Brian Wrenn, et al v. DC, et al

Plaintiff / Appellant: Brian Wrenn, Tyler Whidby, Joshua Akery and Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.
Amicus Curiae: DC Vote, State of Washington, DC Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, DC for Democracy, Everytown for Gun Safety, State of Oregon, State of Maryland, State of Illinois, The Heller Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., State of Massachusetts, The League of Women Voters of the District of Colubmia, U.S. Justice Foundation, Policy Analysis Center, The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, State of New York, State of Iowa, Anthony A. Williams, Former Mayor, Vincent C. Gray, Former Mayor, State of Connecticut, Gun Owners Foundation, State of California, State of Hawaii and Charles Nichols
Defendant / Appellee: Peter Newsham, in his official capacity as Chief of Police for the Metropolitan Police Department, District of Columbia and Cathy L. Lanier, in her personal capacity as Former Chief of Police for the Metropolitan Police Department
Case Number: 16-7025
Filed: March 15, 2016
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2017 FIRST CLASS MAIL RETURNED [1703565] marked "RTS - Not at this address". Mail had been sent to Jonathan Lowy. [16-7025]
October 16, 2017 FIRST CLASS MAIL RETURNED [1700127] marked "Return to Sender". Mail had been sent to Jonathan Lowy containing copy of madate. [16-7025]
October 6, 2017 MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, U.S. District Court. [16-7025]
September 28, 2017 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged Amicus brief [ # 1692045-2 ] is filed [16-7025]
September 28, 2017 PER CURIAM ORDER, En Banc, [1695463] filed granting motions for invitation to file briefs as amicus curiae in support of petitions for rehearing en banc [ # 1691022-2 ] in 16-7025, [ # 1691021-2 ] in 16-7067; The Clerk is directed to file Amicus brief [ # 1692045-2 ] in 16-7025, [ # 1691138-2 ] in 16-7067; denying petitions for rehearing en banc [ # 1690130-2 ] in 16-7025, [ # 1690132-2 ] in 16-7067. Before Judges: Garland, Henderson, Rogers, Tatel, Griffith, Kavanaugh, Srinivasan, Millett, Pillard, and Wilkins*. * Circuit Judge Wilkins did not participate in these matters. [16-7025, 16-7067]
September 15, 2017 RESPONSE [1693186] to petition for rehearing en banc [ # 1690130-2 ] filed by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Tyler Whidby and Brian Wrenn [Service Date: 09/15/2017 by Email] Length Certification: 3,897 words. [16-7025] (Gura, Alan)
September 8, 2017 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1692045] LODGED by Everytown for Gun Safety [Service Date: 08/31/2017 ] Length of Brief: 2,592 words. [16-7025]--[Edited 09/12/2017 by DR--MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED] (Gupta, Deepak)
September 1, 2017 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1691247] for motion to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1691022-2 ] filed by Everytown for Gun Safety. [16-7025] (Gupta, Deepak)
August 31, 2017 CONSENT MOTION [1691022] to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Previously Filed] filed by Everytown for Gun Safety [Service Date: 08/31/2017 ] [16-7025] (Gupta, Deepak)
August 31, 2017 CLERK'S ORDER [1690931] filed directing Brian Wrenn, et al. and Matthew Grace, et al. to file a joint response to the petitions for rehearing en banc [ # 1690130-2 ] in 16-7025 and [ # 1690132-2 ] in 16-7067 within 15 days of the date of this order. The joint response may not exceed the length limitations established by the order. Absent an order of the court, a reply to the joint response will not be accepted for filing. [16-7025, 16-7067]
August 24, 2017 PETITION [1690130] for rehearing en banc filed by Appellees DC and Peter Newsham [Service Date: 08/24/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 3,889 words. [16-7025] (Johnson, Holly)
July 25, 2017 CLERK'S ORDER [1685641] filed withholding issuance of the mandate. [16-7025]
July 25, 2017 OPINION [1685640] filed (Pages: 31) for the Court by Judge Griffith, DISSENTING OPINION (Pages: 7) by Judge Henderson. [16-7025]
July 25, 2017 PER CURIAM JUDGMENT [1685638] filed that both orders of the District Court appealed from in these causes be vacated and the cases be remanded with instructions to enter permanent injunctions against enforcement of the District's good-reason law, for the reasons in the accompanying opinion . Before Judges: Henderson, Griffith, and Williams. [16-7025]
October 7, 2016 TRANSCRIPT [1640955] of oral argument [16-7025]
September 20, 2016 ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Henderson, Griffith and Williams. [16-7025]
September 20, 2016 PER CURIAM ORDER [1636595] filed granting notice of stipulation to terminate appellant Joshua Akery in case [ # 1635209-2 ]. The Court further notes by this order that appellant Joshua Akery is not pursuing the appeal. Before Judges: Henderson, Griffith and Williams. [16-7025]
September 12, 2016 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Alan Gura, on behalf of Appellants Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Tyler Whidby and Brian Wrenn (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [16-7025] (Gura, Alan)
September 12, 2016 NOTICE [1635209] filed to terminate party filed by Joshua Akery [Service Date: 09/12/2016 ] [16-7025] (Gura, Alan)
September 9, 2016 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Holly M. Johnson, on behalf of Appellees DC and Cathy L. Lanier (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [16-7025] (Johnson, Holly)
September 7, 2016 PER CURIAM ORDER [1634228] filed allocating oral argument time as follows: Appellants - 10 Minutes, Appellees - 10 Minutes. One counsel per side to argue; directing party to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney by 09/13/2016 [16-7025]
July 27, 2016 APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1627268] filed by Joshua Akery, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Tyler Whidby and Brian Wrenn [Service Date: 07/27/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6,496 Words. [16-7025] (Gura, Alan)
July 20, 2016 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1625988] filed by Everytown for Gun Safety Everytown for Gun Safety [Service Date: 07/20/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6,989 words. [16-7025] (Gupta, Deepak)
July 20, 2016 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1625908] filed by States of Maryland, California, Connecticut, Hawai'i, Illinois, Iowa, Massachusetts, New York, Oregon, and Washington [Service Date: 07/20/2016 ] Length of Brief: 5,294 words. [16-7025]-[Edited 07/25/2016 by LMF] (Auerbach, Joshua)
July 20, 2016 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1625900] filed by The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence [Service Date: 07/20/2016 ] Length of Brief: 5,101 words. [16-7025] (Levin, Adam)
July 20, 2016 AMENDED NOTICE [1625899] filed by States of Maryland, California, Connecticut, Hawai'i, Illinois, Iowa, Massachusetts, New York, Oregon, and Washington of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 07/20/2015 ] [16-7025] (Auerbach, Joshua)
July 20, 2016 NOTICE [1625884] filed by States of Maryland, California, Connecticut, Hawai'i, Illinois, Iowa, Massachusetts, New York, Oregon, and Washington of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 07/20/2016 ] [16-7025]--[Edited 07/25/2016 by LMF] (Auerbach, Joshua)
July 20, 2016 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1625860] filed by DC Appleseed Center for Law & Justice DC Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, DC for Democracy, DC Vote, The League of Women Voters of the District of Columbia, Former Mayor Anthony A. Williams, and Former Mayor Vincent C. Gray [Service Date: 07/20/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6,819 words. [16-7025] (Wolfson, Paul)
July 20, 2016 NOTICE [1625859] filed by DC Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, DC for Democracy, DC Vote, The League of Women Voters of the District of Columbia, Former Mayor Anthony A. Williams, and Former Mayor Vincent C. Gray of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 07/20/2016 ] [16-7025]-[Edited 07/25/2016 by LMF] (Wolfson, Paul)
July 13, 2016 SEPARATE STATUTORY ADDENDUM [1624586] filed by DC and Cathy L. Lanier to Appellee/Respondent brief [ # 1624585-2 ] [Service Date:07/13/2016 ] [16-7025] (Johnson, Holly)
July 13, 2016 APPELLEE BRIEF [1624585] filed by DC and Cathy L. Lanier [Service Date: 07/13/2016 ] Length of Brief: 13,999 words. [16-7025] (Johnson, Holly)
July 5, 2016 NOTICE [1623137] filed by Everytown for Gun Safety of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 07/05/2016 ] [16-7025]--[Edited 07/08/2016 by AY] (Gupta, Deepak)
June 20, 2016 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1620553] filed by Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation, U.S. Justice Foundation, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, and Heller Foundation [Service Date: 06/20/2016 ] Length of Brief: 5,757. [16-7025] (Titus, Herbert)
June 17, 2016 NOTICE [1620122] filed by Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation, U.S. Justice Foundation, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, The Heller Foundation, and Policy Analysis Center of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 06/17/2016 ] [16-7025] (Titus, Herbert)
June 16, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1619749] filed scheduling oral argument on Tuesday, 09/20/2016. [16-7025]
June 13, 2016 APPELLANT BRIEF [1618975] filed by Joshua Akery, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Tyler Whidby and Brian Wrenn [Service Date: 06/13/2016 ] Length of Brief: 13,301 Words. [16-7025] (Gura, Alan)
June 13, 2016 JOINT APPENDIX [1618973] filed by Joshua Akery, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Tyler Whidby and Brian Wrenn. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 06/13/2016 ] [16-7025] (Gura, Alan)
June 8, 2016 CONSENT NOTICE [1618182] filed by DC Appleseed Center for Law & Justice of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 06/08/2016 ] [16-7025]--[Edited 06/14/2016 by LMF] (Wolfson, Paul)
May 31, 2016 CONSENT NOTICE [1615766] filed by The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 05/31/2016 ] [16-7025]--[Edited 06/10/2016 by LMF] (Levin, Adam)
May 4, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1611786] setting the following briefing schedule: APPELLANTS' BRIEF due 06/13/2016. JOINT APPENDIX due 06/13/2016. APPELLEES' BRIEF due 07/13/2016. APPELLANTS' REPLY BRIEF due 07/27/2016. [16-7025]
May 4, 2016 PER CURIAM ORDER [1611772] denying emergency motion for stay of district court proceedings pending appeal [ # 1610248-2 ]. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this case will be heard on an expedited basis in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1657(a). The Clerk is directed to enter a standard briefing schedule and calendar the case for oral argument in September 2016. Before Judges: Rogers, Kavanaugh and Wilkins. [16-7025]
May 3, 2016 REPLY [1611575] filed by Joshua Akery, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Tyler Whidby and Brian Wrenn to response [ # 1610952-2 ] [Service Date: 05/03/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [16-7025] (Gura, Alan)
April 28, 2016 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1610952] filed by DC and Cathy L. Lanier to motion for other relief [ # 1610248-2 ] [Service Date: 04/28/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [16-7025] (Johnson, Holly)
April 25, 2016 EMERGENCY MOTION [1610248] filed by Joshua Akery, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Tyler Whidby and Brian Wrenn Stay of District Court Proceedings Pending Appeal. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 05/09/2016) [Service Date: 04/25/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 21-30. [16-7025] (Gura, Alan)
April 13, 2016 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1608506] filed by Joshua Akery, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Tyler Whidby and Brian Wrenn [Service Date: 04/13/2016 ] [16-7025] (Gura, Alan)
April 13, 2016 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1608504] submitted by Joshua Akery, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Tyler Whidby and Brian Wrenn [Service Date: 04/13/2016 ] [16-7025] (Gura, Alan)
April 13, 2016 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1608502] filed by Joshua Akery, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Tyler Whidby and Brian Wrenn [Service Date: 04/13/2016 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [16-7025] (Gura, Alan)
April 13, 2016 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1608499] filed by Joshua Akery, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Tyler Whidby and Brian Wrenn [Service Date: 04/13/2016 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [16-7025] (Gura, Alan)
April 13, 2016 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1608497] filed by Joshua Akery, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Tyler Whidby and Brian Wrenn [Service Date: 04/13/2016 ] [16-7025] (Gura, Alan)
April 13, 2016 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1608496] filed by Joshua Akery, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Tyler Whidby and Brian Wrenn [Service Date: 04/13/2016 ] [16-7025] (Gura, Alan)
April 13, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1608493] filed by Alan Gura on behalf of Appellants Joshua Akery, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Tyler Whidby and Brian Wrenn. [16-7025] (Gura, Alan)
April 13, 2016 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1608418] filed by DC and Cathy L. Lanier [Service Date: 04/13/2016 ] [16-7025] (Johnson, Holly)
April 13, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1608417] filed by Holly M. Johnson and co-counsel Todd S. Kim Loren L. AliKhan on behalf of Appellees DC and Cathy L. Lanier. [16-7025] (Johnson, Holly)
March 15, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1604127] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 04/14/2016. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 04/14/2016. APPELLANT statement of issues due 04/14/2016. APPELLANT underlying decision due 04/14/2016. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 04/14/2016. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 04/14/2016. APPELLANT transcript status report due 04/14/2016. APPELLANT procedural motions due 04/14/2016. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 04/29/2016. Directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 04/14/2016. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 04/14/2016. APPELLEE procedural motions due 04/14/2016. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 04/29/2016 [16-7025]
March 15, 2016 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1604125] filed by Joshua Akery, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Tyler Whidby and Brian Wrenn seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:15-cv-00162-CKK. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 16-7025. [16-7025]
March 15, 2016 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [16-7025]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Wrenn, et al v. DC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Brian Wrenn
Represented By: Alan Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Tyler Whidby
Represented By: Alan Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Joshua Akery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DC Vote
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Washington
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DC Appleseed Center for Law & Justice
Represented By: Walter A. Smith Jr.
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DC for Democracy
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Everytown for Gun Safety
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Oregon
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Maryland
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Illinois
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Heller Foundation
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Olson
Represented By: Jeremiah Lee Morgan
Represented By: John Stewart Miles Esquire
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gun Owners of America, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Olson
Represented By: Jeremiah Lee Morgan
Represented By: John Stewart Miles Esquire
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Massachusetts
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The League of Women Voters of the District of Colubmia
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: U.S. Justice Foundation
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Olson
Represented By: Jeremiah Lee Morgan
Represented By: John Stewart Miles Esquire
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Policy Analysis Center
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Olson
Represented By: Jeremiah Lee Morgan
Represented By: John Stewart Miles Esquire
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence
Represented By: Jonathan Elias Lowy Esquire
Represented By: Adam Keith Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Olson
Represented By: Jeremiah Lee Morgan
Represented By: John Stewart Miles Esquire
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of New York
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Iowa
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Anthony A. Williams, Former Mayor
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Vincent C. Gray, Former Mayor
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gun Owners Foundation
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Olson
Represented By: Jeremiah Lee Morgan
Represented By: John Stewart Miles Esquire
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of California
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Hawaii
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Charles Nichols
Represented By: Charles Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Peter Newsham, in his official capacity as Chief of Police for the Metropolitan Police Department
Represented By: Todd Sunhwae Kim
Represented By: Holly Michelle Johnson
Represented By: Richard Stuart Love
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: District of Columbia
Represented By: Todd Sunhwae Kim
Represented By: Holly Michelle Johnson
Represented By: Richard Stuart Love
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cathy L. Lanier, in her personal capacity as Former Chief of Police for the Metropolitan Police Department
Represented By: Todd Sunhwae Kim
Represented By: Holly Michelle Johnson
Represented By: Richard Stuart Love
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?