State of New York, et al v. EPA
Petitioner: City of Boulder, (CO), City of South Miami, (FL), State of Colorado, City of Los Angeles, State of New Jersey, State of Illinois, State of North Carolina, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Washington, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of California, City of New York, State of Oregon, State of Maryland, State of Connecticut, State of New York, State of Delaware, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, People of the State of Michigan, State of Hawaii, State of Maine, State of Minnesota, District of Columbia, City of Philadelphia, City of Chicago, State of Wisconsin, Commonwealth of Virginia and State of New Mexico
Respondent: Environmental Protection Agency
Case Number: 19-1165
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 CERTIFIED INDEX TO RECORD [1803445] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1140, EPA in 19-1165, 19-1166 [Service Date: 08/23/2019 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166] (Carlisle, Benjamin) [Entered: 08/23/2019 02:08 PM]
August 22, 2019 JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1803230] Align deadlines for initial submissions, procedural and dispositive motions, and certified index to record with deadlines in the lead case, American Lung Assoc. v. EPA filed by City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, People of the State of Michigan, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin in 19-1165, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1166 [Service Date: 08/22/2019 ] Length Certification: 717 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 08/22/2019 11:42 AM]
August 21, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1803158] filed by Paul Garrahan and co-counsel Steven Novick on behalf of Petitioner State of Oregon. [19-1165] (Garrahan, Paul) [Entered: 08/21/2019 04:07 PM]
August 20, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1802881] filed by Aimee D. Thomson on behalf of Petitioner Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. [19-1165] (Thomson, Aimee) [Entered: 08/20/2019 10:14 AM]
August 16, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1802500] filed consolidating cases 19-1165 (Consolidation started 08/16/2019) with 19-1140; directing party to file in 19-1165 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 09/16/2019. PETITIONER statement of issues due 09/16/2019 [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166] [Entered: 08/16/2019 11:29 AM]
August 16, 2019 CERTIFIED COPY [1802494] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1802486-2 ] [19-1165] [Entered: 08/16/2019 11:24 AM]
August 16, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1802493] filed by Peter Surdo on behalf of Petitioner State of Minnesota. [19-1165] (Surdo, Peter) [Entered: 08/16/2019 11:23 AM]
August 16, 2019 LETTER [1802491] sent regarding attorney membership to Michael Nelson Feuer, Esquire for City of Los Angeles. Application for Admission due 09/16/2019. [19-1165] [Entered: 08/16/2019 11:21 AM]
August 13, 2019 PETITION FOR REVIEW [1802486] of a decision by federal agency filed by City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, People of the State of Michigan, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin [Service Date: 08/13/2019 ] Disclosure Statement: Not Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [19-1165] [Entered: 08/16/2019 11:15 AM]
August 13, 2019 PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [19-1165] [Entered: 08/16/2019 10:53 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: State of New York, et al v. EPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Boulder, (CO)
Represented By: Debra S. Kalish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of South Miami, (FL)
Represented By: Thomas Frank Pepe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Colorado
Represented By: Eric Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Los Angeles
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of New Jersey
Represented By: Lisa Jo Morelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Illinois
Represented By: Daniel Isaac Rottenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of North Carolina
Represented By: Asher Paris Spiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Megan M. Herzog
Represented By: Melissa Ann Hoffer Esquire
Represented By: Christophe Gagnon Courchesne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Washington
Represented By: Christopher Huriaux Reitz
Represented By: Emily C. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Gregory Stage Schultz Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Vermont
Represented By: Nicholas Frank Persampieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of California
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Rumsey
Represented By: David Alexander Zonana
Represented By: Robert William Byrne Esquire
Represented By: Timothy Eugene Sullivan
Represented By: Margaret Elaine Meckenstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of New York
Represented By: Christopher Gene King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Oregon
Represented By: Steven Novick
Represented By: Paul Andrew Garrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Maryland
Represented By: Roberta Rose James
Represented By: Joshua Segal
Represented By: John Burnside Howard Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Matthew Ivan Levine
Represented By: Scott Norman Koschwitz Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of New York
Represented By: Andrew Gerard Frank
Represented By: Morgan Anna Costello
Represented By: Michael J. Myers
Represented By: Gavin Geraghty McCabe
Represented By: Brian Murray Lusignan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Delaware
Represented By: Valerie Melissa Edge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Aimee Diane Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: People of the State of Michigan
Represented By: Zachary C. Larsen
Represented By: Gillian E. Wener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Hawaii
Represented By: William F. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Maine
Represented By: Laura Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Peter Surdo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: District of Columbia
Represented By: Karl A. Racine
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Philadelphia
Represented By: Scott Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Chicago
Represented By: Benna Ruth Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Gabe Johnson-Karp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Paul Kugelman Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Anne Minard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?