State of New York, et al v. DOL, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: District of Columbia, State of Maryland, State of Washington, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, State of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of New Jersey, State of Delaware, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Oregon, Commonwealth of Virginia and State of California
Defendant / Appellant: United States of America, United States Department of Labor and R. Alexander Acosta, in his official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of Labor
Amicus Curiae: Lake Cities Chamber of Commerce, (Texas), State of Kentucky, by and through Governor Matt Bevin, Las Vegas Latin Chamber of Commerce, (Nevada), Wylie Chamber of Commerce, (Texas), Phil Bryant, Governor of Mississippi, Urban Chamber of Commerce, (Nevada), Greater Las Vegas Association of REALTORS, Elgin Area Chamber of Commerce, (Illinois), Marshfield Area Chamber of Commerce & Industry, (Wisconsin), Coalition to Protect and Promote Association Health Plans, Las Vegas Metro Chamber of Commerce, (Nevada), Greater Lexington Chamber of Commerce and Visitors Center, (South Carolina), Kansas City Regional Association of REALTORS, Rowlett Chamber of Commerce, (Texas), St. Charles Chamber of Commerce, (Illinois), Baldwin County Association of REALTORS, State of Utah, East Parker County Chamber of Commerce, (Texas), Hurst Euless Bedford Chamber of Commerce, (Texas), Greater Arlington Chamber of Commerce, (Texas), North Texas Gay Lesbian Bisexual Transgender Chamber of Commerce, (Texas), Northwest Chamber of Commerce, (Missouri), Greater Fairbanks Chamber of Commerce, (Alaska), The Chamber (Schertz-Cibolo-Selma Area), (Texas), Chamber (Schertz-Cibolo-Selma Area), (Texas), Wichita Falls Chamber of Commerce, (Texas), Restaurant Law Center, Orland Chamber of Commerce, (Illinois), Reno and Sparks Chamber of Commerce, (Nevada), Zebulan Chamber of Commerce, (North Carolina), Heritage Corridor Business Alliance, (Illinois), Wheaton Chamber of Commerce, (Illinois), Nevada Association of REALTORS, Oklahoma Insurance Department, Mesquite Chamber of Commerce, (Texas), State of South Carolina, Vermont Chamber of Commerce, Traverse City Area Chamber of Commerce, (Michigan), Las Vegas Asian Chamber of Commerce, (Nevada), State of Kansas, Lewisville Area Chamber of Commerce, Tucson Metro Chamber, (Arizona), State Chamber of Oklahoma, Grand Prairie Chamber of Commerce, (Texas), Wisconsin Manufacturers & Commerce, Greater Waco Chamber of Commerce, (Texas), Cedar Hill Chamber of Commerce, (Texas), State of Indiana, Texas Association of Business, State of Louisiana, Frisco Chamber of Commerce, (Texas), Denison Area Chamber of Commerce, (Texas), Colleyville Chamber of Commerce, (Texas), State of Tennessee, United Service Association for Health Care, Tennessee REALTORS, Boulder City Chamber of Commerce, (Nevada), Lubbock Chamber of Commerce, (Texas), State of Alabama, Chester County Chamber of Business and Industry, (Pennsylvania), Henderson Chamber of Commerce, AssociationHealthPlans.com, Allen Fairview Chamber of Commerce, (Texas), Granbury Chamber of Commerce, (Texas), Garland Chamber of Commerce, (Texas), State of West Virginia, Mansfield Area Chamber of Commerce, (Texas), Plano Chamber of Commerce, (Texas), Minnesota Chamber of Commerce, State of Montana, San Antonio Chamber of Commerce, (Texas), Alaska Chamber of Commerce, State of Georgia, State of North Dakota, East Valley Chambers of Commerce Alliance, (Arizona), State of South Dakota, Elmhurst Chamber of Commerce & Industry, (Illinois), Tennessee Chamber of Commerce & Industry, National Association of Realtors, Rockwall Area Chamber of Commerce, (Texas), State of Oklahoma, Bolingbrook Area Chamber of Commerce, (Illinois), Longview Chamber of Commerce, (Texas), Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Federation of Independent Business, Pottsboro Area Chamber of Commerce, (Texas), Carol Stream Chamber of Commerce, (Illinois), Louisiana Association of Business and Industry, State of Texas, Greater Miami Chamber of Commerce, (Florida), Grapevine Chamber of Commerce, (Texas), Montana State Auditor, Commissioner of Securities and Insurance, West Suburban Chamber of Commerce and Industry, (Illinois), Chamber630, (Illinois) and Melissa Area Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Case Number: 19-5125
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 CORRECTED AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1793456] filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Federation of Independent Business, Texas Association of Business, United Service Association for Health Care, Alaska Chamber of Commerce, Allen Fairview Chamber of Commerce, Bolingbrook Area Chamber of Commerce, Boulder City Chamber of Commerce, Carol Stream Chamber of Commerce, Cedar Hill Chamber of Commerce, Chamber (Schertz-Cibolo-Selma Area), Chamber630, Chester County Chamber of Business and Industry, Colleyville Chamber of Commerce, Denison Area Chamber of Commerce, East Parker County Chamber of Commerce, East Valley Chambers of Commerce Alliance, Elgin Area Chamber of Commerce, Elmhurst Chamber of Commerce & Industry, Frisco Chamber of Commerce, Garland Chamber of Commerce, Granbury Chamber of Commerce, Grand Prairie Chamber of Commerce, Grapevine Chamber of Commerce, Greater Arlington Chamber of Commerce, Greater Lexington Chamber of Commerce and Visitors Center, Greater Miami Chamber of Commerce, Greater Waco Chamber of Commerce, Henderson Chamber of Commerce, Heritage Corridor Business Alliance, Hurst Euless Bedford Chamber of Commerce, Lake Cities Chamber of Commerce, Las Vegas Asian Chamber of Commerce, Las Vegas Latin Chamber of Commerce, Las Vegas Metro Chamber of Commerce, Lewisville Area Chamber of Commerce, Longview Chamber of Commerce, Louisiana Association of Business and Industry, Lubbock Chamber of Commerce, Mansfield Area Chamber of Commerce, Marshfield Area Chamber of Commerce & Industry, Melissa Area Chamber of Commerce, Mesquite Chamber of Commerce, Minnesota Chamber of Commerce, North Texas Gay Lesbian Bisexual Transgender Chamber of Commerce, Northwest Chamber of Commerce, Orland Chamber of Commerce, Plano Chamber of Commerce, Pottsboro Area Chamber of Commerce, Reno and Sparks Chamber of Commerce, Rockwall Area Chamber of Commerce, Rowlett Chamber of Commerce, San Antonio Chamber of Commerce, St. Charles Chamber of Commerce, State Chamber of Oklahoma, Tennessee Chamber of Commerce & Industry, The Chamber (Schertz-Cibolo-Selma Area), Traverse City Area Chamber of Commerce, Tucson Metro Chamber, Urban Chamber of Commerce, Vermont Chamber of Commerce, West Suburban Chamber of Commerce and Industry, Wheaton Chamber of Commerce, Wichita Falls Chamber of Commerce, Wisconsin Manufacturers & Commerce, Wylie Chamber of Commerce and Zebulan Chamber of Commerce [Service Date: 06/18/2019 ] Length of Brief: 4,911 words. [19-5125] (McGinley, Michael) [Entered: 06/18/2019 08:00 PM]
June 10, 2019 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1791921] to Amicus brief [ # 1791774-2 ] filed by R. Alexander Acosta, DOL, USA, Alaska Chamber of Commerce, Chamber (Schertz-Cibolo-Selma Area), Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Chester County Chamber of Business and Industry, East Valley Chambers of Commerce Alliance, Grapevine Chamber of Commerce, Greater Lexington Chamber of Commerce and Visitors Center, Greater Miami Chamber of Commerce, Greater Waco Chamber of Commerce, Henderson Chamber of Commerce, Hurst Euless Bedford Chamber of Commerce, Las Vegas Metro Chamber of Commerce, Lubbock Chamber of Commerce, Minnesota Chamber of Commerce, Montana State Auditor, Commissioner of Securities and Insurance, National Association of Realtors, National Federation of Independent Business, Nevada Association of REALTORS, Oklahoma Insurance Department, Reno and Sparks Chamber of Commerce, Restaurant Law Center, San Antonio Chamber of Commerce, State Chamber of Oklahoma, Texas Association of Business, The Baldwin County Association of REALTORS, The Greater Las Vegas Association of REALTORS, The Kansas City Regional Association of REALTORS, The Tennessee REALTORS, Tucson Metro Chamber, Vermont Chamber of Commerce, Wisconsin Manufacturers & Commerce, Zebulan Chamber of Commerce and Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Delaware, State of Maryland, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of Oregon and State of Washington. [19-5125] (Goldowitz, Israel) [Entered: 06/10/2019 03:36 PM]
June 10, 2019 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1791918] to Amicus brief [ # 1791771-2 ] filed by National Association of Realtors. [19-5125] (Goldowitz, Israel) [Entered: 06/10/2019 03:34 PM]
June 10, 2019 AMENDED NOTICE [1791913] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, State and Local Chambers of Commerce, the National Federation of Independent Business, the Texas Association of Business, and the United Service Association for Health Care, Marshfield Area Chamber of Commerce & Industry, Wylie Chamber of Commerce, Wichita Falls Chamber of Commerce, Rowlett Chamber of Commerce, Rockwall Area Chamber of Commerce, Pottsboro Area Chamber of Commerce, Plano Chamber of Commerce, North Texas Gay Lesbian Bisexual Transgender Chamber of Commerce, Mesquite Chamber of Commerce, Melissa Area Chamber of Commerce, Mansfield Area Chamber of Commerce, Longview Chamber of Commerce, Lewisville Area Chamber of Commerce, Lake Cities Chamber of Commerce, Greater Arlington Chamber of Commerce, Grand Prairie Chamber of Commerce, Granbury Chamber of Commerce, Garland Chamber of Commerce, Frisco Chamber of Commerce, East Parker County Chamber of Commerce, Denison Area Chamber of Commerce, The Chamber (Schertz-Cibolo-Selma Area), Colleyville Chamber of Commerce, Cedar Hill Chamber of Commerce, Allen Fairview Chamber of Commerce, Urban Chamber of Commerce, Las Vegas Latin Chamber of Commerce, Las Vegas Asian Chamber of Commerce, Boulder City Chamber of Commerce, Northwest Chamber of Commerce, Traverse City Area Chamber of Commerce, Wheaton Chamber of Commerce, West Suburban Chamber of Commerce and Industry, St. Charles Chamber of Commerce, Orland Chamber of Commerce, Heritage Corridor Business Alliance, Elmhurst Chamber of Commerce & Industry, Elgin Area Chamber of Commerce, Chamber630, Carol Stream Chamber of Commerce, Bolingbrook Area Chamber of Commerce, Greater Fairbanks Chamber of Commerce, Tennessee Chamber of Commerce & Industry, Louisiana Association of Business and Industry and United Service Association for Health Care [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] [19-5125]--[Edited 06/11/2019 by LMF] (McGinley, Michael) [Entered: 06/10/2019 03:29 PM]
June 7, 2019 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1791774] filed by Coalition to Protect and Promote Association Health Plans, joined with AssociationHealthPlans. com [Service Date: 06/07/2019 ] Length of Brief: 5,720. [19-5125] (Goldowitz, Israel) [Entered: 06/07/2019 11:01 PM]
June 7, 2019 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1791771] filed by National Association of Realtors [Service Date: 06/07/2019 ] Length of Brief: 4,895 Words. [19-5125] (Goldowitz, Israel) [Entered: 06/07/2019 08:50 PM]
June 7, 2019 JOINT AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1791767] filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Federation of Independent Business, Texas Association of Business, Alaska Chamber of Commerce, Chamber (Schertz-Cibolo-Selma Area), Chester County Chamber of Business and Industry, East Valley Chambers of Commerce Alliance, Grapevine Chamber of Commerce, Greater Lexington Chamber of Commerce and Visitors Center, Greater Miami Chamber of Commerce, Greater Waco Chamber of Commerce, Henderson Chamber of Commerce, Hurst Euless Bedford Chamber of Commerce, Las Vegas Metro Chamber of Commerce, Lubbock Chamber of Commerce, Minnesota Chamber of Commerce, Reno and Sparks Chamber of Commerce, San Antonio Chamber of Commerce, State Chamber of Oklahoma, Tucson Metro Chamber, Vermont Chamber of Commerce, Wisconsin Manufacturers & Commerce and Zebulan Chamber of Commerce United Service Association for Health Care, Tennessee Chamber of Commerce & Industry, Greater Fairbanks Chamber of Commerce, Bolingbrook Area Chamber of Commerce, Carol Stream Chamber of Commerce, Chamber360, Elgin Area Chamber of Commerce, etc. [Service Date: 06/07/2019 ] Length of Brief: This brief complies with the type-volume limitations of Fed. R. App. P. 29(a)(5), Fed. R. App. P. 32(a)(2), and D.C. Cir. Rule 32(e)(3) because it contains 4,911 words, excluding the parts of the brief exempted by Fed. R. App. P. 32(f).. [19-5125] (McGinley, Michael) [Entered: 06/07/2019 07:10 PM]
June 7, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791765] filed by Michael H. McGinley and co-counsel Daryl Joseffer on behalf of Amicus Curiae for Appellant Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. [19-5125] (McGinley, Michael) [Entered: 06/07/2019 05:53 PM]
June 7, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791764] filed by Michael H. McGinley on behalf of Amici Curiae for Appellant Alaska Chamber of Commerce, Chamber (Schertz-Cibolo-Selma Area), Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Chester County Chamber of Business and Industry, East Valley Chambers of Commerce Alliance, Grapevine Chamber of Commerce, Greater Lexington Chamber of Commerce and Visitors Center, Greater Miami Chamber of Commerce, Greater Waco Chamber of Commerce, Henderson Chamber of Commerce, Hurst Euless Bedford Chamber of Commerce, Las Vegas Metro Chamber of Commerce, Lubbock Chamber of Commerce, Minnesota Chamber of Commerce, National Federation of Independent Business, Reno and Sparks Chamber of Commerce, San Antonio Chamber of Commerce, State Chamber of Oklahoma, Texas Association of Business, Tucson Metro Chamber, Vermont Chamber of Commerce, Wisconsin Manufacturers & Commerce and Zebulan Chamber of Commerce. [19-5125] (McGinley, Michael) [Entered: 06/07/2019 05:51 PM]
June 7, 2019 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1791756] filed by States of Texas, Alabama, Georgia, Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Montana, North Dakota, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Utah, and West Virginia, Governor Phil Bryant of Mississippi, and Kentucky, by and through Governor Matt Bevin [Service Date: 06/07/2019 ] Length of Brief: 4,146 words. [19-5125]--[Edited 06/12/2019 by LMF] (Hawkins, Kyle) [Entered: 06/07/2019 05:13 PM]
June 7, 2019 NOTICE [1791754] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by State of Texas, Alabama, Georgia, Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Montana, North Dakota, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Utah, and West Virginia, Governor Phil Bryant of Mississippi, and Kentucky, by and through Governor Matt Bevin [Service Date: 06/07/2019 ] [19-5125]--[Edited 06/12/2019 by LMF] (Hawkins, Kyle) [Entered: 06/07/2019 05:07 PM]
June 7, 2019 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1791746] filed by The Restaurant Law Center [Service Date: 06/07/2019 ] Length of Brief: 6,128 Words. [19-5125] (Niccolini, Robert) [Entered: 06/07/2019 04:51 PM]
June 7, 2019 NOTICE [1791710] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Attached] filed by Coalition to Protect and Promote Association Health Plans and AssociationHealthPlans.com [Service Date: 06/07/2019 ] [19-5125]--[Edited 06/11/2019 by LMF] (Goldowitz, Israel) [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:26 PM]
June 7, 2019 NOTICE [1791687] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by The Restaurant Law Center [Service Date: 06/07/2019 ] [19-5125]--[Edited 06/10/2019 by LMF] (Niccolini, Robert) [Entered: 06/07/2019 02:12 PM]
June 7, 2019 NOTICE [1791636] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Attached] filed by National Association of Realtors [Service Date: 06/07/2019 ] [19-5125]--[Edited 06/07/2019 by LMF] (Goldowitz, Israel) [Entered: 06/07/2019 11:47 AM]
June 6, 2019 AMENDED NOTICE [1791324] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by Oklahoma Insurance Department and Montana State Auditor [Service Date: 06/05/2019 ] [19-5125] (Rees, Susan) [Entered: 06/06/2019 09:48 AM]
June 5, 2019 JOINT NOTICE [1791304] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, State and Local Chambers of Commerce, National Federation of Independent Business, and Texas Association of Business [Service Date: 06/05/2019 ] [19-5125] --[Edited 06/06/2019 by LMF] (McGinley, Michael) [Entered: 06/05/2019 09:48 PM]
June 5, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791194] filed by Andy Beshear on behalf of Appellee Commonwealth of Kentucky. [19-5125] (Beshear, Andrew) [Entered: 06/05/2019 02:40 PM]
June 5, 2019 JOINT AMICUS FOR APPELLANT FINAL BRIEF [1791122] filed by Montana State Auditor, Commissioner of Securities and Insurance and Oklahoma Insurance Department [Service Date: 06/05/2019 ] Length of Brief: Certificate of Compliance. [19-5125] (Rees, Susan) [Entered: 06/05/2019 12:09 PM]
June 4, 2019 JOINT AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1790995] filed by Oklahoma Insurance Department and Montana State Auditor, Commissioner of Securities and Insurance [Service Date: 06/04/2019 ] Length of Brief: Certificate of Compliance. [19-5125] (Rees, Susan) [Entered: 06/04/2019 05:57 PM]
June 4, 2019 JOINT NOTICE [1790928] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by Oklahoma Insurance Department and Montana State Auditor, Commissioner of Securities and Insurance [Service Date: 06/04/2019 ] [19-5125]--[Edited 06/05/2019 by LMF] (Rees, Susan) [Entered: 06/04/2019 02:51 PM]
June 3, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1790551] filed by Stephen B. Vogel on behalf of Appellee Commonwealth of Massachusetts. [19-5125] (Vogel, Stephen) [Entered: 06/03/2019 09:20 AM]
June 3, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1790542] filed by Jessica M. Willey on behalf of Appellee State of Delaware. [19-5125] (Willey, Jessica) [Entered: 06/03/2019 08:17 AM]
May 31, 2019 APPELLANT BRIEF [1790517] filed by R. Alexander Acosta, DOL and USA [Service Date: 05/31/2019 ] Length of Brief: 11,022 words. [19-5125] (Shih, Michael) [Entered: 05/31/2019 05:38 PM]
May 31, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1790431] filed by R. Alexander Acosta, DOL and USA [Service Date: 05/31/2019 ] [19-5125] (Shih, Michael) [Entered: 05/31/2019 01:05 PM]
May 31, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1790430] filed by R. Alexander Acosta, DOL and USA [Service Date: 05/31/2019 ] [19-5125] (Shih, Michael) [Entered: 05/31/2019 01:03 PM]
May 31, 2019 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1790429] submitted by R. Alexander Acosta, DOL and USA [Service Date: 05/31/2019 ] [19-5125] (Shih, Michael) [Entered: 05/31/2019 12:59 PM]
May 31, 2019 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1790428] filed by R. Alexander Acosta, DOL and USA [Service Date: 05/31/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-5125] (Shih, Michael) [Entered: 05/31/2019 12:57 PM]
May 31, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1790425] filed by USA, DOL and R. Alexander Acosta [Service Date: 05/31/2019 ] [19-5125] (Shih, Michael) [Entered: 05/31/2019 12:56 PM]
May 31, 2019 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1790424] filed by R. Alexander Acosta, DOL and USA [Service Date: 05/31/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [19-5125] (Shih, Michael) [Entered: 05/31/2019 12:55 PM]
May 31, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1790372] filed by State of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, DC, Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of California, State of Delaware, State of Maryland, State of New Jersey, State of Oregon and State of Washington [Service Date: 05/31/2019 ] [19-5125] (Grieco, Matthew) [Entered: 05/31/2019 10:46 AM]
May 30, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1790313] filed by Jona J. Maukonen on behalf of Appellee State of Oregon. [19-5125] (Maukonen, Jona) [Entered: 05/30/2019 06:02 PM]
May 30, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1790220] filed by Michelle S. Kallen on behalf of Appellee Commonwealth of Virginia. [19-5125] (Kallen, Michelle) [Entered: 05/30/2019 02:51 PM]
May 24, 2019 LETTER [1789408] advising of arguing counsel's availability for oral argument filed by State of New York [Service Date: 05/24/2019 ] [19-5125] (Grieco, Matthew) [Entered: 05/24/2019 12:24 PM]
May 22, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1788943] filed by Jeffrey T. Sprung on behalf of Appellee State of Washington. [19-5125] (Sprung, Jeffrey) [Entered: 05/22/2019 12:11 PM]
May 17, 2019 AMENDED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1788409] filed by Matthew W. Grieco and co-counsel Steven C. Wu on behalf of Appellee State of New York. [19-5125] (Grieco, Matthew) [Entered: 05/17/2019 04:52 PM]
May 13, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1787647] filed by Graham E. Phillips and co-counsel Loren L. AliKhan; Caroline S. Van Zile on behalf of Appellee DC. [19-5125] (Phillips, Graham) [Entered: 05/13/2019 04:48 PM]
May 10, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1787269] filed considering appellants' motion to expedite appeal [ # 1787089-2 ], setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 05/31/2019. Brief of Amicus in support of appellants, if any, due 06/07/2019. APPELLEE Brief due on 07/15/2019. Brief of Amicus in support of appellees, if any, due 07/22/2019. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 07/25/2019. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 08/01/2019. Final Briefs due 08/08/2019. [19-5125] [Entered: 05/10/2019 10:37 AM]
May 9, 2019 AMENDED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1787151] filed by Michael Shih and co-counsel Jennifer L. Utrecht, Mark B. Stern, Michael S. Raab on behalf of Appellants R. Alexander Acosta, DOL and USA. [19-5125] (Utrecht, Jennifer) [Entered: 05/09/2019 01:59 PM]
May 9, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1787089] to expedite case filed by R. Alexander Acosta, DOL and USA [Service Date: 05/09/2019 ] Length Certification: 4,247. [19-5125] (Shih, Michael) [Entered: 05/09/2019 11:39 AM]
May 8, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1786956] filed by Michael Shih and co-counsel Jennifer L. Utrecht; Mark B. Stern on behalf of Appellants R. Alexander Acosta, DOL and USA. [19-5125] (Shih, Michael) [Entered: 05/08/2019 04:28 PM]
May 8, 2019 LETTER [1786700] sent regarding attorney membership to Jessica M. Willey for State of Delaware. Application for Admission due 06/07/2019. [19-5125] [Entered: 05/08/2019 09:48 AM]
May 8, 2019 LETTER [1786697] sent regarding attorney membership to Taylor Payne for Commonwealth of Kentucky. Application for Admission due 06/07/2019. [19-5125] [Entered: 05/08/2019 09:46 AM]
May 8, 2019 LETTER [1786693] sent regarding attorney membership to Scott J. Kaplan for State of Oregon. Application for Admission due 06/07/2019. [19-5125] [Entered: 05/08/2019 09:44 AM]
May 8, 2019 LETTER [1786688] sent regarding attorney membership to Eric M. Gold for Commonwealth of Massachusetts. Application for Admission due 06/07/2019. [19-5125] [Entered: 05/08/2019 09:38 AM]
May 7, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1786579] filed by Steven C. Wu on behalf of Appellee State of New York. [19-5125] (Wu, Steven) [Entered: 05/07/2019 02:06 PM]
May 1, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1785535] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 05/31/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 05/31/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/31/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/31/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/31/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 05/31/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/31/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/31/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/17/2019. Directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 05/31/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/31/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/31/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/17/2019 [19-5125] [Entered: 05/01/2019 04:08 PM]
May 1, 2019 LETTER [1785530] sent regarding attorney membership to Matthew Colangelo for appellees. Application for Admission due 05/31/2019. [19-5125] [Entered: 05/01/2019 04:02 PM]
April 30, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1785527] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-01747-JDB filed by R. Alexander Acosta, DOL and USA. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5125. [19-5125] [Entered: 05/01/2019 03:59 PM]
April 30, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5125] [Entered: 05/01/2019 03:58 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: State of New York, et al v. DOL, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: District of Columbia
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Caroline S. Van Zile
Represented By: Graham E. Phillips
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Maryland
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Steven Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Washington
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Sprung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Michael Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of New York
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Matthew William Grieco
Represented By: Steven Wu Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Stephen B. Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of New Jersey
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Berns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Delaware
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Jessica M. Willey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Andrew G. Beshear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Oregon
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Jona Maukonen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Michelle Shane Kallen
Represented By: Matthew Robert McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of California
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Karli Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: United States of America
Represented By: Mark B. Stern
Represented By: Jennifer L. Utrecht
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Represented By: Melissa Moore
Represented By: Michael Shih
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: United States Department of Labor
Represented By: Mark B. Stern
Represented By: Jennifer L. Utrecht
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Represented By: Melissa Moore
Represented By: Michael Shih
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: R. Alexander Acosta, in his official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of Labor
Represented By: Mark B. Stern
Represented By: Jennifer L. Utrecht
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Represented By: Melissa Moore
Represented By: Michael Shih
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lake Cities Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Kentucky, by and through Governor Matt Bevin
Represented By: Kyle D. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Las Vegas Latin Chamber of Commerce, (Nevada)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Wylie Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Phil Bryant, Governor of Mississippi
Represented By: Kyle D. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Urban Chamber of Commerce, (Nevada)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Greater Las Vegas Association of REALTORS
Represented By: Israel Goldowitz Esquire I
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Elgin Area Chamber of Commerce, (Illinois)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Marshfield Area Chamber of Commerce & Industry, (Wisconsin)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Coalition to Protect and Promote Association Health Plans
Represented By: Israel Goldowitz Esquire I
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Las Vegas Metro Chamber of Commerce, (Nevada)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Greater Lexington Chamber of Commerce and Visitors Center, (South Carolina)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kansas City Regional Association of REALTORS
Represented By: Israel Goldowitz Esquire I
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rowlett Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: St. Charles Chamber of Commerce, (Illinois)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Baldwin County Association of REALTORS
Represented By: Israel Goldowitz Esquire I
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Utah
Represented By: Kyle D. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: East Parker County Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Hurst Euless Bedford Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Greater Arlington Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: North Texas Gay Lesbian Bisexual Transgender Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Northwest Chamber of Commerce, (Missouri)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Greater Fairbanks Chamber of Commerce, (Alaska)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Chamber (Schertz-Cibolo-Selma Area), (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chamber (Schertz-Cibolo-Selma Area), (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Wichita Falls Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Restaurant Law Center
Represented By: Robert R. Niccolini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Orland Chamber of Commerce, (Illinois)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Reno and Sparks Chamber of Commerce, (Nevada)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Zebulan Chamber of Commerce, (North Carolina)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Heritage Corridor Business Alliance, (Illinois)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Wheaton Chamber of Commerce, (Illinois)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Nevada Association of REALTORS
Represented By: Israel Goldowitz Esquire I
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Oklahoma Insurance Department
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mesquite Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of South Carolina
Represented By: Kyle D. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Vermont Chamber of Commerce
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Traverse City Area Chamber of Commerce, (Michigan)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Las Vegas Asian Chamber of Commerce, (Nevada)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Kansas
Represented By: Kyle D. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lewisville Area Chamber of Commerce
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tucson Metro Chamber, (Arizona)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State Chamber of Oklahoma
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Grand Prairie Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Wisconsin Manufacturers & Commerce
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Greater Waco Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Cedar Hill Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Indiana
Represented By: Kyle D. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Texas Association of Business
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Kyle D. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Frisco Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Denison Area Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Colleyville Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Tennessee
Represented By: Kyle D. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: United Service Association for Health Care
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tennessee REALTORS
Represented By: Israel Goldowitz Esquire I
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Boulder City Chamber of Commerce, (Nevada)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lubbock Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Alabama
Represented By: Kyle D. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chester County Chamber of Business and Industry, (Pennsylvania)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Henderson Chamber of Commerce
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AssociationHealthPlans.com
Represented By: Israel Goldowitz Esquire I
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Allen Fairview Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Granbury Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Garland Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of West Virginia
Represented By: Kyle D. Hawkins
Represented By: Patrick J. Morrisey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mansfield Area Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Plano Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Minnesota Chamber of Commerce
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Montana
Represented By: Kyle D. Hawkins
Represented By: Timothy C. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: San Antonio Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Alaska Chamber of Commerce
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Georgia
Represented By: Kyle D. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of North Dakota
Represented By: Kyle D. Hawkins
Represented By: Wayne Kevin Stenehjem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: East Valley Chambers of Commerce Alliance, (Arizona)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of South Dakota
Represented By: Kyle D. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Elmhurst Chamber of Commerce & Industry, (Illinois)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tennessee Chamber of Commerce & Industry
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Association of Realtors
Represented By: Israel Goldowitz Esquire I
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rockwall Area Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Kyle D. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bolingbrook Area Chamber of Commerce, (Illinois)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Longview Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Federation of Independent Business
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Pottsboro Area Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Carol Stream Chamber of Commerce, (Illinois)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Louisiana Association of Business and Industry
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Texas
Represented By: Kyle D. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Greater Miami Chamber of Commerce, (Florida)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Grapevine Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Montana State Auditor, Commissioner of Securities and Insurance
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: West Suburban Chamber of Commerce and Industry, (Illinois)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chamber630, (Illinois)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Melissa Area Chamber of Commerce, (Texas)
Represented By: Michael H. McGinley
Represented By: Daryl Langdon Joseffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?