American Society for Testing, et al v. Public.Resource.Org, Inc.
Amicus Curiae: David Michaels, Bruce R. James, Robert B. Reich, American Society of Safety Engineers, Beth Williams, Edward Felten, Yvette Joy Liebesman, Margaret Chon, Megan J. Smith, Roger Skalbeck, Lila Bailey, Consumers Union, Institute of Electrical and Electronics Engineers, Inc., Jonathan Askin, Amy Vanderlyke Dygert, Raymond A. Mosley, David Olson, David G. Post, Steven VanRoekel, Stephen McJohn, Alexander Macgillivray, Will Cross, American Insurance Association, Blake E. Reid, Judith C. Russell, Beth Simone Noveck, Mark P. McKenna, Notre Dame Law School, DJ Patil, Judicata, Inc., Jennifer Pahlka, Michelle M. Wu, Tyler T. Ochoa, American Association of Law Libraries, Association of Research Libraries, Annemarie Bridy, Stacey Dogan, Boston University School of Law, Ronald E. Wheeler, Zoe Lofgren, Sina Bahram, Public Knowledge, Free Law Project, Center for Science in the Public Interest, Aaron Perzanowski, Public Citizen, Inc., James Gibson, Carol M. Browner, Andrew McLaughlin, Seamus Kraft, Betsy Rosenblatt, Whittier Law School, Aneesh Chopra, Kendra K. Levine, Nicole Wong, American Library Association, n, Darrell E. Issa, International Trademark Association, OpenGov Foundation, International Electrotechnical Commission, David Sorkin, American Society of Civil Engineers, United States Public Interest Research Group, Inc., Micaheel W. Carroll, Brian Love, Joan Claybrook, Re: Create Coalition, John D. Podesta, International Code Council, Inc., International Association of Plumbing & Mechanical Officials, Underwriters Laboratories Inc., Benjamin J. Keele, Rebecca Tushnet, Harvard Law School, Sunlight Foundation, North American Energy Standards Board, American Dental Association, International Organization for Standardization, National Electrical Manufacturers Association, Lincoln Network, Ariel Katz, American Medical Association, David Hansen, Jessica Litman, University of Michigan Law School, Jim DelRosso, American National Standards Institute, Inc., Brandon Butler, Sarah Hooke Lee, Elizabeth I. Winston, Catholic University, Columbus School of Law, Kyle K. Courtney, National Employment Law Project, Shubha Ghosh, Justia Inc., American Hospital Association, R Street Institute, Jessica Silbey, Michael A. Carrier, Association of College and Research Libraries, Fastcase, Inc. and Robert Walker
Plaintiff / Appellee: National Fire Protection Association, Inc., American Society of Heating, Refrigerating, and Air-Conditioning Engineers, Inc. and American Society for Testing and Materials
Defendant / Appellant: Public.Resource.Org, Inc.
Case Number: 17-7035
Filed: February 28, 2017
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 TRANSCRIPT [1789263] of oral argument [17-7035, 17-7039] [Entered: 05/23/2019 03:35 PM]
August 28, 2018 MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, U.S. District Court. [17-7035, 17-7039] [Entered: 08/28/2018 10:09 AM]
July 17, 2018 CLERK'S ORDER [1740943] filed withholding issuance of the mandate. [17-7035, 17-7039] [Entered: 07/17/2018 10:58 AM]
July 17, 2018 OPINION [1740942] filed (Pages: 37) for the Court by Judge Tatel, CONCURRING OPINION (Pages: 3) by Judge Katsas. [17-7035, 17-7039] [Entered: 07/17/2018 10:57 AM]
July 17, 2018 PER CURIAM JUDGMENT [1740935] filed that the District Courts permanent injunctions be vacated, the partial grant of summary judgment against PRO be reversed, and the case is hereby remanded to the District Court for further proceedings, for the reasons in the accompanying opinion . Before Judges: Tatel, Wilkins, and Katsas. [17-7035, 17-7039] [Entered: 07/17/2018 10:53 AM]
May 14, 2018 ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Tatel, Wilkins and Katsas. [17-7035, 17-7039] [Entered: 05/15/2018 11:26 AM]
May 3, 2018 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Corynne McSherry, on behalf of Appellant Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035, 17-7039 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [17-7035, 17-7039] (McSherry, Corynne) [Entered: 05/03/2018 03:35 PM]
May 2, 2018 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Donald B. Verrilli, Jr., on behalf of Appellees National Fire Protection Association, Inc., American Society for Testing and Materials and American Society of Heating, Refrigerating, and Air-Conditioning Engineers, Inc. in 17-7035, Appellees National Fire Protection Association, Inc., American Society of Heating, Refrigerating, and Air-conditioning Engineers, Inc., American Society for Testing and Materials and American Educational Research Association, Inc. in 17-7039 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [17-7035, 17-7039] (Verrilli, Donald) [Entered: 05/02/2018 03:38 PM]
April 27, 2018 PER CURIAM ORDER [1728460] filed allocating oral argument time as follows: Appellant - 15 Minutes, Appellees - 15 Minutes. One counsel per side to argue; directing party to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney by 05/07/2018 [17-7035, 17-7039] [Entered: 04/27/2018 10:33 AM]
March 9, 2018 CLERK'S ORDER [1721464] filed scheduling oral argument on Monday, 05/14/2018. [17-7035, 17-7039] [Entered: 03/09/2018 11:21 AM]
February 14, 2018 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT FINAL BRIEF [1718064] filed by Public Citizen, Inc., Center for Science in the Public Interest, Consumers Union, National Employment Law Project and United States Public Interest Research Group, Inc. in 17-7035, 17-7039 [Service Date: 02/14/2018 ] Length of Brief: 4,989 words. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Rosenbaum, Adina) [Entered: 02/14/2018 05:47 PM]
February 14, 2018 APPELLANT FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1718060] filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035, 17-7039 [Service Date: 02/14/2018 ] Length of Brief: 8,997 words. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bridges, Andrew) [Entered: 02/14/2018 05:16 PM]
February 14, 2018 APPELLANT FINAL BRIEF [1718058] filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035, 17-7039 [Service Date: 02/14/2018 ] Length of Brief: 12,959 words. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bridges, Andrew) [Entered: 02/14/2018 05:12 PM]
February 14, 2018 APPELLEE FINAL BRIEF [1718049] filed by American Society for Testing and Materials, American Society of Heating, Refrigerating, and Air-Conditioning Engineers, Inc. and National Fire Protection Association, Inc. in 17-7035 [Service Date: 02/14/2018 ] Length of Brief: 11,206 Words. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Verrilli, Donald) [Entered: 02/14/2018 04:55 PM]
February 14, 2018 APPELLEE FINAL BRIEF [1718044] filed by American Educational Research Association, Inc., American Psychological Association, Inc. and National Council on Measurement In Education, Inc. in 17-7039 [Service Date: 02/14/2018 ] Length of Brief: 5,931 words. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Elgarten, Clifton) [Entered: 02/14/2018 04:41 PM]
February 2, 2018 APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1716359] filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035, 17-7039 [Service Date: 02/02/2018 ] Length of Brief: 8,993 Words. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bridges, Andrew) [Entered: 02/02/2018 07:13 PM]
January 31, 2018 REDACTED JOINT APPENDIX [1715850] filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035, 17-7039. [Volumes: 6] [Service Date: 01/31/2018 ] [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bridges, Andrew) [Entered: 01/31/2018 06:52 PM]
January 31, 2018 NOTICE [1715802] of submission of paper filing filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035 [Service Date: 01/31/2018 ] [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bridges, Andrew) [Entered: 01/31/2018 03:27 PM]
January 31, 2018 SEALED APPENDIX [1715754] filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 01/31/2018 ] [17-7035, 17-7039] [Entered: 01/31/2018 02:00 PM]
January 30, 2018 LETTER [1715483] advising of arguing counsel's availability for oral argument filed by American Educational Research Association, Inc., American Psychological Association, Inc. and National Council on Measurement In Education, Inc. in 17-7039 [Service Date: 01/30/2018 ] [17-7035, 17-7039] (Elgarten, Clifton) [Entered: 01/30/2018 01:54 PM]
January 25, 2018 LETTER [1714688] advising of arguing counsel's availability for oral argument filed by American Society of Heating, Refrigerating, and Air-Conditioning Engineers, Inc. in 17-7035 [Service Date: 01/25/2018 ] [17-7035, 17-7039] (Wetzel, Joseph) [Entered: 01/25/2018 02:07 PM]
January 24, 2018 APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1714565] filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035, 17-7039 [Service Date: 01/24/2018 ] Length of Brief: 8,990. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bridges, Andrew) [Entered: 01/24/2018 11:43 PM]
January 12, 2018 LETTER [1712918] advising of arguing counsel's availability for oral argument filed by National Fire Protection Association, Inc. [Service Date: 01/12/2018 ] [17-7035] (Verrilli, Donald) [Entered: 01/12/2018 05:17 PM]
December 15, 2017 NOTICE [1709147] Attorney Oral Argument Availability filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035, 17-7039 [Service Date: 12/15/2017 ] [17-7035, 17-7039] (McSherry, Corynne) [Entered: 12/15/2017 03:13 PM]
December 7, 2017 CORRECTED AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1708025] filed by American Dental Association, American Medical Association and American Hospital Association [Service Date: 12/07/2017 ] Length of Brief: 5,677 Words. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bierig, Jack) [Entered: 12/07/2017 04:18 PM]
December 6, 2017 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1707832] filed by The International Trademark Association [Service Date: 12/06/2017 ] Length of Brief: 6,178 words. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Dreyer, Anthony) [Entered: 12/06/2017 04:25 PM]
December 6, 2017 CONSENT NOTICE [1707829] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by The International Trademark Association [Service Date: 12/06/2017 ] [17-7035, 17-7039]--[Edited 12/07/2017 by LMF] (Dreyer, Anthony) [Entered: 12/06/2017 04:18 PM]
December 6, 2017 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1707817] filed by American National Standards Institute, Inc. and Ten Members [Service Date: 12/06/2017 ] Length of Brief: 6,432 words.. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Rothell, Bonnie) [Entered: 12/06/2017 03:45 PM]
December 6, 2017 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1707788] filed by American Medical Association, American Dental Association And American Hospital Association [Service Date: 12/06/2017 ] Length of Brief: 5,677 Words. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bierig, Jack) [Entered: 12/06/2017 02:56 PM]
December 6, 2017 CONSENT NOTICE [1707770] of intention to participate as amicus curiae filed by Underwriters Laboratories Inc., North American Energy Standards Board, National Electrical Manufacturers Association, International Code Council, Inc., International Organization for Standardization, International Electrotechnical Commission, International Association of Plumbing & Mechanical Officials, Institute of Electrical and Electronics Engineers, Inc., American Society of Safety Engineers, American Society of Civil Engineers and American National Standards Institute, Inc. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by American National Standards Institute, Inc. and Ten Members [Service Date: 12/06/2017 ] [17-7035, 17-7039]--[Edited 12/07/2017 by LMF] (Rothell, Bonnie) [Entered: 12/06/2017 02:10 PM]
December 6, 2017 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1707720] filed by American Insurance Association [Service Date: 12/06/2017 ] Length of Brief: 3202 words.. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Denham, V.) [Entered: 12/06/2017 11:20 AM]
November 20, 2017 NOTICE [1705195] Attorney Oral Argument Availability filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035 [Service Date: 11/20/2017 ] [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bridges, Andrew) [Entered: 11/20/2017 12:19 PM]
November 13, 2017 NOTICE [1704006] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by American Insurance Association [Service Date: 11/13/2017 ] [17-7035, 17-7039]--[Edited 11/13/2017 by LMF] (Denham, V.) [Entered: 11/13/2017 11:37 AM]
November 8, 2017 APPELLEE BRIEF [1703714] filed by American Educational Research Association, Inc., American Psychological Association, Inc. and National Council on Measurement In Education, Inc. in 17-7039 [Service Date: 11/08/2017 ] Length of Brief: 5,953 words. [17-7039, 17-7035] (Elgarten, Clifton) [Entered: 11/08/2017 06:27 PM]
November 8, 2017 APPELLEE BRIEF [1703687] filed by American Society for Testing and Materials, American Society of Heating, Refrigerating, and Air-Conditioning Engineers, Inc. and National Fire Protection Association, Inc. in 17-7035 [Service Date: 11/08/2017 ] Length of Brief: 11,214 Words. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Verrilli, Donald) [Entered: 11/08/2017 05:02 PM]
October 27, 2017 PER CURIAM ORDER [1701720] granting motion to exceed word limits and extend time [ # 1699931-3 ]. The following revised briefing schedule and format will now apply in these consolidated cases: APPELLEES' BRIEF(S) (not to exceed a combined total of 18,000 words) due 11/08/2017. AMICi CURIAE BRIEFS IN SUPPORT OF APPELLEES (not to exceed 6,500 words) due 12/06/2017. APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF (not to exceed 9,000 words) due 01/24/2018. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 01/31/2018. FINAL BRIEFS due 02/14/2018. Before Judges: Henderson, Kavanaugh and Millett. [17-7035, 17-7039] [Entered: 10/27/2017 10:12 AM]
October 23, 2017 CLERK'S ORDER [1700743] filed suspending briefing schedule [17-7035, 17-7039] [Entered: 10/23/2017 09:17 AM]
October 18, 2017 CONSENT MOTION [1699931] to Modify the Order Setting Combined Word Limits for Appellees (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/30/2017), to exceed brief (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/30/2017), to extend time to file reply to 01/10/2018 (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/30/2017), to expedite ruling on. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/30/2017) filed by American Educational Research Association, Inc., American Psychological Association, Inc. and National Council on Measurement In Education, Inc. in 17-7039 (Service Date: 10/18/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 835 words. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Elgarten, Clifton) [Entered: 10/18/2017 04:25 PM]
September 26, 2017 CONSENT NOTICE [1694856] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by Intellectual Property Professors [Service Date: 09/26/2017 ] [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bagenstos, Samuel) [Entered: 09/26/2017 09:51 PM]
September 26, 2017 CORRECTED NOTICE [1694770] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by Members of Congress [Service Date: 09/26/2017 ] [17-7035, 17-7039]--[Edited 09/28/2017 by LMF] (Gellis, Catherine) [Entered: 09/26/2017 02:12 PM]
September 25, 2017 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1694529] filed by Sina Bahram [Service Date: 09/25/2017 ] Length of Brief: 5141 words. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Malone, Phillip) [Entered: 09/25/2017 11:42 PM]
September 25, 2017 CONSENT AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1694527] filed by Intellectual Property Professors [Service Date: 09/25/2017 ] Length of Brief: 3208 Words. [17-7035, 17-7039]--[Edited 09/26/2017 by LMF] (Bagenstos, Samuel) [Entered: 09/25/2017 10:48 PM]
September 25, 2017 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT FINAL BRIEF [1694498] filed by [Service Date: 09/25/2017 ] Length of Brief: 4728 words. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Gellis, Catherine) [Entered: 09/25/2017 04:54 PM]
September 25, 2017 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1694485] filed by Public Citizen, Inc., Center for Science in the Public Interest, Consumers Union, National Employment Law Project, and United States Public Interest Resarch Group, Inc. [Service Date: 09/25/2017 ] Length of Brief: 5,003 words. [17-7035, 17-7039]--[Edited 09/26/2017 by LMF] (Rosenbaum, Adina) [Entered: 09/25/2017 04:33 PM]
September 25, 2017 CONSENT NOTICE [1694432] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by Members of Congress [Service Date: 09/25/2017 ] [17-7035, 17-7039] (Gellis, Catherine) [Entered: 09/25/2017 03:18 PM]
September 25, 2017 NOTICE [1694312] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Public Citizen, Inc., Center for Science in the Public Interest, Consumers Union, National Employment Law Project, and United States Public Interest Research Group, Inc. [Service Date: 09/25/2017 ] [17-7035, 17-7039] --[Edited 09/26/2017 by LMF] (Rosenbaum, Adina) [Entered: 09/25/2017 11:57 AM]
September 25, 2017 AMENDED AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1694255] filed by Sixty-Six Library Associations, Nonprofit Organizations, Legal Technology Companies, Former Senior Government Officials, Librarians, Innovators, and Professors of Law [Service Date: 07/25/2017 ] Length of Brief: 6,305 words. [17-7035, 17-7039]--[Edited 09/26/2017 by LMF] (Duan, Charles) [Entered: 09/25/2017 10:09 AM]
September 25, 2017 NOTICE [1694253] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Chopra, Aneesh; Noveck, Beth Simone; Pahlka, Jennifer; Reich, Robert B. [Service Date: 07/25/2017 ] [17-7035, 17-7039] -[Edited 09/26/2017 by LMF] (Duan, Charles) [Entered: 09/25/2017 10:04 AM]
September 23, 2017 NOTICE [1694234] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Sina Bahram [Service Date: 09/22/2017 ] [17-7035, 17-7039]-[Edited 09/26/2017 by LMF] (Malone, Phillip) [Entered: 09/23/2017 01:44 AM]
September 22, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1694037] filed by Allyson N. Ho and co-counsel J. Kevin Fee and Jordana S. Rubel on behalf of Appellee American Society for Testing and Materials in 17-7035. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Fee, J. Kevin) [Entered: 09/22/2017 11:44 AM]
September 22, 2017 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1694011] filed by Sixty-Two Library Associations, Nonprofit Organizations, Legal Technology Companies, Former Senior Government Officials, Librarians, Innovators, and Professors of Law [Service Date: 09/22/2017 ] Length of Brief: 6,305 words. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Duan, Charles) [Entered: 09/22/2017 10:05 AM]
September 22, 2017 NOTICE [1694010] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Sixty-Two Library Associations, Nonprofit Organizations, Legal Technology Companies, Former Senior Government Officials, Librarians, Innovators, and Professors of Law (fully listed in document) [Service Date: 07/22/2017 ] [17-7035, 17-7039] (Duan, Charles) [Entered: 09/22/2017 10:02 AM]
August 30, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1690694] filed by Donald B. Verrilli, Jr. and co-counsel Rose L. Ehler on behalf of Appellee National Fire Protection Association, Inc. in 17-7035, 17-7039. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Ehler, Rose) [Entered: 08/30/2017 11:04 AM]
August 28, 2017 APPELLANT BRIEF [1690456] filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035, 17-7039 [Service Date: 08/28/2017 ] Length of Brief: 12,942 words. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bridges, Andrew) [Entered: 08/28/2017 10:32 PM]
August 16, 2017 PER CURIAM ORDER [1688926] discharging order to show cause [ # 1680061-5 ]; referring question of this courts jurisdiction to the merits panel to which this case is assigned; granting unopposed motion to establish briefing schedule [ # 1678545-2 ]. The following briefing schedule will apply in these consolidated cases: APPELLANT'S BRIEF (not to exceed 13,000 words) due 08/28/2017. AMICI CURIAE BRIEFS IN SUPPORT OF APPELLANT OR IN SUPPORT OF NEITHER PARTY (not to exceed 6,500 words) due 09/25/2017. APPELLEES' BRIEF (not to exceed a combined total of 13,000 words) due 10/25/2017. AMICI CURIAE BRIEFS IN SUPPORT OF APPELLEES (not to exceed 6,500 words) due 11/22/2017. APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF (not to exceed 6,500 words) due 12/15/2017. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 12/22/2017. FINAL BRIEFS due 01/05/2018. Before Judges: Henderson, Brown and Srinivasan. [17-7035, 17-7039] [Entered: 08/16/2017 08:37 AM]
June 28, 2017 RESPONSE [1681824] to order [ # 1680061-2 ],[ # 1680061-4 ],[ # 1680061-5 ],[ # 1680061-3 ] filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035, 17-7039 (Service Date: 06/28/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 454 words. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bridges, Andrew) [Entered: 06/28/2017 09:30 PM]
June 16, 2017 FIRST CLASS AND CERTIFIED MAIL SENT [1680066] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.70070710000471953746] of order [ # 1680061-2 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 07/17/2017 from Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. [17-7035, 17-7039] [Entered: 06/16/2017 02:52 PM]
June 16, 2017 CLERK'S ORDER [1680061] filed to show cause regarding dismissing case for lack of jurisdiction. Response to Order due 07/17/2017. The response may not exceed the length limitations established in the order., Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [17-7035, 17-7039] [Entered: 06/16/2017 02:48 PM]
June 8, 2017 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1678938] for motion to establish briefing schedule [ # 1678545-2 ] filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035, 17-7039. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bridges, Andrew) [Entered: 06/08/2017 04:28 PM]
June 6, 2017 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1678545] to establish briefing schedule filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035, 17-7039 [Service Date: 06/06/2017 ] Length Certification: 416. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bridges, Andrew) [Entered: 06/06/2017 05:22 PM]
June 5, 2017 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1678329] filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035 [Service Date: 06/05/2017 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Becker, Matthew) [Entered: 06/05/2017 07:00 PM]
April 25, 2017 STATEMENT [1672521] with Disclosure Listing filed by American Society of Heating, Refrigerating, and Air-Conditioning Engineers, Inc. in 17-7035, American Society of Heating, Refrigerating, and Air-conditioning Engineers, Inc. in 17-7039 [Service Date: 04/25/2017 ] [17-7035, 17-7039] (Mezzina, Paul) [Entered: 04/25/2017 11:19 AM]
April 19, 2017 STATEMENT [1671839] with Disclosure Listing filed by American Society for Testing and Materials in 17-7035, 17-7039 [Service Date: 04/19/2017 ] [17-7035, 17-7039] (Ho, Allyson) [Entered: 04/19/2017 04:00 PM]
April 18, 2017 STATEMENT [1671572] with Disclosure Listing filed by National Fire Protection Association, Inc. [Service Date: 04/18/2017 ] [17-7035] (Verrilli, Donald) [Entered: 04/18/2017 01:52 PM]
April 13, 2017 STATEMENT [1670944] with Disclosure Listing filed by American Educational Research Association, Inc., American Psychological Association, Inc. and National Council on Measurement In Education, Inc. in 17-7039 [Service Date: 04/13/2017 ] [17-7039, 17-7035] (Stewart, John) [Entered: 04/13/2017 11:35 AM]
April 7, 2017 NOTICE [1670991] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court containing amended notice of appeal [17-7035] [Entered: 04/13/2017 01:38 PM]
April 6, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1669994] filed by Jack R. Bierig on behalf of Amici Curiae American Dental Association, American Hospital Association and American Medical Association in 17-7035. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bierig, Jack) [Entered: 04/06/2017 07:00 PM]
April 6, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1669993] filed by David Halperin on behalf of Appellant Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035, 17-7039. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Halperin, David) [Entered: 04/06/2017 06:49 PM]
April 6, 2017 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1669990] submitted by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035, 17-7039 [Service Date: 04/06/2017 ] [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bridges, Andrew) [Entered: 04/06/2017 06:36 PM]
April 6, 2017 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1669989] filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035, 17-7039 [Service Date: 04/06/2017 ] [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bridges, Andrew) [Entered: 04/06/2017 06:34 PM]
April 6, 2017 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1669988] filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035, 17-7039 [Service Date: 04/06/2017 ] [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bridges, Andrew) [Entered: 04/06/2017 06:33 PM]
April 6, 2017 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1669986] filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035, 17-7039 [Service Date: 04/06/2017 ] [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bridges, Andrew) [Entered: 04/06/2017 06:32 PM]
April 6, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1669983] filed by Corynne McSherry and co-counsel Mitchell L. Stoltz on behalf of Appellant Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035. [17-7035, 17-7039] (McSherry, Corynne) [Entered: 04/06/2017 05:28 PM]
April 6, 2017 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1669978] filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035, 17-7039 [Service Date: 04/06/2017 ]. Status of Transcripts: transcripts needed for the appeal have been ordered, but not all transcripts have been received. Next APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/08/2017. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bridges, Andrew) [Entered: 04/06/2017 04:40 PM]
April 6, 2017 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1669974] filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035 [Service Date: 04/06/2017 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bridges, Andrew) [Entered: 04/06/2017 04:35 PM]
April 6, 2017 STATEMENT [1669970] with Disclosure Listing filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035 [Service Date: 04/06/2017 ] [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bridges, Andrew) [Entered: 04/06/2017 04:32 PM]
April 6, 2017 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1669964] filed by American Educational Research Association, Inc., American Psychological Association, Inc. and National Council on Measurement In Education, Inc. in 17-7039 [Service Date: 04/06/2017 ] [17-7039, 17-7035] (Stewart, John) [Entered: 04/06/2017 04:23 PM]
April 6, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1669962] filed by Andrew P. Bridges on behalf of Appellant Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bridges, Andrew) [Entered: 04/06/2017 04:22 PM]
April 6, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1669961] filed by Clifton S. Elgarten on behalf of Appellees American Educational Research Association, Inc., American Psychological Association, Inc. and National Council on Measurement In Education, Inc. in 17-7039. [17-7039, 17-7035] (Stewart, John) [Entered: 04/06/2017 04:21 PM]
April 6, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1669958] filed by Donald B. Verrilli, Jr. and co-counsel Kelly M. Klaus on behalf of Appellee National Fire Protection Association, Inc.. [17-7035] (Klaus, Kelly) [Entered: 04/06/2017 04:18 PM]
April 6, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1669937] filed by Joseph R. Wetzel and co-counsel Paul Alessio Mezzina, and Jason Blake Cunningham on behalf of Appellee American Society of Heating, Refrigerating, and Air-Conditioning Engineers, Inc. in 17-7035, Appellee American Society of Heating, Refrigerating, and Air-conditioning Engineers, Inc. in 17-7039. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Mezzina, Paul) [Entered: 04/06/2017 03:18 PM]
April 6, 2017 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1669867] filed by American Society for Testing and Materials, American Society of Heating, Refrigerating, and Air-Conditioning Engineers, Inc. and National Fire Protection Association, Inc. [Service Date: 04/06/2017 ] [17-7035] (Ho, Allyson) [Entered: 04/06/2017 12:55 PM]
April 6, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1669864] filed by Allyson N. Ho and co-counsel J. Kevin Fee and Jordana S. Rubel on behalf of Appellee American Society for Testing and Materials. [17-7035] (Ho, Allyson) [Entered: 04/06/2017 12:51 PM]
April 5, 2017 NOTICE [1669769] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by American Medical Association, American Dental Association and American Hospital Association [Service Date: 04/05/2017 ] [17-7035, 17-7039]--[Edited 04/06/2017 by LMF] (Bierig, Jack) [Entered: 04/05/2017 06:57 PM]
March 24, 2017 NOTICE [1667838] to terminate attorney filed by American Educational Research Association, Inc., American Psychological Association, Inc. and National Council on Measurement In Education, Inc. in 17-7039 [Service Date: 03/24/2017 ] [17-7039, 17-7035] (Hudis, Jonathan) [Entered: 03/24/2017 05:43 PM]
March 15, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1666145] filed by John I. Stewart, Jr. on behalf of Appellees American Educational Research Association, Inc., American Psychological Association, Inc. and National Council on Measurement In Education, Inc. in 17-7039. [17-7039, 17-7035] (Stewart, John) [Entered: 03/15/2017 01:15 PM]
March 7, 2017 CLERK'S ORDER [1664722] filed consolidating cases 17-7039 (Consolidation started 03/07/2017) with 17-7035; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 04/06/2017. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 04/06/2017. APPELLANT statement of issues due 04/06/2017. APPELLANT underlying decision due 04/06/2017. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 04/06/2017. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 04/06/2017. APPELLANT transcript status report due 04/06/2017. APPELLANT procedural motions due 04/06/2017. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 04/21/2017; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 04/06/2017. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 04/06/2017. APPELLEE procedural motions due 04/06/2017. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 04/21/2017 [17-7035, 17-7039] [Entered: 03/07/2017 11:29 AM]
February 28, 2017 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1663396] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:13-cv-01215-TSC filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 17-7035. [17-7035] [Entered: 02/28/2017 01:32 PM]
February 28, 2017 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [17-7035] [Entered: 02/28/2017 01:31 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: American Society for Testing, et al v. Public.Resource.Org, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: David Michaels
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bruce R. James
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Robert B. Reich
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Society of Safety Engineers
Represented By: Bonnie Hochman Rothell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Beth Williams
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Edward Felten
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Yvette Joy Liebesman
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Margaret Chon
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Megan J. Smith
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Roger Skalbeck
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lila Bailey
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Consumers Union
Represented By: Adina Hyman Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Institute of Electrical and Electronics Engineers, Inc.
Represented By: Bonnie Hochman Rothell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jonathan Askin
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Amy Vanderlyke Dygert
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Raymond A. Mosley
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: David Olson
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: David G. Post
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Steven VanRoekel
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Stephen McJohn
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Alexander Macgillivray
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Will Cross
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Insurance Association
Represented By: V. Robert Denham Esquire Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Blake E. Reid
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Judith C. Russell
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Beth Simone Noveck
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mark P. McKenna, Notre Dame Law School
Represented By: Samuel R. Bagenstos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DJ Patil
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Judicata, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jennifer Pahlka
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michelle M. Wu
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tyler T. Ochoa
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Association of Law Libraries
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Association of Research Libraries
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Annemarie Bridy
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Stacey Dogan, Boston University School of Law
Represented By: Samuel R. Bagenstos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ronald E. Wheeler
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Zoe Lofgren
Represented By: Catherine Rachel Gellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sina Bahram
Represented By: Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
Represented By: Phillip R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Public Knowledge
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Free Law Project
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Center for Science in the Public Interest
Represented By: Adina Hyman Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Aaron Perzanowski
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Public Citizen, Inc.
Represented By: Adina Hyman Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: James Gibson
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Carol M. Browner
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Andrew McLaughlin
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Seamus Kraft
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Betsy Rosenblatt, Whittier Law School
Represented By: Samuel R. Bagenstos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Aneesh Chopra
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kendra K. Levine
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Nicole Wong
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Library Association, n
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Darrell E. Issa
Represented By: Catherine Rachel Gellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: International Trademark Association
Represented By: Anthony J. Dreyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OpenGov Foundation
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: International Electrotechnical Commission
Represented By: Bonnie Hochman Rothell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: David Sorkin
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Society of Civil Engineers
Represented By: Bonnie Hochman Rothell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: United States Public Interest Research Group, Inc.
Represented By: Adina Hyman Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Micaheel W. Carroll
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Brian Love
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Joan Claybrook
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Re: Create Coalition
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: John D. Podesta
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: International Code Council, Inc.
Represented By: Bonnie Hochman Rothell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: International Association of Plumbing & Mechanical Officials
Represented By: Bonnie Hochman Rothell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Underwriters Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Bonnie Hochman Rothell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Benjamin J. Keele
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rebecca Tushnet, Harvard Law School
Represented By: Samuel R. Bagenstos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sunlight Foundation
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: North American Energy Standards Board
Represented By: Bonnie Hochman Rothell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Dental Association
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: International Organization for Standardization
Represented By: Bonnie Hochman Rothell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Electrical Manufacturers Association
Represented By: Bonnie Hochman Rothell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lincoln Network
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ariel Katz
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Medical Association
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: David Hansen
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jessica Litman, University of Michigan Law School
Represented By: Samuel R. Bagenstos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jim DelRosso
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American National Standards Institute, Inc.
Represented By: Bonnie Hochman Rothell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Brandon Butler
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sarah Hooke Lee
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Elizabeth I. Winston, Catholic University, Columbus School of Law
Represented By: Samuel R. Bagenstos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kyle K. Courtney
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Employment Law Project
Represented By: Adina Hyman Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Shubha Ghosh
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Justia Inc.
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Hospital Association
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: R Street Institute
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jessica Silbey
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michael A. Carrier
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Association of College and Research Libraries
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Fastcase, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Robert Walker
Represented By: Charles Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: National Fire Protection Association, Inc.
Represented By: Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
Represented By: Rose Leda Ehler
Represented By: Kelly M. Klaus Esquire I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: American Society of Heating, Refrigerating, and Air-Conditioning Engineers, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Bucholtz Esquire
Represented By: Paul Alessio Mezzina
Represented By: Jason Blake Cunningham
Represented By: Joseph Richard Wetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: American Society for Testing and Materials
Represented By: J. Kevin Fee
Represented By: Michael F. Clayton
Represented By: Allyson Newton Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Public.Resource.Org, Inc.
Represented By: David Elliot Halperin
Represented By: Andrew Phillip Bridges
Represented By: Mitchell Stoltz
Represented By: Corynne Marette McSherry
Represented By: Matthew B. Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?