Dick Heller, et al v. DC, et al

Amicus Curiae: Gun Owners of America, Inc., Delaware Coalition Against Gun Violence, Inc., Institute on the Constitution, Ohio Coalition Against Gun Violence, The CRPA Foundation, DC for Democracy, Arizonans for Gun Safety, Illinois Council Against Handgun Violence, Protect Minnesota, Major City Chiefs of Police Association, New Mexicans for Gun Safety, State of Connecticut, State of Maryland, State of Illinois, Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, International Municipal Lawyers Association, Women Against Gun Violence, Pink Pistols, Lincoln Institute for Research and Education, Colorado Ceasefire Capitol Fund, Ceasefire Oregon, Women Against Gun Control, Inc., State of Massachusetts, The Abraham Lincoln Foundation for Public Policy Research, Violence Policy Center, U.S. Justice Foundation, Gun Owners of California, Inc., Policy Analysis Center, Maine Citizens Against Handgun Violence, League of Women Voters of the District of Columbia, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, State of New York, State of Iowa, State of California, Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Wisconsin Anti-Violence Effort, United States Conference of Mayors, DC Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, Gun Violence Prevention Center of Utah, Educational Fund to Stop Gun Violence, National Rifle Association, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation, DownsizeDC.org, States United to Prevent Gun Violence, Downsize DC Foundation, Second Amendment Sisters, Inc., New Yorkers Against Gun Violence, Marylanders to Prevent Gun Violence and State of Hawaii
Plaintiff / Appellant: Dick Anthony Heller, William Carter and Absalom F. Jordan, Jr.
Defendant / Appellee: Vincent C. Gray, Mayor, District of Columbia, Muriel Bowser, Mayor, District of Columbia, District of Columbia and Cathy L. Lanier, CA-09-454
Case Number: 14-7071
Filed: May 21, 2014
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2016 MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, District Court [14-7071]
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order PER CURIAM ORDER, En Banc, (IN SLIP OPINION FORMAT) [1600951] filed denying appellees' petition for rehearing en banc [ # 1578869-3 ]. Before Judges: Garland, Henderson, Rogers, Tatel, Brown, Griffith, Kavanaugh, Srinivasan, Millett,* Pillard and Wilkins. * A statement by Circuit Judge Millett, concurring in the denial of rehearing en banc, is attached. [14-7071]
February 26, 2016 PER CURIAM ORDER [1600949] filed denying appellees' petition for rehearing [ # 1578869-2 ]. Before Judges: Henderson, Millett and Ginsburg. [14-7071]
December 31, 2015 NOTICE [1591403] filed by Arizonans for Gun Safety, Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Ceasefire Oregon, Colorado Ceasefire Capitol Fund, Delaware Coalition Against Gun Violence, Inc., Educational Fund to Stop Gun Violence, Gun Violence Prevention Center of Utah, Illinois Council Against Handgun Violence, Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Maine Citizens Against Handgun Violence, Marylanders to Prevent Gun Violence, New Mexicans for Gun Safety, New Yorkers Against Gun Violence, Ohio Coalition Against Gun Violence, Protect Minnesota, States United to Prevent Gun Violence, Violence Policy Center, Wisconsin Anti-Violence Effort and Women Against Gun Violence to terminate attorney [Service Date: 12/31/2015 ] [14-7071] (Valentini, Francesco)
November 6, 2015 RESPONSE [1582460] filed by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller and Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. to petition for rehearing [ # 1578869-2 ], petition for rehearing en banc [ # 1578869-3 ] [Service Date: 11/06/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [14-7071] (Peterson, Dan)
October 22, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER [1579300] filed directing appellants to file a response to petition for rehearing en banc [ # 1578869-3 ] within 15 days of the date of this order. The response may not exceed 15 pages. Absent further order of the court, the court will not accept a reply to the response. [14-7071]
October 19, 2015 PETITION [1578869] filed by Appellees Muriel Bowser and DC for rehearing, for rehearing en banc. [Service Date: 10/19/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [14-7071] (AliKhan, Loren)
September 18, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER [1573769] filed withholding issuance of the mandate. [14-7071]
September 18, 2015 OPINION [1573768] filed (Pages: 28) for the Court by Judge Ginsburg, CONCURRING in part DISSENTING in part OPINION (Pages: 18) by Judge Henderson. [14-7071]
September 18, 2015 PER CURIAM JUDGMENT [1573765] filed that the District Courts final order appealed from in this cause be affirmed with respect to: the basic registration requirement as applied to long guns, D.C. Code 7-2502.01(a); the requirement that a registrant be fingerprinted and photographed and make a personal appearance to register a firearm, D.C. Code 7-2502.04; the requirement that an individual pay certain fees associated with the registration of a firearm, D.C. Code 7-2502.05; and the requirement that registrants complete a firearms safety and training course, D.C. Code 7-2502.03(a)(13). The District Courts order be reversed with respect to the requirement that a person bring with him the firearm to be registered, D.C. Code 7-2502.04(c); the requirement that a gun owner re-register his firearm every three years, D.C. Code 7-2502.07a; the requirement that conditions registration of a firearm upon passing a test of knowledge of the Districts firearms laws, D.C. Code 7-2502.03(a)(10); and the prohibition on registration of more than one pistol per registrant during any 30-day period, D.C. Code 7-2502.03(e), for the reasons in the accompanying opinion . Before Judges: Henderson, Millett and Ginsburg. [14-7071]
May 21, 2015 LETTER FILED [1553530] by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller and Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 05/21/2015 ] [14-7071] (Halbrook, Stephen)
April 20, 2015 ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Henderson, Millett and Ginsburg. [14-7071]
April 10, 2015 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Loren L. AliKhan, on behalf of Appellees Muriel Bowser and DC (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [14-7071] (AliKhan, Loren)
April 9, 2015 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Stephen P. Halbrook, on behalf of Appellants William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller and Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [14-7071] (Halbrook, Stephen)
April 9, 2015 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1546496] allocating oral argument time as follows: Appellants - 10 Minutes, Appellees - 10 Minutes. One counsel per side to argue; directing party to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney by 04/13/2015 [14-7071]
January 27, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1534403] scheduling oral argument on Monday, 04/20/2015. [14-7071]
January 14, 2015 APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1532151] filed by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller and Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. [Service Date: 01/14/2015 ] Length of Brief: 6,928 Words. [14-7071] (Peterson, Dan)
December 12, 2014 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1527023] filed by Arizonans for Gun Safety, Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Ceasefire Oregon, Colorado Ceasefire Capitol Fund, Delaware Coalition Against Gun Violence, Inc., Educational Fund to Stop Gun Violence, Gun Violence Prevention Center of Utah, Illinois Council Against Handgun Violence, Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Maine Citizens Against Handgun Violence, Marylanders to Prevent Gun Violence, New Mexicans for Gun Safety, New Yorkers Against Gun Violence, Ohio Coalition Against Gun Violence, Protect Minnesota, States United to Prevent Gun Violence, Violence Policy Center, Wisconsin Anti-Violence Effort and Women Against Gun Violence [Service Date: 12/12/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6,957 Words. [14-7071] (Wolfson, Paul)
December 12, 2014 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1526933] filed by [Service Date: 12/12/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6,161 Words. [14-7071] (Diesenhaus, Jonathan)
December 12, 2014 NOTICE filed [1526931] by DC Appleseed Center for Law & Justice League of Women Voters of the District of Columbia DC for Democracy of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 12/12/2014 ] [14-7071] (Diesenhaus, Jonathan)
December 11, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER-- AMENDED NOTICE filed [1526815] by Brady Center To Prevent Gun Violence, Women Against Gun Violence, Wisconsin Anti-Violence Effort, Violence Policy Center, States United to Prevent Gun Violence, Protect Minnesota, Ohio Coalition Against Gun Violence, New Yorkers Against Gun Violence, New Mexicans for Gun Safety, Marylanders to Prevent Gun Violence, Maine Citizens Against Handgun Violence, Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Illinois Council Against Handgun Violence, Gun Violence Prevention Center of Utah, Educational Fund to Stop Gun Violence, Delaware Coalition Against Gun Violence, Inc., Colorado Ceasefire Capitol Fund, Ceasefire Oregon and Arizonans for Gun Safety of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 12/12/2014 ] [14-7071]--[Edited 12/12/2014 by LMC] (Wolfson, Paul)
December 11, 2014 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1526692] filed by International Municipal Lawyers Association, Major City Chiefs of Police Association and United States Conference of Mayors [Service Date: 12/11/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6,820 Words. [14-7071] (Rubin, Howard)
December 5, 2014 APPELLEE BRIEF [1525853] filed by DC, Vincent C. Gray and Cathy L. Lanier [Service Date: 12/05/2014 ] Length of Brief: 13,950 words. [14-7071] (AliKhan, Loren)
November 7, 2014 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1521373] granting motion to extend time [ # 1520941-2 ], setting revised briefing schedule: APPELLEEs' Brief due on 12/05/2014. APPELLANTs' Reply Brief due 01/14/2015 [14-7071]
November 5, 2014 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1520941] by DC and Vincent C. Gray to extend time to file brief to 12/05/2014. [Service Date: 11/05/2014 ] Pages: 1-10. [14-7071] (AliKhan, Loren)
September 29, 2014 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1514349] by Howard R. Rubin on behalf of Amici Curiae for Appellee International Municipal Lawyers Association, Major City Chiefs of Police Association and United States Conference of Mayors. [14-7071] (Rubin, Howard)
September 26, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER-- CONSENT NOTICE filed [1514187] by International Municipal Lawyers Association, Major City Chiefs of Police Association, United States Conference of Mayors of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 09/26/2014 ] [14-7071]--[Edited 09/26/2014 by JJA] (Rubin, Howard)
September 17, 2014 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1512682] granting appellees' consent motion to extend time [ # 1512420-2 ], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLEE Brief due on 11/17/2014. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 12/17/2014 [14-7071]
September 16, 2014 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1512420] by DC, Vincent C. Gray and Cathy L. Lanier to extend time to file brief to 11/17/2014. [Service Date: 09/16/2014 ] Pages: 1-10. [14-7071] (AliKhan, Loren)
September 12, 2014 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1512129] to Amicus brief [ # 1511435-2 ] filed by Pink Pistols and The CRPA Foundation. [14-7071] (Malsch, Jeffrey)
September 12, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--NOTICE filed [1512127] by Second Amendment Sisters, Inc. Women Against Gun Control of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 09/12/2014 ] [14-7071]--[Edited 09/15/2014 by JJA] (Malsch, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2014 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1511435] filed by Pink Pistols and The CRPA Foundation [Service Date: 09/09/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6,511 Words. [14-7071] (Malsch, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2014 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1511433] filed by Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, Downsize DC Foundation, DownsizeDC.org, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners of California, Inc., Institute on the Constitution, Lincoln Institute for Research and Education, Policy Analysis Center, The Abraham Lincoln Foundation for Public Policy Research and U.S. Justice Foundation [Service Date: 09/09/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6,931 words. [14-7071] (Olson, William)
September 8, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--NOTICE filed [1511213] by Gun Owners of America, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of California, U.S. Justice Found., Lincoln Inst., Abraham Lincoln Found., Inst. on the Constitution, Conservative Legal Def. and Edu. Fund, Policy Analysis Center, DownsizeDC Found, DownsizeDC.org of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 09/08/2014 ] [14-7071]--[Edited 09/09/2014 by JJA] (Olson, William)
September 5, 2014 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1510971] filed by National Rifle Association, Inc. [Service Date: 09/05/2014 ] [14-7071] (Sweeney, John)
September 5, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--NOTICE filed [1510968] by CRPA Foundation, Pink Pistols and identity-based non-profit sporting organizations of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 09/05/2014 ] [14-7071]--[Edited 09/08/2014 by JJA] (Malsch, Jeffrey)
September 5, 2014 SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT APPENDIX [1510896] filed by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and DC, Vincent C. Gray and Cathy L. Lanier. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date:09/05/2014 ] [14-7071]--[Edited 09/05/2014 by JJA]--[Edited 09/05/2014 by JJA]
September 5, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER-- CONSENT NOTICE filed [1510859] by National Rifle Association, Inc. of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 09/05/2014 ] [14-7071]--[Edited 09/05/2014 by LMC] (Sweeney, John)
September 3, 2014 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1510412] by Paul R.Q. Wolfson and co-counsel Francesco Valentini on behalf of Amicus Curiae for Appellee Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. [14-7071] (Valentini, Francesco)
September 3, 2014 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--NOTICE filed [1510377] by Brady Center To Prevent Gun Violence of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 09/03/2014 ] [14-7071]--[Edited 09/03/2014 by JJA] (Valentini, Francesco)
September 2, 2014 JOINT APPENDIX [1510367] filed by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and DC and Vincent C. Gray. [Volumes: 2] [Service Date: 09/02/2014 ] [14-7071] (Peterson, Dan)
September 2, 2014 APPELLANT BRIEF [1510366] filed by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller and Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. [Service Date: 09/02/2014 ] Length of Brief: 13957 words. [14-7071] (Peterson, Dan)
July 23, 2014 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1504116] setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 09/02/2014. APPENDIX due 09/02/2014. APPELLEE Brief due on 10/02/2014. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 10/16/2014 [14-7071]
June 20, 2014 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1498697] by DC and Vincent C. Gray [Service Date: 06/20/2014 ] [14-7071] (AliKhan, Loren)
June 20, 2014 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1498695] by Loren L. AliKhan and co-counsel Todd S. Kim; Holly M. Johnson on behalf of Appellees DC and Vincent C. Gray. [14-7071] (AliKhan, Loren)
June 13, 2014 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1497619] by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller and Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. [Service Date: 06/13/2014 ] [14-7071] (Peterson, Dan)
June 13, 2014 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1497618] by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller and Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. [Service Date: 06/13/2014 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [14-7071] (Peterson, Dan)
June 13, 2014 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1497617] by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller and Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. [Service Date: 06/13/2014 ] [14-7071] (Peterson, Dan)
June 13, 2014 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1497616] by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller and Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. [Service Date: 06/13/2014 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [14-7071] (Peterson, Dan)
June 13, 2014 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1497615] by Stephen P. Halbrook and co-counsel Dan M. Peterson on behalf of Appellants William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller and Absalom F. Jordan, Jr.. [14-7071] (Peterson, Dan)
June 13, 2014 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1497613] by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller and Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. [Service Date: 06/13/2014 ] [14-7071] (Peterson, Dan)
June 13, 2014 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1497611] by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller and Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. [Service Date: 06/13/2014 ] [14-7071] (Peterson, Dan)
May 21, 2014 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1493927] directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/20/2014. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 06/20/2014. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/20/2014. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/20/2014. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/20/2014. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/20/2014. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/20/2014. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/20/2014. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/07/2014; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 06/20/2014. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/20/2014. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/20/2014. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/07/2014 [14-7071]
May 21, 2014 NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1493917] by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller and Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:08-cv-01289-JEB. Assigned USCA Case Number [14-7071]
May 21, 2014 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [14-7071]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dick Heller, et al v. DC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gun Owners of America, Inc.
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Represented By: Jeremiah Lee Morgan
Represented By: John Stewart Miles Esquire
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Delaware Coalition Against Gun Violence, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Institute on the Constitution
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Represented By: Jeremiah Lee Morgan
Represented By: John Stewart Miles Esquire
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ohio Coalition Against Gun Violence
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The CRPA Foundation
Represented By: Jeffrey Martin Malsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DC for Democracy
Represented By: Jonathan L. Diesenhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Arizonans for Gun Safety
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Illinois Council Against Handgun Violence
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Protect Minnesota
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Major City Chiefs of Police Association
Represented By: Howard Robert Rubin
Represented By: Daniel Edward Lipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New Mexicans for Gun Safety
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Maryland
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Illinois
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: International Municipal Lawyers Association
Represented By: Howard Robert Rubin
Represented By: Daniel Edward Lipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Women Against Gun Violence
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Pink Pistols
Represented By: Jeffrey Martin Malsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lincoln Institute for Research and Education
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Represented By: Jeremiah Lee Morgan
Represented By: John Stewart Miles Esquire
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Colorado Ceasefire Capitol Fund
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ceasefire Oregon
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Women Against Gun Control, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Martin Malsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Massachusetts
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Abraham Lincoln Foundation for Public Policy Research
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Represented By: Jeremiah Lee Morgan
Represented By: John Stewart Miles Esquire
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Violence Policy Center
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: U.S. Justice Foundation
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Represented By: Jeremiah Lee Morgan
Represented By: John Stewart Miles Esquire
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gun Owners of California, Inc.
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Represented By: Jeremiah Lee Morgan
Represented By: John Stewart Miles Esquire
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Policy Analysis Center
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Represented By: Jeremiah Lee Morgan
Represented By: John Stewart Miles Esquire
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Maine Citizens Against Handgun Violence
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: League of Women Voters of the District of Columbia
Represented By: Jonathan L. Diesenhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Represented By: Jeremiah Lee Morgan
Represented By: John Stewart Miles Esquire
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of New York
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Iowa
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of California
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Wisconsin Anti-Violence Effort
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: United States Conference of Mayors
Represented By: Howard Robert Rubin
Represented By: Daniel Edward Lipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DC Appleseed Center for Law & Justice
Represented By: Jonathan L. Diesenhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gun Violence Prevention Center of Utah
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Educational Fund to Stop Gun Violence
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Rifle Association, Inc.
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney Esquire
Represented By: James Wallace Porter III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gun Owners Foundation
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Represented By: Jeremiah Lee Morgan
Represented By: John Stewart Miles Esquire
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DownsizeDC.org
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Represented By: Jeremiah Lee Morgan
Represented By: John Stewart Miles Esquire
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: States United to Prevent Gun Violence
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Downsize DC Foundation
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Represented By: Jeremiah Lee Morgan
Represented By: John Stewart Miles Esquire
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Second Amendment Sisters, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Martin Malsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New Yorkers Against Gun Violence
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Marylanders to Prevent Gun Violence
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Hawaii
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Dick Anthony Heller
Represented By: Dan Mark Peterson
Represented By: Stephen Porter Halbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: William Carter
Represented By: Dan Mark Peterson
Represented By: Stephen Porter Halbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Absalom F. Jordan, Jr.
Represented By: Dan Mark Peterson
Represented By: Stephen Porter Halbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Vincent C. Gray, Mayor, District of Columbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Muriel Bowser, Mayor, District of Columbia
Represented By: Todd Sunhwae Kim
Represented By: Holly Michelle Johnson
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: District of Columbia
Represented By: Todd Sunhwae Kim
Represented By: Holly Michelle Johnson
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cathy L. Lanier, CA-09-454
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?