Public Employees for Environm, et al v. U.S. Chemical Safety and Haza
Defendant / Appellant: U.S. Chemical Safety and Hazard Investigation Board
Plaintiff / Appellee: Louisiana Bucket Brigade, United Support and Memorial for Workplace Fatalities, Air Alliance Houston, Dr. Neil Carman, PH.D. and Public Employees for Environmental Responsibility
Case Number: 19-5089
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1790294] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 07/09/2019. APPELLEE Brief due on 08/08/2019. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 08/29/2019. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 09/05/2019. Final Briefs due 09/19/2019. [19-5089] [Entered: 05/30/2019 05:27 PM]
May 17, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1788356] filed by Sommer H. Engels on behalf of Appellant U.S. Chemical Safety and Hazard Investigation Board. [19-5089] (Engels, Sommer) [Entered: 05/17/2019 02:29 PM]
May 8, 2019 STATEMENT [1786987] with Disclosure Listing filed by Air Alliance Houston, Louisiana Bucket Brigade, Public Employees for Environmental Responsibility and United Support and Memorial for Workplace Fatalities [Service Date: 05/08/2019 ] [19-5089] (Dinerstein, Paula) [Entered: 05/08/2019 06:24 PM]
May 8, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1786950] filed by Air Alliance Houston, Neil Carman, Louisiana Bucket Brigade, Public Employees for Environmental Responsibility and United Support and Memorial for Workplace Fatalities [Service Date: 05/08/2019 ] [19-5089] (Dinerstein, Paula) [Entered: 05/08/2019 04:24 PM]
May 8, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1786948] filed by Paula Dinerstein on behalf of Appellees Air Alliance Houston, Neil Carman, Louisiana Bucket Brigade, Public Employees for Environmental Responsibility and United Support and Memorial for Workplace Fatalities. [19-5089] (Dinerstein, Paula) [Entered: 05/08/2019 04:21 PM]
May 8, 2019 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1786877] filed by U.S. Chemical Safety and Hazard Investigation Board [Service Date: 05/08/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-5089] (Kupfer, Avi) [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:10 PM]
May 8, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1786875] filed by U.S. Chemical Safety and Hazard Investigation Board [Service Date: 05/08/2019 ] [19-5089] (Kupfer, Avi) [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:08 PM]
May 8, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1786874] filed by U.S. Chemical Safety and Hazard Investigation Board [Service Date: 05/08/2019 ] [19-5089] (Kupfer, Avi) [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:07 PM]
May 8, 2019 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1786873] filed by U.S. Chemical Safety and Hazard Investigation Board [Service Date: 05/08/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-5089] (Kupfer, Avi) [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:04 PM]
May 8, 2019 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1786872] submitted by U.S. Chemical Safety and Hazard Investigation Board [19-5089] (Kupfer, Avi) [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:03 PM]
May 8, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1786870] filed by U.S. Chemical Safety and Hazard Investigation Board [Service Date: 05/08/2019 ] [19-5089] (Kupfer, Avi) [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:02 PM]
May 8, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1786736] filed by Avi Kupfer on behalf of Appellant U.S. Chemical Safety and Hazard Investigation Board. [19-5089] (Kupfer, Avi) [Entered: 05/08/2019 10:55 AM]
April 8, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1781726] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 05/08/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 05/08/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/08/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/08/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/08/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 05/08/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/08/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/08/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 05/23/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 05/08/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/08/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/08/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 05/23/2019 [19-5089] [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:22 PM]
April 8, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1781724] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:17-cv-02608-APM filed by U.S. Chemical Safety and Hazard Investigation Board. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5089. [19-5089] [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:21 PM]
April 8, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5089] [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:19 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Public Employees for Environm, et al v. U.S. Chemical Safety and Haza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: U.S. Chemical Safety and Hazard Investigation Board
Represented By: Sommer H. Engels
Represented By: Avi Kupfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Louisiana Bucket Brigade
Represented By: Paula N. Dinerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: United Support and Memorial for Workplace Fatalities
Represented By: Paula N. Dinerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Air Alliance Houston
Represented By: Paula N. Dinerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Dr. Neil Carman, PH.D.
Represented By: Paula N. Dinerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Public Employees for Environmental Responsibility
Represented By: Paula N. Dinerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?