012 03:49 PM]
May 25, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1375762] by Julander Energy Company in 12-1174 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1174] (Bookbinder, David) [Entered: 05/25/2012 03:49 PM]
May 25, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1375761] by Deseret Power Electric Cooperative in 12-1176 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1176] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 05/25/2012 03:47 PM]
May 25, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1375760] by Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1178] (Holmstead, Jeffrey) [Entered: 05/25/2012 03:47 PM]
May 25, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1375753] by Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 12-1187 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1187] (Gidiere, Philip) [Entered: 05/25/2012 03:26 PM]
May 25, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1375751] by Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 12-1187 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1187] (Gidiere, Philip) [Entered: 05/25/2012 03:24 PM]
May 25, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1375744] by State of Arkansas in 12-1190 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1190] (Jones, Kendra) [Entered: 05/25/2012 03:11 PM]
May 25, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1375743] by State of Arkansas in 12-1190 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1190] (Jones, Kendra) [Entered: 05/25/2012 03:09 PM]
May 25, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1375738] by Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Integrity Project and Sierra Club in 12-1194 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1194] (Pew, James) [Entered: 05/25/2012 02:59 PM]
May 25, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1375733] by Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Integrity Project and Sierra Club in 12-1194 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1194] (Pew, James) [Entered: 05/25/2012 02:52 PM]
May 25, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1375708] by Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority in 12-1189 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1189] (Hayes, John) [Entered: 05/25/2012 01:30 PM]
May 25, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1375705] by Institute for Liberty and National Black Chamber of Commerce in 12-1102 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1102] (Grossman, Andrew) [Entered: 05/25/2012 01:28 PM]
May 25, 2012 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1375703] by Institute for Liberty and National Black Chamber of Commerce in 12-1102 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1102] (Grossman, Andrew) [Entered: 05/25/2012 01:27 PM]
May 25, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1375702] by Institute for Liberty and National Black Chamber of Commerce in 12-1102 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1102] (Grossman, Andrew) [Entered: 05/25/2012 01:26 PM]
May 25, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1375698] by Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority in 12-1189 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1189, 12-1100] (Hayes, John) [Entered: 05/25/2012 01:24 PM]
May 25, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1375661] by ARIPPA in 12-1181 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1181] (Vaccaro, Katherine) [Entered: 05/25/2012 12:34 PM]
May 25, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1375658] by ARIPPA in 12-1181 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1181] (Vaccaro, Katherine) [Entered: 05/25/2012 12:30 PM]
May 25, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1375657] by Georgia Association of Manufacturers, Inc., Indiana Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Indiana Coal Council, Inc., Kentucky Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Kentucky Coal Association, Inc., North Carolina Chamber, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Pennsylvania Chamber of Business and Industry, Pennsylvania Coal Association, South Carolina Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Coal Association, Incorporated, West Virginia Chamber of Commerce, West Virginia Coal Association, Inc. and Wisconsin Industrial Energy Group, Inc. [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1182] (Rubrecht, Gale Lea) [Entered: 05/25/2012 12:23 PM]
May 25, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1375656] by Georgia Association of Manufacturers, Inc., Indiana Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Indiana Coal Council, Inc., Kentucky Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Kentucky Coal Association, Inc., North Carolina Chamber, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Pennsylvania Chamber of Business and Industry, Pennsylvania Coal Association, South Carolina Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Coal Association, Incorporated, West Virginia Chamber of Commerce, West Virginia Coal Association, Inc. and Wisconsin Industrial Energy Group, Inc. [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1182] (Rubrecht, Gale Lea) [Entered: 05/25/2012 12:19 PM]
May 25, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1375653] by Midwest Ozone Group [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1172] (Rubrecht, Gale Lea) [Entered: 05/25/2012 12:16 PM]
May 25, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1375651] by Midwest Ozone Group [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1172] (Rubrecht, Gale Lea) [Entered: 05/25/2012 12:14 PM]
May 25, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1375649] by Railroad Commission of Texas, State of Texas, Texas Commission on Environmental Quality and Texas Public Utility Commission in 12-1185 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1185] (Smith, Mary) [Entered: 05/25/2012 12:12 PM]
May 25, 2012 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1375648] by Railroad Commission of Texas, State of Texas, Texas Commission on Environmental Quality and Texas Public Utility Commission in 12-1185 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1185] (Smith, Mary) [Entered: 05/25/2012 12:12 PM]
May 25, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1375647] by Railroad Commission of Texas, State of Texas, Texas Commission on Environmental Quality and Texas Public Utility Commission in 12-1185 [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1185] (Smith, Mary) [Entered: 05/25/2012 12:10 PM]
May 25, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1375593] by Terry E. Branstad, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, Jack Conway, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Michigan, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Utah, State of West Virginia and State of Wyoming [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1196] (Gordon, Neil) [Entered: 05/25/2012 09:29 AM]
May 25, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1375592] by Terry E. Branstad, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, Jack Conway, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Michigan, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Utah, State of West Virginia and State of Wyoming [Service Date: 05/25/2012 ] [12-1196] (Gordon, Neil) [Entered: 05/25/2012 09:28 AM]
May 24, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1375577] by American Public Power Association in 12-1173 [Service Date: 05/24/2012 ] [12-1173, 12-1100] (Ritts, Leslie) [Entered: 05/24/2012 10:22 PM]
May 24, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1375576] by American Public Power Association in 12-1173 [Service Date: 05/24/2012 ] [12-1173, 12-1100] (Ritts, Leslie) [Entered: 05/24/2012 10:21 PM]
May 24, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1375568] by Utility Air Regulatory Group [Service Date: 05/24/2012 ] [12-1147] (Zeugin, Lee) [Entered: 05/24/2012 04:52 PM]
May 24, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1375567] by Utility Air Regulatory Group [Service Date: 05/24/2012 ] [12-1147] (Zeugin, Lee) [Entered: 05/24/2012 04:49 PM]
May 24, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1375542] by Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1166 [Service Date: 05/24/2012 ] [12-1166, 12-1100] (Freeman, Lauren) [Entered: 05/24/2012 03:49 PM]
May 24, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1375541] by Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1166 [Service Date: 05/24/2012 ] [12-1166, 12-1100] (Freeman, Lauren) [Entered: 05/24/2012 03:48 PM]
May 24, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1375517] by United Mine Workers of America in 12-1183 [Service Date: 05/24/2012 ] [12-1183, 12-1100] (Crandall, Grant) [Entered: 05/24/2012 03:04 PM]
May 24, 2012 STATEMENT FILED [1375515] by United Mine Workers of America in 12-1183 with Disclosure Listing [Service Date: 05/24/2012 ] [12-1183, 12-1100] (Crandall, Grant) [Entered: 05/24/2012 03:03 PM]
May 24, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1375514] by United Mine Workers of America in 12-1183 [Service Date: 05/24/2012 ] [12-1183, 12-1100] (Crandall, Grant) [Entered: 05/24/2012 02:54 PM]
May 24, 2012 MOTION filed [1375381] by EPA in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1182, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1195, 12-1196 to extend time to file motion to 06/08/2012. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 06/07/2012) [Service Date: 05/24/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 05/24/2012 09:44 AM]
May 22, 2012 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1375106] by Eco Power Solutions (USA) Corporation in 12-1170 to motion for leave to intervene. [ # 1373682-2 ] [Service Date: 05/22/2012 by Clerk, CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 16-20. [12-1170, 12-1174, 12-1194] (Bernstein, Norman) [Entered: 05/22/2012 07:42 PM]
May 21, 2012 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1374669] by Jonathan A. Glogau on behalf of Petitioner State of Florida. [12-1196] (Glogau, Jonathan) [Entered: 05/21/2012 11:32 AM]
May 18, 2012 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1374443] granting motions for leave to intervene. [ # 1364090-2 ], [ # 1364230-2 ], [ # 1364505-2 ], [ # 1368730-2 ], and [ # 1369083-2 ]. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 05/18/2012 12:30 PM]
May 18, 2012 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1374363] by City of Baltimore, City of New York, County of Erie, New York, DC, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island and State of Vermont in 12-1100 to motion to sever issue [ # 1371309-2 ], motion to expedite case [ # 1371309-3 ] [Service Date: 05/18/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [12-1100, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1184] (Iancu, Carol) [Entered: 05/18/2012 09:59 AM]
May 17, 2012 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT FILED [1374332] to motion to sever issue [ # 1371309-2 ], motion to expedite case [ # 1371309-3 ](Reply to Response by Mail and Response to Cross Motion due on 06/01/2012) combined with a MOTION FILED by Chase Power Development, LLC in 12-1191 to expedite case., to sever issue [Service Date: 05/17/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1184, 12-1191] (Thiele, Christopher) [Entered: 05/17/2012 07:05 PM]
May 17, 2012 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1374331] by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Lung Association, American Nurses Association, American Public Health Association, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, Clean Air Council, Conservation Law Foundation, Environment America, Environmental Defense Fund, Izaak Walton League of America, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Sierra Club and Waterkeeper Alliance in 12-1100 to motion to sever issue [ # 1371309-2 ], motion to expedite case [ # 1371309-3 ] [Service Date: 05/17/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 21-30. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Narayan, Sanjay) [Entered: 05/17/2012 06:42 PM]
May 17, 2012 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1374330] by EPA in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1182, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1195, 12-1196 [Service Date: 05/17/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 21-30. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 05/17/2012 05:53 PM]
May 17, 2012 MODIFIED DOCKET TEXT-- JOINT MOTION filed [1374329] by City of Baltimore, County of Erie, New York, DC, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island and State of Vermont in 12-1100 for leave to file response (Response to Motion served by mail due on 06/01/2012) [Service Date: 05/17/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1184]--[Edited 05/18/2012 by AY] (Iancu, Carol) [Entered: 05/17/2012 05:33 PM]
May 17, 2012 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1374325] by Calpine Corporation, Exelon Corporation, National Grid Generation, LLC and Public Service Enterprise Group, Inc. in 12-1100 to motion to sever issue [ # 1371309-2 ], motion to expedite case [ # 1371309-3 ] [Service Date: 05/17/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Collins, Brendan) [Entered: 05/17/2012 05:18 PM]
May 17, 2012 JOINT RESPONSE FILED [1374288] by Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition and Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 12-1100 to motion to sever issue [ # 1371309-2 ], motion to expedite case [ # 1371309-3 ] [Service Date: 05/17/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1184, 12-1187, 12-1188] (Gidiere, Philip) [Entered: 05/17/2012 03:24 PM]
May 17, 2012 RESPONSE FILED [1374277] by Utility Air Regulatory Group in 12-1147 to motion to sever issue [ # 1371309-2 ], motion to expedite case [ # 1371309-3 ] [Service Date: 05/17/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1147] (Zeugin, Lee) [Entered: 05/17/2012 02:59 PM]
May 17, 2012 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1374183] by Amanda Shafer Berman on behalf of Respondent EPA in 12-1100. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Berman, Amanda) [Entered: 05/17/2012 10:48 AM]
May 16, 2012 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION filed [1374134] by Chase Power Development, LLC for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 05/16/2012 ] [12-1194, 12-1100, 12-1191]--[Edited 05/18/2012 by KRM] (Thiele, Christopher) [Entered: 05/16/2012 09:22 PM]
May 16, 2012 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION filed [1374122] by White Stallion Energy Center, LLC for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 05/16/2012 ] [12-1194]--[Edited 05/18/2012 by KRM] (Marwell, Jeremy) [Entered: 05/16/2012 06:23 PM]
May 16, 2012 MOTION filed [1374118] by National Association for the Advancement of Colored People for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 05/16/2012 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Pew, James) [Entered: 05/16/2012 05:50 PM]
May 16, 2012 CORRECTED MOTION filed [1374106] by State of California, et al. for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 05/16/2012 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Durbin, Susan) [Entered: 05/16/2012 05:04 PM]
May 16, 2012 JOINT MOTION filed [1374099] by Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition and Lignite Energy Council for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 05/16/2012 ] [12-1100, 12-1194] (Cobb, William) [Entered: 05/16/2012 04:44 PM]
May 16, 2012 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--MOTION filed [1374094] by State of California et al for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 05/16/2012 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196]--[Edited 05/17/2012 by AY] (Durbin, Susan) [Entered: 05/16/2012 04:37 PM]
May 16, 2012 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION filed [1374075] by Sunflower Electric Power Corporation for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 05/16/2012 ] [12-1194, 12-1100]--[Edited 05/18/2012 by KRM] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 05/16/2012 03:57 PM]
May 16, 2012 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION filed [1374074] by National Mining Association for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 05/16/2012 ] [12-1194, 12-1100]--[Edited 05/18/2012 by KRM] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 05/16/2012 03:55 PM]
May 16, 2012 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION filed [1374071] by Peabody Energy Corporation for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 05/16/2012 ] [12-1194, 12-1100]--[Edited 05/18/2012 by KRM] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 05/16/2012 03:51 PM]
May 16, 2012 NOTICE FILED [1373920] by Environmental Defense Fund in 12-1100 to withdraw attorney David T. Lifland who represented Environmental Defense Fund in 12-1100 [Service Date: 05/16/2012 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Lifland, David) [Entered: 05/16/2012 09:26 AM]
May 15, 2012 MOTION filed [1373910] by the National Black Chamber of Commerce and the Institute for Liberty for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 05/15/2012 ] [12-1100, 12-1194] (Grossman, Andrew) [Entered: 05/15/2012 07:02 PM]
May 15, 2012 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION filed [1373909] by Eco Power Solutions (USA) Corp. for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 05/15/2012] [12-1194]--[Edited 05/16/2012 by KRM] (Bernstein, Norman) [Entered: 05/15/2012 05:50 PM]
May 15, 2012 MOTION filed [1373905] by Eco Power Solutions (USA) Corporation for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Attached] [Service Date: 05/15/2012 ] [12-1194] (Bernstein, Norman) [Entered: 05/15/2012 05:32 PM]
May 14, 2012 JOINT MOTION filed [1373682] by Utility Air Regulatory Group; Oak Grove Management Company LLC for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 05/14/2012 ] [12-1100, 12-1170, 12-1174, 12-1194] (Zeugin, Lee) [Entered: 05/14/2012 06:25 PM]
May 11, 2012 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1373420] by Norman W. Bernstein on behalf of Petitioner Eco Power Solutions (USA) Corporation. [12-1170] (Bernstein, Norman) [Entered: 05/11/2012 04:18 PM]
May 9, 2012 JOINT NOTICE FILED [1373043] by White Stallion Energy Center, LLC in 12-1100, Deseret Power Electric Cooperative in 12-1176, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation in 12-1177, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178, Tenaska Trailblazer Partners, LLC in 12-1180, Power4Georgians, LLC in 12-1184 Notice of Further Clarification and Modification of Relief Requested. [Service Date: 05/09/2012 ] [12-1100, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1184] (Fortuna, John) [Entered: 05/09/2012 10:48 PM]
May 3, 2012 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1372182] by Elizabeth L. Horner on behalf of Petitioner Utility Air Regulatory Group. [12-1147] (Horner, Elizabeth) [Entered: 05/03/2012 02:06 PM]
May 1, 2012 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1371798] granting motion to extend time [ # 1371736-2 ]; responses to motion to sever issue [ # 1371309-2 ] and to expedite [1371309-3 now due on 05/17/2012. Reply to responses due 05/30/2012 [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 05/01/2012 03:26 PM]
May 1, 2012 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1371736] by EPA in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1182, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1195, 12-1196 to extend time to file response to 05/17/2012. [Service Date: 05/01/2012 ] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 05/01/2012 01:41 PM]
May 1, 2012 JOINT NOTICE FILED [1371642] by White Stallion Energy Center, LLC in 12-1100, Deseret Power Electric Cooperative in 12-1176, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation in 12-1177, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 12-1178, Tenaska Trailblazer Partners, LLC in 12-1180, Power4Georgians, LLC in 12-1184 Notice of Clarification Concerning Joint Motion to Sever and Expedite New Unit Claims. [Service Date: 05/01/2012 ] [12-1100, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1184] (Barmeyer, Patricia) [Entered: 05/01/2012 10:21 AM]
April 27, 2012 JOINT MOTION filed [1371309] by Sunflower Electric Power Corporation in 12-1177 to sever issue (Response to Motion served by mail due on 05/10/2012), to expedite case. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 05/10/2012) [Service Date: 04/27/2012 by Clerk] Pages: 21-30. [12-1177, 12-1100] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 04/27/2012 06:38 PM]
April 27, 2012 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1371247] granting motion to extend time [ # 1371056-2 ]; extending initial submissions not yet filed and procedural motions due 05/25/2012. Dispositive motions and certified index now due 06/11/2012 [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 04/27/2012 01:43 PM]
April 27, 2012 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1371244] by White Stallion Energy Center, LLC [Service Date: 04/27/2012 ] [12-1100] (Marwell, Jeremy) [Entered: 04/27/2012 01:27 PM]
April 27, 2012 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1371236] by White Stallion Energy Center, LLC [Service Date: 04/27/2012 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [12-1100] (Marwell, Jeremy) [Entered: 04/27/2012 12:16 PM]
April 27, 2012 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1371234] by White Stallion Energy Center, LLC [Service Date: 04/27/2012 ] [12-1100] (Marwell, Jeremy) [Entered: 04/27/2012 12:06 PM]
April 27, 2012 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1371232] by White Stallion Energy Center, LLC [Service Date: 04/27/2012 ] [12-1100] (Marwell, Jeremy) [Entered: 04/27/2012 12:05 PM]
April 27, 2012 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1371229] by White Stallion Energy Center, LLC [Service Date: 04/27/2012 ] [12-1100] (Marwell, Jeremy) [Entered: 04/27/2012 12:02 PM]
April 26, 2012 MOTION filed [1371056] by EPA in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1182, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1195, 12-1196 to extend time to file initial submissions (Response to Motion served by mail due on 05/10/2012) [Service Date: 04/26/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 04/26/2012 04:11 PM]
April 24, 2012 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1370428] consolidating case 12-1196 (Consolidation started 04/24/2012) with 12-1100; directing party to file in 12-1196 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 05/24/2012. PETITIONER statement of issues due 05/24/2012 [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1196] [Entered: 04/24/2012 12:19 PM]
April 23, 2012 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1370044] consolidating cases 12-1188, 12-1189 (Consolidation started 04/23/2012) with 12-1100; directing party to file in 12-1188, 12-1189 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 05/23/2012. PETITIONER statement of issues due 05/23/2012 [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1188, 12-1189, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195] [Entered: 04/23/2012 11:13 AM]
April 23, 2012 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1370027] to statement disclosure listing FRAP 26.1 [ # 1369415-2 ] filed by Georgia Association of Manufacturers, Inc., Indiana Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Indiana Coal Council, Inc., Kentucky Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Kentucky Coal Association, Inc., North Carolina Chamber, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Pennsylvania Chamber of Business and Industry, Pennsylvania Coal Association, South Carolina Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Coal Association, Incorporated, West Virginia Chamber of Commerce, West Virginia Coal Association, Inc. and Wisconsin Industrial Energy Group, Inc.. [12-1182] (Rubrecht, Gale Lea) [Entered: 04/23/2012 10:47 AM]
April 19, 2012 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1369559] consolidating cases 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1182, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1185, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195, 12-1187 (Consolidation started 04/19/2012) with 12-1100; directing party to file in 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 05/21/2012. PETITIONER statement of issues due 05/21/2012 [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166, 12-1170, 12-1172, 12-1173, 12-1174, 12-1175, 12-1176, 12-1177, 12-1178, 12-1180, 12-1181, 12-1182, 12-1183, 12-1184, 12-1185, 12-1187, 12-1190, 12-1191, 12-1193, 12-1194, 12-1195] [Entered: 04/19/2012 10:20 AM]
April 18, 2012 STATEMENT FILED [1369415] by Georgia Association of Manufacturers, Inc., Indiana Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Indiana Coal Council, Inc., Kentucky Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Kentucky Coal Association, Inc., North Carolina Chamber, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Pennsylvania Chamber of Business and Industry, Pennsylvania Coal Association, South Carolina Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Chamber of Commerce, The Virginia Coal Association, Incorporated, West Virginia Chamber of Commerce, West Virginia Coal Association, Inc. and Wisconsin Industrial Energy Group, Inc. with Disclosure Listing [Service Date: 04/12/2012 ] [12-1182] (Rubrecht, Gale Lea) [Entered: 04/18/2012 11:37 AM]
April 16, 2012 CERTIFIED COPY [1369110] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1369106-2 ] [12-1191] [Entered: 04/16/2012 04:26 PM]
April 16, 2012 MOTION filed [1369083] by National Grid Generation LLC for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 04/16/2012 ] [12-1100] (Collins, Brendan) [Entered: 04/16/2012 03:23 PM]
April 13, 2012 MOTION filed [1368730] by State of North Carolina for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 04/13/2012 ] [12-1100] (Bernstein, Marc) [Entered: 04/13/2012 11:28 AM]
April 10, 2012 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1368082] consolidating cases 12-1166 (Consolidation started 04/10/2012) with 12-1100; directing party to file in 12-1166 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 05/10/2012. PETITIONER statement of issues due 05/10/2012 [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147, 12-1166] [Entered: 04/10/2012 02:14 PM]
March 21, 2012 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1364962] by Sean H. Donahue on behalf of Movant-Intervenor for Respondent Environmental Defense Fund in 12-1100. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 03/21/2012 09:27 PM]
March 20, 2012 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1364667] granting motion to extend time [ # 1364151-2 ] in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102; extending Clerk order initial submissions for appellant/petitioner [ # 1359749-3 ] in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102 PETITIONER docketing statement due 04/27/2012. PETITIONER certificate as to parties, etc. due 04/27/2012. PETITIONER statement of issues due 04/27/2012. PETITIONER underlying decision due 04/27/2012. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 04/27/2012. PETITIONER procedural motions due 04/27/2012. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 05/14/2012; extending Clerk order initial submissions for appellee/respondent [ # 1359749-4 ] in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102 RESPONDENT certified index to record due 05/14/2012. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 04/27/2012. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 05/14/2012; extending Clerk order initial submission for apet [ # 1364229-3 ] in 12-1147 PETITIONER docketing statement due 04/27/2012. PETITIONER statement of issues due 04/27/2012 [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147] [Entered: 03/20/2012 02:07 PM]
March 19, 2012 MOTION filed [1364505] by Calpine Corporation, Exelon Corporation, and Public Service Enterprise Group, Inc. for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 03/19/2012 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147] (Collins, Brendan) [Entered: 03/19/2012 05:41 PM]
March 16, 2012 MOTION filed [1364230] by AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, et al. for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 03/16/2012 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102] (Pew, James) [Entered: 03/16/2012 04:52 PM]
March 16, 2012 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1364229] consolidating cases 12-1147 (Consolidation started 03/16/2012) with 12-1100; directing party to file in 12-1147 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 04/16/2012. PETITIONER statement of issues due 04/16/2012 [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1147] [Entered: 03/16/2012 04:48 PM]
March 16, 2012 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1364151] by EPA in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102 to extend time to file initial submissions [Service Date: 03/16/2012 ] Pages: 1-10. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 03/16/2012 01:59 PM]
March 16, 2012 JOINT MOTION filed [1364090] by Commonwealth of Massachusetts and States of Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Iowa, Maine, Maryland, New Hampshire, New Mexico, New York, Rhode Island, Vermont, and District of Columbia and City of New York for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 03/16/2012 ] [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102] (Iancu, Carol) [Entered: 03/16/2012 11:31 AM]
March 9, 2012 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1362934] by Eric G. Hostetler and co-counsel Matthew R. Oakes on behalf of Respondent EPA in 12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102. [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 03/09/2012 03:19 PM]
February 22, 2012 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1359749] consolidating cases 12-1101, 12-1102 (Consolidation started 02/22/2012) with 12-1100; directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 03/23/2012. PETITIONER certificate as to parties, etc. due 03/23/2012. PETITIONER statement of issues due 03/23/2012. PETITIONER underlying decision due 03/23/2012. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 03/23/2012. PETITIONER procedural motions due 03/23/2012. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 04/09/2012; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 03/23/2012. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 03/23/2012. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 04/09/2012. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 04/09/2012 [12-1100, 12-1101, 12-1102] [Entered: 02/22/2012 02:35 PM]
February 16, 2012 CERTIFIED COPY [1358857] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1358855-2 ] [12-1100] [Entered: 02/16/2012 12:56 PM]
February 16, 2012 PETITION FOR REVIEW filed [1358855] by White Stallion Energy Center, LLC of a decision by federal agency [Service Date: 02/16/2012 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing [12-1100] [Entered: 02/16/2012 12:55 PM]
February 16, 2012 PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [12-1100] [Entered: 02/16/2012 12:53 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: White Stallion Energy Center v. EPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Chase Power Development, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Charles Thiele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: American Public Health Association
Represented By: John Timothy Suttles Jr.
Represented By: Myra Dean Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of North Carolina
Represented By: Marc D. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: City of Baltimore
Represented By: William Rowe Phelan Esquire Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of California
Represented By: David Alexander Zonana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Environmental Defense Fund
Represented By: Vickie Lynn Patton
Represented By: Tomas Elias Carbonell
Represented By: Graham Getty McCahan
Represented By: Pamela A. Campos
Represented By: Sean H. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition
Represented By: William James Cobb III
Represented By: Michael J. Nasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Massachusetts
Represented By: Carol A. Iancu
Represented By: Melissa Ann Hoffer Esquire
Represented By: Tracy Leigh Triplett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Exelon Corporation
Represented By: Brendan K. Collins Esquire
Represented By: Robert Bruce McKinstry Esquire Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Institute for Liberty
Represented By: David B. Rivkin Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Michael Grossman
Represented By: Lee Casey
Represented By: Mark W. DeLaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of New Mexico
Represented By: William G. Grantham
Represented By: Stephen Robert Farris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Illinois
Represented By: Gerald T. Karr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future
Represented By: Ann Brewster Weeks Esquire
Represented By: Darin T. Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Peabody Energy Corporation
Represented By: Michael H. Higgins
Represented By: Peter S. Glaser
Represented By: George Y. Sugiyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By: John Timothy Suttles Jr.
Represented By: Myra Dean Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: National Mining Association
Represented By: Michael H. Higgins
Represented By: Peter S. Glaser
Represented By: George Y. Sugiyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Eco Power Solutions (USA) Corporation
Represented By: Norman W. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: City of Chicago
Represented By: Benna Ruth Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Waterkeeper Alliance
Represented By: James Samuel Pew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: National Association for the Advancement of Colored People
Represented By: James Samuel Pew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Iowa
Represented By: David Robert Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Calpine Corporation
Represented By: Brendan K. Collins Esquire
Represented By: Robert Bruce McKinstry Esquire Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Natural Resources Council of Maine
Represented By: Ann Brewster Weeks Esquire
Represented By: Darin T. Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Utility Air Regulatory Group
Represented By: Elizabeth Louise Horner
Represented By: F. William Brownell
Represented By: Craig S. Harrison
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Freeman
Represented By: Lee Bernard Zeugin
Represented By: Henry Vernon Nickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Sunflower Electric Power Corporation
Represented By: Michael H. Higgins
Represented By: Peter S. Glaser
Represented By: George Y. Sugiyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Clean Air Council
Represented By: James Samuel Pew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: American Nurses Association
Represented By: John Timothy Suttles Jr.
Represented By: Myra Dean Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Public Service Enterprise Group, Inc.
Represented By: Brendan K. Collins Esquire
Represented By: Robert Bruce McKinstry Esquire Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Oregon
Represented By: Paul Andrew Garrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Lignite Energy Council
Represented By: William James Cobb III
Represented By: Michael J. Nasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Environment America
Represented By: Ann Brewster Weeks Esquire
Represented By: Darin T. Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Ohio Environmental Council
Represented By: Ann Brewster Weeks Esquire
Represented By: Darin T. Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: National Black Chamber of Commerce
Represented By: David B. Rivkin Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Michael Grossman
Represented By: Lee Casey
Represented By: Mark W. DeLaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of New Hampshire
Represented By: Kelvin Allen Brooks Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Delaware
Represented By: Valerie Melissa Edge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: John DuVal Walke Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Maine
Represented By: Gerald Donohue Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Maryland
Represented By: Roberta Rose James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of New York
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Donovan
Represented By: Michael J. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Physicians for Social Responsibility
Represented By: John Timothy Suttles Jr.
Represented By: Myra Dean Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: James Samuel Pew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: District of Columbia
Represented By: James C. McKay Jr.
Represented By: Todd Sunhwae Kim
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Izaak Walton League of America
Represented By: Ann Brewster Weeks Esquire
Represented By: Darin T. Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Oak Grove Management Company, LLC
Represented By: C. Grady Moore III
Represented By: Leslie Garrett Allen
Represented By: Philip Stephen Gidiere III
Represented By: Thomas Lee Casey III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Conservation Law Foundation
Represented By: Ann Brewster Weeks Esquire
Represented By: Darin T. Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: County of Erie, New York
Represented By: Jeremy Christopher Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: American Lung Association
Represented By: John Timothy Suttles Jr.
Represented By: Myra Dean Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Kimberly P. Massicotte
Represented By: Matthew Ivan Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Vermont
Represented By: Thea J. Schwartz Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Max Hollister Kieley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Sierra Club
Represented By: James Samuel Pew
Represented By: Neil Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Gregory Stage Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: National Grid Generation, LLC
Represented By: Brendan K. Collins Esquire
Represented By: Robert Bruce McKinstry Esquire Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: City of New York
Represented By: Christopher Gene King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American College of Chest Physicians
Represented By: Adam Babich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Richard J. Lazarus
Represented By: Wendy B. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Oliver A. Houck
Represented By: Wendy B. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law
Represented By: Michael Alan Livermore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jody Freeman
Represented By: Wendy B. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: William W. Buzbee
Represented By: Wendy B. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American College of Preventive Medicine
Represented By: Adam Babich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Association for the Medical Direction of Respiratory Care
Represented By: Adam Babich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Zygmunt J.B. Plater
Represented By: Wendy B. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Represented By: Robin S. Conrad Esquire
Represented By: Sandra Patricia Franco
Represented By: Michael B. Wigmore Esquire
Represented By: Rachel Lee Brand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Robert V. Percival
Represented By: Wendy B. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine
Represented By: Adam Babich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Thoracic Society
Represented By: Adam Babich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Matthew Robert Oakes
Represented By: Eric Gerig Hostetler
Represented By: Wendy Lynn Blake
Represented By: Stephanie J. Talbert
Represented By: Amanda Shafer Berman Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: White Stallion Energy Center, LLC
Represented By: Eric A. Groten
Represented By: Jeremy C. Marwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?