Yi Tai Shao v. John Roberts, et al
Defendant / Appellee: United States Supreme Court, Rice Pichon, BJ Fadem, Tani G. Cantil-Sakauye, Chief Justice as Doe Dft No. 5, John G. Roberts, Chief Justice, Rudolph Contreras, Gregory Saldivar, Commissioner, Sarah Scofield, Tsan-Kuen Wang, Michael Reedy, Jackie Francis, Google Inc., a Delaware Corporation, Lucy H. Koh, Judge, Ruth Bader Ginsburg, Associate Justice, Mary L. Murphy, Theodore Zayner, Judge, Edward Davila, Judge, Kevin L. Warnock, Jill Sardeson, Mary Ann Grill, Judge, Janet Everson, California Sixth District Court of Appeal, Esther Chung, Patricia Bamattre-Manoukian, Justice, Jeff Atkins, Elena Kagan, Associate Justice, Patricia Lucas, Judge, American Inns of Court, James McManis, Department of Family and Children Services, Elise Mitchell, Carole Tait-Starnes, Eugene Premo, Justice, Sonia Sotomayor, Associate Justice, County of Santa Clara, California Supreme Court as Doe No. 2, Lisa Herrick, Peter Kirwan, Judge, David Sussman, U.S. House Judiciary Committee, Samuel A. Alito, Jr., Associate Justice, U.S. Senate Judiciary Committee, Stephen G. Breyer, Associate Justice, Anthony M. Kennedy, Associate Justice, Franklin Elia, Justice, Susan Walker, Adrienne M. Grover, Doe Dft. No. 1, Joshua Weinstein, Judge, Does 4-50, David H. Yamasaki, John Orlando, Youtube, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, J. Clifford Wallace, Judge, Eric Swamwell, House Representative, McManis Faulkner, LLP, San Francisco Bay Area American Inn Of Court, Clerk's Office of California Sixth District Court of Appeal, Maureen Folan, Diane Feinstein, Senate, Santa Clara County Superior Court of California, Misook Oh, Conrad Rushing, Justice, William A. Ingram, American Inn of Court, Clarence Thomas, Associate Justice, Supreme Court of California, Doe Dft. No. 4, Rebecca Delgado, Darryl Young and Jordan Bickell
Plaintiff / Appellant: Yi Tai Shao, Esquire, Attorney and Yi Tai Shao
Case Number: 19-5014
Filed: January 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 LETTER [1867710] received from the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court of the following activity in the case before it: A petition for writ of certiorari was filed and placed on the docket on 10/20/2020 as No. 20-524. [19-5014] [Entered: 10/22/2020 12:58 PM]
May 1, 2020 PER CURIAM ORDER, En Banc, [1840903] filed denying appellant's motion for en banc reconsideration [ # 1834621-3 ]. Before Judges: Srinivasan, Henderson, Rogers, Tatel, Garland, Griffith, Millett, Pillard, Wilkins, Katsas and Rao. [19-5014] [Entered: 05/01/2020 01:41 PM]
May 1, 2020 PER CURIAM ORDER [1840899] filed dismissing as moot appellant's motion to exceed word limits [ # 1834710-2 ]. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for judicial notice be granted [ # 1834622-2 ]. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for reconsideration be denied [ # 1834621-2 ]. The Clerk is directed to accept no further submissions from *** Yi Tai Shao *** in this closed case. Before Judges: Millett, Pillard and Wilkins. [19-5014] [Entered: 05/01/2020 01:36 PM]
March 21, 2020 MOTION [1834710] to exceed word limits of motion for reconsideration and suggestion of reconsideration en banc filed by Yi Tai Shao (Service Date: 03/21/2020 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 6 pages. [19-5014] [Entered: 03/23/2020 12:11 PM]
March 21, 2020 MOTION [1834622] for judicial notice filed by Yi Tai Shao (Service Date: 03/21/2020 by CM/ECF NDA, Email) Length Certification: 1833 words. [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 03/21/2020 09:30 PM]
March 21, 2020 MOTION [1834621] for reconsideration, for reconsideration en banc lodged by Appellant Yi Tai Shao [Service Date: 03/21/2020 by CM/ECF NDA, Email] Length Certification: 5068 words with Motion to increase word limits simultaneously filed. [19-5014]--[Edited 04/06/2020 by AY--MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 03/21/2020 09:25 PM]
February 18, 2020 MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, U.S. District Court. [19-5014] [Entered: 02/18/2020 03:04 PM]
February 5, 2020 PER CURIAM ORDER [1827069] ORDERED that the motion to extend time be dismissed as moot [ # 1820096-2 ]. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the petition for rehearing be denied [ # 1820049-2 ]. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the alternative motion to recuse and transfer be denied. Before Judges: Millett, Pillard and Wilkins. [19-5014] [Entered: 02/05/2020 09:33 AM]
December 13, 2019 PROPOSED JUDGMENT [1820102] submitted by Yi Tai Shao [Service Date: 12/13/2019 ] [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 12/13/2019 01:01 PM]
December 13, 2019 MOTION [1820096] to extend time to file petition to 12/13/2019 filed by Yi Tai Shao (Service Date: 12/13/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email, US Mail) Length Certification: 555 words. [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 12/13/2019 12:54 PM]
December 13, 2019 PETITION [1820049] for rehearing filed by Appellant Yi Tai Shao [Service Date: 12/13/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email, US Mail] Length Certification: 4778 words. [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 12/13/2019 09:11 AM]
November 13, 2019 PER CURIAM ORDER [1815653] filed granting motion for leave to late file the response to the order to show cause [ # 1805022-2 ]; FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for leave to late file the petition for rehearing be dismissed as moot. FURTHER ORDERED denying petition for rehearing [ # 1803537-2 ]; FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for judicial notice be granted in part, and dismissed in part as moot [ # 1804514-2 ], [ # 1804513-2 ]; discharging order to show cause [ # 1799946-4 ], FURTHER ORDERED, on the courts own motion, that the district courts January 17, 2019 order dismissing appellants complaint be summarily affirmed with respect to all remaining appellees. FURTHER ORDERED that the motions to exceed the briefing word limits and to dispense with a portion of the appendix be dismissed as moot. [ # 1774339-2 ], withholding issuance of the mandate. (see order for details) Before Judges: Millett, Pillard and Wilkins. [19-5014] [Entered: 11/13/2019 04:54 PM]
September 13, 2019 SUPPLEMENT [1806352] to response [ # 1804512-2 ], petition for rehearing [ # 1803537-2 ] filed by Yi Tai Shao [Service Date: 09/12/2019 ] [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 09/13/2019 01:53 AM]
September 4, 2019 MOTION [1805022] to extend time to file response to 09/03/2019 filed by Yi Tai Shao (Service Date: 09/04/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email) Length Certification: 292 words. [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 09/04/2019 06:42 PM]
September 2, 2019 MOTION [1804514] for judicial notice filed by Yi Tai Shao (Service Date: 09/02/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email) Length Certification: 5299 words. [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 09/02/2019 10:18 AM]
September 2, 2019 MOTION [1804513] for judicial notice filed by Yi Tai Shao (Service Date: 09/02/2019 by Email) Length Certification: 5299 words. [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 09/02/2019 09:47 AM]
August 31, 2019 RESPONSE [1804512] to order [ # 1799946-2 ], [ # 1799946-3 ], [ # 1799946-4 ] filed by Yi Tai Shao (Service Date: 08/30/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email) Length Certification: 5257. [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 08/31/2019 12:48 AM]
August 24, 2019 PETITION [1803537] for rehearing filed by Appellant Yi Tai Shao [Service Date: 08/24/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email] Length Certification: 3897 words. [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 08/24/2019 07:54 PM]
August 19, 2019 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1802721] received from Regus [signed for on 08/05/2019] for order [1799950-2] sent to Appellant Yi Tai Shao [19-5014] [Entered: 08/19/2019 11:55 AM]
July 31, 2019 FIRST CLASS AND CERTIFIED MAIL SENT [1799950] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.70190700000052691386] of order [ # 1799946-3 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 08/30/2019 from Yi Tai Shao. [19-5014] [Entered: 07/31/2019 12:09 PM]
July 31, 2019 PER CURIAM ORDER [1799946] filed discharging Clerk order to show cause [ # 1781890-4 ]; denying motion to recuse and transfer [ # 1791001-3 ]; denying motion to strike document [ # 1789575-3 ]; granting motion for summary affirmance [ # 1778169-2 ]; denying motion for summary reversal [ # 1787225-2 ]; to show cause regarding why the district courts January 17, 2019 order should not be summarily affirmed with respect to all remaining appellees. [ # 1771148-2 ]. Response to Order due 08/30/2019The response may not exceed the length limitations established in the order., Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; Further Ordered motion for judicial notice be granted in part and dismissed in part as moot. [ # 1787004-2 ]; deferring consideration of motion to exceed page limits [ # 1774339-2 ] and motion to dispense with appendix [ # 1774340-2 ] pending further order of the Court.; The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail.Pursuant to D.C. Circuit Rule 36, this disposition will not be published. The Clerk is directed to withhold issuance of the mandate herein until resolution of the remainder of the appeal. Before Judges: Millett, Pillard and Wilkins. [19-5014] [Entered: 07/31/2019 11:58 AM]
June 27, 2019 NOTICE [1794947] to withdraw attorney Veronica S. Ascarrunz who represented Youtube, Inc. and Google Inc. in 19-5014 filed by Google Inc. and Youtube, Inc. [Service Date: 06/27/2019 ] [19-5014] (Ascarrunz, Veronica) [Entered: 06/27/2019 06:14 PM]
June 26, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1794711] filed by Lauren Gallo White on behalf of Appellees Google Inc. and Youtube, Inc.. [19-5014] (White, Lauren) [Entered: 06/26/2019 08:56 PM]
June 5, 2019 SUPPLEMENT [1791301] to motion to recuse [ # 1791001-3 ] filed by Yi Tai Shao [Service Date: 06/05/2019 ] [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 06/05/2019 08:49 PM]
June 5, 2019 AMENDED MOTION [1791001] to recuse filed by Yi Tai Shao (Service Date: 06/05/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 5,199 words. [19-5014]--[Edited 06/05/2019 by SHA-Event Type Modified by the Clerk's Office] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 06/05/2019 12:43 AM]
May 31, 2019 NOTICE [1790526] filed of submission of paper filing filed by Yi Tai Shao [Service Date: 05/31/2019 ] [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 05/31/2019 07:07 PM]
May 29, 2019 REPLY [1789890] filed by Yi Tai Shao to response [ # 1788644-2 ] [Service Date: 05/29/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email] Length Certification: 638 words. [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 05/29/2019 06:49 AM]
May 29, 2019 REPLY [1789889] filed by Yi Tai Shao to response and RESPONSE IN SUPPORT filed to Cross Motion [ # 1787004-2 ], [ # 1787225-2 ] [Service Date: 05/28/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email] Length Certification: 2377 words. [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 05/29/2019 02:02 AM]
May 28, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1789843] filed dismissing as moot motion for extension of time to respond to the court's order to show cause [ # 1787200-2 ]. Appellant's response was timely filed. [19-5014] [Entered: 05/28/2019 04:24 PM]
May 28, 2019 AMENDED MOTION [1789575] to strike the reply and response filed by Yi Tai Shao (Service Date: 05/28/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 2079 words. [19-5014]--[Edited 06/05/2019 by SHA-Event Type Modified by the Clerk's Office] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 05/28/2019 01:22 AM]
May 23, 2019 MOTION [1789293] to strike the reply, to strike the filed by Yi Tai Shao (Service Date: 05/23/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email) Length Certification: 1397 words. [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 05/23/2019 10:16 PM]
May 20, 2019 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1788644] to motion for summary reversal [ # 1787225-2 ] filed by American Inns of Court, William A. Ingram and San Francisco Bay Area American Inn of Court [Service Date: 05/20/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email, US Mail] Length Certification: 1,143 Words. [19-5014] (Barnsback, Michael) [Entered: 05/20/2019 05:16 PM]
May 20, 2019 REPLY [1788641] filed by American Inns of Court, William A. Ingram and San Francisco Bay Area American Inn of Court to response [ # 1786663-2 ] [Service Date: 05/20/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email, US Mail] Length Certification: 3,472. [19-5014] (Barnsback, Michael) [Entered: 05/20/2019 04:55 PM]
May 16, 2019 MOTION [1788216] to recuse filed by Ms. Yi Tai Shao, Esquire (Service Date: 05/16/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email) Length Certification: 4,704 words excluding exhibits. [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 05/16/2019 11:14 PM]
May 16, 2019 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1788172] to supplemental [ # 1788040-2 ] filed by Ms. Yi Tai Shao, Esquire. [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 05/16/2019 03:26 PM]
May 15, 2019 SUPPLEMENT [1788040] to motion for summary reversal [ # 1787225-2 ], response [ # 1786663-2 ] filed by Ms. Yi Tai Shao, Esquire [Service Date: 05/15/2019 ] [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 05/15/2019 10:04 PM]
May 10, 2019 MOTION [1787225] for summary reversal (Response to Motion served by hand due on 05/20/2019). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 05/20/2019) filed by Ms. Yi Tai Shao, Esquire (Service Date: 05/09/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email) Length Certification: 2199 words. [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 05/10/2019 12:20 AM]
May 9, 2019 MOTION [1787200] Extension of Appellant's time to respond to the Order to Show Cause of April 9, 2019 by 2 days filed by Ms. Yi Tai Shao, Esquire (Service Date: 05/09/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email) Length Certification: 228. [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 05/09/2019 04:06 PM]
May 9, 2019 MOTION [1787004] for judicial notice filed by Ms. Yi Tai Shao, Esquire (Service Date: 05/08/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email) Length Certification: 5200 words. [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 05/09/2019 12:56 AM]
May 8, 2019 RESPONSE [1786663] to order [ # 1781890-2 ], [ # 1781890-3 ], [ # 1781890-4 ] filed by Ms. Yi Tai Shao, Esquire (Service Date: 05/08/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 5,199 words in full compliance with Rule 27. [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 05/08/2019 01:45 AM]
April 22, 2019 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1784887] received from Alicia B [signed for on 04/15/2019] for order [1781893-2] sent to Appellant Ms. Yi Tai Shao, Esquire [19-5014] [Entered: 04/26/2019 12:41 PM]
April 9, 2019 FIRST CLASS AND CERTIFIED MAIL SENT [1781893] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.70070710000471968177] of order [ # 1781890-3 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 05/09/2019 from Yi Tai Shao, Attorney. [19-5014] [Entered: 04/09/2019 12:00 PM]
April 9, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1781890] filed to show cause regarding motion for summary affirmance [ # 1778169-2 ]. Response to Order due 05/09/2019. The response may not exceed the length limitations established in the order., Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5014] [Entered: 04/09/2019 11:56 AM]
March 19, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1778324] filed by Carole Tait-Starnes [Service Date: 03/19/2019 ] [19-5014] (Aist, James) [Entered: 03/19/2019 02:20 PM]
March 19, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1778320] filed by James S. Aist on behalf of Appellee Carole Tait-Starnes. [19-5014] (Aist, James) [Entered: 03/19/2019 02:18 PM]
March 18, 2019 MOTION [1778169] for summary affirmance (Response to Motion served by hand due on 03/28/2019). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 03/28/2019) filed by American Inns of Court, William A. Ingram and San Francisco Bay Area American Inn Of Court (Service Date: 03/18/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 1,347 Words. [19-5014] (Barnsback, Michael) [Entered: 03/18/2019 04:56 PM]
March 5, 2019 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1775936] to motion to dispense with appendix [ # 1774340-2 ], motion to exceed page limits [ # 1774339-2 ] filed by Ms. Yi Tai Shao, Esquire. [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 03/05/2019 01:36 AM]
March 5, 2019 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1775935] for motion to exceed page limits [ # 1774339-2 ], motion to dispense with appendix [ # 1774340-2 ] filed by Ms. Yi Tai Shao, Esquire. [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 03/05/2019 01:33 AM]
March 1, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1775667] filed by Janet Everson, McManis Faulkner, LLP, James McManis and Michael Reedy [Service Date: 03/01/2019 ] [19-5014] (Lassart, James) [Entered: 03/01/2019 06:17 PM]
March 1, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1775666] filed by James A. Lassart on behalf of Appellees Janet Everson, McManis Faulkner, LLP, James McManis and Michael Reedy. [19-5014] (Lassart, James) [Entered: 03/01/2019 06:14 PM]
March 1, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1775627] filed by Supreme Court of California, Tani G. Cantil-Sakauye, California Sixth District Court of Appeal, Patricia Bamattre-Manoukian, Franklin Elia, Adrienne M. Grover, Eugene Premo, Clerk's Office of California Sixth District Court of Appeal, Santa Clara County Superior Court of California, Maureen Folan, Mary Ann Grill, Peter Kirwan, Patricia Lucas, Rice Pichon, Joshua Weinstein, Theodore Zayner, Edward Davila, Gregory Saldivar, Rebecca Delgado, Lisa Herrick, Jill Sardeson, Sarah Scofield, Susan Walker and David H. Yamasaki [Service Date: 03/01/2019 ] [19-5014] (Dorner, Drew) [Entered: 03/01/2019 04:45 PM]
March 1, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1775626] filed by American Inns of Court, William A. Ingram and San Francisco Bay Area American Inn Of Court [Service Date: 03/01/2019 ] [19-5014] (Barnsback, Michael) [Entered: 03/01/2019 04:43 PM]
March 1, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1775625] filed by County of Santa Clara, Misook Oh, Mary L. Murphy and Darryl Young [Service Date: 03/01/2019 ] [19-5014] (Brandt, George) [Entered: 03/01/2019 04:42 PM]
March 1, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1775618] filed by Drew T. Dorner on behalf of Appellees Supreme Court of California, Tani G. Cantil-Sakauye, California Sixth District Court of Appeal, Patricia Bamattre-Manoukian, Franklin Elia, Adrienne M. Grover, Eugene Premo, Clerk's Office of California Sixth District Court of Appeal, Santa Clara County Superior Court of California, Maureen Folan, Mary Ann Grill, Peter Kirwan, Patricia Lucas, Rice Pichon, Joshua Weinstein, Theodore Zayner, Edward Davila, Gregory Saldivar, Rebecca Delgado, Lisa Herrick, Jill Sardeson, Sarah Scofield, Susan Walker and David H. Yamasaki. [19-5014] (Dorner, Drew) [Entered: 03/01/2019 04:38 PM]
March 1, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1775617] filed by James R. Williams and co-counsel George Allen Brandt on behalf of Appellees County of Santa Clara, Misook Oh, Mary L. Murphy and Darryl Young. [19-5014] (Brandt, George) [Entered: 03/01/2019 04:38 PM]
March 1, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1775601] filed by Google Inc. and Youtube, Inc. [Service Date: 03/01/2019 ] [19-5014] (Ascarrunz, Veronica) [Entered: 03/01/2019 04:07 PM]
March 1, 2019 STATEMENT [1775517] with Disclosure Listing filed by William A. Ingram [Service Date: 03/01/2019 ] [19-5014] (Barnsback, Michael) [Entered: 03/01/2019 10:44 AM]
March 1, 2019 STATEMENT [1775516] with Disclosure Listing filed by San Francisco Bay Area American Inn Of Court [Service Date: 03/01/2019 ] [19-5014] (Barnsback, Michael) [Entered: 03/01/2019 10:43 AM]
March 1, 2019 STATEMENT [1775513] with Disclosure Listing filed by American Inns of Court [Service Date: 03/01/2019 ] [19-5014] (Barnsback, Michael) [Entered: 03/01/2019 10:42 AM]
March 1, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1775510] filed by Michael E. Barnsback on behalf of Appellees American Inns of Court, William A. Ingram and San Francisco Bay Area American Inn Of Court. [19-5014] (Barnsback, Michael) [Entered: 03/01/2019 10:41 AM]
February 28, 2019 STATEMENT [1775429] with Disclosure Listing filed by Google Inc. and Youtube, Inc. [Service Date: 02/28/2019 ] [19-5014] (Ascarrunz, Veronica) [Entered: 02/28/2019 04:48 PM]
February 28, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1775423] filed by Veronica Ascarrunz on behalf of Appellees Google Inc. and Youtube, Inc.. [19-5014] (Ascarrunz, Veronica) [Entered: 02/28/2019 04:34 PM]
February 21, 2019 MOTION [1774340] to be relieved from filing Appendix filed by Ms. Yi Tai Shao, Esquire (Service Date: 02/21/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email) Length Certification: One page of the motion plus one page of proposed order. [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 02/21/2019 09:42 PM]
February 21, 2019 MOTION [1774339] to enlarge the page limits of Opening Brief filed by Ms. Yi Tai Shao, Esquire (Service Date: 02/21/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email) Length Certification: 2 pages plus proposed order (1 page). Totally 3 pages. [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 02/21/2019 09:37 PM]
February 21, 2019 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1774338] filed by Ms. Yi Tai Shao, Esquire [Service Date: 02/21/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 02/21/2019 09:28 PM]
February 21, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1774337] filed by SHAO, Yi Tai on behalf of Appellant Ms. Yi Tai Shao, Esquire. [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 02/21/2019 09:25 PM]
February 21, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1774336] filed by Ms. Yi Tai Shao, Esquire [Service Date: 02/21/2019 ] [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 02/21/2019 09:22 PM]
February 21, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1774334] filed by Ms. Yi Tai Shao, Esquire [Service Date: 02/21/2019 ] [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 02/21/2019 09:20 PM]
February 21, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1774332] filed by Ms. Yi Tai Shao, Esquire [Service Date: 02/21/2019 ] [19-5014] (Shao, Yi Tai) [Entered: 02/21/2019 09:17 PM]
February 7, 2019 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1773137] received from Alicia B. for order [1771163-2] sent to Appellant Ms. Yi Tai Shao, Esquire [19-5014] [Entered: 02/13/2019 10:27 AM]
January 30, 2019 CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1771163] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7016 3010 0000 2295 5447] of order [ # 1771156-2 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 03/01/2019 from Yi Tai Shao, Attorney. [19-5014] [Entered: 01/30/2019 05:06 PM]
January 30, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1771156] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 03/01/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 03/01/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 03/01/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 03/01/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 03/01/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 03/01/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 03/01/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 03/01/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 03/18/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 03/01/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 03/01/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 03/01/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 03/18/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5014] [Entered: 01/30/2019 05:00 PM]
January 30, 2019 LETTER [1771152] sent regarding attorney membership to James S. Aist for Carole Tait-Starnes, Veronica S. Ascarrunz for Google Inc. and Youtube, Inc., George A. Brandt for County of Santa Clara, Darryl Young, Mary L. Murphy and Misook Oh, Drew T. Dorner for Supreme Court of California, Santa Clara County Superior Court of California, Rebecca Delgado, Susan Walker, David H. Yamasaki, Lisa Herrick, California Sixth District Court Of Appeal, Clerk's Office of California Sixth District Court of Appeal, Eugene Premo, Franklin Elia, Patricia Bamattre-manoukian, Edward Davila, Patricia Lucas, Rice Pichon, Theodore Zayner, Joshua Weinstein, Mary Ann Grill, Maureen Folan, Peter Kirwan, Gregory Saldivar, Sarah Scofield, Jill Sardeson, Tani G. Cantil-sakauye, Adrienne M. Grover and California Supreme Court as Doe No. 2 and James A Lassart for James Mcmanis, Michael Reedy, Mcmanis Faulkner, LLP and Janet Everson. Application for Admission due 03/01/2019. [19-5014] [Entered: 01/30/2019 04:56 PM]
January 30, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1771148] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-01233-RC filed by Ms. Yi Tai Shao, Esquire. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5014. [19-5014] [Entered: 01/30/2019 04:54 PM]
January 30, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5014] [Entered: 01/30/2019 04:53 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Yi Tai Shao v. John Roberts, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rice Pichon
Represented By: Drew T. Dorner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BJ Fadem
Represented By: BJ Fadem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tani G. Cantil-Sakauye, Chief Justice as Doe Dft No. 5
Represented By: Drew T. Dorner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John G. Roberts, Chief Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rudolph Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gregory Saldivar, Commissioner
Represented By: Drew T. Dorner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sarah Scofield
Represented By: Drew T. Dorner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tsan-Kuen Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michael Reedy
Represented By: James A. Lassart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jackie Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Google Inc., a Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Veronica S. Ascarrunz
Represented By: Lauren Gallo White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lucy H. Koh, Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ruth Bader Ginsburg, Associate Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mary L. Murphy
Represented By: George A. Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Theodore Zayner, Judge
Represented By: Drew T. Dorner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Edward Davila, Judge
Represented By: Drew T. Dorner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kevin L. Warnock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jill Sardeson
Represented By: Drew T. Dorner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mary Ann Grill, Judge
Represented By: Drew T. Dorner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Janet Everson
Represented By: James A. Lassart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: California Sixth District Court of Appeal
Represented By: Drew T. Dorner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Esther Chung
Represented By: Max Francis Maccoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Patricia Bamattre-Manoukian, Justice
Represented By: Drew T. Dorner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jeff Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Elena Kagan, Associate Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Patricia Lucas, Judge
Represented By: Drew T. Dorner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: American Inns of Court
Represented By: Michael E. Barnsback Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James McManis
Represented By: James A. Lassart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Department of Family and Children Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Elise Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Carole Tait-Starnes
Represented By: James S. Aist Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Eugene Premo, Justice
Represented By: Drew T. Dorner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sonia Sotomayor, Associate Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: County of Santa Clara
Represented By: George A. Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: California Supreme Court as Doe No. 2
Represented By: Drew T. Dorner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lisa Herrick
Represented By: Drew T. Dorner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Peter Kirwan, Judge
Represented By: Drew T. Dorner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. House Judiciary Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Samuel A. Alito, Jr., Associate Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. Senate Judiciary Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Stephen G. Breyer, Associate Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Anthony M. Kennedy, Associate Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Franklin Elia, Justice
Represented By: Drew T. Dorner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Susan Walker
Represented By: Drew T. Dorner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Adrienne M. Grover, Doe Dft. No. 1
Represented By: Drew T. Dorner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Joshua Weinstein, Judge
Represented By: Drew T. Dorner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Does 4-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David H. Yamasaki
Represented By: Drew T. Dorner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Orlando
Represented By: John Orlando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Youtube, Inc., a Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Veronica S. Ascarrunz
Represented By: Lauren Gallo White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. Clifford Wallace, Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Eric Swamwell, House Representative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: McManis Faulkner, LLP
Represented By: James A. Lassart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: San Francisco Bay Area American Inn Of Court
Represented By: Michael E. Barnsback Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Clerk's Office of California Sixth District Court of Appeal
Represented By: Drew T. Dorner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Maureen Folan
Represented By: Drew T. Dorner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Diane Feinstein, Senate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Santa Clara County Superior Court of California
Represented By: Drew T. Dorner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Misook Oh
Represented By: George A. Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Conrad Rushing, Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: William A. Ingram, American Inn of Court
Represented By: Michael E. Barnsback Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Clarence Thomas, Associate Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Supreme Court of California, Doe Dft. No. 4
Represented By: Drew T. Dorner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rebecca Delgado
Represented By: Drew T. Dorner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Darryl Young
Represented By: George A. Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jordan Bickell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Yi Tai Shao, Esquire, Attorney
Represented By: Yi Tai Shao Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Yi Tai Shao
Represented By: Yi Tai Shao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?