Halogenated Solvents Industry v. EPA
Petitioner: Halogenated Solvents Industry Alliance, Inc
Respondent: Andrew Wheeler, Administrator, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and Environmental Protection Agency
Not Yet Classified: Natural Resources Defense Council, Lauren Atkins, Wendy Hartley, Safer Chemicals Health Families and Vermont Public Interest Group
Case Number: 19-1115
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 CONSENT MOTION [1796945] to transfer case (Response to Motion served by hand due on 07/22/2019). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 07/22/2019) filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler (Service Date: 07/12/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 386. [19-1115] (Buckley, Sarah) [Entered: 07/12/2019 01:14 PM]
July 9, 2019 REPLY [1796476] filed by Lauren Atkins, Wendy Hartley, Safer Chemicals Health Families and Vermont Public Interest Group to response [Service Date: 07/09/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2566 words. [19-1115] (Sussman, Robert) [Entered: 07/09/2019 04:28 PM]
July 2, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1795589] filed by Aaron Colangelo on behalf of Movant-Intervenor for Respondent Natural Resources Defense Council. [19-1115] (Colangelo, Aaron) [Entered: 07/02/2019 09:01 PM]
June 26, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1794707] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1794363-2 ]; reply to response [ # 1794177-2 ] due 07/09/2019 [19-1115] [Entered: 06/26/2019 05:58 PM]
June 25, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1794363] to extend time to file motion to 07/09/2019 filed by Lauren Atkins, Wendy Hartley, Safer Chemicals Health Families and Vermont Public Interest Group Length Certification: yes. [19-1115] (Sussman, Robert) [Entered: 06/25/2019 11:54 AM]
June 24, 2019 CORRECTED MOTION [1794239] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. [Service Date: 06/24/2019 ] [19-1115]--[Edited 06/25/2019 by LMF] (Zimpleman, Thomas) [Entered: 06/24/2019 04:34 PM]
June 24, 2019 MOTION [1794202] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. [Service Date: 06/24/2019 ] [19-1115] (Zimpleman, Thomas) [Entered: 06/24/2019 03:01 PM]
June 24, 2019 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1794177] to motion [ # 1792741-2 ] filed by Halogenated Solvents Industry Alliance, Inc [Service Date: 06/24/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1,723 words. [19-1115] (Bradley, Keith) [Entered: 06/24/2019 02:33 PM]
June 14, 2019 MOTION [1792741] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Vermont Public Interest Research Group, Safer Chemicals Healthy Families, Lauren Atkins, Wendy Hartley [Service Date: 06/14/2019 ] [19-1115]--[Edited 06/14/2019 by AY] (Sussman, Robert) [Entered: 06/14/2019 08:12 AM]
June 7, 2019 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1791730] to statement [ # 1791729-2 ], certificate [ # 1791728-2 ], statement [ # 1791726-2 ], statement [ # 1791718-2 ] filed by Halogenated Solvents Industry Alliance, Inc. [19-1115] (Bradley, Keith) [Entered: 06/07/2019 04:05 PM]
June 7, 2019 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1791729] filed by Halogenated Solvents Industry Alliance, Inc [Service Date: 06/07/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-1115] (Bradley, Keith) [Entered: 06/07/2019 04:04 PM]
June 7, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1791728] filed by Halogenated Solvents Industry Alliance, Inc [Service Date: 06/07/2019 ] [19-1115] (Bradley, Keith) [Entered: 06/07/2019 04:02 PM]
June 7, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1791726] filed by Halogenated Solvents Industry Alliance, Inc [Service Date: 06/07/2019 ] [19-1115] (Bradley, Keith) [Entered: 06/07/2019 04:01 PM]
June 7, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1791718] and UNDERLYING DECISION filed by Halogenated Solvents Industry Alliance, Inc [Service Date: 06/07/2019 ] [19-1115]--[Edited 06/10/2019 by LMF] (Bradley, Keith) [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:53 PM]
June 4, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1790871] filed by Sarah A. Buckley on behalf of Respondents EPA and Andrew Wheeler. [19-1115] (Buckley, Sarah) [Entered: 06/04/2019 11:30 AM]
May 28, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1789829] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 06/27/2019. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 06/27/2019. PETITIONER statement of issues due 06/27/2019. PETITIONER underlying decision due 06/27/2019. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 06/27/2019. PETITIONER procedural motions due 06/27/2019. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 07/12/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 06/27/2019. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 06/27/2019. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 07/12/2019. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 07/12/2019 [19-1115] [Entered: 05/28/2019 04:00 PM]
May 28, 2019 CERTIFIED COPY [1789822] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1789819-2 ] [19-1115] [Entered: 05/28/2019 03:46 PM]
May 24, 2019 PETITION FOR REVIEW [1789819] of a decision by federal agency filed by Halogenated Solvents Industry Alliance, inc. [Service Date: 05/24/2019 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [19-1115] [Entered: 05/28/2019 03:37 PM]
May 24, 2019 PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [19-1115] [Entered: 05/28/2019 03:51 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halogenated Solvents Industry v. EPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Halogenated Solvents Industry Alliance, Inc
Represented By: Keith Bradley
Represented By: William Caffey Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andrew Wheeler, Administrator, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Sarah A. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Sarah A. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: Thomas Zimpleman
Represented By: Aaron S. Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Lauren Atkins
Represented By: Robert Matthew Sussman Esquire I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Wendy Hartley
Represented By: Robert Matthew Sussman Esquire I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Safer Chemicals Health Families
Represented By: Robert Matthew Sussman Esquire I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Vermont Public Interest Group
Represented By: Robert Matthew Sussman Esquire I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?