Public Employees, et al v. Abigail Ross Hopper, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: Richard Largay, Cetacean Society International, Martha Powers, Anthony R. Jessen, 10cv1079, Californians for Renewable Energy, Barbara Durkin, Jonathan E. Mayhew, 10cv1072, Town of Barnstable, Massachusetts, 10cv1073, Three Bays Preservation, Cindy Lowry, Lower Laguna Madre Foundation, Wampanoag Tribe of Gay Head, (AQUINNAH) ; 11cv1238, Public Employees for Environmental Responsibility and Martha's Vineyard/Dukes County Fisherman's Association, 10cv1072
Defendant / Appellee: Sally Jewell, Secretary, U.S. Department of the Interior, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, formerly known as Minerals Management Service, Robert J. Papp, Jr., Admiral, in his official capacity; 10cv1079, Eileen Sobeck, Assistant Administrator, National Marine Fisheries Service, United States Army Corps of Engineers, Walter Cruickshank, Acting Director, U.S. Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, United States Department of the Interior, 10cv1073, Dan Ashe, Director, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Abigail Ross Hopper, Director, U.S. Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Penny Sue Pritzker, Secretary, U.S. Department of Commerce, Thomas P. Bostick, U.S. Army Chief of Engineers and Commanding General and United States Coast Guard, 10cv1079
Plaintiff / Appellant: Christopher Birdsey, Heather Rockwell, 10cv1079, James Keding, 10cv1079, Frank Caruso, 10cv1079, Neil Good, 10cv1079, Lou Gonzaga, 10cv1079, Ron Borjeson, 10cv1079, Patricia J. Dineen, 10cv1079, James R. Powell, 10cv1079, William H. Rypka, 10cv1079, Richard Klein, 10cv1079, Crocker Snow, Jr., Pauline K. Klein, 10cv1079, Cameron Dawson, 10cv1079, Robert Bussiere, 10cv1079, Alliance to Protect Nantucket Sound, David Moriarty, 10cv1079, Jeff Good, 10cv1079 and Barbara Jean Pennick, 10cv1079
Intervenor Defendant / Appellee: Cape Wind Associates, LLC
Case Number: 14-5123
Filed: May 22, 2014
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2014 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1497032] granting motion to dismiss cases voluntarily [ # 1496245-2 ], issuing mandate [14-5117, 14-5123, 14-5124, 14-5126] [Entered: 06/11/2014 10:38 AM]
June 11, 2014 MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, District Court [14-5117, 14-5123, 14-5124, 14-5126] [Entered: 06/11/2014 10:47 AM]
June 5, 2014 JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1496245] by Dan Ashe, Thomas P. Bostick, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Walter Cruickshank, Sally Jewell, Robert J. Papp, Jr., Penny Sue Pritzker, Eileen Sobeck, United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Coast Guard and DOI in 14-5117, 14-5123, 14-5124, 14-5126 to dismiss case voluntarily [Service Date: 06/05/2014 ] Pages: 1-10. [14-5117, 14-5123, 14-5124, 14-5126] (Gunter, John) [Entered: 06/05/2014 02:06 PM]
May 23, 2014 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1494379] consolidating cases 14-5123, 14-5124 (Cross-appeal started 05/23/2014) with 14-5117; directing party to file in 14-5123, 14-5124 initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/23/2014. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/23/2014 [14-5117, 14-5123, 14-5124] [Entered: 05/23/2014 02:37 PM]
May 23, 2014 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1494335] by J. David Gunter II on behalf of Appellants Dan Ashe, Thomas P. Bostick, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Walter Cruickshank, Sally Jewell, Robert J. Papp, Jr., Penny Sue Pritzker, Eileen Sobeck, United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Coast Guard and DOI in 14-5117, Appellees Dan Ashe, Thomas P. Bostick, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Walter Cruickshank, Sally Jewell, Robert J. Papp, Jr., Penny Sue Pritzker, Eileen Sobeck, United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Coast Guard and DOI in 14-5123, 14-5124. [14-5117, 14-5123, 14-5124] (Gunter, John) [Entered: 05/23/2014 12:17 PM]
May 22, 2014 NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1494191] by Alliance to Protect Nantucket Sound, Christopher Birdsey, Ron Borjeson, Robert Bussiere, Frank Caruso, Cameron Dawson, Patricia J. Dineen, Lou Gonzaga, Jeff Good, Neil Good, James Keding, Pauline K. Klein, Richard Klein, David Moriarty, Barbara Jean Pennick, James R. Powell, Heather Rockwell, William H. Rypka and Crocker Snow, Jr. seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:10-cv-01067-RBW-DAR,1:10-cv-01073-RMU,1:10-cv-01079-RMU,1:11-cv-01238-RMU. Assigned USCA Case Number [14-5123] [Entered: 05/22/2014 03:08 PM]
May 22, 2014 LETTER SENT [1494193] regarding attorney membership to Mr. James O. Bickford for Alliance to Protect Nantucket Sound, Ron Borjeson, Jeff Good, James Keding, Neil Good, Robert Bussiere, Cameron Dawson, Patricia J. Dineen, David Moriarty, William H. Rypka, Richard Klein, Pauline K. Klein, Heather Rockwell, Barbara Jean Pennick, Lou Gonzaga, Frank Caruso, James R. Powell, Christopher Birdsey and Crocker Snow, Jr.. Application for Admission due 06/23/2014. [14-5123] [Entered: 05/22/2014 03:09 PM]
May 22, 2014 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [14-5123] [Entered: 05/22/2014 03:07 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Public Employees, et al v. Abigail Ross Hopper, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Richard Largay
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Cetacean Society International
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Represented By: Eric Robert Glitzenstein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Martha Powers
Represented By: William Stewart Eubanks II
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Represented By: Eric Robert Glitzenstein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Anthony R. Jessen, 10cv1079
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Californians for Renewable Energy
Represented By: William Stewart Eubanks II
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Represented By: Eric Robert Glitzenstein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Barbara Durkin
Represented By: William Stewart Eubanks II
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Represented By: Eric Robert Glitzenstein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jonathan E. Mayhew, 10cv1072
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Town of Barnstable, Massachusetts, 10cv1073
Represented By: W. Eric Pilsk
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Three Bays Preservation
Represented By: William Stewart Eubanks II
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Represented By: Eric Robert Glitzenstein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Cindy Lowry
Represented By: William Stewart Eubanks II
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Represented By: Eric Robert Glitzenstein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Lower Laguna Madre Foundation
Represented By: William Stewart Eubanks II
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Represented By: Eric Robert Glitzenstein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Wampanoag Tribe of Gay Head, (AQUINNAH) ; 11cv1238
Represented By: Hope Madeline Babcock
Represented By: Thomas Moore Gremillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Public Employees for Environmental Responsibility
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Represented By: Eric Robert Glitzenstein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Martha's Vineyard/Dukes County Fisherman's Association, 10cv1072
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sally Jewell, Secretary, U.S. Department of the Interior
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: John David Gunter II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, formerly known as Minerals Management Service
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: John David Gunter II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert J. Papp, Jr., Admiral, in his official capacity; 10cv1079
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: John David Gunter II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Eileen Sobeck, Assistant Administrator, National Marine Fisheries Service
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: John David Gunter II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: John David Gunter II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Walter Cruickshank, Acting Director, U.S. Bureau of Ocean Energy Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of the Interior, 10cv1073
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: John David Gunter II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dan Ashe, Director, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: John David Gunter II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Abigail Ross Hopper, Director, U.S. Bureau of Ocean Energy Management
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: John David Gunter II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Penny Sue Pritzker, Secretary, U.S. Department of Commerce
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: John David Gunter II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Thomas P. Bostick, U.S. Army Chief of Engineers and Commanding General
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: John David Gunter II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Coast Guard, 10cv1079
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: John David Gunter II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Christopher Birdsey
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Heather Rockwell, 10cv1079
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: James Keding, 10cv1079
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Frank Caruso, 10cv1079
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Neil Good, 10cv1079
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lou Gonzaga, 10cv1079
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ron Borjeson, 10cv1079
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Patricia J. Dineen, 10cv1079
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: James R. Powell, 10cv1079
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: William H. Rypka, 10cv1079
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Richard Klein, 10cv1079
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Crocker Snow, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Pauline K. Klein, 10cv1079
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Cameron Dawson, 10cv1079
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Robert Bussiere, 10cv1079
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Alliance to Protect Nantucket Sound
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David Moriarty, 10cv1079
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jeff Good, 10cv1079
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Barbara Jean Pennick, 10cv1079
Represented By: Benjamin S. Sharp
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellee: Cape Wind Associates, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Howard Marraro Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?