Jacqueline Halbig, et al v. Sylvia Mathews Burwell, et al
Amicus Curiae: Linda J. Blumberg, Leighton Ku, Jonathan Gruber, Duke AIDS Legal Project, Joel Teitelbaum, David Tedrow, Jose Szapocznik, Orrin G. Hatch, National Health Law Program, Daniel Polsky, Jeffrey Levi, Martin A. Philbert, Amitabh Chandra, AIDS Institute, Jennifer Causor, Michael Cannon, Joseph Newhouse, J. Bradford DeLong, Frank Levy, Judicial Watch, Inc., Gregory Evans, Susan F. Wood, America's Health Insurance Plans, Robert W. Blum, Philip C. Nasca, Paul B. Ginsburg, John A. Graves, Kenneth Thorpe, Commonwealth of Virginia, Southern HIV/AIDS Strategy Initiative, Gary Burtless, HIV Medicine Association, Paul Brandt-Rauf, North Carolina AIDS Action Network, Mark V. Pauly, Aidan Robinson, Benjamin Sommers, Paul D. Cleary, Richard S. Kurz, Peter Jacobson, Association for Community Affiliated Plans, AARP, State of South Carolina, Katherine Swartz, Sara Rosenbaum, Wendy K. Mariner, Peter Diamond, Stuart Altman, Michael G. Perri, Kyle L. Grazier, James B. Rebitzer, Laura Tyson, State of Kansas, Craig H. Blakely, John F. Holahan, Taylor L. Burke, Jane Hyatt Thorpe, One Voice Texas, Michelle M. Mello, American Heart Association, Lawrence Katz, Ezekiel Emanuel, Paul N. Van de Water, National Minority AIDS Council, Janet Currie, Jonathan Adler, Edwin Trevathan, Paula Lantz, Southern Poverty Law Center, John R. Finnegan, Jr., Henry J. Aaron, Sherry Glied, Martha Robinson, Alan C. Monheit, Marco Rubio, Mary Tedrow, George G. Rhoads, Peter H. Lindert, National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, National Alliance of State and Territorial AIDS Directors, State of Alabama, State of Michigan, Jay Maddock, Harold Pollack, Public Health Deans, Chairs, and Faculty, American Hospital Association, Eric S. Maskin, American Diabetes Association, Meredith Rosenthal, State of West Virginia, Claudia Goldin, Harvard Law School Center for Health Law and Policy Innovation, Members of Congress, Community Catalyst, Lawrence H. Summers, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, State of Nebraska, Karen Davis, Genevieve M. Kenney, Justin Wolfers, Dave Camp, Galen Institute, State of Georgia, Oladele A. Ogunseitan, Robert D. Reischauer, Philip J. Cook, Steve Orofino, Robert F. Meenan, State Officials, Vivian Ho, AIDS Alabama, David Cutler, Isabel Sawhill, Stephen Zuckerman, Barry Bosworth, State of Oklahoma, American Cancer Society, Jose F. Cordero, Michael Reich, Darrell E. Issa, Lynn R. Goldman, Jonathan Skinner, Jared Blitz, Laura Rudkin, Mike Lee, Austin Frakt, Pacific Research Institute, John Cornyn, Cato Institute, John B. Shoven, Rob Portman, Consumer's Research, Susan Athey, Ted Cruz, Marilyn Moon, Families USA, Jill Horwitz and Alice M. Rivlin
Defendant / Appellee: United States Department of Health and Human Services, John A. Koskinen, in his official capacity as Commissioner of Internal Revenue, Jacob J. Lew, in his official capacity as U.S. Secretary of the Treasury, United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Kathleen Sebelius, in her official capacity as U.S. Secretary of Health and Human Services, Steven L. Miller, in his official capacity as Acting Commissioner of Internal Revenue and Sylvia Mathews Burwell, in her official capacity as U.S. Secretary of Health and Human Services
Plaintiff / Appellant: GC Restaurants SA, LLC, Sarah Rumpf, Community National Bank, Jacqueline Halbig, David Klemencic, Olde England's Lion & Rose Forum, LLC, Innovare Health Advocates, Olde England's Lion & Rose, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Sonterra, Ltd, Carrie Lowery, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Westlake, LLC and Olde England's Lion & Rose at Castle Hills, Ltd
Case Number: 14-5018
Filed: January 16, 2014
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2015 MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, District Court [14-5018] [Entered: 07/09/2015 04:06 PM]
July 9, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1561796] granting appellants' motion to dismiss case voluntarily [ # 1560058-2 ], The Clerk is directed to transmit forthwith to the district court a certified copy of this order in lieu of formal mandate. [14-5018] [Entered: 07/09/2015 04:05 PM]
June 29, 2015 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1560058] by Community National Bank, GC Restaurants SA, LLC, Jacqueline Halbig, Innovare Health Advocates, David Klemencic, Carrie Lowery, Olde England's Lion & Rose Forum, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Castle Hills, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Sonterra, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Westlake, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose, Ltd and Sarah Rumpf to dismiss case voluntarily [Service Date: 06/29/2015 ] Pages: 1-10. [14-5018] (Carvin, Michael) [Entered: 06/29/2015 05:29 PM]
June 23, 2015 NOTICE FILED [1559213] by Community National Bank, GC Restaurants SA, LLC, Jacqueline Halbig, Innovare Health Advocates, David Klemencic, Carrie Lowery, Olde England's Lion & Rose Forum, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Castle Hills, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Sonterra, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Westlake, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose, Ltd and Sarah Rumpf to withdraw attorney Jonathan Andrew Berry who represented Sarah Rumpf, Olde England's Lion & Rose, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Westlake, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Sonterra, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Castle Hills, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose Forum, LLC, Carrie Lowery, David Klemencic, Innovare Health Advocates, Jacqueline Halbig, GC Restaurants SA, LLC and Community National Bank in 14-5018 [Service Date: 06/23/2015 ] [14-5018] (Carvin, Michael) [Entered: 06/23/2015 05:21 PM]
November 12, 2014 PER CURIAM ORDER, En Banc, filed [1521822] that this case be removed from the oral argument calendar of December 17, 2014, and held in abeyance pending disposition by the Supreme Court of King v. Burwell, No. 14-114 (cert. granted Nov. 7, 2014). The parties are directed to file motions to govern future proceedings within 30 days of the date of the Supreme Courts decision in King v. Burwell. Before Judges: Garland, Henderson, Rogers, Tatel, Brown, Griffith, Kavanaugh, Srinivasan, Millett, Pillard, Wilkins, Edwards and Randolph. [14-5018] [Entered: 11/12/2014 03:09 PM]
November 10, 2014 MOTION filed [1521607] by Community National Bank, GC Restaurants SA, LLC, Jacqueline Halbig, Innovare Health Advocates, David Klemencic, Carrie Lowery, Olde England's Lion & Rose Forum, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Castle Hills, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Sonterra, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Westlake, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose, Ltd and Sarah Rumpf to hold case in abeyance (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/24/2014) [Service Date: 11/10/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [14-5018] (Carvin, Michael) [Entered: 11/10/2014 03:46 PM]
November 3, 2014 CORRECTED AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1520452] filed by Craig H. Blakely, Robert W. Blum, Paul Brandt-Rauf, Taylor L. Burke, Paul D. Cleary, Jose F. Cordero, Gregory Evans, John R. Finnegan, Jr., Lynn R. Goldman, John A. Graves, Kyle L. Grazier, Peter Jacobson, Leighton Ku, Richard S. Kurz, Paula Lantz, Jeffrey Levi, Jay Maddock, Wendy K. Mariner, Robert F. Meenan, Michelle M. Mello, Philip C. Nasca, Oladele A. Ogunseitan, Michael G. Perri, Martin A. Philbert, George G. Rhoads, Sara Rosenbaum, Laura Rudkin, Benjamin Sommers, Katherine Swartz, Jose Szapocznik, Joel Teitelbaum, Kenneth Thorpe, Edwin Trevathan and Susan F. Wood [Service Date: 11/03/2014 ] Length of Brief: This brief complies with the type-volume limitation of Fed. R. App. P. 32(a)(7)(B) because this brief contains 6,997 words, excluding the parts of the brief exempted by Fed. R. App. P. 32(a)(7)(B)(iii).. [14-5018] (Goel, Ankur) [Entered: 11/03/2014 09:38 PM]
November 3, 2014 CORRECTED AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1520430] filed by AIDS Alabama, AIDS Institute, Association for Community Affiliated Plans, Community Catalyst, Duke AIDS Legal Project, HIV Medicine Association, Harvard Law School Center for Health Law and Policy Innovation, National Alliance of State and Territorial AIDS Directors, National Minority AIDS Council, North Carolina AIDS Action Network, One Voice Texas and Southern HIV/AIDS Strategy Initiative [Service Date: 11/03/2014 ] Length of Brief: 5,808 Words. [14-5018] (Fleming, Mark) [Entered: 11/03/2014 06:00 PM]
November 3, 2014 APPELLEE BRIEF [1520363] filed by Sylvia Mathews Burwell, IRS, John A. Koskinen, Jacob J. Lew, HHS and TREA [Service Date: 11/03/2014 ] Length of Brief: 13,876 words. [14-5018] (Klein, Alisa) [Entered: 11/03/2014 03:23 PM]
November 3, 2014 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1520359] filed by American Hospital Association [Service Date: 11/03/2014 ] Length of Brief: 4,120 words. [14-5018] (Perella, Dominic) [Entered: 11/03/2014 03:14 PM]
November 3, 2014 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1520350] filed by Henry J. Aaron, Stuart Altman, Susan Athey, Linda J. Blumberg, Barry Bosworth, Gary Burtless, Amitabh Chandra, Philip J. Cook, Janet Currie, David Cutler, Karen Davis, J. Bradford DeLong, Ezekiel Emanuel, Austin Frakt, Paul B. Ginsburg, Sherry Glied, Claudia Goldin, Jonathan Gruber, Vivian Ho, John F. Holahan, Jill Horwitz, Lawrence Katz, Genevieve M. Kenney, Frank Levy, Peter H. Lindert, Eric S. Maskin, Alan C. Monheit, Marilyn Moon, Joseph Newhouse, Mark V. Pauly, Harold Pollack, Daniel Polsky, James B. Rebitzer, Michael Reich, Robert D. Reischauer, Alice M. Rivlin, Meredith Rosenthal, Isabel Sawhill, John B. Shoven, Jonathan Skinner, Lawrence H. Summers, Katherine Swartz, Kenneth Thorpe, Laura Tyson, Paul N. Van de Water, Justin Wolfers and Stephen Zuckerman [Service Date: 11/03/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6,994 words. [14-5018] (Hellman, Matthew) [Entered: 11/03/2014 02:52 PM]
November 3, 2014 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD-corrected brief filed-AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1520343] filed by AIDS Alabama, AIDS Institute, Association for Community Affiliated Plans, Community Catalyst, Duke AIDS Legal Project, HIV Medicine Association, Harvard Law School Center for Health Law and Policy Innovation, National Alliance of State and Territorial AIDS Directors, National Minority AIDS Council, North Carolina AIDS Action Network, One Voice Texas and Southern HIV/AIDS Strategy Initiative [Service Date: 11/03/2014 ] Length of Brief: 5, 808 Words. [14-5018]--[Edited 11/04/2014 by LMC] (Fleming, Mark) [Entered: 11/03/2014 02:42 PM]
November 3, 2014 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD-corrected brief filed-AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1520338] filed by Craig H. Blakely, Robert W. Blum, Paul Brandt-Rauf, Taylor L. Burke, Paul D. Cleary, Jose F. Cordero, Gregory Evans, John R. Finnegan, Jr., Lynn R. Goldman, John A. Graves, Kyle L. Grazier, Peter Jacobson, Leighton Ku, Richard S. Kurz, Paula Lantz, Jeffrey Levi, Jay Maddock, Wendy K. Mariner, Robert F. Meenan, Michelle M. Mello, Philip C. Nasca, Oladele A. Ogunseitan, Michael G. Perri, Martin A. Philbert, George G. Rhoads, Sara Rosenbaum, Laura Rudkin, Benjamin Sommers, Katherine Swartz, Katherine Swartz, Jose Szapocznik, Joel Teitelbaum, Jane Hyatt Thorpe, Edwin Trevathan and Susan F. Wood [Service Date: 11/03/2014 ] Length of Brief: 1. This brief complies with the type-volume limitation of Fed. R. App. P. 32(a)(7)(B) because this brief contains 9,451 words, excluding the parts of the brief exempted by Fed. R. App. P. 32(a)(7)(B)(iii). 2.This brief complies with the typeface requirem. [14-5018] [14-5018]--[Edited 11/04/2014 by LMC] (Goel, Ankur) [Entered: 11/03/2014 02:32 PM]
November 3, 2014 CONSENT AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1520326] filed by Families USA [Service Date: 11/03/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6,835 Words. [14-5018] (Hussain, Murad) [Entered: 11/03/2014 02:02 PM]
November 3, 2014 CONSENT AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1520319] filed by AARP, National Health Law Program and Southern Poverty Law Center [Service Date: 11/03/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6,765 words. [14-5018] (Gonzalez, Iris) [Entered: 11/03/2014 01:58 PM]
November 3, 2014 CORRECTED AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1520304] filed by America's Health Insurance Plans [Service Date: 11/03/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6,824 Words. [14-5018] (Pincus, Andrew) [Entered: 11/03/2014 01:10 PM]
November 3, 2014 CONSENT AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1520278] filed by Members of Congress [Service Date: 11/03/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6,734 words. [14-5018] (Wydra, Elizabeth) [Entered: 11/03/2014 11:47 AM]
November 3, 2014 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1520277] filed by America's Health Insurance Plans [Service Date: 11/03/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6,824 Words. [14-5018] (Pincus, Andrew) [Entered: 11/03/2014 11:41 AM]
November 3, 2014 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1520255] filed by Commonwealth of Virginia [Service Date: 11/03/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6,744 words. [14-5018] (Raphael, Stuart) [Entered: 11/03/2014 11:07 AM]
November 3, 2014 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1520248] filed by Jared Blitz, Jennifer Causor, Steve Orofino, Aidan Robinson, Martha Robinson, David Tedrow and Mary Tedrow [Service Date: 11/03/2014 ] Length of Brief: 5,798 Words. [14-5018] (Kapke, Kara) [Entered: 11/03/2014 10:24 AM]
November 2, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER-- AMENDED NOTICE filed [1520216] by Susan F. Wood, Jane Hyatt Thorpe, Joel Teitelbaum, Katherine Swartz, Benjamin Sommers, Sara Rosenbaum, Michelle M. Mello, Wendy K. Mariner, Jay Maddock, Jeffrey Levi, Leighton Ku, Peter Jacobson, John A. Graves, Taylor L. Burke, Jose Szapocznik, Oladele A. Ogunseitan, Laura Rudkin, Paula Lantz, Kyle L. Grazier, Robert W. Blum, Edwin Trevathan, George G. Rhoads, Martin A. Philbert, Michael G. Perri, Philip C. Nasca, Robert F. Meenan, Richard S. Kurz, Lynn R. Goldman, John R. Finnegan, Jr., Gregory Evans, Jose F. Cordero, Paul D. Cleary, Paul Brandt-Rauf and Craig H. Blakely of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 11/02/2014 ] [14-5018]--[Edited 11/03/2014 by LMC] (Goel, Ankur) [Entered: 11/02/2014 10:23 PM]
November 1, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER-- AMENDED NOTICE filed [1520215] by Harvard Law School Center for Health Law and Policy Innovation, Southern HIV/AIDS Strategy Initiative, One Voice Texas, North Carolina AIDS Action Network, National Minority AIDS Council, National Alliance of State and Territorial AIDS Directors, HIV Medicine Association, Duke AIDS Legal Project, Community Catalyst, Association for Community Affiliated Plans, AIDS Institute and AIDS Alabama of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 11/01/2014 ] [14-5018]--[Edited 11/03/2014 by LMC] (Fleming, Mark) [Entered: 11/01/2014 12:49 PM]
October 31, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--NOTICE filed [1520095] by Jared Blitz Jennifer Causor Steve Orofino Aidan Robinson Martha Robinson David Tedrow Mary Tedrow of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 10/31/2014 ] [14-5018]--[Edited 10/31/2014 by LMC] (Kapke, Kara) [Entered: 10/31/2014 01:46 PM]
October 31, 2014 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1520074] by Martha Jane Perkins on behalf of Amicus Curiae for Appellee National Health Law Program. [14-5018] (Perkins, Martha) [Entered: 10/31/2014 12:51 PM]
October 31, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--NOTICE filed [1520006] by National Health Law Program and Southern Poverty Law Center of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 10/31/2014 ] [14-5018]--[Edited 10/31/2014 by LMC] (Perkins, Martha) [Entered: 10/31/2014 10:59 AM]
October 31, 2014 CONSENT NOTICE filed [1519970] by GROUP OF PUBLIC HEALTH DEANS, CHAIRS, AND FACULTY of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 10/31/2014 ] [14-5018] (Goel, Ankur) [Entered: 10/31/2014 09:55 AM]
October 30, 2014 JOINT AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1519773] filed by American Cancer Society, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Diabetes Association and American Heart Association [Service Date: 10/30/2014 ] [14-5018] (Rouvelas, Mary) [Entered: 10/30/2014 11:24 AM]
October 30, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--NOTICE filed [1519745] by National Health Law Program of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 10/30/2014 ] [14-5018]--[Edited 10/30/2014 by LMC] (Perkins, Martha) [Entered: 10/30/2014 10:34 AM]
October 29, 2014 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1519686] granting appellees' unopposed motion for a one-day extension of time in which to file paper copies of briefs [ # 1519492-2 ]. [14-5018] [Entered: 10/29/2014 05:05 PM]
October 29, 2014 NOTICE filed [1519631] by Economic Scholars of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 10/29/2014 ] [14-5018] (Hellman, Matthew) [Entered: 10/29/2014 03:16 PM]
October 29, 2014 NOTICE filed [1519598] by Commonwealth of Virginia of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 10/29/2014 ] [14-5018] (Raphael, Stuart) [Entered: 10/29/2014 01:53 PM]
October 28, 2014 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1519492] by Sylvia Mathews Burwell, IRS, John A. Koskinen, Jacob J. Lew, HHS and TREA to extend time to file brief to 11/04/2014. [Service Date: 10/28/2014 ] Pages: 1-10. [14-5018] (Klein, Alisa) [Entered: 10/28/2014 06:21 PM]
October 27, 2014 JOINT NOTICE filed [1519149] by American Cancer Society, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Diabetes Association, American Heart Association of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 10/27/2014 ] [14-5018] (Rouvelas, Mary) [Entered: 10/27/2014 01:51 PM]
October 24, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--NOTICE filed [1518921] by Harvard Law School Center for Health Law and Policy Innovation of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 10/24/2014 ] [14-5018]--[Edited 10/24/2014 by LMC] (Fleming, Mark) [Entered: 10/24/2014 03:24 PM]
October 14, 2014 NOTICE filed [1516881] by AARP of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 10/14/2014 ] [14-5018] (Gonzalez, Iris) [Entered: 10/14/2014 12:50 PM]
October 7, 2014 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1515957] by Iris Y. Gonzalez on behalf of Amicus Curiae for Appellee AARP. [14-5018] (Gonzalez, Iris) [Entered: 10/07/2014 03:57 PM]
October 3, 2014 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1515524] filed by Dave Camp, John Cornyn, Ted Cruz, Orrin G. Hatch, Darrell E. Issa, Mike Lee and Marco Rubio [Service Date: 10/03/2014 ] Length of Brief: 5707. [14-5018] (Cooper, Charles) [Entered: 10/03/2014 04:47 PM]
October 3, 2014 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1515507] filed by Galen Institute [Service Date: 10/03/2014 ] Length of Brief: 5,276 words. [14-5018] (Gustafson, Adam) [Entered: 10/03/2014 03:51 PM]
October 3, 2014 NOTICE FILED [1515498] filed by Dave Camp, John Cornyn, Ted Cruz, Orrin G. Hatch, Darrell E. Issa, Mike Lee and Marco Rubio of Intent To File Amicus Brief. [Service Date: 10/03/2014 ] [14-5018] (Cooper, Charles) [Entered: 10/03/2014 03:32 PM]
October 3, 2014 JOINT APPENDIX [1515497] filed by Community National Bank, GC Restaurants SA, LLC, Jacqueline Halbig, Innovare Health Advocates, David Klemencic, Carrie Lowery, Olde England's Lion & Rose Forum, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Castle Hills, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Sonterra, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Westlake, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose, Ltd, Sarah Rumpf and Sylvia Mathews Burwell, IRS, John A. Koskinen, Jacob J. Lew, HHS and TREA. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 10/03/2014 ] [14-5018] (Carvin, Michael) [Entered: 10/03/2014 03:31 PM]
October 3, 2014 APPELLANT BRIEF [1515493] filed by Community National Bank, GC Restaurants SA, LLC, Jacqueline Halbig, Innovare Health Advocates, David Klemencic, Carrie Lowery, Olde England's Lion & Rose Forum, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Castle Hills, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Sonterra, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Westlake, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose, Ltd and Sarah Rumpf [Service Date: 10/03/2014 ] Length of Brief: 13,908 Words. [14-5018] (Carvin, Michael) [Entered: 10/03/2014 03:21 PM]
October 3, 2014 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1515419] filed by State of Kansas and State of Nebraska [Service Date: 10/03/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6773 words. [14-5018] (Chanay, Jeffrey) [Entered: 10/03/2014 12:55 PM]
October 3, 2014 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1515395] filed by Cato Institute and Pacific Research Institute [Service Date: 10/03/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6,976 words. [14-5018] (Rein, Bertram) [Entered: 10/03/2014 11:39 AM]
October 3, 2014 CONSENT AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1515365] filed by Jonathan Adler and Michael Cannon [Service Date: 10/03/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6,985 Words. [14-5018] (Grant, Eric) [Entered: 10/03/2014 11:02 AM]
October 3, 2014 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1515353] filed by Judicial Watch, Inc. [Service Date: 10/03/2014 ] Length of Brief: 2111 words. [14-5018] (Bekesha, Michael) [Entered: 10/03/2014 10:48 AM]
October 1, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--NOTICE filed [1514876] by Judicial Watch, Inc. of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 10/01/2014 ] [14-5018]--[Edited 10/01/2014 by LMC] (Bekesha, Michael) [Entered: 10/01/2014 10:22 AM]
September 4, 2014 Publishing Order [ # 1510560-4 ] [14-5018] [Entered: 09/04/2014 09:32 AM]
September 4, 2014 PER CURIAM ORDER, En Banc, filed [1510560] that the petition be granted [ # 1505583-1 ]. Case No. 14-5018 will be reheard by the court sitting en banc. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the judgment filed July 22, 2014, be vacated. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the oral argument before the en banc court be heard at 9:30 a.m. on Wednesday, December 17, 2014, in Courtroom #20, Sixth Floor. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, in addition to filing briefs electronically, the parties file 30 paper copies of each of their briefs and the appendix, in accordance with the following schedule: Brief for Appellants - October 3, 2014; Joint Appendix - October 3, 2014; Brief(s) for Amici Curiae for Appellants - October 3, 2014; Brief for Appellees - November 3, 2014; Brief(s) for Amici Curiae for Appellees - November 3, 2014; Reply Brief for Appellants - November 17, 2014. Parties are directed to hand deliver the paper copies of their briefs to the Clerks office by the date due. Before Judges: Garland, Henderson, Rogers, Tatel, Brown, Griffith, Kavanaugh, Srinivasan, Millett, Pillard and Wilkins. [14-5018] [Entered: 09/04/2014 09:28 AM]
August 18, 2014 RESPONSE FILED [1508041] by Community National Bank, GC Restaurants SA, LLC, Jacqueline Halbig, Innovare Health Advocates, David Klemencic, Carrie Lowery, Olde England's Lion & Rose Forum, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Castle Hills, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Sonterra, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Westlake, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose, Ltd and Sarah Rumpf to petition for rehearing en banc [ # 1505583-2 ] [Service Date: 08/18/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [14-5018] (Carvin, Michael) [Entered: 08/18/2014 03:52 PM]
August 1, 2014 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1505780] Upon consideration of the petition for rehearing en banc, it is ORDERED, on the courts own motion, that within 15 days of the date of this order, appellants file a response to the petition for rehearing en banc, not to exceed 15 pages. Absent further order of the court, the court will not accept a reply to the response. [ # 1505583-2 ] [14-5018] [Entered: 08/01/2014 05:01 PM]
August 1, 2014 PETITION filed [1505583] by Appellees Sylvia Mathews Burwell, IRS, John A. Koskinen, Jacob J. Lew, HHS and TREA for rehearing en banc. [Service Date: 08/01/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [14-5018] (Klein, Alisa) [Entered: 08/01/2014 12:03 PM]
July 24, 2014 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1504290] dismissing as moot motion to strike document [ # 1484024-2 ] in light of the court's opinion issued July 22, 2014. Before Judges: Griffith, Edwards and Randolph. [14-5018] [Entered: 07/24/2014 11:33 AM]
July 22, 2014 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1503851] withholding issuance of the mandate. [14-5018] [Entered: 07/22/2014 10:14 AM]
July 22, 2014 OPINION filed [1503850] (Pages: 42) for the Court by Judge Griffith, CONCURRING OPINION (Pages: 1) by Judge Randolph, DISSENTING OPINION (Pages: 29) by Judge Edwards [14-5018] [Entered: 07/22/2014 10:13 AM]
July 22, 2014 [THIS JUDGMENT VACATED BY COURT'S 9/4/14 PER CURIAM ORDER] PER CURIAM JUDGMENT filed [1503849] that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in this cause is hereby reversed and the case is remanded with instructions to grant summary judgment to appellants and vacate the IRS Rule for the reasons in the accompanying opinion. Before Judges: Griffith, Edwards and Randolph. [14-5018] [Entered: 07/22/2014 10:10 AM]
June 25, 2014 RESPONSE FILED [1499319] by Sylvia Mathews Burwell, IRS, John A. Koskinen, Jacob J. Lew, HHS and TREA to letter Rule 28j authorities [ # 1499131-2 ], letter [ # 1499131-3 ] [Service Date: 06/25/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [14-5018] (Klein, Alisa) [Entered: 06/25/2014 12:47 PM]
June 24, 2014 LETTER FILED [1499131] by Community National Bank, GC Restaurants SA, LLC, Jacqueline Halbig, Innovare Health Advocates, David Klemencic, Carrie Lowery, Olde England's Lion & Rose Forum, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Castle Hills, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Sonterra, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Westlake, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose, Ltd and Sarah Rumpf pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 06/24/2014 ] [14-5018] (Carvin, Michael) [Entered: 06/24/2014 10:40 AM]
May 29, 2014 RESPONSE FILED [1495018] by IRS, John A. Koskinen, Jacob J. Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, HHS and TREA to letter Rule 28j authorities [ # 1494586-2 ], letter [ # 1494586-3 ] [Service Date: 05/29/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [14-5018] (Klein, Alisa) [Entered: 05/29/2014 11:24 AM]
May 27, 2014 LETTER FILED [1494586] by Community National Bank, GC Restaurants SA, LLC, Jacqueline Halbig, Innovare Health Advocates, David Klemencic, Carrie Lowery, Olde England's Lion & Rose Forum, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Castle Hills, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Sonterra, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Westlake, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose, Ltd and Sarah Rumpf pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 05/27/2014 ] [14-5018] (Carvin, Michael) [Entered: 05/27/2014 02:31 PM]
March 31, 2014 TRANSCRIPT [1486267] of oral argument [14-5018] [Entered: 03/31/2014 02:50 PM]
March 25, 2014 ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Griffith, Edwards and Randolph. [14-5018] [Entered: 03/25/2014 11:11 AM]
March 20, 2014 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1484667] deferring consideration of motion to strike document [ # 1484024-2 ] pending further order of the Court. Before Judges: Griffith, Edwards and Randolph. [14-5018] [Entered: 03/20/2014 04:30 PM]
March 20, 2014 LETTER FILED [1484557] by Community National Bank, GC Restaurants SA, LLC, Jacqueline Halbig, Innovare Health Advocates, David Klemencic, Carrie Lowery, Olde England's Lion & Rose Forum, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Castle Hills, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Sonterra, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Westlake, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose, Ltd and Sarah Rumpf pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 03/20/2014 ] [14-5018] (Carvin, Michael) [Entered: 03/20/2014 10:35 AM]
March 14, 2014 MOTION filed [1484024] by Community National Bank, GC Restaurants SA, LLC, Jacqueline Halbig, Innovare Health Advocates, David Klemencic, Carrie Lowery, Olde England's Lion & Rose Forum, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Castle Hills, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Sonterra, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Westlake, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose, Ltd and Sarah Rumpf to strike the notice (Response to Motion served by mail due on 03/27/2014) [Service Date: 03/14/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [14-5018] (Carvin, Michael) [Entered: 03/14/2014 02:13 PM]
March 12, 2014 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Michael Carvin, on behalf of Appellants Community National Bank, GC Restaurants SA, LLC, Jacqueline Halbig, Innovare Health Advocates, David Klemencic, Carrie Lowery, Olde England's Lion & Rose Forum, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Castle Hills, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Sonterra, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Westlake, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose, Ltd and Sarah Rumpf. [14-5018] (Carvin, Michael) [Entered: 03/12/2014 03:54 PM]
March 12, 2014 LETTER FILED [1483516] by IRS, John A. Koskinen, Jacob J. Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, HHS and TREA pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 03/12/2014 ] [14-5018] (Klein, Alisa) [Entered: 03/12/2014 10:09 AM]
March 11, 2014 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Stuart F. Delery, on behalf of Appellees IRS, John A. Koskinen, Jacob J. Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, HHS and TREA. [14-5018] (Klein, Alisa) [Entered: 03/11/2014 07:17 PM]
March 11, 2014 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1483474] by Alisa B. Klein (already appeared) and co-counsel Stuart F. Delery on behalf of Appellees IRS, John A. Koskinen, Jacob J. Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, HHS and TREA. [14-5018] (Klein, Alisa) [Entered: 03/11/2014 07:15 PM]
March 11, 2014 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1483463] allocating oral argument time as follows: Appellants -- 30 Minutes, Appellees -- 30 Minutes; directing party to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney - due 03/18/2014 [14-5018] [Entered: 03/11/2014 05:53 PM]
March 7, 2014 RESPONSE FILED [1482749] by IRS, John A. Koskinen, Jacob J. Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, HHS and TREA to letter Rule 28j authorities [ # 1482055-2 ], letter [ # 1482055-3 ] [Service Date: 03/07/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [14-5018] (Klein, Alisa) [Entered: 03/07/2014 10:17 AM]
February 28, 2014 LETTER FILED [1482055] by Community National Bank, GC Restaurants SA, LLC, Jacqueline Halbig, Innovare Health Advocates, David Klemencic, Carrie Lowery, Olde England's Lion & Rose Forum, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Castle Hills, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Sonterra, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Westlake, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose, Ltd and Sarah Rumpf pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 02/28/2014 ] [14-5018] (Carvin, Michael) [Entered: 02/28/2014 03:38 PM]
February 20, 2014 LETTER FILED [1480726] by IRS, John A. Koskinen, Jacob J. Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, HHS and TREA pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 02/20/2014 ] [14-5018] (Klein, Alisa) [Entered: 02/20/2014 10:53 AM]
February 19, 2014 APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1480655] filed by Community National Bank, GC Restaurants SA, LLC, Jacqueline Halbig, Innovare Health Advocates, David Klemencic, Carrie Lowery, Olde England's Lion & Rose Forum, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Castle Hills, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Sonterra, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Westlake, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose, Ltd and Sarah Rumpf [Service Date: 02/19/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6,975 words. [14-5018] (Carvin, Michael) [Entered: 02/19/2014 06:56 PM]
February 18, 2014 CORRECTED AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1480372] filed by Families USA [Service Date: 02/18/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6,931 Words. [14-5018] (Hussain, Murad) [Entered: 02/18/2014 03:31 PM]
February 18, 2014 CORRECTED AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1480246] filed by Henry J. Aaron, Stuart Altman, Susan Athey, Linda J. Blumberg, Barry Bosworth, Gary Burtless, Amitabh Chandra, Philip J. Cook, Janet Currie, David Cutler, Karen Davis, J. Bradford DeLong, Peter Diamond, Ezekiel Emanuel, Austin Frakt, Paul B. Ginsburg, Sherry Glied, Claudia Goldin, Jonathan Gruber, Vivian Ho, John F. Holahan, Jill Horwitz, Lawrence Katz, Genevieve M. Kenney, Frank Levy, Peter H. Lindert, Eric S. Maskin, Alan C. Monheit, Marilyn Moon, Joseph Newhouse, Mark V. Pauly, Harold Pollack, Daniel Polsky, James B. Rebitzer, Michael Reich, Robert D. Reischauer, Alice M. Rivlin, Meredith Rosenthal, Isabel Sawhill, John B. Shoven, Jonathan Skinner, Lawrence H. Summers, Katherine Swartz, Kenneth Thorpe, Laura Tyson, Paul N. Van de Water, Justin Wolfers and Stephen Zuckerman [Service Date: 02/17/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6,948 words. [14-5018] (Hellman, Matthew) [Entered: 02/18/2014 11:18 AM]
February 17, 2014 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD-corrected brief will be filed-AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1480153] filed by [Service Date: 02/17/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6,948 words. [14-5018]--[Edited 02/18/2014 by LMC] (Hellman, Matthew) [Entered: 02/17/2014 11:51 AM]
February 17, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--NOTICE filed [1480152] by Families USA of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 02/17/2014 ] [14-5018]--[Edited 02/18/2014 by LMC] (Hussain, Murad) [Entered: 02/17/2014 11:41 AM]
February 17, 2014 CONSENT AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1480151] filed by AARP [Service Date: 02/17/2014 ] Length of Brief: 5, 923 words. [14-5018] (Bagby, Kelly) [Entered: 02/17/2014 11:38 AM]
February 17, 2014 MODIFIED EVENT-- AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1480150] filed by America's Health Insurance Plans [Service Date: 02/17/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6,066 words. [14-5018]--[Edited 02/18/2014 by LMC] (Pincus, Andrew) [Entered: 02/17/2014 11:21 AM]
February 17, 2014 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1480149] filed by American Hospital Association [Service Date: 02/17/2013 ] Length of Brief: 3,462 Words. [14-5018] (Perella, Dominic) [Entered: 02/17/2014 11:19 AM]
February 15, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER-- CORRECTED AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1480148] filed by Members of Congress and State Officials [Service Date: 02/15/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6998 words. [14-5018]--[Edited 02/18/2014 by LMC] (Wydra, Elizabeth) [Entered: 02/15/2014 02:06 PM]
February 14, 2014 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD-corrected brief filed- CONSENT AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1480146] filed by Members of Congress [Service Date: 02/14/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6998 words. [14-5018]--[Edited 02/18/2014 by LMC] (Wydra, Elizabeth) [Entered: 02/14/2014 07:54 PM]
February 14, 2014 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1480134] filed by Public Health Deans, Chairs, and Faculty [Service Date: 02/14/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6,876 words. [14-5018] (Goel, Ankur) [Entered: 02/14/2014 05:04 PM]
February 14, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--NOTICE filed [1480132] by Stephen Zuckerman, Justin Wolfers, Paul N. Van de Water, Laura Tyson, Kenneth Thorpe, Katherine Swartz, Lawrence H. Summers, Jonathan Skinner, John B. Shoven, Isabel Sawhill, Meredith Rosenthal, Alice M. Rivlin, Robert D. Reischauer, Michael Reich, James B. Rebitzer, Daniel Polsky, Harold Pollack, Mark V. Pauly, Joseph Newhouse, Alan C. Monheit, Marilyn Moon, Eric S. Maskin, Peter H. Lindert, Frank Levy, Lawrence Katz, Jill Horwitz, John F. Holahan, Vivian Ho, Genevieve M. Kenney, Jonathan Gruber, Claudia Goldin, Paul B. Ginsburg, Sherry Glied, Austin Frakt, Ezekiel Emanuel, Peter Diamond, J. Bradford DeLong, Karen Davis, David Cutler, Janet Currie, Philip J. Cook, Amitabh Chandra, Gary Burtless, Barry Bosworth, Linda J. Blumberg, Susan Athey, Stuart Altman and Henry J. Aaron of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 02/17/2014 ] [14-5018]--[Edited 02/18/2014 by LMC] (Hellman, Matthew) [Entered: 02/14/2014 04:54 PM]
February 14, 2014 JOINT AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1480067] filed by American Cancer Society, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Diabetes Association and American Heart Association [Service Date: 02/14/2014 ] Length of Brief: 4,890. [14-5018] (Rouvelas, Mary) [Entered: 02/14/2014 01:53 PM]
February 14, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER-- JOINT NOTICE filed [1480058] by American Cancer Society, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Diabetes Association, American Heart Association of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 02/14/2014 ] [14-5018]--[Edited 02/14/2014 by LMC] (Rouvelas, Mary) [Entered: 02/14/2014 01:24 PM]
February 12, 2014 APPELLEE BRIEF [1479834] filed by IRS, John A. Koskinen, Jacob J. Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, HHS and TREA [Service Date: 02/12/2014 ] Length of Brief: 13,754 words. [14-5018] (Klein, Alisa) [Entered: 02/12/2014 03:30 PM]
February 12, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER-- CONSENT NOTICE filed [1479823]by Public Health Deans, Chairs, and Faculty of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 02/12/2014 ] [14-5018]--[Edited 02/12/2014 by LMC] (Goel, Ankur) [Entered: 02/12/2014 03:07 PM]
February 12, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER-- CONSENT NOTICE filed [1479714] by Members of Congress and State Officials of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 02/12/2014 ] [14-5018]--[Edited 02/12/2014 by LMC] (Wydra, Elizabeth) [Entered: 02/12/2014 11:11 AM]
February 11, 2014 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1479610] granting the joint motion to extend the due dates for paper briefs until the next business day after the briefs are due [ # 1479414-2 ]. [14-5018] [Entered: 02/11/2014 04:51 PM]
February 11, 2014 JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1479414] by IRS, John A. Koskinen, Jacob J. Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, HHS and TREA to extend time to file brief to 02/14/2014. [Service Date: 02/11/2014 ] Pages: 1-10. [14-5018] (Klein, Alisa) [Entered: 02/11/2014 09:12 AM]
February 7, 2014 CORRECTED AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1478864] filed by National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center [Service Date: 02/06/2014 ] Length of Brief: 5,908 Words. [14-5018] (Woodrum, John) [Entered: 02/07/2014 11:40 AM]
February 6, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1478785] filed by Galen Institute [Service Date: 02/06/2014 ] Length of Brief: 5,106 words. [14-5018]--[Edited 02/07/2014 by LMC] (Gustafson, Adam) [Entered: 02/06/2014 11:56 PM]
February 6, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1478784] filed by Dave Camp, John Cornyn, Ted Cruz, Orrin G. Hatch, Darrell E. Issa, Mike Lee, Rob Portman and Marco Rubio [Service Date: 02/06/2014 ] Length of Brief: 5,613 words. [14-5018]--[Edited 02/07/2014 by LMC] (Cooper, Charles) [Entered: 02/06/2014 08:35 PM]
February 6, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--NOTICE filed [1478783] by Darrell E. Issa, Dave Camp, Marco Rubio, Rob Portman, Mike Lee, Orrin G. Hatch, Ted Cruz and John Cornyn of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 02/06/2014 ] [14-5018]--[Edited 02/07/2014 by LMC] (Cooper, Charles) [Entered: 02/06/2014 08:04 PM]
February 6, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--NOTICE filed [1478782] by The Galen Institute of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 02/06/2014 ] [14-5018]--[Edited 02/07/2014 by LMC] (Gustafson, Adam) [Entered: 02/06/2014 07:58 PM]
February 6, 2014 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD-corrected brief to be filed-AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1478780] filed by National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center [Service Date: 02/06/2014 ] Length of Brief: 5,908. [14-5018]--[Edited 02/07/2014 by LMC] (Woodrum, John) [Entered: 02/06/2014 07:54 PM]
February 6, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1478779] filed by filed by State of Kansas, State of Michigan, State of Nebraska and State of Nebraska [Service Date: 02/06/2014 ] [14-5018] Length of Brief: This brief contains 6,932 words. [14-5018]--[Edited 02/07/2014 by LMC] (Chanay, Jeffrey) [Entered: 02/06/2014 07:25 PM]
February 6, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--NOTICE filed [1478778] by States of Kansas, Michigan, and Nebraska of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 02/06/2014 ] [14-5018]--[Edited 02/07/2014 by LMC] (Chanay, Jeffrey) [Entered: 02/06/2014 07:09 PM]
February 6, 2014 CORRECTED AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1478754] filed by Jonathan Adler and Michael Cannon [Service Date: 02/06/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6,814 Words. [14-5018] (Grossman, Andrew) [Entered: 02/06/2014 04:19 PM]
February 6, 2014 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1478744] filed by Cato Institute and Pacific Research Institute [Service Date: 02/06/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6,120 words. [14-5018] (Rein, Bertram) [Entered: 02/06/2014 04:02 PM]
February 6, 2014 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1478682] filed by Jonathan Adler and Michael Cannon [Service Date: 02/06/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6,814 Words. [14-5018]--[Edited 02/07/2014 by LMC] (Grossman, Andrew) [Entered: 02/06/2014 02:37 PM]
February 6, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--NOTICE filed [1478603] by National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 02/06/2014 ] [14-5018]--[Edited 02/06/2014 by LMC] (Woodrum, John) [Entered: 02/06/2014 11:32 AM]
February 5, 2014 MODIFIED EVENT--AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1478525] [1478525] filed by Consumer's Research, State of Alabama, State of Georgia, State of Nebraska, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina and State of West Virginia [Service Date: 02/05/2014 ] Length of Brief: Word Count: 4,739. [14-5018]--[Edited 02/06/2014 by KRM] (Beynon, Rebecca) [Entered: 02/05/2014 08:30 PM]
February 5, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--NOTICE filed [1478522] by States of Oklahoma, Alabama, Georgia, West Virginia, Nebraska, and South Carolina, and Consumers' Research of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 02/05/2014 ] [14-5018]--[Edited 02/06/2014 by KRM] (Beynon, Rebecca) [Entered: 02/05/2014 07:54 PM]
February 5, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--NOTICE filed [1478514] by America's Health Insurance Plans of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 02/05/2014 ] [14-5018]--[Edited 02/06/2014 by LMC] (Pincus, Andrew) [Entered: 02/05/2014 04:51 PM]
February 2, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--NOTICE filed [1477891] by Jonathan Adler and Michael Cannon of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 02/02/2014 ] [14-5018]--[Edited 02/03/2014 by LMC] (Grossman, Andrew) [Entered: 02/02/2014 10:45 AM]
January 31, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--NOTICE filed [1477780] by American Hospital Association of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 01/31/2014 ] [14-5018]--[Edited 01/31/2014 by LMC] (Perella, Dominic) [Entered: 01/31/2014 01:26 PM]
January 30, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--NOTICE filed [1477682] by Cato Institute and Pacific Research Institute of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 01/30/2014 ] [14-5018]--[Edited 01/31/2014 by LMC] (Rein, Bertram) [Entered: 01/30/2014 08:57 PM]
January 30, 2014 JOINT APPENDIX [1477680] filed by Community National Bank, GC Restaurants SA, LLC, Jacqueline Halbig, Innovare Health Advocates, David Klemencic, Carrie Lowery, Olde England's Lion & Rose Forum, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Castle Hills, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Sonterra, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Westlake, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose, Ltd, Sarah Rumpf and IRS, John A. Koskinen, Jacob J. Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, HHS and TREA. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 01/30/2014 ] [14-5018] (Carvin, Michael) [Entered: 01/30/2014 06:00 PM]
January 30, 2014 APPELLANT BRIEF [1477678] filed by Community National Bank, GC Restaurants SA, LLC, Jacqueline Halbig, Innovare Health Advocates, David Klemencic, Carrie Lowery, Olde England's Lion & Rose Forum, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Castle Hills, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Sonterra, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Westlake, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose, Ltd and Sarah Rumpf [Service Date: 01/30/2014 ] Length of Brief: 13,941. [14-5018] (Carvin, Michael) [Entered: 01/30/2014 05:58 PM]
January 29, 2014 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1477407] granting the parties' joint motion to set due dates for amicus briefs [ # 1477318-2 ]. Amici curiae are reminded that non-governmental amici curiae on the same side must file a single brief or certify to the court why separate briefing is necessary. See D.C. Cir. Rule 29(d). In addition, amici curiae are directed to that portion of Rule 29(d) describing generally unacceptable grounds for filing separate briefs. [14-5018] [Entered: 01/29/2014 04:23 PM]
January 29, 2014 JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1477318] by IRS, John A. Koskinen, Jacob J. Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, HHS and TREA to establish briefing schedule [Service Date: 01/29/2014 ] Pages: 1-10. [14-5018] (Klein, Alisa) [Entered: 01/29/2014 11:42 AM]
January 28, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--NOTICE filed [1477175] by AARP of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 01/28/2014 ] [14-5018]--[Edited 01/29/2014 by LMC] (Bagby, Kelly) [Entered: 01/28/2014 02:30 PM]
January 23, 2014 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1476321] scheduling oral argument before Judges GRIFFITH, EDWARDS, RANDOLPH Tuesday, 03/25/2014 AM [14-5018] [Entered: 01/23/2014 12:24 PM]
January 23, 2014 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1476316] that in consideration of appellant's motion to expedite the appeal, it is ORDERED that the following briefing schedule apply: Brief for Appellants (not to exceed 14,000 words) due on January 30, 2014, Joint Appendix due on January 30, 2014, Brief for Appellees (not to exceed 14,000 words) due on February 13, 2014, Reply Brief for Appellants (not to exceed 7,000 words) due on February 19, 2014. Parties are directed to hand deliver the paper copies of their briefs to the Clerk's office by the date due. All briefs and appendices must contain the date that the case is scheduled for oral argument at the top of the cover. See D.C. Cir. Rule 28(a)(8). The Clerk is directed to schedule this case for oral argument on the earliest available date following the completion of briefing. The parties will be notified by separate order of the oral argument date and the composition of the merits panel. Before Judges: Tatel, Brown and Pillard. [14-5018] [Entered: 01/23/2014 12:04 PM]
January 22, 2014 REPLY FILED [1476008] by Community National Bank, GC Restaurants SA, LLC, Jacqueline Halbig, Innovare Health Advocates, David Klemencic, Carrie Lowery, Olde England's Lion & Rose Forum, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Castle Hills, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Sonterra, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Westlake, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose, Ltd and Sarah Rumpf to response [ # 1475926-2 ] [Service Date: 01/22/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [14-5018] (Carvin, Michael) [Entered: 01/22/2014 10:40 AM]
January 21, 2014 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1475936] by IRS, John A. Koskinen, Jacob J. Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, HHS and TREA [Service Date: 01/21/2014 ] [14-5018] (Klein, Alisa) [Entered: 01/21/2014 03:43 PM]
January 21, 2014 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1475926] by IRS, John A. Koskinen, Jacob J. Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, HHS and TREA to motion to expedite case [ # 1475591-2 ] [Service Date: 01/21/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [14-5018] (Klein, Alisa) [Entered: 01/21/2014 02:57 PM]
January 17, 2014 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1475796] considering motion to expedite [ # 1475591-2 ]; directing that appellees file a response to the motion, not to exceed 20 pages, by 12:00 noon on Wednesday, January 22, 2014, and that appellants file a reply, not to exceed 10 pages, by 12:00 noon on Thursday, January 23, 2014. The parties are directed to file the paper copies of their pleadings by hand. [14-5018] [Entered: 01/17/2014 03:39 PM]
January 17, 2014 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1475605] directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 02/18/2014. APPELLANT procedural motions due 02/18/2014. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 03/03/2014; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 02/18/2014. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 02/18/2014. APPELLEE procedural motions due 02/18/2014. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 03/03/2014 [14-5018] [Entered: 01/17/2014 08:49 AM]
January 16, 2014 MOTION filed [1475591] by Community National Bank, GC Restaurants SA, LLC, Jacqueline Halbig, Innovare Health Advocates, David Klemencic, Carrie Lowery, Olde England's Lion & Rose Forum, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Castle Hills, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Sonterra, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Westlake, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose, Ltd and Sarah Rumpf to expedite case. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 01/30/2014) [Service Date: 01/16/2014 by US Mail, Email] Pages: 16-20. [14-5018] (Carvin, Michael) [Entered: 01/16/2014 05:03 PM]
January 16, 2014 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1475586] by Community National Bank, GC Restaurants SA, LLC, Jacqueline Halbig, Innovare Health Advocates, David Klemencic, Carrie Lowery, Olde England's Lion & Rose Forum, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Castle Hills, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Sonterra, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Westlake, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose, Ltd and Sarah Rumpf [Service Date: 01/16/2014 ] [14-5018] (Carvin, Michael) [Entered: 01/16/2014 04:50 PM]
January 16, 2014 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1475583] by Community National Bank, GC Restaurants SA, LLC, Jacqueline Halbig, Innovare Health Advocates, David Klemencic, Carrie Lowery, Olde England's Lion & Rose Forum, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Castle Hills, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Sonterra, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Westlake, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose, Ltd and Sarah Rumpf [Service Date: 01/16/2014 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [14-5018] (Carvin, Michael) [Entered: 01/16/2014 04:47 PM]
January 16, 2014 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1475581] by Community National Bank, GC Restaurants SA, LLC, Jacqueline Halbig, Innovare Health Advocates, David Klemencic, Carrie Lowery, Olde England's Lion & Rose Forum, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Castle Hills, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Sonterra, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Westlake, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose, Ltd and Sarah Rumpf [Service Date: 01/16/2014 ] [14-5018] (Carvin, Michael) [Entered: 01/16/2014 04:45 PM]
January 16, 2014 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1475577] by Community National Bank, GC Restaurants SA, LLC, Jacqueline Halbig, Innovare Health Advocates, David Klemencic, Carrie Lowery, Olde England's Lion & Rose Forum, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Castle Hills, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Sonterra, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Westlake, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose, Ltd and Sarah Rumpf [Service Date: 01/16/2014 ] [14-5018] (Carvin, Michael) [Entered: 01/16/2014 04:38 PM]
January 16, 2014 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1475575] by Michael A. Carvin and co-counsel Jacob M. Roth and Jonathan A. Berry on behalf of Appellants Community National Bank, GC Restaurants SA, LLC, Jacqueline Halbig, Innovare Health Advocates, David Klemencic, Carrie Lowery, Olde England's Lion & Rose Forum, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Castle Hills, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Sonterra, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Westlake, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose, Ltd and Sarah Rumpf. [14-5018] (Carvin, Michael) [Entered: 01/16/2014 04:37 PM]
January 16, 2014 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1475572] by Community National Bank, GC Restaurants SA, LLC, Jacqueline Halbig, Innovare Health Advocates, David Klemencic, Carrie Lowery, Olde England's Lion & Rose Forum, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Castle Hills, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Sonterra, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Westlake, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose, Ltd and Sarah Rumpf [Service Date: 01/16/2014 ] [14-5018] (Carvin, Michael) [Entered: 01/16/2014 04:31 PM]
January 16, 2014 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1475523] by Alisa B. Klein and co-counsel Mark B. Stern on behalf of Appellees IRS, Jacob J. Lew, Steven L. Miller, Kathleen Sebelius, HHS and TREA. [14-5018] (Klein, Alisa) [Entered: 01/16/2014 02:58 PM]
January 16, 2014 NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1475487] by Community National Bank, GC Restaurants SA, LLC, Jacqueline Halbig, Innovare Health Advocates, David Klemencic, Carrie Lowery, Olde England's Lion & Rose Forum, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Castle Hills, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Sonterra, Ltd, Olde England's Lion & Rose at Westlake, LLC, Olde England's Lion & Rose, Ltd and Sarah Rumpf seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:13-cv-00623-PLF. Assigned USCA Case Number [14-5018] [Entered: 01/16/2014 01:31 PM]
January 16, 2014 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [14-5018] [Entered: 01/16/2014 01:31 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jacqueline Halbig, et al v. Sylvia Mathews Burwell, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Linda J. Blumberg
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Leighton Ku
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jonathan Gruber
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Duke AIDS Legal Project
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Parisi
Represented By: Mark Christopher Fleming Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Joel Teitelbaum
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: David Tedrow
Represented By: Joel Thaddeus Larson Jr.
Represented By: David Andrew Frazee
Represented By: Kara M. Kapke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jose Szapocznik
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Orrin G. Hatch
Represented By: Howard Curtis Nielson Jr.
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Brian W. Barnes
Represented By: Michael E. Rosman
Represented By: David Henry Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Health Law Program
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Daniel Polsky
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jeffrey Levi
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Martin A. Philbert
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Amitabh Chandra
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AIDS Institute
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Parisi
Represented By: Mark Christopher Fleming Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jennifer Causor
Represented By: Joel Thaddeus Larson Jr.
Represented By: David Andrew Frazee
Represented By: Kara M. Kapke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michael Cannon
Represented By: Andrew Michael Grossman
Represented By: Eric Allen Grant
Represented By: Bradley Alan Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Joseph Newhouse
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: J. Bradford DeLong
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Frank Levy
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Judicial Watch, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Bekesha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gregory Evans
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Susan F. Wood
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: America's Health Insurance Plans
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Brian David Netter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Robert W. Blum
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Philip C. Nasca
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Paul B. Ginsburg
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: John A. Graves
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kenneth Thorpe
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Stuart Alan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Southern HIV/AIDS Strategy Initiative
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Parisi
Represented By: Mark Christopher Fleming Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gary Burtless
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HIV Medicine Association
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Parisi
Represented By: Mark Christopher Fleming Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Paul Brandt-Rauf
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: North Carolina AIDS Action Network
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Parisi
Represented By: Mark Christopher Fleming Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mark V. Pauly
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Aidan Robinson
Represented By: Joel Thaddeus Larson Jr.
Represented By: David Andrew Frazee
Represented By: Kara M. Kapke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Benjamin Sommers
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Paul D. Cleary
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Richard S. Kurz
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Peter Jacobson
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Association for Community Affiliated Plans
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Parisi
Represented By: Mark Christopher Fleming Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AARP
Represented By: Iris Yohana Gonzalez
Represented By: Michael R. Schuster
Represented By: Kelly Riseden Bagby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of South Carolina
Represented By: Rebecca A. Beynon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Katherine Swartz
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sara Rosenbaum
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Wendy K. Mariner
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Peter Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Stuart Altman
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michael G. Perri
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kyle L. Grazier
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: James B. Rebitzer
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Laura Tyson
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Kansas
Represented By: Jeffrey Allyn Chanay
Represented By: Bryan Charles Clark Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Craig H. Blakely
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: John F. Holahan
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Taylor L. Burke
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jane Hyatt Thorpe
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: One Voice Texas
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Parisi
Represented By: Mark Christopher Fleming Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michelle M. Mello
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Heart Association
Represented By: Mary Pauline Rouvelas Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lawrence Katz
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ezekiel Emanuel
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Paul N. Van de Water
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Minority AIDS Council
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Parisi
Represented By: Mark Christopher Fleming Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Janet Currie
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jonathan Adler
Represented By: Andrew Michael Grossman
Represented By: Eric Allen Grant
Represented By: Bradley Alan Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Edwin Trevathan
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Paula Lantz
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Southern Poverty Law Center
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: John R. Finnegan, Jr.
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Henry J. Aaron
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sherry Glied
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Martha Robinson
Represented By: Joel Thaddeus Larson Jr.
Represented By: David Andrew Frazee
Represented By: Kara M. Kapke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Alan C. Monheit
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Marco Rubio
Represented By: Howard Curtis Nielson Jr.
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Brian W. Barnes
Represented By: Michael E. Rosman
Represented By: David Henry Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mary Tedrow
Represented By: Joel Thaddeus Larson Jr.
Represented By: David Andrew Frazee
Represented By: Kara M. Kapke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: George G. Rhoads
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Peter H. Lindert
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center
Represented By: John R. Woodrum Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Alliance of State and Territorial AIDS Directors
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Parisi
Represented By: Mark Christopher Fleming Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Alabama
Represented By: Luther J. Strange III
Represented By: Rebecca A. Beynon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Michigan
Represented By: Jeffrey Allyn Chanay
Represented By: Bryan Charles Clark Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jay Maddock
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Harold Pollack
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Public Health Deans, Chairs, and Faculty
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Hospital Association
Represented By: Dominic Francis Perella Esquire
Represented By: Sean Marotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Eric S. Maskin
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Diabetes Association
Represented By: Mary Pauline Rouvelas Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Meredith Rosenthal
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of West Virginia
Represented By: Rebecca A. Beynon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Claudia Goldin
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Harvard Law School Center for Health Law and Policy Innovation
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Parisi
Represented By: Mark Christopher Fleming Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Members of Congress
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Community Catalyst
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Parisi
Represented By: Mark Christopher Fleming Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lawrence H. Summers
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network
Represented By: Mary Pauline Rouvelas Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Nebraska
Represented By: Jon Cumberland Bruning
Represented By: Rebecca A. Beynon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Karen Davis
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Genevieve M. Kenney
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Justin Wolfers
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Dave Camp
Represented By: Howard Curtis Nielson Jr.
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Brian W. Barnes
Represented By: Michael E. Rosman
Represented By: David Henry Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Galen Institute
Represented By: C. Boyden Gray
Represented By: Adam Jeffrey White
Represented By: Adam Rabun Fast Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Georgia
Represented By: Rebecca A. Beynon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Oladele A. Ogunseitan
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Robert D. Reischauer
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Philip J. Cook
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Steve Orofino
Represented By: Joel Thaddeus Larson Jr.
Represented By: David Andrew Frazee
Represented By: Kara M. Kapke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Robert F. Meenan
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State Officials
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Vivian Ho
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AIDS Alabama
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Parisi
Represented By: Mark Christopher Fleming Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: David Cutler
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Isabel Sawhill
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Stephen Zuckerman
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Barry Bosworth
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Patrick Robert Wyrick Esquire
Represented By: Rebecca A. Beynon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Cancer Society
Represented By: Mary Pauline Rouvelas Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jose F. Cordero
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michael Reich
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Darrell E. Issa
Represented By: Howard Curtis Nielson Jr.
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Brian W. Barnes
Represented By: Michael E. Rosman
Represented By: David Henry Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lynn R. Goldman
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jonathan Skinner
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jared Blitz
Represented By: Joel Thaddeus Larson Jr.
Represented By: David Andrew Frazee
Represented By: Kara M. Kapke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Laura Rudkin
Represented By: Ankur Jayant Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mike Lee
Represented By: Howard Curtis Nielson Jr.
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Brian W. Barnes
Represented By: Michael E. Rosman
Represented By: David Henry Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Austin Frakt
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Pacific Research Institute
Represented By: William Spencer Consovoy
Represented By: Bertram Walter Rein
Represented By: John Michael Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: John Cornyn
Represented By: Howard Curtis Nielson Jr.
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Brian W. Barnes
Represented By: Michael E. Rosman
Represented By: David Henry Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Cato Institute
Represented By: William Spencer Consovoy
Represented By: Ilya Shapiro Esquire
Represented By: Bertram Walter Rein
Represented By: John Michael Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: John B. Shoven
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rob Portman
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Michael E. Rosman
Represented By: David Henry Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Consumer's Research
Represented By: Rebecca A. Beynon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Susan Athey
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ted Cruz
Represented By: Howard Curtis Nielson Jr.
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Brian W. Barnes
Represented By: Michael E. Rosman
Represented By: David Henry Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Marilyn Moon
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Families USA
Represented By: Robert Neil Weiner
Represented By: Murad Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jill Horwitz
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Alice M. Rivlin
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Beth S. Brinkmann
Represented By: Ronald C. Machen Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Mark B. Stern
Represented By: Alisa B. Klein
Represented By: Stuart F. Delery
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John A. Koskinen, in his official capacity as Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Represented By: Beth S. Brinkmann
Represented By: Ronald C. Machen Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Mark B. Stern
Represented By: Alisa B. Klein
Represented By: Stuart F. Delery
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jacob J. Lew, in his official capacity as U.S. Secretary of the Treasury
Represented By: Beth S. Brinkmann
Represented By: Ronald C. Machen Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Mark B. Stern
Represented By: Alisa B. Klein
Represented By: Stuart F. Delery
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of the Treasury
Represented By: Beth S. Brinkmann
Represented By: Ronald C. Machen Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Mark B. Stern
Represented By: Alisa B. Klein
Represented By: Stuart F. Delery
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Beth S. Brinkmann
Represented By: Ronald C. Machen Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Mark B. Stern
Represented By: Alisa B. Klein
Represented By: Stuart F. Delery
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kathleen Sebelius, in her official capacity as U.S. Secretary of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Steven L. Miller, in his official capacity as Acting Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sylvia Mathews Burwell, in her official capacity as U.S. Secretary of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Beth S. Brinkmann
Represented By: Ronald C. Machen Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Mark B. Stern
Represented By: Alisa B. Klein
Represented By: Stuart F. Delery
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GC Restaurants SA, LLC
Represented By: Michael Anthony Carvin
Represented By: Jacob Moshe Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Sarah Rumpf
Represented By: Michael Anthony Carvin
Represented By: Jacob Moshe Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Community National Bank
Represented By: Michael Anthony Carvin
Represented By: Jacob Moshe Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jacqueline Halbig
Represented By: Michael Anthony Carvin
Represented By: Jacob Moshe Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David Klemencic
Represented By: Michael Anthony Carvin
Represented By: Jacob Moshe Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Olde England's Lion & Rose Forum, LLC
Represented By: Michael Anthony Carvin
Represented By: Jacob Moshe Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Innovare Health Advocates
Represented By: Michael Anthony Carvin
Represented By: Jacob Moshe Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Olde England's Lion & Rose, Ltd
Represented By: Michael Anthony Carvin
Represented By: Jacob Moshe Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Olde England's Lion & Rose at Sonterra, Ltd
Represented By: Michael Anthony Carvin
Represented By: Jacob Moshe Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Carrie Lowery
Represented By: Michael Anthony Carvin
Represented By: Jacob Moshe Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Olde England's Lion & Rose at Westlake, LLC
Represented By: Michael Anthony Carvin
Represented By: Jacob Moshe Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Olde England's Lion & Rose at Castle Hills, Ltd
Represented By: Michael Anthony Carvin
Represented By: Jacob Moshe Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?