Grace, et al v. William Barr, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: Gio, Maria, Grace, Gina, Mina, A.P.A., minor daughter, J.A.C.F., minor daughter, Nora, and her minor son, A.B.A. (by and through his mother), Carmen, and her minor daughter, J.A.C.F. (by and through her mother), Cindy Ardon Mejia, and her minor daughter, A.P.A. (by and through her mother), Mona and A.B.A., minor son
Defendant / Appellant: Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting Attorney General of the United States, in his Official Capacity, James McHenry, Director of the Executive Office for Immigration Review, in his Official Capacity, William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States, in his Official Capacity, L. Francis Cissna, Director of United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, in his Official Capacity and Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, in her Official Capacity
Amicus Curiae: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Case Number: 19-5013
Filed: January 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
July 17, 2020 Summary Grace v. Barr

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1780273] filed by Anne Dutton on behalf of Appellees A.B.A., A.P.A., Carmen, Gina, Gio, Grace, J.A.C.F., Maria, Cindy Ardon Mejia, Mina, Mona and Nora. [19-5013] (Dutton, Anne) [Entered: 03/29/2019 03:57 PM]
March 29, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1780277] filed by Blaine Bookey on behalf of Appellees A.B.A., A.P.A., Carmen, Gina, Gio, Grace, J.A.C.F., Maria, Cindy Ardon Mejia, Mina, Mona and Nora. [19-5013] (Bookey, Blaine) [Entered: 03/29/2019 04:06 PM]
March 29, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1780278] filed by Karen Musalo on behalf of Appellees A.B.A., A.P.A., Carmen, Gina, Gio, Grace, J.A.C.F., Maria, Cindy Ardon Mejia, Mina, Mona and Nora. [19-5013] (Musalo, Karen) [Entered: 03/29/2019 04:09 PM]
March 29, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1780271] filed by Eunice Lee on behalf of Appellees A.B.A., A.P.A., Carmen, Gina, Gio, Grace, J.A.C.F., Maria, Cindy Ardon Mejia, Mina, Mona and Nora. [19-5013] (Lee, Eunice) [Entered: 03/29/2019 03:47 PM]
March 22, 2019 NOTICE [1778927] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Immigration Reform Law Institute [Service Date: 03/22/2019 ] [19-5013]--[Edited 03/22/2019 by AH] (Hethmon, Michael) [Entered: 03/22/2019 02:03 PM]
March 1, 2019 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1775663] filed by William P. Barr, L. Francis Cissna, James McHenry and Kirstjen M. Nielsen [Service Date: 03/01/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [19-5013] (Reuveni, Erez) [Entered: 03/01/2019 06:05 PM]
March 1, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1775650] filed by William P. Barr, L. Francis Cissna, James McHenry and Kirstjen M. Nielsen [Service Date: 03/01/2019 ] [19-5013] (Reuveni, Erez) [Entered: 03/01/2019 05:27 PM]
March 1, 2019 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1775664] filed by William P. Barr, L. Francis Cissna, James McHenry and Kirstjen M. Nielsen [Service Date: 03/01/2019 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [19-5013] (Reuveni, Erez) [Entered: 03/01/2019 06:10 PM]
March 1, 2019 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1775665] submitted by William P. Barr, L. Francis Cissna, James McHenry and Kirstjen M. Nielsen [Service Date: 03/01/2019 ] [19-5013] (Reuveni, Erez) [Entered: 03/01/2019 06:11 PM]
March 1, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1775673] filed by William P. Barr, L. Francis Cissna, James McHenry and Kirstjen M. Nielsen [Service Date: 03/01/2019 ] [19-5013] (Reuveni, Erez) [Entered: 03/01/2019 06:49 PM]
March 1, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1775669] filed by A.B.A., A.P.A., Carmen, Gina, Gio, Grace, J.A.C.F., Maria, Cindy Ardon Mejia, Mina, Mona and Nora [Service Date: 03/01/2019 ] [19-5013] (Newell, Jennifer) [Entered: 03/01/2019 06:31 PM]
March 1, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1775648] filed by Sandra Park and co-counsel Lenora Lapidus on behalf of Appellees A.B.A., A.P.A., Carmen, Gina, Gio, Grace, J.A.C.F., Maria, Mina, Mona, Nora and Cindy Ardon Mejia. [19-5013] (Park, Sandra) [Entered: 03/01/2019 05:25 PM]
March 1, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1775647] filed by William P. Barr, L. Francis Cissna, James McHenry and Kirstjen M. Nielsen [Service Date: 03/01/2019 ] [19-5013] (Reuveni, Erez) [Entered: 03/01/2019 05:24 PM]
February 28, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1775450] filed by Katrina Eiland on behalf of Appellees A.B.A., A.P.A., Carmen, Gina, Gio, Grace, J.A.C.F., Maria, Cindy Ardon Mejia, Mina, Mona and Nora. [19-5013] (Eiland, Katrina) [Entered: 02/28/2019 06:26 PM]
February 28, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1775451] filed by Julie Veroff on behalf of Appellees A.B.A., A.P.A., Carmen, Gina, Gio, Grace, J.A.C.F., Maria, Cindy Ardon Mejia, Mina, Mona and Nora. [19-5013] (Veroff, Julie) [Entered: 02/28/2019 06:34 PM]
February 28, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1775453] filed by Celso Perez on behalf of Appellees A.B.A., A.P.A., Carmen, Gina, Gio, Grace, J.A.C.F., Maria, Cindy Ardon Mejia, Mina, Mona and Nora. [19-5013] (Perez, Celso) [Entered: 02/28/2019 06:47 PM]
February 28, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1775449] filed by Cody H. Wofsy on behalf of Appellees A.B.A., A.P.A., Carmen, Gina, Gio, Grace, J.A.C.F., Maria, Cindy Ardon Mejia, Mina, Mona and Nora. [19-5013] (Wofsy, Cody) [Entered: 02/28/2019 06:18 PM]
February 19, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1773885] filed by Judy Rabinovitz on behalf of Appellees A.B.A., A.P.A., Carmen, Gina, Gio, Grace, J.A.C.F., Maria, Cindy Ardon Mejia, Mina, Mona and Nora. [19-5013] (Rabinovitz, Judy) [Entered: 02/19/2019 03:05 PM]
February 6, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1772292] filed by Jennifer Chang Newell on behalf of Appellees A.B.A., A.P.A., Carmen, Gina, Gio, Grace, J.A.C.F., Maria, Cindy Ardon Mejia, Mina, Mona and Nora. [19-5013] (Newell, Jennifer) [Entered: 02/06/2019 05:22 PM]
February 6, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1772286] filed by Arthur B. Spitzer on behalf of Appellees A.B.A., A.P.A., Carmen, Gina, Gio, Grace, J.A.C.F., Maria, Cindy Ardon Mejia, Mina, Mona and Nora. [19-5013] (Spitzer, Arthur) [Entered: 02/06/2019 04:26 PM]
January 31, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1771230] filed by Erez Reuveni on behalf of Appellants L. Francis Cissna, James McHenry, Kirstjen M. Nielsen and Matthew G. Whitaker. [19-5013] (Reuveni, Erez) [Entered: 01/31/2019 10:46 AM]
January 30, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1771093] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-01853-EGS filed by L. Francis Cissna, James McHenry, Kirstjen M. Nielsen and Matthew G. Whitaker. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5013. [19-5013] [Entered: 01/30/2019 03:08 PM]
January 30, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1771096] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 03/01/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 03/01/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 03/01/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 03/01/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 03/01/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 03/01/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 03/01/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 03/01/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 03/18/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 03/01/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 03/01/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 03/01/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 03/18/2019 [19-5013] [Entered: 01/30/2019 03:11 PM]
January 30, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5013] [Entered: 01/30/2019 03:08 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Grace, et al v. William Barr, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Gio
Represented By: Scott Matthew Michelman
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: Eunice Lee
Represented By: Blaine Bookey
Represented By: Anne Dutton
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Represented By: Sandra Park
Represented By: Celso Javier Perez
Represented By: Karen Musalo
Represented By: Lenora Lapidus
Represented By: Julie Veroff
Represented By: Katrina Eiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Maria
Represented By: Scott Matthew Michelman
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: Eunice Lee
Represented By: Blaine Bookey
Represented By: Anne Dutton
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Represented By: Sandra Park
Represented By: Celso Javier Perez
Represented By: Karen Musalo
Represented By: Lenora Lapidus
Represented By: Julie Veroff
Represented By: Katrina Eiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Grace
Represented By: Scott Matthew Michelman
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: Eunice Lee
Represented By: Blaine Bookey
Represented By: Anne Dutton
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Represented By: Sandra Park
Represented By: Celso Javier Perez
Represented By: Karen Musalo
Represented By: Lenora Lapidus
Represented By: Julie Veroff
Represented By: Katrina Eiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Gina
Represented By: Scott Matthew Michelman
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: Eunice Lee
Represented By: Blaine Bookey
Represented By: Anne Dutton
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Represented By: Sandra Park
Represented By: Celso Javier Perez
Represented By: Karen Musalo
Represented By: Lenora Lapidus
Represented By: Julie Veroff
Represented By: Katrina Eiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mina
Represented By: Scott Matthew Michelman
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: Eunice Lee
Represented By: Blaine Bookey
Represented By: Anne Dutton
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Represented By: Sandra Park
Represented By: Celso Javier Perez
Represented By: Karen Musalo
Represented By: Lenora Lapidus
Represented By: Julie Veroff
Represented By: Katrina Eiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: A.P.A., minor daughter
Represented By: Scott Matthew Michelman
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: Eunice Lee
Represented By: Blaine Bookey
Represented By: Anne Dutton
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Represented By: Sandra Park
Represented By: Celso Javier Perez
Represented By: Karen Musalo
Represented By: Lenora Lapidus
Represented By: Julie Veroff
Represented By: Katrina Eiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: J.A.C.F., minor daughter
Represented By: Scott Matthew Michelman
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: Eunice Lee
Represented By: Blaine Bookey
Represented By: Anne Dutton
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Represented By: Sandra Park
Represented By: Celso Javier Perez
Represented By: Karen Musalo
Represented By: Lenora Lapidus
Represented By: Julie Veroff
Represented By: Katrina Eiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Nora, and her minor son, A.B.A. (by and through his mother)
Represented By: Scott Matthew Michelman
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: Eunice Lee
Represented By: Blaine Bookey
Represented By: Anne Dutton
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Represented By: Sandra Park
Represented By: Celso Javier Perez
Represented By: Karen Musalo
Represented By: Lenora Lapidus
Represented By: Julie Veroff
Represented By: Katrina Eiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Carmen, and her minor daughter, J.A.C.F. (by and through her mother)
Represented By: Scott Matthew Michelman
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: Eunice Lee
Represented By: Blaine Bookey
Represented By: Anne Dutton
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Represented By: Sandra Park
Represented By: Celso Javier Perez
Represented By: Karen Musalo
Represented By: Lenora Lapidus
Represented By: Julie Veroff
Represented By: Katrina Eiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Cindy Ardon Mejia, and her minor daughter, A.P.A. (by and through her mother)
Represented By: Scott Matthew Michelman
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: Eunice Lee
Represented By: Blaine Bookey
Represented By: Anne Dutton
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Represented By: Sandra Park
Represented By: Celso Javier Perez
Represented By: Karen Musalo
Represented By: Lenora Lapidus
Represented By: Julie Veroff
Represented By: Katrina Eiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mona
Represented By: Scott Matthew Michelman
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: Eunice Lee
Represented By: Blaine Bookey
Represented By: Anne Dutton
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Represented By: Sandra Park
Represented By: Celso Javier Perez
Represented By: Karen Musalo
Represented By: Lenora Lapidus
Represented By: Julie Veroff
Represented By: Katrina Eiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: A.B.A., minor son
Represented By: Scott Matthew Michelman
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: Eunice Lee
Represented By: Blaine Bookey
Represented By: Anne Dutton
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Represented By: Sandra Park
Represented By: Celso Javier Perez
Represented By: Karen Musalo
Represented By: Lenora Lapidus
Represented By: Julie Veroff
Represented By: Katrina Eiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting Attorney General of the United States, in his Official Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: James McHenry, Director of the Executive Office for Immigration Review, in his Official Capacity
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States, in his Official Capacity
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: L. Francis Cissna, Director of United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, in his Official Capacity
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, in her Official Capacity
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Represented By: Michael Meriwether Hethmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?