Great Lakes Communication Corp, et al v. FCC, et al
Petitioner: Sipmeeting, LLC, Northern Valley Communications, LLC, Great Lakes Communication Corp., Total Bridge, Inc. and No Cost Conference Inc.
Respondent: Federal Communications Commission and United States of America
Case Number: 19-1233
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 SUPPLEMENT [1813548] to motion for other relief [ # 1813419-2 ] filed by Great Lakes Communication Corp., No Cost Conference Inc., Northern Valley Communications, LLC, Sipmeeting, LLC and Total Bridge, Inc. [Service Date: 10/31/2019 ] [19-1233] (Carter, George) [Entered: 10/31/2019 12:43 PM]
October 31, 2019 REDACTED SUPPLEMENT [1813501] to motion [ # 1813419-2 ] filed by Total Bridge, Inc., Sipmeeting, LLC, Northern Valley Communications, LLC, No Cost Conference Inc. and Great Lakes Communication Corp. [Service Date: 10/31/2019 ] [19-1233] (Carter, George) [Entered: 10/31/2019 11:19 AM]
October 31, 2019 SEALED EXHIBITS [1813476] to emergency motion for stay [ # 1813419-2 ] filed by Great Lakes Communication Corp., No Cost Conference Inc., Northern Valley Communications, LLC, Sipmeeting, LLC and Total Bridge, Inc. [Service Date: 10/30/2019 ] [19-1233] [Entered: 10/31/2019 10:47 AM]
October 30, 2019 EMERGENCY MOTION [1813419] Emergency Stay of FCC Order Pending Review filed by Great Lakes Communication Corp., No Cost Conference Inc., Northern Valley Communications, LLC, Sipmeeting, LLC and Total Bridge, Inc. (Service Date: 10/30/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 5,196 words.. [19-1233] (Carter, George) [Entered: 10/30/2019 08:42 PM]
October 30, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1813408] Unopposed Motion to File Under Seal Certain Confidential Exhibits in Support of Petitioners' Emergency Motion for Stay of FCC Order Pending Review filed by Great Lakes Communication Corp., No Cost Conference Inc., Northern Valley Communications, LLC, Sipmeeting, LLC and Total Bridge, Inc. Length Certification: 1,214 Words. [19-1233] (Carter, George) [Entered: 10/30/2019 05:59 PM]
October 30, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1813344] filed by James M. Carr on behalf of Respondent FCC. [19-1233] (Carr, James) [Entered: 10/30/2019 01:27 PM]
October 30, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1813336] filed by Richard K. Welch on behalf of Respondent FCC. [19-1233] (Welch, Richard) [Entered: 10/30/2019 01:06 PM]
October 30, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1813324] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 12/02/2019. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 12/02/2019. PETITIONER statement of issues due 12/02/2019. PETITIONER underlying decision due 12/02/2019. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 12/02/2019. PETITIONER procedural motions due 12/02/2019. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 12/16/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 12/02/2019. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 12/02/2019. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 12/16/2019. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 12/16/2019 [19-1233] [Entered: 10/30/2019 12:45 PM]
October 30, 2019 CERTIFIED COPY [1813322] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1813319-2 ] [19-1233] [Entered: 10/30/2019 12:42 PM]
October 29, 2019 PETITION FOR REVIEW [1813319] of a decision by federal agency filed by Great Lakes Communication Corp., No Cost Conference Inc., Northern Valley Communications, LLC, Sipmeeting, LLC and Total Bridge, Inc. [Service Date: 10/29/2019 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [19-1233] [Entered: 10/30/2019 12:39 PM]
October 29, 2019 PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [19-1233] [Entered: 10/30/2019 12:38 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Great Lakes Communication Corp, et al v. FCC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sipmeeting, LLC
Represented By: George David Carter Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Northern Valley Communications, LLC
Represented By: George David Carter Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Great Lakes Communication Corp.
Represented By: George David Carter Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Total Bridge, Inc.
Represented By: George David Carter Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: No Cost Conference Inc.
Represented By: George David Carter Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Communications Commission
Represented By: Richard Kiser Welch
Represented By: James M. Carr Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?