State of California, et al v. Andrew Wheeler, et al
Petitioner: State of Colorado, City of Los Angeles, State of New Jersey, State of Illinois, State of North Carolina, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Connecticut, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of California, by and through Governor Gavin Newsom, Attorney General Xavier Becerra, and the California Air Resources Board, City of New York, State of Oregon, State of Maryland, State of Washington, State of New York, State of Delaware, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, People of the State of Michigan, State of Hawaii, State of Maine, State of Minnesota, District of Columbia, State of Wisconsin, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of New Mexico and State of Nevada
Respondent: Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler, in his official capacity as Administrator, United States Environmental Protection Agency, Elaine L. Chao, in her official capacity as Secretary, United States Department of Transportation and United States Department of Transportation
Case Number: 19-1239
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 CERTIFIED COPY [1817044] of Petition for Review sent to respondent United States Department of Transportation [ # 1816808-2 ] [19-1239] [Entered: 11/21/2019 02:58 PM]
November 21, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1817039] filed by Julia K. Forgie and co-counsel David A. Zonana and Gary E. Tavetian on behalf of Petitioner State of California in 19-1239. [19-1239, 19-1230, 19-1241, 19-1242] (Forgie, Julia) [Entered: 11/21/2019 02:41 PM]
November 21, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1816934] filed granting motion for leave to intervene [ # 1813676-2 ] in 19-1230. [19-1230, 19-1239, 19-1241, 19-1242] [Entered: 11/21/2019 10:35 AM]
November 20, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1816851] filed consolidating cases 19-1242 (Consolidation started 11/20/2019) with 19-1230; directing party to file in 19-1242 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 12/20/2019. PETITIONER statement of issues due 12/20/2019 [19-1230, 19-1239, 19-1241, 19-1242] [Entered: 11/20/2019 05:02 PM]
November 20, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1816817] filed consolidating cases 19-1239 (Consolidation started 11/20/2019) with 19-1230; directing party to file in 19-1239 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 12/20/2019. PETITIONER statement of issues due 12/20/2019 [19-1230, 19-1239, 19-1241] [Entered: 11/20/2019 03:58 PM]
November 20, 2019 CERTIFIED COPY [1816812] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1816808-2 ] [19-1239] [Entered: 11/20/2019 03:54 PM]
November 15, 2019 PETITION FOR REVIEW [1816808] of a decision by federal agency filed by City of Los Angeles, City of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin [Service Date: 11/15/2019 ] Disclosure Statement: Not Applicable to this Party; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [19-1239] [Entered: 11/20/2019 03:53 PM]
November 15, 2019 PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [19-1239] [Entered: 11/20/2019 03:52 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of California, et al v. Andrew Wheeler, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andrew Wheeler, in his official capacity as Administrator, United States Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Elaine L. Chao, in her official capacity as Secretary, United States Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Colorado
Represented By: Eric Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Los Angeles
Represented By: Michael James Bostrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of New Jersey
Represented By: Aaron Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Illinois
Represented By: Daniel Isaac Rottenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of North Carolina
Represented By: Asher Paris Spiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Matthew Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Scott Norman Koschwitz Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Gregory Stage Schultz Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Vermont
Represented By: Nicholas Frank Persampieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of California, by and through Governor Gavin Newsom, Attorney General Xavier Becerra, and the California Air Resources Board
Represented By: David Alexander Zonana
Represented By: Gary Edward Tavetian
Represented By: Julia Kathryn Forgie
Represented By: Margaret Elaine Meckenstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of New York
Represented By: Christopher Gene King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Oregon
Represented By: Paul Andrew Garrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Maryland
Represented By: Roberta Rose James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Washington
Represented By: Emily C. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of New York
Represented By: Gavin Geraghty McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Delaware
Represented By: Christian Douglas Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Michael Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: People of the State of Michigan
Represented By: Neil David Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Hawaii
Represented By: William F. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Maine
Represented By: Laura Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Peter Surdo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: District of Columbia
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Vandermeuse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Caitlin O'Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Anne Minard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Nevada
Represented By: Heidi Parry Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?