Abdulsalam Ali Al-Hela, et al v. Donald Trump, et al
Respondent / Appellee: Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, John C. Ring, Rear Admiral, Commander Joint Task Force - GTMO, Steven G. Yamashita, Army Col, Commander, Joint Detention Group, Stephen Gabavics, Army Col, Commander, Joint Detention Group, Patrick M. Shanahan, Acting Secretary, United States Department of Defense and John F. Hussey, Brigadier General, Commander Joint Task Force - GTMO
Petitioner / Appellant: Abdulsalam Ali Abdulrahman Al-Hela, Detainee Camp Delta, also known as Abd Al-Salam Ali Al-Hila
Not Yet Classified: Abdulwahab Ali Abdulrahman Al-Hela, As Next Friend of Abdulsalam Ali Abdulrahman Al-Hela
Case Number: 19-5079
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
August 28, 2020 Summary Al-Hela v. Trump

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 REDACTED STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1789381] filed by Abdulsalam Ali Abdulrahman Al-Hela [Service Date: 05/24/2019 ] [19-5079] (Foster, Brian) [Entered: 05/24/2019 11:36 AM]
May 1, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1785480] filed by John F. Hussey, Patrick M. Shanahan, Steven G. Yamashita and Donald J. Trump [Service Date: 05/01/2019 ] [19-5079] (Hinshelwood, Bradley) [Entered: 05/01/2019 02:13 PM]
April 30, 2019 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1785359] filed by Abdulsalam Ali Abdulrahman Al-Hela [Service Date: 04/30/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [19-5079] (Foster, Brian) [Entered: 04/30/2019 06:11 PM]
April 30, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1785358] filed by S. William Livingston and co-counsel Brian E. Foster, Andrew D. Garrahan, Cyril T. Djoukeng, David H. Remes on behalf of Appellant Abdulsalam Ali Abdulrahman Al-Hela. [19-5079] (Foster, Brian) [Entered: 04/30/2019 06:10 PM]
April 30, 2019 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1785360] to statement [ # 1785351-2 ], certificate [ # 1785352-2 ], statement [ # 1785353-2 ], record [ # 1785355-2 ], statement [ # 1785356-2 ], notice [ # 1785358-2 ], report status of transcript (final) [ # 1785359-2 ] filed by Abdulsalam Ali Abdulrahman Al-Hela. [19-5079] (Foster, Brian) [Entered: 04/30/2019 06:14 PM]
April 30, 2019 CLASSIFIED UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1785914] submitted by Abdulsalam Ali Abdulrahman Al-Hela [Service Date: 04/30/2019 ] [19-5079] [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:53 AM]
April 30, 2019 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1785356] filed by Abdulsalam Ali Abdulrahman Al-Hela [Service Date: 04/30/2019 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [19-5079] (Foster, Brian) [Entered: 04/30/2019 06:01 PM]
April 30, 2019 CLASSIFIED STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1785907] filed by Abdulsalam Ali Abdulrahman Al-Hela [Service Date: 04/30/2019 ] [19-5079] [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:50 AM]
April 30, 2019 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1785355] submitted by Abdulsalam Ali Abdulrahman Al-Hela [Service Date: 04/30/2019 ] [19-5079] (Foster, Brian) [Entered: 04/30/2019 06:00 PM]
April 30, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1785352] filed by Abdulsalam Ali Abdulrahman Al-Hela [Service Date: 04/30/2019 ] [19-5079] (Foster, Brian) [Entered: 04/30/2019 05:57 PM]
April 30, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1785351] filed by Abdulsalam Ali Abdulrahman Al-Hela [Service Date: 04/30/2019 ] [19-5079] (Foster, Brian) [Entered: 04/30/2019 05:56 PM]
April 30, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1785353] filed by Abdulsalam Ali Abdulrahman Al-Hela [Service Date: 04/30/2019 ] [19-5079] (Foster, Brian) [Entered: 04/30/2019 05:59 PM]
April 3, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1781011] filed by Brad Hinshelwood and co-counsel Sharon Swingle on behalf of Appellees John C. Ring, Patrick M. Shanahan, Donald J. Trump and Steven G. Yamashita. [19-5079] (Hinshelwood, Bradley) [Entered: 04/03/2019 04:38 PM]
April 1, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1780409] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 05/01/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 05/01/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/01/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/01/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/01/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 05/01/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/01/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/01/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 05/16/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 05/01/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/01/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/01/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 05/16/2019 [19-5079] [Entered: 04/01/2019 11:32 AM]
March 29, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1780403] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:05-cv-01048-UNA filed by Abdulsalam Ali Abdulrahman Al-Hela. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5079. [19-5079] [Entered: 04/01/2019 11:27 AM]
March 29, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5079] [Entered: 04/01/2019 11:23 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Abdulsalam Ali Al-Hela, et al v. Donald Trump, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Donald J. Trump, President of the United States
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Represented By: Bradley Hinshelwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: John C. Ring, Rear Admiral, Commander Joint Task Force - GTMO
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Represented By: Bradley Hinshelwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Steven G. Yamashita, Army Col, Commander, Joint Detention Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Stephen Gabavics, Army Col, Commander, Joint Detention Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Patrick M. Shanahan, Acting Secretary, United States Department of Defense
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Represented By: Bradley Hinshelwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: John F. Hussey, Brigadier General, Commander Joint Task Force - GTMO
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Represented By: Bradley Hinshelwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Abdulsalam Ali Abdulrahman Al-Hela, Detainee Camp Delta, also known as Abd Al-Salam Ali Al-Hila
Represented By: Schuyler W. Livingston
Represented By: Brian Ernest Foster
Represented By: Andrew Duffield Garrahan
Represented By: David Harry Remes
Represented By: Cyril Djoukeng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Abdulwahab Ali Abdulrahman Al-Hela, As Next Friend of Abdulsalam Ali Abdulrahman Al-Hela
Represented By: Schuyler W. Livingston
Represented By: Brian Ernest Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?