Matthew Grace, et al v. DC, et al

Amicus Curiae: Everytown for Gun Safety, State of Montana, State of Hawaii, State of California, D.C. Vote, State of Oregon, Vincent C. Gray, State of Maryland, Law Enforcement Association of America, State of Nevada, State of Utah, Gun Owners of America, Inc., State of Wyoming, DC Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, DC for Democracy, State of Massachusetts, State of Arkansas, State of Ohio, Law Enforcement Action Network, State of South Carolina, State of Alabama, State of Wisconsin, State of Illinois, League of Women Voters of the District of Columbia, State of West Virginia, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, Western States Sheriffs' Association, State of Oklahoma, Law Enforcement Legal Defense Fund, State of Iowa, The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, State of Arizona, Colorado Police Protective Association, U.S. Justice Foundation, State of Washington, State of Texas, National Rifle Association of America, Inc., CRPA Foundation, International Law Enforcement Educators and Trainers Association, State of South Dakota, State of Indiana, State of New York, Anthony A. Williams, International Association of Law Enforcement Firearms Instructors, State of Connecticut, State of Missouri, Heller Foundation, Charles Nichols and Gun Owners Foundation
Defendant / Appellant: Peter Newsham, in his official capacity as Chief of Police for the Metropolitan Police Department, Cathy L. Lanier, in her official capacity as Chief of Police for the Metropolitan Police Department and District of Columbia
Plaintiff / Appellee: Matthew Grace and Pink Pistols
Case Number: 16-7067
Filed: May 26, 2016
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2017 MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, U.S. District Court. [16-7067]
September 28, 2017 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged Amicus brief [ # 1691138-2 ] is filed [16-7067]
September 28, 2017 PER CURIAM ORDER, En Banc, [1695463] filed granting motions for invitation to file briefs as amicus curiae in support of petitions for rehearing en banc [ # 1691022-2 ] in 16-7025, [ # 1691021-2 ] in 16-7067; The Clerk is directed to file Amicus brief [ # 1692045-2 ] in 16-7025, [ # 1691138-2 ] in 16-7067; denying petitions for rehearing en banc [ # 1690130-2 ] in 16-7025, [ # 1690132-2 ] in 16-7067. Before Judges: Garland, Henderson, Rogers, Tatel, Griffith, Kavanaugh, Srinivasan, Millett, Pillard, and Wilkins*. * Circuit Judge Wilkins did not participate in these matters. [16-7025, 16-7067]
September 15, 2017 JOINT RESPONSE [1693095] to petition for rehearing en banc [ # 1690132-2 ] filed by Matthew Grace and Pink Pistols [Service Date: 09/15/2017 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Length Certification: 3897 Words. [16-7067] (Cooper, Charles)
September 1, 2017 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1691248] for motion to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1691021-2 ] filed by Everytown for Gun Safety. [16-7067] (Gupta, Deepak)
August 31, 2017 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1691138] LODGED by Everytown for Gun Safety [Service Date: 08/31/2017 ] Length of Brief: 2,592 Words. [16-7067]
August 31, 2017 CONSENT MOTION [1691021] to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Previously Filed] filed by Everytown for Gun Safety [Service Date: 08/31/2017 ] [16-7067] (Gupta, Deepak)
August 31, 2017 CLERK'S ORDER [1690931] filed directing Brian Wrenn, et al. and Matthew Grace, et al. to file a joint response to the petitions for rehearing en banc [ # 1690130-2 ] in 16-7025 and [ # 1690132-2 ] in 16-7067 within 15 days of the date of this order. The joint response may not exceed the length limitations established by the order. Absent an order of the court, a reply to the joint response will not be accepted for filing. [16-7025, 16-7067]
August 24, 2017 PETITION [1690132] for rehearing en banc filed by Appellants DC and Peter Newsham [Service Date: 08/24/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 3,889 words. [16-7067] (Johnson, Holly)
July 25, 2017 CLERK'S ORDER [1685647] filed withholding issuance of the mandate. [16-7067]
July 25, 2017 OPINION [1685646] filed (Pages: 31) for the Court by Judge Griffith, DISSENTING OPINION (Pages: 7) by Judge Henderson. [16-7067]
July 25, 2017 PER CURIAM JUDGMENT [1685643] filed that both orders of the District Court appealed from in these causes be vacated and the cases be remanded with instructions to enter permanent injunctions against enforcement of the District's good-reason law, for the reasons in the accompanying opinion . Before Judges: Henderson, Griffith, and Williams. [16-7067]
October 7, 2016 TRANSCRIPT [1640957] of oral argument [16-7067]
September 20, 2016 ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Henderson, Griffith and Williams. [16-7067]
September 9, 2016 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Loren L. AliKhan, on behalf of Appellants DC and Cathy L. Lanier (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [16-7067] (AliKhan, Loren)
September 7, 2016 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, David H. Thompson, on behalf of Appellees Matthew Grace and Pink Pistols (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [16-7067] (Thompson, David)
September 7, 2016 PER CURIAM ORDER [1634229] filed allocating oral argument time as follows: Appellants - 10 Minutes, Appellees - 10 Minutes. One counsel per side to argue; directing party to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney by 09/13/2016 [16-7067]
August 19, 2016 APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1631303] filed by DC and Cathy L. Lanier [Service Date: 08/19/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6,998 words. [16-7067] (Johnson, Holly)
August 12, 2016 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1630253] filed by CRPA Foundation, International Law Enforcement Educators and Trainers Association, Law Enforcement Action Network, Law Enforcement Association of America, Law Enforcement Legal Defense Fund and Western States Sheriffs' Association Colorado Police Protective Association, International Association of Law Enforcement Firearms Instructors [Service Date: 08/12/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6,994 words. [16-7067] (Peterson, Dan)
August 12, 2016 AMENDED NOTICE [1630250] filed by Western States Sheriffs' Association, International Law Enforcement Educators and Trainers Association, Law Enforcement Legal Defense Fund, Law Enforcement Action Network, CRPA Foundation, Colorado Police Protective Association, et al. of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 08/12/2016 ] [16-7067]--[Edited 08/15/2016 by RJC] (Peterson, Dan)
August 12, 2016 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1630248] filed by Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Heller Foundation and U.S. Justice Foundation [Service Date: 08/12/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6951. [16-7067] (Titus, Herbert)
August 12, 2016 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1630235] filed by Arizona, Alabama, Arkansas, Indiana, Missouri, Montana, Nevada, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Texas, Utah, West Virginia, Wisconsin, and Wyoming [Service Date: 08/12/2016 ] [16-7067] (Miller, Keith)
August 12, 2016 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1630234] filed by National Rifle Association of America, Inc. [Service Date: 08/12/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6,995 words. [16-7067] (Clement, Paul)
August 12, 2016 CONSENT NOTICE [1630233] filed by National Rifle Association of America, Inc. of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 08/12/2016 ] [16-7067]--[Edited 08/15/2016 by RJC] (Clement, Paul)
August 12, 2016 NOTICE [1630149] filed by Arizona, Alabama, Arkansas, Indiana, Missouri, Montana, Nevada, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Texas, Utah, West Virginia, Wisconsin, and Wyoming of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 08/12/2016 ]. [16-7067]--[Edited 08/15/2016 by RJC] (Miller, Keith)
August 11, 2016 NOTICE [1629949] filed by Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation, U.S. Justice Foundation, Heller Foundation, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 08/11/2016 ] [16-7067]--[Edited 08/12/2016 by RJC] (Titus, Herbert)
August 10, 2016 NOTICE [1629722] filed by Western States Sheriffs' Association, International Law Enforcement Educators and Trainers Association, Law Enforcement Legal Defense Fund, Law Enforcement Action Network, Law Enforcement Association of America, CRPA Foundation of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 08/10/2016 ] [16-7067]--[Edited 08/11/2016 by RJC] (Peterson, Dan)
August 5, 2016 APPELLEE BRIEF [1628939] filed by Matthew Grace and Pink Pistols [Service Date: 08/05/2016 ] Length of Brief: 13,995 Words. [16-7067] (Cooper, Charles)
July 19, 2016 ERRATA [1625526] filed by The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence to Amicus brief [ # 1624574-2 ] . Reason for errata: to correct an error in the Table of Authorities. [Service Date: 07/19/2016 ] [16-7067] (Levin, Adam)
July 14, 2016 ERRATA [1624621] filed by DC and Cathy L. Lanier to Appellant/Petitioner brief [ # 1623783-2 ] . Reason for errata: to correct an error in a citation. [Service Date: 07/14/2016 ] [16-7067] (Johnson, Holly)
July 13, 2016 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1624592] filed by Everytown for Gun Safety [Service Date: 07/13/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6,995 words. [16-7067] (Gupta, Deepak)
July 13, 2016 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1624590] filed by States of Maryland, California, Connecticut, Hawai'i, Illinois, Iowa, Massachusetts, New York, Oregon, and Washington [Service Date: 07/13/2016 ] Length of Brief: 5,294 words. [16-7067] (Auerbach, Joshua)
July 13, 2016 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1624574] filed by The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence [Service Date: 07/13/2016 ] Length of Brief: 5,203 words.. [16-7067] (Levin, Adam)
July 13, 2016 NOTICE [1624558] filed by States of Maryland, California, Connecticut, Hawai'i, Illinois, Iowa, Massachusetts, New York, Oregon, and Washington of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 07/13/2016 ] [16-7067] (Auerbach, Joshua)
July 13, 2016 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1624447] filed by DC Appleseed Center for Law & Justice DC Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, DC for Democracy, DC Vote, The League of Women Voters of the District of Columbia, Former Mayor Anthony A. Williams, and Former Mayor Vincent C. Gray [Service Date: 07/13/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6,765 words. [16-7067] (Wolfson, Paul)
July 13, 2016 AMENDED NOTICE [1624444] filed by DC Appleseed Center for Law & Justice, DC for Democracy, DC Vote, The League of Women Voters of the District of Columbia, Former Mayor Anthony A. Williams, and Former Mayor Vincent C. Gray of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 07/13/2016 ] [16-7067] (Wolfson, Paul)
July 8, 2016 CORRECTED APPELLANT BRIEF [1623783] filed by DC and Cathy L. Lanier [Service Date: 07/08/2016 ] Length of Brief: 14,000 words. [16-7067] (Johnson, Holly)
July 6, 2016 JOINT APPENDIX [1623388] filed by DC and Cathy L. Lanier. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 07/06/2016 ] [16-7067] (Johnson, Holly)
July 6, 2016 SEPARATE STATUTORY ADDENDUM [1623387] filed by DC and Cathy L. Lanier to Appellant/Petitioner brief [ # 1623386-2 ] [Service Date:07/06/2016 ] [16-7067] (Johnson, Holly)
July 6, 2016 APPELLANT BRIEF [1623386] filed by DC and Cathy L. Lanier [Service Date: 07/06/2016 ] Length of Brief: 14,000 words. [16-7067] (Johnson, Holly)
July 5, 2016 NOTICE [1623135] filed by Everytown for Gun Safety of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 07/05/2016 ] [16-7067]--[Edited 07/07/2016 by AY] (Gupta, Deepak)
June 29, 2016 CONSENT NOTICE [1622280] filed by The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 06/29/2016 ] [16-7067]--[Edited 06/30/2016 by MLG--MODIFIED PARTY FILER--] (Levin, Adam)
June 16, 2016 CONSENT NOTICE [1619899] filed by DC Appleseed Center for Law & Justice of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 06/16/2016 ] [16-7067]--[Edited 06/20/2016 by MLG--MODIFIED EVENT--] (Wolfson, Paul)
June 16, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1619747] filed scheduling oral argument on Tuesday, 09/20/2016. [16-7067]
June 10, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1618637] filed by Charles J. Cooper and co-counsel Howard C. Nielson, Jr. and John D. Ohlendorf on behalf of Appellees Matthew Grace and Pink Pistols. [16-7067] (Cooper, Charles)
June 9, 2016 PER CURIAM ORDER [1618483] It is ORDERED that the following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLANTS' BRIEF due 07/06/2016. APPENDIX due 07/06/2016. APPELLEES' BRIEF due 08/05/2016. APPELLANTS' REPLY BRIEF due 08/19/2016. Before Judges: Griffith, Srinivasan and Millett. [16-7067]
June 8, 2016 CONSENT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1618192] filed by DC and Cathy L. Lanier to extend time to file brief to 07/13/2016. [Service Date: 06/08/2016 ] Pages: 1-10. [16-7067] (Johnson, Holly)
June 8, 2016 NOTICE [1618187] filed by Charles Nichols of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 06/08/2016 ] [16-7067]
June 8, 2016 PER CURIAM ORDER [1618104] granting emergency motion for stay pending appeal [ # 1615224-2 ]. The district courts order filed May 17, 2016, is stayed pending appeal, and the administrative stay entered May 27, 2016, is dissolved. It is FURTHER ORDERED that consideration of this appeal be expedited. The Clerk is directed to calendar this case for oral argument on the same date and before the same panel as Wrenn v. District of Columbia, No. 16-7025. The following briefing schedule will apply: APPELLANTS' BRIEF due 06/29/2016. APPENDIX due 06/29/2016. APPELLEES' BRIEF due 07/20/2016. APPELLANTS' REPLY BRIEF due 08/03/2016. Before Judges: Griffith, Srinivasan and Millett. [16-7067]
June 6, 2016 REPLY [1617036] filed by DC and Cathy L. Lanier to response [ # 1616402-2 ] [Service Date: 06/06/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [16-7067] (Johnson, Holly)
June 2, 2016 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1616402] filed by Matthew Grace and Pink Pistols to motion for other relief [ # 1615224-2 ] [Service Date: 06/02/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [16-7067] (Cooper, Charles)
June 2, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1616376] filed by Charles J. Cooper and co-counsel David H. Thompson and Peter A. Patterson on behalf of Appellees Matthew Grace and Pink Pistols. [16-7067] (Cooper, Charles)
May 27, 2016 PER CURIAM ORDER [1615293] filed ORDERED that the district courts order filed May 17, 2016, granting appellees motion for a preliminary injunction, be administratively stayed pending further order of the court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellees file a response to the motion for stay pending appeal by 9:00 a.m. on Friday, June 3, 2016, and that appellants file any reply by 4:00 p.m. on Monday, June 6, 2016. The parties are directed to hand-deliver the paper copies of their submissions to the court by the time and date due. Before Judges: Rogers, Kavanaugh* and Wilkins (*Circuit Judge Kavanaugh would deny the administrative stay) [16-7067]
May 27, 2016 EMERGENCY MOTION [1615224] filed by DC and Cathy L. Lanier for immediate administrative stay, stay pending appeal, and, in event of stay, abeyance. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 06/09/2016). (Response to Motion served by hand due on 06/06/2016) [Service Date: 05/27/2016 by Email, CM/ECF NDA, Hand Delivery] Pages: 16-20. [16-7067] (Johnson, Holly)
May 27, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1615220] filed by Holly M. Johnson and co-counsel Todd S. Kim; Loren L. AliKhan on behalf of Appellants DC and Cathy L. Lanier. [16-7067] (Johnson, Holly)
May 26, 2016 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1615197] filed by DC and Cathy L. Lanier seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:15-cv-02234-RJL. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 16-7067. [16-7067]
May 26, 2016 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [16-7067]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthew Grace, et al v. DC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Everytown for Gun Safety
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Represented By: Eric A. Tirschwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Montana
Represented By: Timothy C. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Hawaii
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of California
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: D.C. Vote
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Oregon
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Vincent C. Gray
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Maryland
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Law Enforcement Association of America
Represented By: Dan Mark Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gun Owners of America, Inc.
Represented By: John Stewart Miles Esquire
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esquire
Represented By: Jeremiah Lee Morgan
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Olson
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Wyoming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DC Appleseed Center for Law & Justice
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Represented By: Walter A. Smith Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DC for Democracy
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Represented By: Walter A. Smith Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Massachusetts
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Law Enforcement Action Network
Represented By: Dan Mark Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Alabama
Represented By: Luther J. Strange III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Illinois
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: League of Women Voters of the District of Columbia
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of West Virginia
Represented By: Patrick J. Morrisey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund
Represented By: John Stewart Miles Esquire
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esquire
Represented By: Jeremiah Lee Morgan
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Olson
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Western States Sheriffs' Association
Represented By: Dan Mark Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Law Enforcement Legal Defense Fund
Represented By: Dan Mark Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Iowa
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence
Represented By: Jonathan Elias Lowy Esquire
Represented By: Adam Keith Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Arizona
Represented By: Keith Joseph Miller
Represented By: John Robert Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Colorado Police Protective Association
Represented By: Dan Mark Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: U.S. Justice Foundation
Represented By: John Stewart Miles Esquire
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esquire
Represented By: Jeremiah Lee Morgan
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Olson
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Washington
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Rifle Association of America, Inc.
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Christopher George Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CRPA Foundation
Represented By: Dan Mark Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: International Law Enforcement Educators and Trainers Association
Represented By: Dan Mark Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of South Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Indiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of New York
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Anthony A. Williams
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: International Association of Law Enforcement Firearms Instructors
Represented By: Dan Mark Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Joshua Neal Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Heller Foundation
Represented By: John Stewart Miles Esquire
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esquire
Represented By: Jeremiah Lee Morgan
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Olson
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Charles Nichols
Represented By: Charles Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gun Owners Foundation
Represented By: John Stewart Miles Esquire
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esquire
Represented By: Jeremiah Lee Morgan
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Olson
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Peter Newsham, in his official capacity as Chief of Police for the Metropolitan Police Department
Represented By: Holly Michelle Johnson
Represented By: Todd Sunhwae Kim
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Cathy L. Lanier, in her official capacity as Chief of Police for the Metropolitan Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: District of Columbia
Represented By: Holly Michelle Johnson
Represented By: Todd Sunhwae Kim
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Matthew Grace
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: David Henry Thompson
Represented By: Howard Curtis Nielson Jr.
Represented By: John David Ohlendorf
Represented By: Peter Andrew Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Pink Pistols
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: David Henry Thompson
Represented By: Howard Curtis Nielson Jr.
Represented By: John David Ohlendorf
Represented By: Peter Andrew Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?