City of Chicago, Illinois, et al v. FCC, et al
Petitioner: King County, Washington, City of St. Paul, MN, City of Olympia, Washington, Southwest Suburban Cable Commission, Northern Dakota County Cable Communications Commission, City of Seattle, Washington, Colorado Communications and Utility Alliance, City of St. Louis Park, Minnesota, City of Tumwater, Washington, City of Chicago, Illinois, Rainier Communications Commission, Thurston County, Washington, City of Fridley, Minnesota, City and County of Denver Colorado, City of Bellingham, Washington, City of Bloomington, Minnesota, City of Lacey, Washington and City of Tacoma, Washington
Respondent: Federal Communications Commission and United States of America
Case Number: 19-1226
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 LETTER [1813667] sent to transfer case to the USCA 9th Circuit. Documents Sent: Clerk's File (electronic) and copy of order transferring case. [19-1225, 19-1226] [Entered: 10/31/2019 05:49 PM]
October 31, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1813666] filed granting motion to transfer cases [ # 1813620-2 ]. The Clerk is directed to transmit the original files, including a copy of this order, to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. [19-1225, 19-1226] [Entered: 10/31/2019 05:45 PM]
October 31, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1813620] to transfer case filed by FCC in 19-1225, 19-1226 [Service Date: 10/31/2019 ] Length Certification: 468 Words. [19-1225, 19-1226] (Carr, James) [Entered: 10/31/2019 03:45 PM]
October 30, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1813303] to transfer case filed by FCC [Service Date: 10/30/2019 ] Length Certification: 546 words. [19-1226] (Carr, James) [Entered: 10/30/2019 12:04 PM]
October 30, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1813299] filed by Maureen K. Flood and co-counsel Richard K. Welch on behalf of Respondent FCC. [19-1226] (Flood, Maureen) [Entered: 10/30/2019 11:45 AM]
October 30, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1813296] filed by James M. Carr and co-counsel Ashley S. Boizelle, Jacob M. Lewis on behalf of Respondent FCC. [19-1226] (Carr, James) [Entered: 10/30/2019 11:40 AM]
October 29, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1813160] filed consolidating cases 19-1225 (Consolidation started 10/29/2019) with 19-1226; directing party to file in 19-1225 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 12/02/2019. PETITIONER statement of issues due 12/02/2019 [19-1226, 19-1225] [Entered: 10/29/2019 03:54 PM]
October 28, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1812844] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 11/27/2019. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 11/27/2019. PETITIONER statement of issues due 11/27/2019. PETITIONER underlying decision due 11/27/2019. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 11/27/2019. PETITIONER procedural motions due 11/27/2019. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 12/12/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 11/27/2019. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 11/27/2019. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 12/12/2019. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 12/12/2019 [19-1226] [Entered: 10/28/2019 02:06 PM]
October 28, 2019 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE [1812840] received. Fee Amount: $500.00 Receipt Number: ADC-46729-984. [19-1226] (Fellman, Kenneth) [Entered: 10/28/2019 01:43 PM]
October 28, 2019 LETTER [1812839] sent regarding attorney membership to Brian T. Grogan for City of Tacoma, Washington, Northern Dakota County Cable Communications Commission, City of St. Paul, MN, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Bloomington, Minnesota, City of Fridley, Minnesota and City of St. Louis Park, Minnesota and Patrick T. Zomer for City of Tacoma, Washington, Northern Dakota County Cable Communications Commission, City of St. Paul, MN, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Bloomington, Minnesota, City of Fridley, Minnesota and City of St. Louis Park, Minnesota. Application for Admission due 11/27/2019. [19-1226] [Entered: 10/28/2019 01:42 PM]
October 28, 2019 CERTIFIED COPY [1812837] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1812832-2 ] [19-1226] [Entered: 10/28/2019 01:40 PM]
October 24, 2019 PETITION FOR REVIEW [1812832] of a decision by federal agency filed by City and County of Denver Colorado, City of Bellingham, Washington, City of Bloomington, Minnesota, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Fridley, Minnesota, City of Lacey, Washington, City of Olympia, Washington, City of Seattle, Washington, City of St. Louis Park, Minnesota, City of St. Paul, MN, City of Tacoma, Washington, City of Tumwater, Washington, Colorado Communications and Utility Alliance, King County, Washington, Northern Dakota County Cable Communications Commission, Rainier Communications Commission, Southwest Suburban Cable Commission and Thurston County, Washington [Service Date: 10/24/2019 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [19-1226] [Entered: 10/28/2019 01:29 PM]
October 24, 2019 PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [19-1226] [Entered: 10/28/2019 01:27 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: City of Chicago, Illinois, et al v. FCC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: King County, Washington
Represented By: Kenneth S. Fellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of St. Paul, MN
Represented By: Brian T. Grogan
Represented By: Patrick T. Zomer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Olympia, Washington
Represented By: Kenneth S. Fellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Southwest Suburban Cable Commission
Represented By: Brian T. Grogan
Represented By: Patrick T. Zomer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Northern Dakota County Cable Communications Commission
Represented By: Brian T. Grogan
Represented By: Patrick T. Zomer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Seattle, Washington
Represented By: Kenneth S. Fellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Colorado Communications and Utility Alliance
Represented By: Kenneth S. Fellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of St. Louis Park, Minnesota
Represented By: Brian T. Grogan
Represented By: Patrick T. Zomer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Tumwater, Washington
Represented By: Kenneth S. Fellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Chicago, Illinois
Represented By: Brian T. Grogan
Represented By: Patrick T. Zomer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rainier Communications Commission
Represented By: Kenneth S. Fellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thurston County, Washington
Represented By: Kenneth S. Fellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Fridley, Minnesota
Represented By: Brian T. Grogan
Represented By: Patrick T. Zomer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City and County of Denver Colorado
Represented By: Kenneth S. Fellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Bellingham, Washington
Represented By: Kenneth S. Fellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Bloomington, Minnesota
Represented By: Brian T. Grogan
Represented By: Patrick T. Zomer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Lacey, Washington
Represented By: Kenneth S. Fellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Tacoma, Washington
Represented By: Brian T. Grogan
Represented By: Patrick T. Zomer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Communications Commission
Represented By: Jacob M. Lewis
Represented By: Ashley Stocks Boizelle
Represented By: Richard Kiser Welch
Represented By: Maureen Katherine Flood
Represented By: James M. Carr Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?