Murray Energy Corporation v. EPA, et al
Petitioner: Murray Energy Corporation
Respondent: Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler, Gina McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt
Intervenor: American Public Health Association, Chesapeake Climate Action Network, State of California, Environmental Defense Fund, Commonwealth of Virginia, Exelon Corporation, Downwinders at Risk, State of New Mexico, Environmental Integrity Project, State of Illinois, Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, Conservation Law Foundation, State of Minnesota, City of Baltimore, State of Iowa, National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, City of Chicago, Calpine Corporation, The Ohio Environmental Council, Clean Air Council, State of Oregon, State of New Hampshire, State of Delaware, Natural Resources Defense Council, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of New York, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Natural Resources Council of Maine, District of Columbia, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, County of Erie, New York, American Lung Association, State of Connecticut, State of Vermont, Sierra Club, State of Rhode Island, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Washington and City of New York
Amicus Curiae: Robert P. Mason, Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law, Joel D. Blum, Celia Y. Chen, Elsie M. Sunderland, Noelle Eckley Selin, National Congress of American Indians, Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians, Little Traverse Bay Bands of Odawa Indians, Daniel A. Jaffe, Cato Institute, David C. Evers, Fond du Lac Band of Lake Superior Chippewa, Little River Band of Ottawa Indians, Charles T. Driscoll, Jr., Great Lakes Indian Fish and Wildlife Commission, Bad River Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians, Philippe Grandjean, St. Croix Chippewa Indians of Wisconsin, Lac Courte Oreilles Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians and American Thoracic Society
Case Number: 16-1127
Filed: April 25, 2016
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 NOTICE [1860398] to substitute attorney Oramel H. Skinner substituted by Drew C. Ensign filed by State of Arizona in 16-1204 [Service Date: 09/08/2020 ] [16-1204, 16-1127, 16-1206, 16-1208] (Ensign, Drew) [Entered: 09/08/2020 08:27 PM]
September 8, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1860397] filed by Drew C. Ensign on behalf of Petitioner State of Arizona in 16-1204. [16-1204, 16-1127, 16-1206, 16-1208] (Ensign, Drew) [Entered: 09/08/2020 08:26 PM]
August 26, 2020 PER CURIAM ORDER [1858346] filed granting the joint motion to govern future proceedings [ # 1855241-2 ], These consolidated cases continue to remain in abeyance; The parties are directed to file motions to govern future proceedings by 02/22/2021. Before Judges: Srinivasan and Griffith. [16-1127, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208] [Entered: 08/26/2020 10:41 AM]
August 24, 2020 AMENDED STATEMENT [1858092] with Disclosure Listing filed by Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 16-1206 [Service Date: 08/24/2020 ] [16-1127, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208] (Gidiere, Philip) [Entered: 08/24/2020 07:50 PM]
August 6, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1855462] filed by Mithun Mansinghani on behalf of Petitioner State of Oklahoma in 16-1204. [16-1204, 16-1127, 16-1206, 16-1208] (Mansinghani, Mithun) [Entered: 08/06/2020 04:11 PM]
August 5, 2020 JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1855241] to govern future proceedings filed by American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Calpine Corporation, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, City of Baltimore, City of Chicago, City of New York, Clean Air Council, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, Conservation Law Foundation, County of Erie, New York, DC, Downwinders at Risk, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Integrity Project, Exelon Corporation, NAACP, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Sierra Club, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, The Ohio Environmental Council, Murray Energy Corporation and EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 16-1127, American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Calpine Corporation, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, Clean Air Council, Downwinders at Risk, Environmental Integrity Project, Exelon Corporation, NAACP, Natural Resources Defense Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Public Utility Commission of Texas, Railroad Commission of Texas, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming, Texas Commission on Environmental Quality and EPA in 16-1204, American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Calpine Corporation, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, Clean Air Council, Downwinders at Risk, Environmental Integrity Project, Exelon Corporation, NAACP, Natural Resources Defense Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 16-1206, American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Calpine Corporation, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, Clean Air Council, Downwinders at Risk, Environmental Integrity Project, Exelon Corporation, NAACP, Natural Resources Defense Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Mississippi Power Company, Southern Company Services, Inc. and EPA in 16-1208 [Service Date: 08/05/2020 ] Length Certification: 1308 words. [16-1127, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208] (Weaver, Susannah) [Entered: 08/05/2020 05:55 PM]
August 3, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1854722] filed by David S. Frankel on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Commonwealth of Massachusetts in 16-1127. [16-1127, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208] (Frankel, David) [Entered: 08/03/2020 10:08 AM]
June 4, 2020 NOTICE [1845689] to withdraw attorney Margaret Claiborne Campbell who represented Georgia Power Company and Southern Company Services, Inc. in 16-1208 filed by Georgia Power Company and Southern Company Services, Inc. in 16-1208 [Service Date: 06/04/2020 ] [16-1127, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208] (Horne, Melissa) [Entered: 06/04/2020 12:18 PM]
June 1, 2020 PER CURIAM ORDER [1845184] filed granting motion to dismiss case voluntarily [ # 1841829-2 ] in 16-1175. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the consolidation of No. 16-1175 with Nos. 16-1127, et al., be terminated [16-1175 (Consolidation termed 06/01/2020) with 16-1127]. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for extension of time to file motions to govern be granted [ # 1842266-2 ]. In light of the parties May 29, 2020 notice advising the court that EPAs 2020 Rule was published in the Federal Register on May 22, 2020, motions to govern future proceedings are now due by August 5, 2020. The Clerk is directed to issue forthwith the mandate in No. 16-1175. Before Judges: Srinivasan and Griffith. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208] [Entered: 06/01/2020 05:24 PM]
May 29, 2020 NOTICE [1844777] publication of final rule filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Clean Air Council, Downwinders at Risk, Environmental Integrity Project, NAACP, Sierra Club, Exelon Corporation and Calpine Corporation in 16-1127, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Clean Air Council, Downwinders at Risk, Environmental Integrity Project, NAACP, Exelon Corporation and Calpine Corporation in 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208 [Service Date: 05/29/2020 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208] (Gormley, Neil) [Entered: 05/29/2020 10:37 AM]
May 12, 2020 NOTICE [1842464] to substitute attorney John Robert Lopez and Keith Joseph Miller substituted by Oramel H. Skinner filed by State of Arizona in 16-1204 [Service Date: 05/12/2020 ] [16-1204, 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1206, 16-1208] (Skinner, Oramel) [Entered: 05/12/2020 03:52 PM]
May 12, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1842463] filed by Oramel H. Skinner on behalf of Petitioner State of Arizona in 16-1204. [16-1204, 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1206, 16-1208] (Skinner, Oramel) [Entered: 05/12/2020 03:47 PM]
May 11, 2020 JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1842266] to extend time to file motion filed by American Public Health Association, American Lung Association, Calpine Corporation, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, City of Baltimore, City of Chicago, City of New York, Clean Air Council, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, Conservation Law Foundation, County of Erie, New York, DC, Downwinders at Risk, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Integrity Project, Exelon Corporation, NAACP, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Sierra Club, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and The Ohio Environmental Council in 16-1127, American Public Health Association, American Lung Association, Calpine Corporation, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, Clean Air Council, Downwinders at Risk, Environmental Integrity Project, Exelon Corporation, NAACP, Natural Resources Defense Council and Physicians for Social Responsibility in 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208 [Service Date: 05/11/2020 ] Length Certification: 1,171 words. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208] (Herzog, Megan) [Entered: 05/11/2020 05:36 PM]
May 11, 2020 NOTICE [1842071] to substitute attorney Stacey W. Person substituted by Peter N. Surdo filed by State of Minnesota in 16-1127 [Service Date: 05/11/2020 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208] (Surdo, Peter) [Entered: 05/11/2020 10:03 AM]
May 8, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1841981] filed by Susannah Landes Weaver on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Environmental Defense Fund in 16-1127. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208] (Weaver, Susannah) [Entered: 05/08/2020 03:00 PM]
May 8, 2020 MOTION [1841829] to dismiss case voluntarily (Response to Motion served by hand due on 05/18/2020). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 05/18/2020) filed by ARIPPA (Service Date: 05/08/2020 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 69 words. [16-1175] (Vaccaro, Katherine) [Entered: 05/08/2020 08:00 AM]
May 6, 2020 NOTICE [1841568] to substitute attorney Roberta Rose James substituted by Michael F. Strande filed by State of Maryland [Service Date: 05/06/2020] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208]--[Edited 05/07/2020 by TAM] (Strande, Michael) [Entered: 05/06/2020 01:50 PM]
April 30, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1840712] filed by Linda B. Secord and co-counsel John R. Hulme on behalf of Petitioners Public Utility Commission of Texas, Railroad Commission of Texas, State of Texas and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 16-1204. [16-1204, 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1206, 16-1208] (Secord, Linda) [Entered: 04/30/2020 01:46 PM]
April 17, 2020 REPORT [1838709] filed by EPA, Andrew Wheeler, E. Scott Pruitt and Gina McCarthy in 16-1127, EPA in 16-1175, 16-1204, EPA, Andrew Wheeler, E. Scott Pruitt and Regina A. McCarthy in 16-1206, 16-1208 abeyance status is Final rule signed. [Service Date: 04/17/2020 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 04/17/2020 04:29 PM]
April 1, 2020 NOTICE [1836203] to substitute attorney Matthew L. Gooch substituted by Jerald R. Hess filed by Commonwealth of Virginia [Service Date: 04/01/2020 ] [16-1127] (Hess, Jerald) [Entered: 04/01/2020 06:50 AM]
January 14, 2020 REPORT [1823976] filed by Gina McCarthy, E. Scott Pruitt and Andrew Wheeler in 16-1127, Regina A. McCarthy, E. Scott Pruitt and Andrew Wheeler in 16-1206 abeyance status is interagency review ongoing [Service Date: 01/14/2020 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 01/14/2020 09:52 AM]
December 23, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1821335] filed by Ann Brewster Weeks and co-counsel Hayden Wong Hashimoto on behalf of Intervenors for Respondent Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, Conservation Law Foundation, Natural Resources Council of Maine and The Ohio Environmental Council in 16-1127, Intervenor for Respondent Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future in 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208] (Hashimoto, Hayden) [Entered: 12/23/2019 12:52 PM]
December 20, 2019 NOTICE [1821217] to substitute attorney Stephanie Talbert substituted by Meghan E Greenfield filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 16-1127, EPA in 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208 [Service Date: 12/20/2019 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 12/20/2019 05:02 PM]
December 19, 2019 NOTICE [1820931] to substitute attorney Sarah Adkins, Samuel Robert Flynn substituted by S. Chad Meredith, Matthew F. Kuhn filed by State of Kentucky [Service Date: 12/19/2019 ] [16-1204] (Kuhn, Matthew) [Entered: 12/19/2019 03:15 PM]
December 19, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1820930] filed by S. Chad Meredith and co-counsel Matthew F. Kuhn on behalf of Petitioner State of Kentucky. [16-1204] (Kuhn, Matthew) [Entered: 12/19/2019 03:13 PM]
December 6, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1819122] filed by John A. Rego and co-counsel Reed W. Sirak, James R. Bedell on behalf of Petitioner Murray Energy Corporation. [16-1127] (Sirak, Reed) [Entered: 12/06/2019 12:33 PM]
November 15, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1816162] filed by John A. Rego on behalf of Petitioner Murray Energy Corporation. [16-1127] (Rego, John) [Entered: 11/15/2019 05:22 PM]
October 30, 2019 SUGGESTION [1813354] of bankruptcy and automatic stay of proceedings filed by Murray Energy Corporation in 16-1127 [Service Date: 10/30/2019 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208] (Lazzaretti, John) [Entered: 10/30/2019 01:57 PM]
October 28, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1812929] filed by Melissa Hoffer and co-counsel Megan M. Herzog on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Commonwealth of Massachusetts in 16-1127. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208] (Iancu, Carol) [Entered: 10/28/2019 04:36 PM]
October 15, 2019 REPORT [1810878] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 16-1127, EPA in 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208 abeyance status is agency proceedings ongoing [Service Date: 10/15/2019 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 10/15/2019 04:34 PM]
August 23, 2019 NOTICE [1803513] to substitute attorney Katharine G. Shirey substituted by Emily C. Nelson filed by State of Washington [Service Date: 08/23/2019 ] [16-1127] (Nelson, Emily) [Entered: 08/23/2019 04:56 PM]
August 23, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1803378] filed by Anne E. Minard on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent State of New Mexico. [16-1127] (Minard, Anne) [Entered: 08/23/2019 11:20 AM]
July 16, 2019 REPORT [1797340] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 16-1127, EPA in 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208 abeyance status is agency proceedings ongoing [Service Date: 07/16/2019 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 07/16/2019 11:01 AM]
June 24, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1794161] filed considering motion to dismiss case voluntarily [ # 1790976-2 ] in 16-1127, 16-1210, dismissing case voluntarily [16-1210 (Consolidation termed 06/24/2019) with 16-1127]. The Clerk is directed to issue forthwith the mandate in No. 16-1210. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] [Entered: 06/24/2019 12:59 PM]
June 5, 2019 NOTICE [1791131] to withdraw attorney , to substitute attorney Max Hollister Kieley substituted by Stacey W. Person filed by State of Minnesota [Service Date: 06/05/2019 ] [16-1127] (Person, Stacey) [Entered: 06/05/2019 12:31 PM]
June 4, 2019 MOTION [1790976] to dismiss case voluntarily (Response to Motion served by hand due on 06/14/2019). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 06/14/2019) filed by Utility Air Regulatory Group in 16-1210 (Service Date: 06/04/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 39 words. [16-1210, 16-1127] (Jaber, Makram) [Entered: 06/04/2019 04:40 PM]
May 22, 2019 NOTICE [1788970] to substitute attorney Gerald D. Reid substituted by Laura E. Jensen filed by State of Maine [Service Date: 05/22/2019 ] [16-1127] (Jensen, Laura) [Entered: 05/22/2019 01:30 PM]
April 15, 2019 REPORT [1782884] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 16-1127, EPA in 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210 abeyance status is agency proceedings ongoing [Service Date: 04/15/2019 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 04/15/2019 12:09 PM]
April 10, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1782197] filed granting motions to terminate party in case [ # 1779707-2 ] [ # 1778791-2 ]. Withdrawing as party State of Wisconsin in 16-1204 and Gulf Power Company in 16-1208. The Clerk is directed to note the dockets to reflect the withdrawal of the State of Wisconsin and Gulf Power Company as petitioners in these consolidated cases. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] [Entered: 04/10/2019 04:01 PM]
April 10, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1782086] filed by Sarah Adkins on behalf of Petitioner State of Kentucky. [16-1204] (Adkins, Sarah) [Entered: 04/10/2019 10:58 AM]
April 2, 2019 NOTICE [1780614] filed of substition of counsel by Lindsay S. See and co-counsel Thomas T. Lampman on behalf of Petitioner State of West Virginia in 16-1204. [16-1204, 16-1127, 16-1208]--[Edited 04/03/2019 by LMF] (See, Lindsay) [Entered: 04/02/2019 10:55 AM]
March 27, 2019 MOTION [1779707] to terminate party filed by Gulf Power Company in 16-1208 (Service Date: 03/27/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMIT, TYPEFACE REQUIREMENTS, AND TYPESTYLE REQUIREMENTS. [16-1208, 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1210] (Manning, Robert) [Entered: 03/27/2019 10:15 AM]
March 21, 2019 MOTION [1778791] to terminate party filed by State of Wisconsin in 16-1204 (Service Date: 03/21/2019 by Email) Length Certification: 87 Words. [16-1204, 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Berg, Luke) [Entered: 03/21/2019 04:34 PM]
March 8, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1776785] filed by Samuel C. Peterson (previously filed as Counsel of Record) and co-counsel Aaron S. Farmer on behalf of Petitioner State of Ohio in 16-1204. [16-1204, 16-1127] (Farmer, Aaron) [Entered: 03/08/2019 03:57 PM]
March 5, 2019 NOTICE [1776173] to substitute attorney Eric E. Murphy substituted by Samuel C. Peterson filed by State of Ohio [Service Date: 03/05/2019 ] [16-1204] (Peterson, Samuel) [Entered: 03/05/2019 04:00 PM]
February 5, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1771994] filed granting motion to withdraw as petitioner [ # 1769121-2 ] . The Clerk is directed to note the docket in No. 16-1204 to reflect the withdrawal of the Michigan Attorney General, on behalf of the People of Michigan, as a petitioner in these consolidated cases. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] [Entered: 02/05/2019 12:32 PM]
January 24, 2019 NOTICE [1770132] to substitute attorney Mary E. Smith substituted by Lisa McClain Mitchell filed by Public Utility Commission of Texas, Railroad Commission of Texas, State of Texas and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 16-1204 [Service Date: 01/24/2019 ] [16-1204, 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Mitchell, Lisa) [Entered: 01/24/2019 05:07 PM]
January 24, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1770128] filed by Lisa McClain Mitchell on behalf of Petitioners Public Utility Commission of Texas, Railroad Commission of Texas, State of Texas and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 16-1204. [16-1204, 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Mitchell, Lisa) [Entered: 01/24/2019 04:53 PM]
January 18, 2019 MOTION [1769121] to withdraw as petitioner (Response to Motion served by hand due on 01/28/2019). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 01/28/2019) filed by Bill Schuette in 16-1204 (Service Date: 01/18/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 66 words. [16-1127, 16-1204] (Gordon, Neil) [Entered: 01/18/2019 12:10 PM]
January 18, 2019 NOTICE [1769049] to withdraw attorney Terese T. Wyly who represented Mississippi Power Company in 16-1208 filed by Mississippi Power Company in 16-1208 [Service Date: 01/18/2019 ] [16-1127, 16-1208] (Pettis, Michael) [Entered: 01/18/2019 10:30 AM]
January 17, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1768875] filed by M. Brant Pettis on behalf of Petitioner Mississippi Power Company in 16-1208. [16-1127, 16-1208] (Pettis, Michael) [Entered: 01/17/2019 12:33 PM]
January 16, 2019 NOTICE [1768667] to withdraw attorney Jeffrey Alan Stone who represented Gulf Power Company in 16-1208 filed by Gulf Power Company in 16-1208 [Service Date: 01/16/2019 ] [16-1208, 16-1127] (Manning, Robert) [Entered: 01/16/2019 02:55 PM]
January 14, 2019 REPORT [1768217] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 16-1127, EPA in 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206 abeyance status is agency review ongoing [Service Date: 01/14/2019 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 01/14/2019 01:46 PM]
January 2, 2019 NOTICE [1766751] to substitute attorney Myra Blake substituted by Deborah M Murray, to withdraw attorney filed by American Lung Association, American Public Health Association and Physicians for Social Responsibility in 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210 [Service Date: 01/02/2019 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Murray, Deborah) [Entered: 01/02/2019 04:44 PM]
December 31, 2018 NOTICE [1766401] to substitute attorney Misha Tseytlin substituted by Luke N. Berg filed by State of Wisconsin [Service Date: 12/31/2018 ] [16-1204] (Berg, Luke) [Entered: 12/31/2018 11:42 AM]
October 16, 2018 REPORT [1755483] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 16-1127, EPA in 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210 abeyance status is agency review ongoing [Service Date: 10/16/2018 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 10/16/2018 01:55 PM]
July 18, 2018 REPORT [1741163] filed by EPA, Gina McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1127, EPA in 16-1175, 16-1204, EPA, Regina A. McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210 abeyance status is agency review ongoing [Service Date: 07/18/2018 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 07/18/2018 11:04 AM]
May 30, 2018 AMENDED STATEMENT [1733438] with Disclosure Listing filed by Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 16-1206 [Service Date: 05/30/2018 ] [16-1206, 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Gidiere, Philip) [Entered: 05/30/2018 05:25 PM]
April 19, 2018 REPORT [1727292] filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1127, EPA in 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210 abeyance status is agency review ongoing [Service Date: 04/19/2018 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 04/19/2018 12:50 PM]
March 6, 2018 NOTICE [1720888] to withdraw attorney Erica Peterson who represented State of West Virginia in 16-1204 filed by State of West Virginia in 16-1204 [Service Date: 03/06/2018 ] [16-1204, 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Martin, Paul) [Entered: 03/06/2018 02:12 PM]
March 5, 2018 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1720709] filed by Paul Anthony Martin, Chief Deputy Attorney General on behalf of Petitioner State of West Virginia in 16-1204. [16-1204, 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Martin, Paul) [Entered: 03/05/2018 05:00 PM]
March 5, 2018 DISREGARD--INCORRECT PDF WAS ATTACHED--ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1720687] filed by Paul Anthony Martin, Chief Deputy Attorney General on behalf of Petitioner State of West Virginia in 16-1204. [16-1204, 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210]--[Edited 03/05/2018 by LMC] (Martin, Paul) [Entered: 03/05/2018 04:27 PM]
January 19, 2018 REPORT [1713723] filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1127, EPA in 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210 abeyance status is agency review ongoing [Service Date: 01/19/2018 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 01/19/2018 11:43 AM]
October 27, 2017 NOTICE [1701712] to withdraw attorney Thomas Michael Johnson Jr. who represented State of West Virginia in 16-1204 filed by State of West Virginia in 16-1204 [Service Date: 10/27/2017 ] [16-1204, 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Peterson, Erica) [Entered: 10/27/2017 09:48 AM]
October 24, 2017 REPORT [1701050] filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1127, EPA in 16-1175, 16-1208, 16-1210, 16-1206, 16-1204 abeyance status is agency review ongoing [Service Date: 10/24/2017 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 10/24/2017 10:19 AM]
October 23, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1700851] filed by Erica N. Peterson on behalf of Petitioner State of West Virginia in 16-1204. [16-1204, 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Peterson, Erica) [Entered: 10/23/2017 12:20 PM]
October 5, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1697042] filed by Samuel R. Flynn on behalf of Petitioner State of Kentucky in 16-1204. [16-1204, 16-1127] (Flynn, Samuel) [Entered: 10/05/2017 09:22 AM]
August 25, 2017 NOTICE [1690279] to withdraw attorney Wendlene M. Lavey who represented Murray Energy Corporation in 16-1127 filed by Murray Energy Corporation in 16-1127 [Service Date: 08/25/2017 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Lavey, Wendlene) [Entered: 08/25/2017 03:47 PM]
August 24, 2017 NOTICE [1690122] to withdraw attorney William Rowe Phelan Jr. who represented City of Baltimore in 16-1127 filed by City of Baltimore in 16-1127 [Service Date: 08/24/2017 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Phelan, William) [Entered: 08/24/2017 02:11 PM]
August 18, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1689367] filed by David E. Ralph and co-counsel Dawn S. Lettman on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent City of Baltimore in 16-1127. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Phelan, William) [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:15 AM]
August 17, 2017 NOTICE [1689193] to withdraw attorney Elbert Lin who represented State of West Virginia in 16-1204 filed by State of West Virginia in 16-1204 [Service Date: 08/17/2017 ] [16-1204, 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 08/17/2017 11:28 AM]
August 15, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1688854] filed by Thomas M. Johnson, Jr. on behalf of Petitioner State of West Virginia in 16-1204. [16-1204, 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Johnson, Thomas) [Entered: 08/15/2017 02:31 PM]
August 3, 2017 NOTICE [1687219] to withdraw attorney Elizabeth Anne Morrisseau who represented State of Wyoming in 16-1204 filed by State of Wyoming in 16-1204 [Service Date: 08/03/2017 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Morrisseau, Elizabeth) [Entered: 08/03/2017 03:20 PM]
July 27, 2017 NOTICE [1686177] to withdraw attorney Robert David Cheren who represented Murray Energy Corporation in 16-1127 filed by Murray Energy Corporation in 16-1127 [Service Date: 07/27/2017 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Lavey, Wendlene) [Entered: 07/27/2017 02:59 PM]
July 26, 2017 REPORT [1685974] filed abeyance status : agency review ongoing filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1127, EPA in 16-1175, 16-1208, 16-1210, 16-1206, 16-1204 [Service Date: 07/26/2017 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 07/26/2017 02:44 PM]
July 24, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1685451] filed by Erik E. Petersen on behalf of Petitioner State of Wyoming in 16-1204. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204] (Petersen, Erik) [Entered: 07/24/2017 11:13 AM]
June 30, 2017 NOTICE [1682326] to withdraw attorney Geoffrey K. Barnes (Response to Motion served by mail due on 07/10/2017) filed by Murray Energy Corporation (Service Date: 06/30/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 57. [16-1127]--[Edited 07/03/2017 by RJC] (Barnes, Geoffrey) [Entered: 06/30/2017 05:21 PM]
June 2, 2017 NOTICE [1678097] to withdraw attorney Pamela A. Campos who represented Environmental Defense Fund in 16-1127 filed by Environmental Defense Fund in 16-1127 [Service Date: 06/02/2017 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (McCahan, Graham) [Entered: 06/02/2017 06:45 PM]
April 27, 2017 PER CURIAM ORDER [1672987] filed that the motion to continue oral argument be granted, and these consolidated cases are hereby removed from the May 18, 2017 oral argument calendar. It is FURTHER ORDERED that these consolidated cases be held in abeyance pending further order of the court. EPA is directed to file status reports on the agencys review of the Supplemental Finding at 90-day intervals beginning 90 days from the date of this order. Within 30 days of the agency notifying the court and the parties what action it has or will be taking with respect to the Supplemental Finding, the parties are directed to file motions to govern future proceedings in these consolidated cases. Before Judges: Brown, Griffith and Srinivasan. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] [Entered: 04/27/2017 03:43 PM]
April 24, 2017 JOINT RESPONSE IN SUPPORT [1672435] to motion for other relief [ # 1671687-2 ] filed by Murray Energy Corporation in 16-1127, ARIPPA in 16-1175, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company, Mississippi Power Company and Southern Company Services, Inc. in 16-1208, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 16-1210, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 16-1206, Public Utility Commission of Texas, Railroad Commission of Texas, Bill Schuette, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, State of Wyoming and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 16-1204 [Service Date: 04/24/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2.155 Words. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Jaber, Makram) [Entered: 04/24/2017 05:34 PM]
April 24, 2017 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1672432] to motion for other relief [ # 1671687-2 ] filed by Calpine Corporation and Exelon Corporation in 16-1127 [Service Date: 04/24/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2661 words. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Collins, Brendan) [Entered: 04/24/2017 05:08 PM]
April 21, 2017 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1672191] to motion for other relief [ # 1671687-2 ] filed by City of Baltimore, City of Chicago, City of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, County of Erie, New York, DC, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington in 16-1127 [Service Date: 04/21/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2777. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Triplett, Tracy) [Entered: 04/21/2017 04:06 PM]
April 21, 2017 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1672173] to motion for other relief [ # 1671687-2 ] filed by American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, Clean Air Council, Conservation Law Foundation, Downwinders at Risk, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Integrity Project, NAACP, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Sierra Club and The Ohio Environmental Council in 16-1127 [Service Date: 04/21/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 4773 words. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 04/21/2017 03:45 PM]
April 18, 2017 MOTION [1671687] Continue Oral Argument (Response to Motion served by mail due on 04/28/2017) filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1127, EPA in 16-1175, 16-1208, 16-1210, 16-1206, 16-1204 (Service Date: 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 1,784 words. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 04/18/2017 06:23 PM]
March 24, 2017 JOINT PETITIONER FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1667700] filed by Murray Energy Corporation in 16-1127, ARIPPA in 16-1175, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company, Mississippi Power Company and Southern Company Services, Inc. in 16-1208, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 16-1210, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 16-1206, Public Utility Commission of Texas, Railroad Commission of Texas, Bill Schuette, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, State of Wyoming and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 16-1204 [Service Date: 03/24/2017 ] Length of Brief: 8,915 words. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Jaber, Makram) [Entered: 03/24/2017 11:52 AM]
March 24, 2017 JOINT PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1667698] filed by Murray Energy Corporation in 16-1127, ARIPPA in 16-1175, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company, Mississippi Power Company and Southern Company Services, Inc. in 16-1208, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 16-1210, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 16-1206, Public Utility Commission of Texas, Railroad Commission of Texas, Bill Schuette, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, State of Wyoming and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 16-1204 [Service Date: 03/24/2017 ] Length of Brief: 17,889 words. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Jaber, Makram) [Entered: 03/24/2017 11:49 AM]
March 24, 2017 INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1667668] filed by City of Baltimore, City of Chicago, City of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, County of Erie, New York, DC, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington in 16-1127 [Service Date: 03/24/2017 ] Length of Brief: 3718. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Triplett, Tracy) [Entered: 03/24/2017 11:06 AM]
March 23, 2017 INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1667407] filed by Calpine Corporation and Exelon Corporation in 16-1127 [Service Date: 03/23/2017 ] Length of Brief: 3712 words. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Collins, Brendan) [Entered: 03/23/2017 10:24 AM]
March 22, 2017 AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1667341] filed by National Congress of American Indians [Service Date: 03/22/2017 ] Length of Brief: 6,499 Words. [16-1127] (Steadman, Jane) [Entered: 03/22/2017 03:51 PM]
March 22, 2017 RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1667291] filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1127, EPA in 16-1175, 16-1208, 16-1210, 16-1206, 16-1204 [Service Date: 03/22/2017 ] Length of Brief: 17,914 Words. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 03/22/2017 12:59 PM]
March 21, 2017 INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1667172] filed by American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, Clean Air Council, Conservation Law Foundation, Downwinders at Risk, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Integrity Project, NAACP, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Sierra Club and The Ohio Environmental Council in 16-1127 [Service Date: 03/21/2017 ] Length of Brief: 3742. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 03/21/2017 06:52 PM]
March 21, 2017 AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1667041] filed by Joel D. Blum, Celia Y. Chen, Charles T. Driscoll, Jr., David C. Evers, Philippe Grandjean, Daniel A. Jaffe, Robert P. Mason, Noelle Eckley Selin and Elsie M. Sunderland in 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1208, 16-1210, 16-1206, 16-1204 [Service Date: 03/21/2017 ] Length of Brief: 6496 words. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Goho, Shaun) [Entered: 03/21/2017 01:18 PM]
March 10, 2017 JOINT APPENDIX [1665569] filed by Cato Institute, American Thoracic Society, Bad River Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians, Joel D. Blum, Celia Y. Chen, Charles T. Driscoll, Jr., David C. Evers, Fond du Lac Band of Lake Superior Chippewa, Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians, Philippe Grandjean, Great Lakes Indian Fish and Wildlife Commission, Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law, Daniel A. Jaffe, Lac Courte Oreilles Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians, Little River Band of Ottawa Indians, Little Traverse Bay Bands of Odawa Indians, Robert P. Mason, National Congress of American Indians, Noelle Eckley Selin, St. Croix Chippewa Indians of Wisconsin, Elsie M. Sunderland, American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Calpine Corporation, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, City of Baltimore, City of Chicago, City of New York, Clean Air Council, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, Conservation Law Foundation, County of Erie, New York, DC, Downwinders at Risk, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Integrity Project, Exelon Corporation, NAACP, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Sierra Club, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, The Ohio Environmental Council, Murray Energy Corporation and EPA and E. Scott Pruitt [Volumes: 3] [Service Date: 03/10/2017 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210]--[Edited 03/13/2017 by RJC] (Jaber, Makram) [Entered: 03/10/2017 07:25 PM]
March 10, 2017 CLERK'S ORDER [1665544] filed scheduling oral argument on Thursday, 05/18/2017. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] [Entered: 03/10/2017 04:33 PM]
February 24, 2017 JOINT PETITIONER REPLY BRIEF [1663056] filed by Murray Energy Corporation in 16-1127, ARIPPA in 16-1175, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company, Mississippi Power Company and Southern Company Services, Inc. in 16-1208, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 16-1210, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 16-1206, Public Utility Commission of Texas, Railroad Commission of Texas, Bill Schuette, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, State of Wyoming and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 16-1204 [Service Date: 02/24/2017 ] Length of Brief: 8,914 words. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Jaber, Makram) [Entered: 02/24/2017 06:32 PM]
February 10, 2017 INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1660822] filed by American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, Clean Air Council, Conservation Law Foundation, Downwinders at Risk, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Integrity Project, NAACP, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Sierra Club and The Ohio Environmental Council in 16-1127, American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, Clean Air Council, Downwinders at Risk, Environmental Integrity Project, NAACP, Natural Resources Defense Council and Physicians for Social Responsibility in 16-1175, 16-1208, American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, Clean Air Council, Downwinders at Risk, Environmental Integrity Project, NAACP and Physicians for Social Responsibility in 16-1210, 16-1206, American Lung Association, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, Clean Air Council, Downwinders at Risk, Environmental Integrity Project, NAACP, Natural Resources Defense Council and Physicians for Social Responsibility in 16-1204 [Service Date: 02/10/2017 ] Length of Brief: 3731 words.. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 02/10/2017 06:53 PM]
February 10, 2017 INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1660762] filed by Calpine Corporation and Exelon Corporation in 16-1127 [Service Date: 02/10/2017 ] Length of Brief: 3709 words. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Collins, Brendan) [Entered: 02/10/2017 04:12 PM]
February 10, 2017 INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1660588] filed by City of Baltimore, City of Chicago, City of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, County of Erie, New York, DC, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington in 16-1127 [Service Date: 02/10/2017 ] Length of Brief: 3735 words. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Triplett, Tracy) [Entered: 02/10/2017 12:59 PM]
February 9, 2017 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged amici briefs [ # 1657674-2 ] [ # 1657479-2 ] [ # 1657423-2 ] are filed. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] [Entered: 02/09/2017 04:11 PM]
February 9, 2017 CLERK'S ORDER [1660460] granting motions to participate as amici curiae in support of respondents [ # 1657480-2 ] [ # 1657472-2 ] [ # 1657419-2 ]. The Clerk is directed to file the lodged amici briefs. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] [Entered: 02/09/2017 04:08 PM]
February 9, 2017 PER CURIAM ORDER [1660381] denying motion to extend the briefing schedule by 45 days [ # 1658604-2 ]. Before Judges: Rogers, Kavanaugh and Millett. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] [Entered: 02/09/2017 12:07 PM]
February 8, 2017 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1660175] for reply [ # 1659983-2 ] filed by Murray Energy Corporation in 16-1127, ARIPPA in 16-1175, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company, Mississippi Power Company and Southern Company Services, Inc. in 16-1208, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 16-1210, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 16-1206, Public Utility Commission of Texas, Railroad Commission of Texas, Bill Schuette, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, State of Wyoming and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 16-1204. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Jaber, Makram) [Entered: 02/08/2017 01:45 PM]
February 7, 2017 JOINT REPLY [1659983] filed by Murray Energy Corporation in 16-1127, ARIPPA in 16-1175, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company, Mississippi Power Company and Southern Company Services, Inc. in 16-1208, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 16-1210, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 16-1206, Public Utility Commission of Texas, Railroad Commission of Texas, Bill Schuette, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, State of Wyoming and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 16-1204 to response [ # 1659428-2 ] [Service Date: 02/07/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 677 Words. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Jaber, Makram) [Entered: 02/07/2017 05:10 PM]
February 3, 2017 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1659428] to motion to extend time [ # 1658604-2 ] filed by American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Calpine Corporation, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, City of Baltimore, City of Chicago, City of New York, Clean Air Council, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, Conservation Law Foundation, County of Erie, New York, DC, Downwinders at Risk, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Integrity Project, Exelon Corporation, NAACP, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Sierra Club, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and The Ohio Environmental Council in 16-1127 [Service Date: 02/03/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2135. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Triplett, Tracy) [Entered: 02/03/2017 05:02 PM]
January 31, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1658606] filed by Shaun A. Goho on behalf of Movant-Amici Curiae for Respondent Joel D. Blum, Celia Y. Chen, Charles T. Driscoll, Jr., David C. Evers, Philippe Grandjean, Daniel A. Jaffe, Robert P. Mason, Noelle Eckley Selin and Elsie M. Sunderland in 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1208, 16-1210, 16-1206, 16-1204. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Goho, Shaun) [Entered: 01/31/2017 05:58 PM]
January 31, 2017 JOINT MOTION [1658604] to extend time to file briefs (Response to Motion served by mail due on 02/10/2017) filed by Murray Energy Corporation in 16-1127, ARIPPA in 16-1175, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company, Mississippi Power Company and Southern Company Services, Inc. in 16-1208, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 16-1210, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 16-1206, Public Utility Commission of Texas, Railroad Commission of Texas, Bill Schuette, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, State of Wyoming and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 16-1204 (Service Date: 01/31/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 1,630 Words. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210]--[Edited 02/01/2017 by RJC] (Jaber, Makram) [Entered: 01/31/2017 05:53 PM]
January 30, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1658320] filed by Adam Babich on behalf of Movant-Amicus Curiae for Respondent American Thoracic Society. [16-1127] (Babich, Adam) [Entered: 01/30/2017 05:28 PM]
January 30, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1658309] filed by Erin Ganahl, Deputy Attorney General on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent State of California. [16-1127] (Ganahl, Erin) [Entered: 01/30/2017 04:58 PM]
January 27, 2017 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1657958] for motion to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1657419-2 ] filed by National Congress of American Indians. [16-1127] (Steadman, Jane) [Entered: 01/27/2017 06:00 PM]
January 26, 2017 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1657765] for motion to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1657480-2 ] filed by Joel D. Blum, Celia Y. Chen, Charles T. Driscoll, Jr., David C. Evers, Philippe Grandjean, Daniel A. Jaffe, Robert P. Mason, Noelle Eckley Selin and Elsie M. Sunderland in 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1208, 16-1210, 16-1206, 16-1204. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Goho, Shaun) [Entered: 01/26/2017 05:16 PM]
January 25, 2017 AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1657674] LODGED by American Thoracic Society [Service Date: 01/25/2017 ] Length of Brief: 5265 Words. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] [Entered: 01/26/2017 02:44 PM]
January 25, 2017 MOTION [1657480] filed to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by Elsie M. Sunderland, Joel D. Blum, Celia Y. Chen, Charles T. Driscoll, Jr., David C. Evers, Philippe Grandjean, Daniel A. Jaffe, Robert P. Mason, and Noelle Eckley Selin [Service Date: 01/25/2017 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210]--[Edited 01/26/2017 by RJC] (Goho, Shaun) [Entered: 01/25/2017 10:36 PM]
January 25, 2017 AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1657479] filed by Elsie M. Sunderland in 16-1127, Joel D. Blum, Celia Y. Chen, Charles T. Driscoll, Jr., David C. Evers, Philippe Grandjean, Daniel A. Jaffe, Robert P. Mason and Noelle Eckley Selin in 16-1175 [Service Date: 01/25/2017 ] Length of Brief: 6,496 words. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 03/28/2017 by LMC] (Goho, Shaun) [Entered: 01/25/2017 10:35 PM]
January 25, 2017 MOTION [1657472] to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by American Thoracic Society [Service Date: 01/25/2017] [16-1127]--[Edited 01/26/2017 by RJC] (Babich, Adam) [Entered: 01/25/2017 06:31 PM]
January 25, 2017 AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1657470] filed by Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law [Service Date: 01/25/2017 ] Length of Brief: 5,049 Words. [16-1127] (Revesz, Richard) [Entered: 01/25/2017 06:13 PM]
January 25, 2017 AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1657423] filed by Bad River Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians, Fond du Lac Band of Lake Superior Chippewa, Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians, Great Lakes Indian Fish and Wildlife Commission, Lac Courte Oreilles Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians, Little River Band of Ottawa Indians, Little Traverse Bay Bands of Odawa Indians, National Congress of American Indians and St. Croix Chippewa Indians of Wisconsin [Service Date: 01/25/2017 ] Length of Brief: 6,481 words. [16-1127]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 03/28/2017 by LMC] (Steadman, Jane) [Entered: 01/25/2017 04:06 PM]
January 25, 2017 MOTION [1657419] filed to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Attached] filed by National Congress of American Indians, et al. [Service Date: 01/25/2017 ] [16-1127]--[Edited 01/26/2017 by RJC] (Steadman, Jane) [Entered: 01/25/2017 03:56 PM]
January 23, 2017 NOTICE [1656959] filed to withdraw attorney James Van Carson who represented Murray Energy Corporation in 16-1127 filed by Murray Energy Corporation [Service Date: 01/23/2017 ] [16-1127] (Carson, James) [Entered: 01/23/2017 06:12 PM]
January 23, 2017 LETTER [1656814] sent to counsel concerning the use of uncommon acronyms and abbreviations in briefs. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] [Entered: 01/23/2017 01:05 PM]
January 18, 2017 RESPONDENT BRIEF [1656539] filed by EPA and Gina McCarthy in 16-1127, EPA in 16-1175, 16-1208, 16-1210, EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 16-1206, 16-1204 [Service Date: 01/18/2017 ] Length of Brief: 17,909 Words. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 01/18/2017 05:01 PM]
December 14, 2016 NOTICE [1651076] filed to withdraw attorney Mitchel T. Denham who represented State of Kentucky in 16-1204 filed by State of Kentucky [Service Date: 12/14/2016 ] [16-1204] (Denham, Mitchel) [Entered: 12/14/2016 02:43 PM]
December 14, 2016 NOTICE [1650981] filed to withdraw attorney Michael James McGrady who represented State of Wyoming in 16-1204 filed by State of Wyoming in 16-1204 [Service Date: 12/14/2016 ] [16-1127, 16-1204] (McGrady, Michael) [Entered: 12/14/2016 10:40 AM]
December 12, 2016 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged Amicus brief [ # 1647667-2 ] is filed. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] [Entered: 12/12/2016 02:10 PM]
December 12, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1650569] granting motion to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1647666-2 ]. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] [Entered: 12/12/2016 02:08 PM]
November 25, 2016 AMICUS FOR PETITIONER BRIEF [1647667] lodged by Cato Institute [Service Date: 11/25/2016 ] Length of Brief: 5606 words. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210]--[Edited 11/28/2016 by AH--MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED] (DeLaquil, Mark) [Entered: 11/25/2016 04:08 PM]
November 25, 2016 MOTION [1647666] filed to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Cato Institute [Service Date: 11/25/2016 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (DeLaquil, Mark) [Entered: 11/25/2016 04:05 PM]
November 18, 2016 JOINT PETITIONER BRIEF [1647029] filed by Murray Energy Corporation in 16-1127, ARIPPA in 16-1175, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company, Mississippi Power Company and Southern Company Services, Inc. in 16-1208, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 16-1210, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 16-1206, Public Utility Commission of Texas, Railroad Commission of Texas, Bill Schuette, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, State of Wyoming and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 16-1204 [Service Date: 11/18/2016 ] Length of Brief: 17,884 Words. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Jaber, Makram) [Entered: 11/18/2016 09:25 PM]
November 1, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1643828] granting motion for leave to participate as amicus curiae in support of respondents filed by the Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law [ # 1640966-2 ] in 16-1127. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] [Entered: 11/01/2016 08:28 AM]
October 14, 2016 PER CURIAM ORDER [1641051] filed setting briefing schedule: Brief of State and Industry Petitioners (not to excced 18,000 words in the aggregate, divided as petitioners see fit) due 11/18/2016. RESPONDENT Brief due on 01/19/2017 (not to exceed 18,000 words). INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT Brief(s) (not to exceed 11,250 words in the aggregate, divided as intervenors see fit) due 02/10/2017. Reply Brief(s) of State and Industry Petitioners (not to exceed 9,000 words in the aggregate, divided as petitioners see fit) due 02/24/2017. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 03/10/2017. Final Briefs due 03/24/2017. Before Judges: Rogers, Srinivasan and Wilkins. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] [Entered: 10/14/2016 11:20 AM]
October 13, 2016 MOTION [1640966] filed to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law [Service Date: 10/13/2016 ] [16-1127]--[Edited 10/14/2016 by RJC] (Revesz, Richard) [Entered: 10/13/2016 04:51 PM]
September 30, 2016 RESPONSE [1638780] filed to order [ # 1633131-2 ],[ # 1633131-3 ] filed by Murray Energy Corporation in 16-1127, ARIPPA in 16-1175, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company, Mississippi Power Company and Southern Company Services, Inc. in 16-1208, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 16-1210, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 16-1206, Public Utility Commission of Texas, Railroad Commission of Texas, Bill Schuette, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, State of Wyoming and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 16-1204 [Service Date: 09/30/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Jaber, Makram) [Entered: 09/30/2016 07:46 PM]
September 30, 2016 RESPONSE [1638714] filed to order [ # 1633131-2 ],[ # 1633131-3 ] filed by EPA and Gina McCarthy in 16-1127, EPA in 16-1175, 16-1208, 16-1210, EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 16-1206, 16-1204 [Service Date: 09/30/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 09/30/2016 03:56 PM]
September 29, 2016 NOTICE [1638458] filed to withdraw attorney Jonathan Zak Ritchie who represented State of West Virginia in 16-1204 filed by State of West Virginia in 16-1204 [Service Date: 09/29/2016 ] [16-1127, 16-1204] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 09/29/2016 04:48 PM]
August 31, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1633131] directing parties to submit proposed briefing formats by 09/30/2016. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] [Entered: 08/31/2016 04:19 PM]
August 29, 2016 PER CURIAM ORDER [1632520] denying motion to sever and consolidate filed in No. 15-1180, et al. [ # 1618799-2 ]. The Clerk is directed to schedule No. 16-1127, et al., for argument on the same day and before the same panel as No. 15-1180, et al. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties submit, within 14 days of the date of this order, a proposed briefing format and schedule. Before Judges: Henderson and Pillard. [15-1180, 15-1191, 15-1192, 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] [Entered: 08/29/2016 10:22 AM]
August 9, 2016 NOTICE [1629403] filed by State of Arizona in 16-1204 to substitute attorney Brock Heathcotte substituted by Keith J. Miller [Service Date: 08/09/2016 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Miller, Keith) [Entered: 08/09/2016 02:33 PM]
August 8, 2016 REPLY [1629133] filed by EPA and Gina McCarthy in 16-1127, EPA in 16-1175, 16-1208, 16-1210, EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 16-1206, 16-1204 to response [ # 1628159-2 ] [Service Date: 08/08/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 08/08/2016 01:47 PM]
August 8, 2016 CERTIFIED INDEX TO RECORD [1629118] filed by EPA and Gina McCarthy in 16-1127, EPA in 16-1175, 16-1208, 16-1210, EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 16-1206, 16-1204 [Service Date: 08/08/2016 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 08/08/2016 01:29 PM]
August 3, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1628451] granting motions for leave to intervene [ # 1626729-2 ] [ # 1626556-2 ] [ # 1622739-2 ] [ # 1615015-2 ]. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] [Entered: 08/03/2016 01:16 PM]
August 2, 2016 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1628159] filed by Murray Energy Corporation in 16-1127, ARIPPA in 16-1175, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company, Mississippi Power Company and Southern Company Services, Inc. in 16-1208, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 16-1210, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 16-1206, Public Utility Commission of Texas, Railroad Commission of Texas, Bill Schuette, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, State of Wyoming and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 16-1204 to motion for other relief [ # 1626842-2 ] [Service Date: 08/02/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Barnes, Geoffrey) [Entered: 08/02/2016 10:48 AM]
July 29, 2016 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1627822] filed by Bill Schuette, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 16-1204 [Service Date: 07/29/2016 ] [16-1204, 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Gordon, Neil) [Entered: 07/29/2016 04:18 PM]
July 29, 2016 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1627821] filed by Bill Schuette, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 16-1204 [Service Date: 07/29/2016 ] [16-1204, 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Gordon, Neil) [Entered: 07/29/2016 04:16 PM]
July 28, 2016 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1627590] filed by Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 16-1206 [Service Date: 07/28/2016 ] [16-1206, 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Gidiere, Philip) [Entered: 07/28/2016 07:21 PM]
July 28, 2016 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1627589] filed by Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 16-1206 [Service Date: 07/28/2016 ] [16-1206, 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Gidiere, Philip) [Entered: 07/28/2016 07:19 PM]
July 28, 2016 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1627588] filed by Oak Grove Management Company, LLC in 16-1206 [Service Date: 07/28/2016 ] [16-1206, 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Gidiere, Philip) [Entered: 07/28/2016 07:17 PM]
July 27, 2016 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1627361] filed by Utility Air Regulatory Group [Service Date: 07/27/2016 ] [16-1210] (Jaber, Makram) [Entered: 07/27/2016 05:53 PM]
July 27, 2016 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1627359] filed by Utility Air Regulatory Group [Service Date: 07/27/2016 ] [16-1210] (Jaber, Makram) [Entered: 07/27/2016 05:44 PM]
July 27, 2016 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1627326] filed by Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company, Mississippi Power Company and Southern Company Services, Inc. in 16-1208 [Service Date: 07/27/2016 ] [16-1208, 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1210] (Levin, Angela) [Entered: 07/27/2016 03:38 PM]
July 27, 2016 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1627323] filed by Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company, Mississippi Power Company and Southern Company Services, Inc. in 16-1208 [Service Date: 07/27/2016 ] [16-1208, 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1210] (Levin, Angela) [Entered: 07/27/2016 03:37 PM]
July 27, 2016 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1627321] filed by Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company, Mississippi Power Company and Southern Company Services, Inc. in 16-1208 [Service Date: 07/27/2016 ] [16-1208, 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1210] (Levin, Angela) [Entered: 07/27/2016 03:36 PM]
July 25, 2016 MOTION [1626842] filed by EPA in 16-1175, EPA and Gina McCarthy in 16-1127, 16-1208, 16-1210, EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 16-1206, 16-1204 Deadline by which Parties Will Submit Joint or Separate Motions for A Briefing Schedule and Format. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 08/08/2016) [Service Date: 07/25/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [16-1175, 16-1127, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 07/25/2016 05:36 PM]
July 25, 2016 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1626807] submitted by ARIPPA in 16-1175 [Service Date: 07/25/2016 ] [16-1175, 16-1127, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Vaccaro, Katherine) [Entered: 07/25/2016 04:31 PM]
July 25, 2016 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1626806] filed by ARIPPA in 16-1175 [Service Date: 07/25/2016 ] [16-1175, 16-1127, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Vaccaro, Katherine) [Entered: 07/25/2016 04:29 PM]
July 25, 2016 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1626805] filed by ARIPPA in 16-1175 [Service Date: 07/25/2016 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [16-1175, 16-1127, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Vaccaro, Katherine) [Entered: 07/25/2016 04:29 PM]
July 25, 2016 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1626804] filed by ARIPPA in 16-1175 [Service Date: 07/25/2016 ] [16-1175, 16-1127, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Vaccaro, Katherine) [Entered: 07/25/2016 04:27 PM]
July 25, 2016 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1626803] filed by ARIPPA in 16-1175 [Service Date: 07/25/2016 ] [16-1175, 16-1127, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Vaccaro, Katherine) [Entered: 07/25/2016 04:25 PM]
July 25, 2016 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1626802] submitted by Murray Energy Corporation in 16-1127 [Service Date: 07/25/2016 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Barnes, Geoffrey) [Entered: 07/25/2016 04:24 PM]
July 25, 2016 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1626801] filed by Murray Energy Corporation in 16-1127 [Service Date: 07/25/2016 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Barnes, Geoffrey) [Entered: 07/25/2016 04:23 PM]
July 25, 2016 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1626800] filed by Murray Energy Corporation in 16-1127 [Service Date: 07/25/2016 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Barnes, Geoffrey) [Entered: 07/25/2016 04:21 PM]
July 25, 2016 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1626799] filed by Murray Energy Corporation in 16-1127 [Service Date: 07/25/2016 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Barnes, Geoffrey) [Entered: 07/25/2016 04:20 PM]
July 25, 2016 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1626798] filed by Murray Energy Corporation in 16-1127 [Service Date: 07/25/2016 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Barnes, Geoffrey) [Entered: 07/25/2016 04:19 PM]
July 25, 2016 MOTION [1626729] filed by Calpine Corporation and Exelon Corporation for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 07/25/2016 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] -- [Edited 08/02/2016 by RJC] (Collins, Brendan) [Entered: 07/25/2016 02:21 PM]
July 22, 2016 MOTION [1626556] filed by American Lung Association, et al. for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 07/22/2016 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210]--[Edited 08/03/2016 by RJC] (Weeks, Ann) [Entered: 07/22/2016 04:40 PM]
July 15, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1625026] filed by David A. Zonana on behalf of Movant-Intervenor for Respondent State of California in 16-1127. [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] (Zonana, David) [Entered: 07/15/2016 03:36 PM]
July 1, 2016 JOINT MOTION [1622739] filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, et al for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 07/01/2016 ] [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210]--[Edited 07/07/2016 by AY] (Riley, Jillian) [Entered: 07/01/2016 12:51 PM]
June 30, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1622608] filed consolidating cases 16-1204 (Consolidation started 06/30/2016) with 16-1127; directing party to file in 16-1204 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 08/01/2016. PETITIONER statement of issues due 08/01/2016 [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1204, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] [Entered: 06/30/2016 04:12 PM]
June 28, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1622149] filed consolidating cases 16-1206 (Consolidation started 06/28/2016) with 16-1175. Directing party to file in 16-1206 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 07/28/2016. PETITIONER statement of issues due 07/28/2016 [16-1175, 16-1127, 16-1206, 16-1208, 16-1210] [Entered: 06/28/2016 04:28 PM]
June 28, 2016 CERTIFIED COPY [1622141] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1622139-2 ] [16-1206, 16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1208, 16-1210] [Entered: 06/28/2016 04:09 PM]
June 27, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1621894] filed consolidating cases 16-1208, 16-1210 (Consolidation started 06/27/2016) with 16-1127; directing party to file in 16-1208, 16-1210 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 07/27/2016. PETITIONER statement of issues due 07/27/2016 [16-1127, 16-1175, 16-1208, 16-1210] [Entered: 06/27/2016 03:14 PM]
June 13, 2016 CERTIFIED COPY [1618950] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1618945-2 ] [16-1175] [Entered: 06/13/2016 12:54 PM]
June 13, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1618949] filed consolidating cases 16-1175 (Consolidation started 06/13/2016) with 16-1127; directing party to file in 16-1175 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 07/25/2016. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 07/25/2016. PETITIONER statement of issues due 07/25/2016. PETITIONER underlying decision due 07/25/2016. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 07/25/2016. PETITIONER procedural motions due 07/25/2016. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 08/08/2016 [16-1175, 16-1127] [Entered: 06/13/2016 12:51 PM]
May 25, 2016 MOTION [1615015] filed by Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Council of Maine, The Ohio Environmental Council, Sierra Club for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 05/25/2016 ] [16-1127]--[Edited 06/02/2016 by MLG--MODIFIED PARTY FILER--] (McCahan, Graham) [Entered: 05/25/2016 07:28 PM]
May 18, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1613741] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1613446-2 ]; extending Clerk order initial submissions for appellant/petitioner [ # 1610471-2 ] PETITIONER docketing statement due 07/25/2016. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 07/25/2016. PETITIONER statement of issues due 07/25/2016. PETITIONER underlying decision due 07/25/2016. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 07/25/2016. PETITIONER procedural motions due 07/25/2016. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 08/08/2016; extending Clerk order initial submissions for appellee/respondent [ # 1610471-3 ] RESPONDENT certified index to record due 08/08/2016. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 07/25/2016. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 08/08/2016 [16-1127] [Entered: 05/18/2016 10:48 AM]
May 16, 2016 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1613446] filed by EPA and Gina McCarthy to extend time to file initial submissions to 07/25/2016. [Service Date: 05/16/2016 ] Pages: 1-10. [16-1127] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 05/16/2016 03:39 PM]
May 2, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1611312] filed by Stephanie J. Talbert on behalf of Respondents EPA and Gina McCarthy. [16-1127] (Talbert, Stephanie) [Entered: 05/02/2016 12:33 PM]
April 26, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1610471] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 05/26/2016. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 05/26/2016. PETITIONER statement of issues due 05/26/2016. PETITIONER underlying decision due 05/26/2016. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 05/26/2016. PETITIONER procedural motions due 05/26/2016. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 06/10/2016; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 05/26/2016. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 05/26/2016. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 06/10/2016. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 06/10/2016 [16-1127] [Entered: 04/26/2016 12:18 PM]
April 26, 2016 CERTIFIED COPY [1610469] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1610467-2 ] [16-1127] [Entered: 04/26/2016 12:17 PM]
April 25, 2016 PETITION FOR REVIEW [1610467] filed by Murray Energy Corporation of a decision by federal agency [Service Date: 04/25/2016 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [16-1127] [Entered: 04/26/2016 12:16 PM]
April 25, 2016 PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [16-1127] [Entered: 04/26/2016 12:13 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Murray Energy Corporation v. EPA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: American Public Health Association
Represented By: Deborah M. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Chesapeake Climate Action Network
Represented By: James Samuel Pew
Represented By: Neil Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of California
Represented By: David Alexander Zonana
Represented By: Erin C. Ganahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Environmental Defense Fund
Represented By: Vickie Lynn Patton
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Levitan
Represented By: Graham Getty McCahan
Represented By: Sean H. Donahue
Represented By: Susannah Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Jerald Russell Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Exelon Corporation
Represented By: Brendan K. Collins Esquire
Represented By: Robert Bruce McKinstry Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Lorene Boudreau
Represented By: Ronald Mathew Varnum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Downwinders at Risk
Represented By: James Samuel Pew
Represented By: Neil Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Anne Minard
Represented By: Tannis Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Environmental Integrity Project
Represented By: James Samuel Pew
Represented By: Neil Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Illinois
Represented By: Gerald T. Karr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future
Represented By: Ann Brewster Weeks Esquire
Represented By: Hayden Wong Hashimoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Conservation Law Foundation
Represented By: Ann Brewster Weeks Esquire
Represented By: Hayden Wong Hashimoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Stacey Willemsen Person
Represented By: Peter Surdo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: City of Baltimore
Represented By: David E. Ralph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Iowa
Represented By: Jacob John Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: National Association for the Advancement of Colored People
Represented By: James Samuel Pew
Represented By: Neil Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: City of Chicago
Represented By: Benna Ruth Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Calpine Corporation
Represented By: Brendan K. Collins Esquire
Represented By: Robert Bruce McKinstry Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Lorene Boudreau
Represented By: Ronald Mathew Varnum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: The Ohio Environmental Council
Represented By: Ann Brewster Weeks Esquire
Represented By: Hayden Wong Hashimoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Clean Air Council
Represented By: James Samuel Pew
Represented By: Neil Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Oregon
Represented By: Paul Andrew Garrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of New Hampshire
Represented By: Kelvin Allen Brooks Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Delaware
Represented By: Valerie Melissa Edge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: Emily Kingsbury Davis
Represented By: John DuVal Walke Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Maine
Represented By: Laura Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Maryland
Represented By: Roberta Rose James
Represented By: Michael F. Strande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of New York
Represented By: Michael J. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Physicians for Social Responsibility
Represented By: Deborah M. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Natural Resources Council of Maine
Represented By: Ann Brewster Weeks Esquire
Represented By: Hayden Wong Hashimoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: District of Columbia
Represented By: Karl A. Racine
Represented By: James C. McKay Jr.
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Chesapeake Bay Foundation
Represented By: James Samuel Pew
Represented By: Neil Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: County of Erie, New York
Represented By: Jeremy Christopher Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: American Lung Association
Represented By: Deborah M. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Matthew Ivan Levine
Represented By: Scott Norman Koschwitz Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Vermont
Represented By: William H. Sorrell
Represented By: Nicholas Frank Persampieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Sierra Club
Represented By: James Samuel Pew
Represented By: Sanjay Narayan
Represented By: Neil Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Gregory Stage Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Megan M. Herzog
Represented By: Melissa Ann Hoffer Esquire
Represented By: Jillian Meade Riley
Represented By: Tracy Leigh Triplett
Represented By: David S. Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Washington
Represented By: Emily C. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: City of New York
Represented By: Christopher Gene King
Represented By: Carrie Noteboom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Meghan Greenfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andrew Wheeler
Represented By: Meghan Greenfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gina McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: E. Scott Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Robert P. Mason
Represented By: Shaun Alaric Goho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law
Represented By: Denise Antonia Grab
Represented By: Richard L. Revesz
Represented By: Jason A. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Joel D. Blum
Represented By: Shaun Alaric Goho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Celia Y. Chen
Represented By: Shaun Alaric Goho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Elsie M. Sunderland
Represented By: Shaun Alaric Goho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Noelle Eckley Selin
Represented By: Shaun Alaric Goho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Congress of American Indians
Represented By: Jane Garrett Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians
Represented By: Jane Garrett Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Little Traverse Bay Bands of Odawa Indians
Represented By: Jane Garrett Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Daniel A. Jaffe
Represented By: Shaun Alaric Goho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Cato Institute
Represented By: Andrew Michael Grossman
Represented By: Ilya Shapiro Esquire
Represented By: Mark W. DeLaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: David C. Evers
Represented By: Shaun Alaric Goho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Fond du Lac Band of Lake Superior Chippewa
Represented By: Jane Garrett Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Little River Band of Ottawa Indians
Represented By: Jane Garrett Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Charles T. Driscoll, Jr.
Represented By: Shaun Alaric Goho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Great Lakes Indian Fish and Wildlife Commission
Represented By: Jane Garrett Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bad River Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians
Represented By: Jane Garrett Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Philippe Grandjean
Represented By: Shaun Alaric Goho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: St. Croix Chippewa Indians of Wisconsin
Represented By: Jane Garrett Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lac Courte Oreilles Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians
Represented By: Jane Garrett Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Thoracic Society
Represented By: Adam Babich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Murray Energy Corporation
Represented By: John David Lazzaretti
Represented By: John A. Rego
Represented By: Reed Sirak
Represented By: James Richard Bedell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?